COULTER v. BERRY DUNN MCNEIL & PARKER LLC
Plaintiff: EMILY COULTER
Defendant: BERRY DUNN MCNEIL & PARKER LLC
Case Number: 2:2024cv00192
Filed: May 28, 2024
Court: US District Court for the District of Maine
Presiding Judge: KAREN FRINK WOLF
Referring Judge: JOHN A WOODCOCK
Nature of Suit: Other Fraud
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332 Diversity-Breach of Contract
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 28, 2024. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 28, 2024 Filing 6 Case transferred in from District of Florida Northern; Case Number 4:24-cv-00201. Copy of transfer order and docket sheet received.
May 28, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER GRANTING MOTION TO TRANSFER - The Parties' Joint Motion to Transfer, ECF No. #4 , is GRANTED. The Clerk shall terminate all other pending motions and take all steps necessary to transfer this action to the United States District Court for the District of Maine. The Clerk shall close the file. Signed by CHIEF JUDGE MARK E WALKER on 5/28/2024. (baf) [Transferred from Florida Northern on 5/28/2024.]
May 28, 2024 Set Deadlines : Pro Hac Vice Certificate due by 6/11/2024. The Certification for Admission Pro Hac Vice form can be downloaded from our website at #http://www.med.uscourts.gov/forms. (jam)
May 24, 2024 Filing 4 (Construed as a MOTION) STIPULATION Joint Stipulation to Transfer to District of Maine by BERRY, DUNN, MCNEIL, & PARKER LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Berry Dunn Consolidation Order 5-6-2024) (LEE, CHRISTOPHER) Modified event type on 5/28/2024 (baf). [Transferred from Florida Northern on 5/28/2024.]
May 24, 2024 Filing 3 NOTICE of Appearance by CHRISTOPHER WALDEN LEE on behalf of BERRY, DUNN, MCNEIL, & PARKER LLC (LEE, CHRISTOPHER) [Transferred from Florida Northern on 5/28/2024.]
May 13, 2024 Filing 2 DOCKET ANNOTATION BY COURT: Counsel is advised by this entry, that a Civil Cover Sheet should be filed as a separate entry using the event selection "Civil Cover Sheet" which is found under "Other Filings" under "Other Documents". Please File the Civil Cover Sheet. (baf) [Transferred from Florida Northern on 5/28/2024.]
May 9, 2024 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against BERRY DUNN MCNEIL & PARKER LLC ( Filing fee $ 405 receipt number BFLNDC-8792809.), filed by Emily Coulter. (FORNARO, MATTHEW) [Transferred from Florida Northern on 5/28/2024.] Modified on 5/28/2024 to indicate the compliant is against BERRY DUNN MCNEIL & PARKER LLC (jgd).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Maine District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: COULTER v. BERRY DUNN MCNEIL & PARKER LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: EMILY COULTER
Represented By: MATTHEW FORNARO
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BERRY DUNN MCNEIL & PARKER LLC
Represented By: CHRISTOPHER WALDEN LEE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?