Radich et al v. Deleon Guerrero
Plaintiff: David J. Radich and Li-Rong Radich
Defendant: James C. Deleon Guerrero and Larrisa Larson
Intervenor: Tanapag Middle School Parent Teacher Student Association
Case Number: 1:2014cv00020
Filed: September 5, 2014
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Mariana Islands
Office: NMI Office
County: Northern Mariana Islands
Presiding Judge: Ramona V Manglona
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 30, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 30, 2018 Filing 86 MANDATE of USCA as to #78 Notice of Appeal filed by Tanapag Middle School Parent Teacher Student Association. (FPA)
November 23, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 85 ORDER of United States Court of Appeals re #78 Notice of Appeal filed by Tanapag Middle School Parent Teacher Student Association. (FPA)
July 21, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 84 ORDER of United States Court of Appeals re #78 Notice of Appeal filed by Tanapag Middle School Parent Teacher Student Association. (FPA)
July 10, 2018 Filing 83 MEMORANDUM of United States Court of Appeals re #78 Notice of Appeal. (FPA)
October 21, 2016 Filing 82 NOTICE by All Plaintiffs of Payment (Guidotti, Daniel)
September 20, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 81 DECISION And Order Granting In Part And Denying In part Plaintiff's #61 Motion for Attorney Fees and Expenses. Signed by Chief Judge Ramona V. Manglona on 9/20/2016. (TVW)
July 8, 2016 Filing 80 TRANSCRIPT REQUEST Transcript Designation and Ordering Form by Tanapag Middle School Parent Teacher Student Association. (Horey, Joseph)
June 8, 2016 Filing 79 REPRESENTATION Statement filed by Tanapag Middle School Parent Teacher Student Association re #78 Notice of Appeal. (BTC)
June 8, 2016 Filing 78 NOTICE OF APPEAL as to #76 Order on Motion to Intervene, Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief, #69 Clerk's Judgment by Tanapag Middle School Parent Teacher Student Association. Filing fee $ 455, receipt number MPX1 4103. (BTC)
May 27, 2016 Filing 77 NOTICE by Tanapag Middle School Parent Teacher Student Association Supplemental Citations (Horey, Joseph)
May 27, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 76 DECISION and ORDER Denying #66 Motion to Intervene. Signed by Chief Judge Ramona V. Manglona on 5/27/2016. (DPB)
May 26, 2016 Motion Taken Under Advisement: #66 MOTION to Intervene for Purposes of Appeal, filed by Tanapag Middle School Parent Teacher Association. (TPM)
May 26, 2016 Filing 75 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Chief Judge Ramona V. Manglona: Motion Hearing held on 5/26/2016 re #66 MOTION to Intervene for Purposes of Appeal filed by Tanapag Middle School Parent Teacher Student Association. (Court Reporter PAG) (TPM)
May 19, 2016 Filing 74 RESPONSE in Support re #66 MOTION to Intervene Motion to Intervene for Purposes of Appeal Reply In Support of Motion to Intervene for Purposes of Appeal filed by Tanapag Middle School Parent Teacher Student Association. (Horey, Joseph)
May 10, 2016 Motion Taken Under Advisement: #61 MOTION for Attorney Fees and Expenses filed by David J. Radich and Li-Rong Radich. (TPM)
May 10, 2016 Filing 73 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Chief Judge Ramona V. Manglona: Motion Hearing held on 5/10/2016 re #61 MOTION for Attorney Fees and Expenses filed by David J. Radich and Li-Rong Radich. (Court Reporter PAG) (TPM)
May 10, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 72 ORDER Granting #71 PLAINTIFFS L.R.16.2CJ.e.1.(a) REQUEST TO APPEAR TELEPHONICALLY. Signed by Chief Judge Ramona V. Manglona on 5/10/2016. (DPB )
May 9, 2016 Filing 71 PLAINTIFFS L.R.16.2CJ.e.1.(a) REQUEST TO APPEAR TELEPHONICALLY by David G. Sigale appearing for Plaintiffs David J. Radich, Li-Rong Radich (DPB )
May 9, 2016 Filing 70 RESPONSE in Opposition re #66 MOTION to Intervene Motion to Intervene for Purposes of Appeal filed by David J. Radich, Li-Rong Radich. (Sigale, David)
May 9, 2016 Filing 69 CLERK'S ENTRY OF JUDGMENT (DPB)
April 27, 2016 Filing 68 MEMORANDUM in Support re #66 MOTION to Intervene Motion to Intervene for Purposes of Appeal filed by Tanapag Middle School Parent Teacher Student Association. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of A. Kodep Ogumoro-Uludong) (Horey, Joseph)
April 26, 2016 Filing 67 Emergency MOTION Emergency Motion Under Local rule 7.1h.3(b) to extend time for filing of Notice of Appeal Joseph E. Horey appearing for Intervenor Tanapag Middle School Parent Teacher Student Association (Horey, Joseph)
April 26, 2016 Set Hearings: re #66 MOTION to Intervene for Purposes of Appeal. Motion Hearing set for 5/26/2016 02:00 PM in Courtroom 101 before Chief Judge Ramona V. Manglona. (DPB )
April 26, 2016 Filing 66 MOTION to Intervene Motion to Intervene for Purposes of Appeal Joseph E. Horey appearing for Intervenor Tanapag Middle School Parent Teacher Student Association (Attachments: #1 Exhibit to Motion to Intervene, #2 Notice of Hearing, #3 Proposed Answer, #4 Exhibit to Proposed Answer) (Horey, Joseph)
April 19, 2016 Set Hearings re #61 MOTION for Attorney Fees. Motion Hearing set for 5/10/2016 10:00 AM in Courtroom 101 before Chief Judge Ramona V. Manglona. (DPB )
April 18, 2016 Filing 65 OPPOSITION to Motion re #61 MOTION for Attorney Fees filed by James C. Deleon Guerrero, Larrisa Larson. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A) (Zarones, James)
April 11, 2016 Filing 64 MEMORANDUM in Support re #63 Memorandum in Support of Motion Exhibit 6B - Cost Receipts (Part 2) filed by David J. Radich, Li-Rong Radich. (Sigale, David)
April 11, 2016 Filing 63 MEMORANDUM in Support re #62 Memorandum in Support of Motion,,, Exhibit 6A - Cost Receipts (Part 1) filed by David J. Radich, Li-Rong Radich. (Sigale, David)
April 11, 2016 Filing 62 MEMORANDUM in Support re #61 MOTION for Attorney Fees filed by David J. Radich, Li-Rong Radich. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Statement of Time and Expense (DGS), #2 Exhibit 1A - Fee Order in Moore v. Madigan, #3 Exhibit 1B - Fee Order and Stipulation in Winbigler v. WCHA, #4 Exhibit 1C - Fee Order in Veasey v. Wilkins, #5 Exhibit 1D - Fee Order in Nino de Rivera Lajous v. Sankey, #6 Exhibit 1E - Fee Order in Jackson v, Eden, #7 Exhibit 1F - Fee Order and Stipulation in Pot v. Witt, #8 Exhibit 1G - USAO Laffey Matrix 2015-16, #9 Exhibit 1H - NLJ Article 011314, #10 Affidavit 2 - Declaration of David G. Sigale, #11 Exhibit 3 - Statement of Time and Expense (DTG), #12 Affidavit 4 - Declaration of Daniel T. Guidotti, #13 Affidavit 5 - Declaration of Charity R. Hodson) (Sigale, David)
April 11, 2016 Filing 61 MOTION for Attorney Fees David G. Sigale appearing for Plaintiffs David J. Radich, Li-Rong Radich (Sigale, David)
March 28, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 60 DECISION AND ORDER Granting Plaintiffs' #51 Cross-Motion for Summary Judgment and Denying Defendants' #50 Cross-Motion for Summary Judgment. Signed by Chief Judge Ramona V. Manglona on 3/28/2016. (TPM)
November 19, 2015 Motions Taken Under Advisement: #50 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by James C. Deleon Guerrero, et al. and #51 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by David L. Radich and Li-Rong Radich. (TPM)
November 19, 2015 Filing 59 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Chief Judge Ramona V. Manglona: Motions Hearing held on 11/19/2015 re #50 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by James C. Deleon Guerrero, et al. and #51 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by David J. Radich and Li-Rong Radich. (Court Reporter PAG) (TPM)
November 9, 2015 Filing 58 REPLY to Response to Motion re #50 MOTION for Summary Judgment , #55 Response in Opposition to Motion filed by James C. Deleon Guerrero, Larrisa Larson. (Zarones, James)
November 9, 2015 Filing 57 RESPONSE filed by All Plaintiffs re #54 Opposition to Motion, #50 MOTION for Summary Judgment (Response to Defendants' Statements of Undisputed Facts). (Sigale, David)
November 9, 2015 Filing 56 REPLY to Response to Motion re #54 Opposition to Motion, #51 Second MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by David J. Radich, Li-Rong Radich. (Sigale, David)
October 26, 2015 Filing 55 RESPONSE in Opposition re #50 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by David J. Radich, Li-Rong Radich. (Sigale, David)
October 26, 2015 Filing 54 OPPOSITION to Motion re #51 Second MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by James C. Deleon Guerrero. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Defendants' Exhibit List in Support of Defendants' Opposition to Plaintiffs' Motion for Summary Judgment) (Zarones, James)
September 21, 2015 Filing 53 STATEMENT filed by All Plaintiffs re #51 Second MOTION for Summary Judgment (F.R.Civ.P. 56 (c)(1) Statement of Undisputed Facts). (Attachments: #1 Appendix Summary Judgment List of Exhibits, #2 Exhibit 1 - Amended Declaration of Li-Rong Radich, #3 Exhibit 2 - Amended Declaration of David J. Radich, #4 Exhibit 3 - Sample WIC Application, #5 Exhibit 4 - Screenshot from mp.gov/executive-directory, #6 Exhibit 5 - Screenshot from mp.gov/excutive-directory, #7 Exhibit 6 - Stipulation (Dkt. #23), #8 Exhibit 7 - Declaration of David G. Sigale, #9 Exhibit 7A - Answers to Interrogatories (David J. Radich), #10 Exhibit 7B - Answers to Interrogatories (Li-Rong Radich)) (Sigale, David)
September 21, 2015 Filing 52 MEMORANDUM in Support re #51 Second MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by David J. Radich, Li-Rong Radich. (Sigale, David)
September 21, 2015 Filing 51 Second MOTION for Summary Judgment David G. Sigale appearing for Plaintiffs David J. Radich, Li-Rong Radich Responses due by 10/26/2015 (Sigale, David)
September 21, 2015 Filing 50 MOTION for Summary Judgment James Matthew Zarones appearing for Defendants James C. Deleon Guerrero, Larrisa Larson (Attachments: #1 Supplement Notice of Motion for Summary Judgment, #2 Exhibit Defendants' Exhibit List in Support of Defendants' Motion for Summary Judgment, #3 Exhibit 1-Declaration of Scott Russell, #4 Exhibit 2-Marianas Political Status Commission Position Paper, #5 Exhibit 3-Analysis of Political and Legal Nature of Relationship Between NMI & US (January 1974), #6 Exhibit 4-Marianas Political Commission Memorandum-Marianas-Applicability of the U.S. Constitution (July 15, 1974), #7 Exhibit 5-Office of Micronesian Status Negotiations Memorandum-Marianas Commonwealth, Application of Articles of the U.S. Constitution (July 8, 1974), #8 Exhibit 6-Constitutional Rights Made Applicable to the State under the Fourteenth Amendment (May 6, 1974), #9 Exhibit 7-Constitutional Convention Briefing Paper No. 7-Bill of Rights (Oct. 8, 1986), #10 Exhibit 8-Constitutional Convention Report No. 4, Committee on Personal Rights (Oct. 29, 1976), #11 Exhibit 9-Constitutional Convention Proposed Amendment No. 37 (Nov. 20, 1976), #12 Exhibit 10-Constitutional Convention Report on Article I, Committee on Personal Rights (Nov. 22, 1976), #13 Exhibit 11-Verbatim Journa, #14 Exhibit 12-Declaration of Pete A. Tenorio) (Zarones, James)
September 8, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 49 SCHEDULING ORDER. Hearing on Motion for Summary Judgment set for 11/19/2015 01:30 PM in Courtroom 101 before Chief Judge Ramona V. Manglona.Signed by Chief Judge Ramona V. Manglona on 09/08/2015. (DPB)
August 14, 2015 Set/Reset Hearing: re #45 Case Management Conference - Case Management Conference set for 8/14/2015 at 8:30 am is continued to 1:00 PM in Courtroom 101 before Chief Judge Ramona V. Manglona. (ACH)
July 28, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 47 ORDER Granting Plaintiffs' L.R.16.2CJ.e.1.(a) Request for Counsel to Appear Telephonically at Case Management Conference re: #46 Plaintiff's Request for Telephonic Appearance. Signed by Chief Judge Ramona V. Manglona on 07/28/2015. (BTC)
July 28, 2015 Filing 46 STATEMENT filed by All Plaintiffs (Agreed Request to Appear Telephonically at Status Conference). (Sigale, David)
July 21, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 45 ORDER RE: Case Management Conference set for 8/14/2015 08:30 AM in Courtroom 101 before Chief Judge Ramona V. Manglona. Signed by Chief Judge Ramona V. Manglona on 07/21/2015. (BTC)
July 1, 2015 Filing 44 NOTICE by James C. Deleon Guerrero, Larrisa Larson Answer to Third Amended Complaint for Declaratory and Injunctive Relief (Zarones, James)
June 16, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 43 ORDER Granting Plaintiff's Motion for Leave to File Third Amended Complaint #42 and Denying Remaining Motions #37 , #40 , and #41 as Moot. Signed by Chief Judge Ramona V. Manglona on 06/16/2015. (BTC)
June 15, 2015 Filing 42 MOTION for Leave to File Third Amended Complaint / Plaintiffs' Response to Defendants' Motion for Summary Disposition David G. Sigale appearing for Plaintiffs David J. Radich, Li-Rong Radich (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - E-mail from James Zarones, Esq., #2 Exhibit B - Third Amended Complaint (proposed)) (Sigale, David)
June 15, 2015 Filing 41 First MOTION for Leave to File Out of Time (Statement of Non-Opposition to Motion to Dismiss) David G. Sigale appearing for Plaintiffs David J. Radich, Li-Rong Radich (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Statement of Non-Opposition with Exhibits) (Sigale, David)
June 14, 2015 Filing 40 First MOTION Summary Disposition James Matthew Zarones appearing for Defendants James C. Deleon Guerrero, Larrisa Larson (Attachments: #1 Notice of Motion) (Zarones, James)
June 8, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 39 ORDER Granting #38 Plaintiff's L.R.16.2CJ.e.1.(a) Request for Counsel to Appear Telephonically at Case Management Conference. Signed by Chief Judge Ramona V. Manglona on 06/08/2015. (DPB )
June 6, 2015 Filing 38 STATEMENT filed by All Plaintiffs (Agreed L.R.16.2CJ.e.1.(a) Request to Appear Telephonically at Motion Hearing). (Sigale, David)
May 22, 2015 Set Hearings: re #37 First MOTION to Dismiss Second Amended Complaint, First MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction Second Amended Complaint Motion Hearing set for 6/18/2015 02:00 PM in Courtroom 101 before Chief Judge Ramona V. Manglona. (DPB )
May 21, 2015 Filing 37 First MOTION to Dismiss Second Amended Complaint, First MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction Second Amended Complaint ( Responses due by 6/4/2015) James Matthew Zarones appearing for Defendants James C. Deleon Guerrero, Larrisa Larson (Attachments: #1 Notice of Motion to Dismiss) (Zarones, James)
April 30, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 36 ORDER Granting #35 Stipulation to Waive Rule 4 Service of the Second Amended Complaint on Defendants. Signed by Chief Judge Ramona V. Manglona on 04/30/2015. (DPB )
April 29, 2015 Filing 35 STATEMENT filed by David J. Radich, Li-Rong Radich re #34 Amended Complaint (Stipulation re Service of Second Amended Complaint). (Sigale, David) Modified on 4/29/2015DOCKET CORRECTION -- was filed as a Statement but corrected to STIPULATION (DPB)
April 22, 2015 Filing 34 Second AMENDED COMPLAINT against James C. Deleon Guerrero, Larrisa Larson, filed by David J. Radich, Li-Rong Radich. (Sigale, David)
April 14, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 33 ORDER Granting re: # 30 First Motion to Amend/Correct Complaint; DENYING as Moot re: # 32 Stipulation to Extend Time.. Signed by Chief Judge Ramona V. Manglona on 04/14/2015. (BTC)
April 14, 2015 Filing 32 STIPULATION to Extend Time by James C. Deleon Guerrero James Matthew Zarones appearing for Defendant James C. Deleon Guerrero (Zarones, James)
April 14, 2015 Filing 31 STATEMENT filed by James C. Deleon Guerrero re # 30 First MOTION to Amend/Correct Complaint (to file Second Amended Complaint) . (Zarones, James)
April 13, 2015 Filing 30 First MOTION to Amend/Correct Complaint (to file Second Amended Complaint) David G. Sigale appearing for Plaintiffs David J. Radich, Li-Rong Radich (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Proposed Second Amended Complaint) (Sigale, David)
April 2, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 29 ORDER Granting re: # 28 Stipulation.. Signed by Chief Judge Ramona V. Manglona on 04/02/2015. (BTC)
April 2, 2015 Filing 28 STIPULATION re # 27 Amended Complaint by James C. Deleon Guerrero James Matthew Zarones appearing for Defendant James C. Deleon Guerrero (Zarones, James)
March 21, 2015 Filing 27 First AMENDED COMPLAINT (against James C. Deleon Guerrero and Larrisa Larson) against All Defendants, filed by David J. Radich, Li-Rong Radich. (Sigale, David)
March 10, 2015 # 16 Motion for Summary Judgment and # 25 Motion to Strike Denied as Moot re # 26 Order (DPB )
March 10, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 26 ORDER Dismissing Complaint for Lack of Standing and Granting Leave to Amend. Signed by Chief Judge Ramona V. Manglona on 03/10/2015. (DPB)
March 9, 2015 Filing 25 MOTION to Strike Declaration of David J. Radich filed on March 4, 2015 James Matthew Zarones appearing for Defendant James C. Deleon Guerrero (Zarones, James)
March 4, 2015 Filing 24 DECLARATION filed by David J. Radich, Li-Rong Radich re # 19 Statement, (Amended Declaration of David J. Radich) . (Sigale, David)
March 3, 2015 Filing 23 STATEMENT filed by All Parties re # 20 Opposition to Motion,,,, (Stipulation for Withdrawl of Section IV D of Defendant's SJ Response as to David J. Radich) . (Sigale, David)
February 19, 2015 Filing 22 REPLY to Response to Motion re # 16 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by David J. Radich, Li-Rong Radich. (Sigale, David)
February 12, 2015 Filing 21 STATEMENT filed by All Parties re # 16 MOTION for Summary Judgment (Stipulation of Withdrawl of Motion for Summary Judgment, as to Count III ONLY, without prejudice) . (Sigale, David)
February 9, 2015 Filing 20 OPPOSITION to Motion re # 16 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by James C. Deleon Guerrero. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1-Declaration of James C. Deleon Guerrero, # 2 Exhibit 2-Declaration of Officer Eric David, # 3 Exhibit 3-Declaration of Officer David Hosono, # 4 Exhibit 4-Future Political Status of Mariana Islands-May 10, 1973, # 5 Exhibit 5-Analysis of Political and Legal Nature of Relationship between NMI and US-Jan. 1974, # 6 Exhibit 6-Applicability of the U.S. Constitution-July 15, 1974, # 7 Exhibit 7-Marianas Commonwealth, Application of Articles of the U.S. Constitution-July 8, 1974, # 8 Exhibit 8-Constitutional Rights Made Applicable to the States under the Fourteenth Amendment-May 6, 1974, # 9 Exhibit 9-Bill of Rights-October 8, 1976, # 10 Exhibit 10-Committee on Personal Rights-November 22, 1976, # 11 Exhibit 11-Proposed Amendment No. 37-November 20, 1976, # 12 Exhibit 12-Article I, Committee on Personal Rights-November 22, 1976, # 13 Exhibit 13-Verbatim Journal-Transcript-November 22, 1976, # 14 Exhibit 14-Declaration of James M. Zarones) (Zarones, James)
January 10, 2015 Filing 19 STATEMENT filed by All Plaintiffs re # 16 MOTION for Summary Judgment (List of Exhibits for Motion for Summary Judgment) . (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1 - Declaration of Li-Rong Radich, # 2 Exhibit 2 - Declaration of David J. Radich, # 3 Exhibit 3 - Application for CNMI Weapons Identification Card, # 4 Exhibit 4 - Website Screenshot of gov.mp/executive-directory) (Sigale, David)
January 10, 2015 Filing 18 STATEMENT filed by All Plaintiffs re # 16 MOTION for Summary Judgment (Statement of Undisputed Facts) . (Sigale, David)
January 10, 2015 Filing 17 MEMORANDUM in Support re # 16 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by David J. Radich, Li-Rong Radich. (Sigale, David)
January 10, 2015 Filing 16 MOTION for Summary Judgment David G. Sigale appearing for Plaintiffs David J. Radich, Li-Rong Radich Responses due by 2/9/2015 (Sigale, David)
December 31, 2014 Set/Reset Hearings: re # 15 Summary Judgment Oral Argument set for 03/05/2015 is continued to 3/12/2015 08:30 AM in Courtroom 101 before Chief Judge Ramona V. Manglona. (BTC)
December 31, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER Granting Plaintiffs' L.R.7.1.h.1 First Stipulated Request for Extension of F.R.CIV.P.56 Summary Judgment Motion Filing Date re # 14 Statement filed by David J. Radich, Li-Rong Radich. Signed by Chief Judge Ramona V. Manglona on 12/31/2014. (BTC)
December 31, 2014 Filing 14 STATEMENT filed by All Plaintiffs (First Stipulation for Extension of Time to File F.R.Civ.P. 56 Submissions) . (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Declaration of David G. Sigale) (Sigale, David)
October 31, 2014 Filing 13 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Chief Judge Ramona V. Manglona: Case Management Conference held on 10/31/2014. Hearing on Plaintiff's Motion for Summary Judgment set for 3/5/2015 09:00 AM in Courtroom 101 before Chief Judge Ramona V. Manglona. (Court Reporter FTR) (TPM)
October 30, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER granting # 11 Plaintiffs' L.R.16.2CJ.e.1.(a) Request for Counsel to Appear telephonically at Case Management Conference. Signed by Chief Judge Ramona V. Manglona on 10/30/2014. (DPB )
October 28, 2014 Filing 11 NOTICE by David J. Radich, Li-Rong Radich (Agreed L.R.16.2CJ.e.1.(a) Request to Appear Telephonically at Case Management Conference) (Sigale, David)
October 15, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER RE: Case Management Conference.Case Management Conference set for 10/31/2014 08:30 AM in Courtroom 101 before Chief Judge Ramona V. Manglona.. Signed by Chief Judge Ramona V. Manglona on 10/15/2014. (BTC)
October 15, 2014 Filing 9 ANSWER to Complaint for Declaratory and Injunctive Relief by James C. Deleon Guerrero. Related document: # 1 Complaint filed by David J. Radich, Li-Rong Radich. (Zarones, James)
October 14, 2014 Filing 8 NOTICE of Appearance by David G. Sigale on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Sigale, David)
October 8, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER Admitting Petitioner Pro Hac Vice for David G. Sigale. Signed by Chief Judge Ramona V. Manglona on 10/08/2014. (DPB )
October 8, 2014 Filing 6 CONSENT by Daniel T. Guidotti, Attorney for Plaintiffs re # 5 PETITION for Admission to Practice Pro Hac Vice for David G. Sigale (Filing Fee: $250.00, Receipt Number: MPX1 3438) (DPB )
October 8, 2014 Filing 5 PETITION for Admission to Practice Pro Hac Vice for David G. Sigale (Filing Fee: $250.00, Receipt Number: MPX1 3438) (DPB )
October 1, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER re # 3 . Signed by Chief Judge Ramona V. Manglona on 10/01/2014. (DPB)
September 30, 2014 Filing 3 STIPULATION re # 1 Complaint to Extend Time by James C. Deleon Guerrero James Matthew Zarones appearing for Defendant James C. Deleon Guerrero (Zarones, James)
September 15, 2014 Filing 2 SUMMONS Returned Executed. (BTC)
September 5, 2014 Summons Issued as to James C. Deleon Guerrero. (BTC)
September 5, 2014 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against James C. Deleon Guerrero (Filing Fee: $400.00, Receipt Number: MPX1 3398.) filed by David J. Radich, Li-Rong Radich. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet) (BTC)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Northern Mariana Islands District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Radich et al v. Deleon Guerrero
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: David J. Radich
Represented By: David G. Sigale
Represented By: Daniel Guidotti
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Li-Rong Radich
Represented By: David G. Sigale
Represented By: Daniel Guidotti
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: James C. Deleon Guerrero
Represented By: James Matthew Zarones
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Larrisa Larson
Represented By: James Matthew Zarones
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor: Tanapag Middle School Parent Teacher Student Association
Represented By: Joseph E. Horey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?