WELLS FARGO BANK NA v. DODGE
Plaintiff: WELLS FARGO BANK NA
Defendant: JAMES C DODGE
Interested Party: JAMES B BARNS, DISCOVER BANK, MAINE REVENUE SERVICES and MAINE DEPARTMENT OF HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES
Case Number: 2:2022cv00412
Filed: December 23, 2022
Court: US District Court for the District of Maine
Presiding Judge: LANCE E WALKER
Referring Judge: KAREN FRINK WOLF
Nature of Suit: Real Property: Foreclosure
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332 Diversity-Breach of Contract
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 9, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 9, 2023 Filing 12 AFFIDAVIT of Service by WELLS FARGO BANK NA. DISCOVER BANK served on 1/5/2023. (LONGORIA, RENEAU)
February 9, 2023 Set Deadlines: Check for Filing of a Motion for Default as to DISCOVER BANK on 3/13/2023. (mmy)
January 24, 2023 Filing 11 ANSWER to #1 Complaint,,, by MAINE DEPARTMENT OF HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Lien, #2 Exhibit Agent Affidavit)(HUSTON, JENNIFER)
January 24, 2023 Filing 10 NOTICE of Appearance by JENNIFER G. HUSTON on behalf of MAINE DEPARTMENT OF HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES (HUSTON, JENNIFER)
January 17, 2023 Filing 9 SUMMONS Returned Executed by WELLS FARGO BANK NA. MAINE REVENUE SERVICES served on 1/10/2023. (LONGORIA, RENEAU)
January 11, 2023 Filing 8 ANSWER to #1 Complaint,,, by MAINE REVENUE SERVICES. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit in Support of Tax Lien Amount and Priority Position)(HUSAR, KAITLYN)
January 10, 2023 Filing 7 SUMMONS Returned Executed by WELLS FARGO BANK NA. MAINE DEPARTMENT OF HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES served on 1/4/2023. (LONGORIA, RENEAU)
January 10, 2023 Set Answer Deadline for MAINE DEPARTMENT OF HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES: Answer due by 1/25/2023. (mmy)
December 29, 2022 Filing 6 Summons Issued as to JAMES B BARNS, DISCOVER BANK, JAMES C DODGE, MAINE DEPARTMENT OF HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES, MAINE REVENUE SERVICES. Counsel shall print the embossed summons and effect service in the manner in accordance with Fed.R.Civ.P.4. Note-If you are using Version 6 of Adobe Acrobat, be sure the PRINT WHAT field is set to DOCUMENTS AND COMMENTS (Click File, then Print to check this setting). (Attachments: #1 Summons -Maine Department of Health and Human Services, #2 Summons - James B. Barns, #3 Summons - Discover Bank, #4 Summons -Maine Revenue Services)(jwr)
December 29, 2022 Filing 5 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by WELLS FARGO BANK NA. (LONGORIA, RENEAU)
December 27, 2022 Filing Fee Paid via Credit Card ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number AMEDC-2742183.), filed by WELLS FARGO BANK NA.(LONGORIA, RENEAU)
December 23, 2022 Filing 4 DIVERSITY DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by WELLS FARGO BANK NA. (jwr)
December 23, 2022 Filing 3 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by WELLS FARGO BANK NA. (jwr)
December 23, 2022 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET. (jwr)
December 23, 2022 Filing 1 COMPLAINT filed by WELLS FARGO BANK NA against JAMES B BARNS, DISCOVER BANK, JAMES C DODGE, MAINE DEPARTMENT OF HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES, MAINE REVENUE SERVICES PAYMENT OF FILING FEE DUE WITHIN 48 HOURS. IF FILING FEE IS BEING PAID WITH A CREDIT CARD COUNSEL ARE INSTRUCTED TO LOGIN TO CMECF AND DOCKET Case Opening Filing Fee Paid FOUND IN THE Complaints and Other Initiating Documents CATEGORY. CHECK PAYMENTS DUE WITHIN 48 HOURS.. (Service of Process Deadline 3/23/2023) Fee due by 12/27/2022. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A -Legal Description, #2 Exhibit B - Note, #3 Exhibit C - Mortgage, #4 Exhibit D Assignment into Wells Fargo Bank, N.A. as Trustees for the Holders of SASCO 2007-MLNI, #5 Exhibit E Nunc Pro Tunc, #6 Exhibit F Quitclaim Assignment Wells Fargo Bank N.A. as Trustee for the holders of SASCO 2007-MLM1, #7 Exhibit G Demand Package, #8 Exhibit H Affidavit Regarding Military Status)(jwr)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Maine District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: WELLS FARGO BANK NA v. DODGE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: WELLS FARGO BANK NA
Represented By: RENEAU J. LONGORIA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JAMES C DODGE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: JAMES B BARNS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: DISCOVER BANK
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: MAINE REVENUE SERVICES
Represented By: KAITLYN M. HUSAR
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: MAINE DEPARTMENT OF HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES
Represented By: JENNIFER G. HUSTON
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?