HIRSHON LAW GROUP PC v. WELLS FARGO BANK NATIONAL ASSOCIATION
Plaintiff: HIRSHON LAW GROUP PC
Defendant: WELLS FARGO BANK NATIONAL ASSOCIATION
Case Number: 2:2023cv00445
Filed: December 7, 2023
Court: US District Court for the District of Maine
Presiding Judge: LANCE E WALKER
Referring Judge: KAREN FRINK WOLF
Nature of Suit: Other Fraud
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332 Diversity-Fraud
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 24, 2024. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 24, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 13 CONSENT CONFIDENTIALITY ORDER By MAGISTRATE JUDGE KAREN FRINK WOLF. (mmy)
January 12, 2024 Filing 12 Consent MOTION for Confidentiality Order by HIRSHON LAW GROUP PC Responses due by 2/2/2024. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Consent Confidentiality Order)(TINKLE, MARSHALL)
January 12, 2024 Reset Answer Deadline for WELLS FARGO BANK NATIONAL ASSOCIATION per Order #11: Answer due by 3/18/2024. (mmy)
January 11, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER granting #10 Motion for Extension of Time. Defendant shall answer or otherwise respond to Plaintiff's Complaint by March 18, 2024. By MAGISTRATE JUDGE KAREN FRINK WOLF. (WOLF, KAREN)
January 10, 2024 Filing 10 Unopposed MOTION to Extend Time to File Answer by WELLS FARGO BANK NATIONAL ASSOCIATION Responses due by 1/31/2024. (BELLEAU, JAMES)
December 21, 2023 Filing 9 DIVERSITY DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by HIRSHON LAW GROUP PC. (TINKLE, MARSHALL)
December 21, 2023 Filing 8 STATE COURT RECORD with Affidavit by WELLS FARGO BANK NATIONAL ASSOCIATION. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Docket Record, #2 Exhibit 2 - Complaint, #3 Exhibit 3 - Summons served on Wells Fargo NA, #4 Exhibit 4 - Dft Notification of Filing Notice of Removal)(BELLEAU, JAMES)
December 19, 2023 Set Deadlines as to HIRSHON LAW GROUP PC: Per Civil Rule 7.1 as Amended December 1, 2022 Diversity Disclosure Statement due by 12/26/2023. (mmy)
December 12, 2023 Reset Answer Deadline for WELLS FARGO BANK NATIONAL ASSOCIATION per Order #7: Answer due by 1/16/2024. (mmy)
December 11, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER granting #6 Motion for Extension of Time. Defendant shall answer or otherwise respond to Plaintiff's Complaint by January 16, 2024. By MAGISTRATE JUDGE KAREN FRINK WOLF. (WOLF, KAREN)
December 11, 2023 Filing 6 Unopposed MOTION to Extend Time to File Answer to Complaint by WELLS FARGO BANK NATIONAL ASSOCIATION Responses due by 1/2/2024. (BELLEAU, JAMES)
December 8, 2023 Filing 5 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by HIRSHON LAW GROUP PC. (TINKLE, MARSHALL)
December 7, 2023 Filing 4 PROCEDURAL ORDER RE: REMOVAL: State Court Record due by 12/21/2023. By Deputy Clerk Cheryl Derrah. (cjd) Modified on 12/11/2023 to remove Judge's name (cjd).
December 7, 2023 Filing 3 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by WELLS FARGO BANK NATIONAL ASSOCIATION. (cjd)
December 7, 2023 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET. (cjd)
December 7, 2023 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Cumberland County Superior Court PAYMENT OF FILING FEE DUE WITHIN 48 HOURS. IF FILING FEE IS BEING PAID WITH A CREDIT CARD COUNSEL ARE INSTRUCTED TO LOGIN TO CMECF AND DOCKET Case Opening Filing Fee Paid FOUND IN THE Complaints and Other Initiating Documents CATEGORY. CHECK PAYMENTS DUE WITHIN 48 HOURS., filed by WELLS FARGO BANK NATIONAL ASSOCIATION. Fee due by 12/11/2023. Per Civil Rule 7.1 as Amended December 1, 2022 Diversity Disclosure Statement due by 12/14/2023. (Attachments: #1 Summons and Complaint)(cjd) Modified on 12/11/2023 to remove partial docket number from Cumberland County (cjd).
December 7, 2023 Filing Fee Paid via Credit Card ( Filing fee $ 405 receipt number AMEDC-2886784.), filed by WELLS FARGO BANK NATIONAL ASSOCIATION.(BELLEAU, JAMES)
December 7, 2023 Set Answer Deadline for Wells Fargo Bank : Answer due by 12/14/2023. (cjd)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Maine District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: HIRSHON LAW GROUP PC v. WELLS FARGO BANK NATIONAL ASSOCIATION
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: HIRSHON LAW GROUP PC
Represented By: MARSHALL J. TINKLE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: WELLS FARGO BANK NATIONAL ASSOCIATION
Represented By: JAMES E. BELLEAU
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?