Murphy v. CNMI Government

Plaintiff: Paul Murphy
Defendant: James C. Deleon Guerrero, CNMI, Larissa Larson and Robert A. Guerrero
Case Number: 1:2014cv00026
Filed: December 24, 2014
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Mariana Islands
Office: NMI Office
County: Northern Mariana Islands
Presiding Judge: Ramona V Manglona
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1343
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 2, 2017. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 2, 2017 Filing 116 AMENDED CLERK'S ENTRY OF JUDGMENT. Signed by Clerk of Court Heather L. Kennedy on 02/02/2017. (DPB)
February 1, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 115 ORDER Awarding Costs to Plaintiff. Signed by Chief Judge Ramona V. Manglona on 02/01/2017. (DPB)
December 5, 2016 Filing 114 CLERK'S ENTRY OF JUDGMENT. (DPB)
October 25, 2016 Filing 113 RESPONSE filed by All Defendants re #112 Bill of Costs . (Brasington, Charles)
October 18, 2016 Filing 112 BILL OF COSTS by Paul Murphy. (Attachments: #1 UNREDACTED Attachments to Bill of Costs, #2 REDACTED Attachments to Bill of Costs) (DPB)
October 5, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 111 ORDER to Extend Response to Plaintiff's Submission for Costs. Signed by Chief Judge Ramona V. Manglona on 10/5/2016. (DPB)
October 5, 2016 Filing 110 STIPULATION to Extend Response to Plaintiff's Submission for Costs by Larissa Larson, James C. Deleon Guerrero, CNMI, Robert A. Guerrero Charles E. Brasington appearing for Defendants Larissa Larson, James C. Deleon Guerrero, CNMI, Robert A. Guerrero (Brasington, Charles)
September 28, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 109 Decision and Order Granting in Part and Denying in Part Cross-Motions for Summary Judgment, re #96 PLAINTIFF'S F.R. CIV. 56(a) MOTION for Summary Judgment by Plaintiff Paul Murphy; #98 Cross MOTION for Summary Judgment; #102 MOTION for Response to Defendants' Motion for Summary Judgment by Plaintiff Paul Murphy; and #106 MOTION for Opposition to Defendants' Cross-Motion by Plaintiff Paul Murphy. Signed by Chief Judge Ramona V. Manglona on 09/28/2016. (ACH)
July 28, 2016 Motions Taken Under Advisement: #96 MOTION for Summary Judgment, filed by Plaintiff and #98 Cross MOTION for Summary Judgment, filed by Defendants. (TPM)
July 28, 2016 Filing 108 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Chief Judge Ramona V. Manglona: Motions Hearing held on 7/28/2016 re #96 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by Paul Murphy and #98 Cross MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by Larissa Larson, Robert A. Guerrero. (Court Reporter PAG) (TPM)
July 21, 2016 Filing 107 MEMORANDUM In Support of Opposition to Defendants' Cross-Motion by Paul Murphy in support of #106 MOTION For Opposition to Defendants' Cross-Motion. (BTC)
July 21, 2016 Filing 106 MOTION for Opposition to Defendants' Cross-Motion by Plaintiff Paul Murphy (BTC)
July 20, 2016 Filing 105 REPLY to Response to Motion re #103 Memorandum, #102 MOTION filed by CNMI, James C. Deleon Guerrero, Robert A. Guerrero, Larissa Larson. (Brasington, Charles)
July 14, 2016 Filing 104 OPPOSITION to Motion re #96 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by CNMI, Robert A. Guerrero, Larissa Larson. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Declaration of Elma Tenorio) (Brasington, Charles)
July 14, 2016 Filing 103 MEMORANDUM In Support of Response to Defendants' Motion for Summary Judgment by Paul Murphy in support of #102 MOTION for Response to Defendants' Motion for Summary Judgment. (BTC)
July 14, 2016 Filing 102 MOTION for Response to Defendants' Motion for Summary Judgment by Plaintiff Paul Murphy (BTC)
July 12, 2016 Filing 101 ERRATA filed by All Defendants re #98 Cross MOTION for Summary Judgment . (Brasington, Charles)
July 1, 2016 Filing 100 TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings: Evidentiary Hearing held on 06/22/2016 before Chief Judge Ramona V. Manglona. Court Reporter: PAG. Pursuant to Judicial Conference Policy, this transcript will be available for inspection and review at the office of the Clerk of Court for a 90 day period, beginning from the date of filing. If you would like a copy of the transcript during the 90 day period it will be available for purchase from the court reporter. After 90 days this transcript will be remotely available to the public through PACER. (DPB)
June 30, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 99 ORDER on #95 Stipulation To Submit The Caliber Restriction Issue On The Previously Filed Briefs. Signed by Chief Judge Ramona V. Manglona on 06/29/2016. (DPB)
June 30, 2016 Filing 98 Cross MOTION for Summary Judgment Charles E. Brasington appearing for Defendants Robert A. Guerrero, Larissa Larson Responses due by 7/14/2016 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Testimony of Hosono (June 22, 2016)) (Brasington, Charles)
June 30, 2016 Filing 97 MEMORANDUM in Support of #96 MOTION for Summary Judgment by Paul Murphy. (Attachments: #1 Attachments Other Authorities) (DPB)
June 30, 2016 Filing 96 PLAINTIFF'S F.R. CIV. 56(a) MOTION for Summary Judgment by Plaintiff Paul Murphy (DPB)
June 29, 2016 Filing 95 STIPULATION on Caliber Issue by Larissa Larson, James C. Deleon Guerrero, CNMI, Robert A. Guerrero Charles E. Brasington appearing for Defendants Larissa Larson, James C. Deleon Guerrero, CNMI, Robert A. Guerrero (Brasington, Charles)
June 22, 2016 Filing 94 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Chief Judge Ramona V. Manglona: Evidentiary Hearing held on 6/22/2016. (Court Reporter PAG) (DPB)
June 17, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 93 ORDER as to Expert and to Hearing Date. Signed by Chief Judge Ramona V. Manglona on 6/17/2016. (DPB)
June 17, 2016 Filing 92 STIPULATION as to Expert and to Hearing Date by Larissa Larson, CNMI, Robert A. Guerrero Charles E. Brasington appearing for Defendants Larissa Larson, CNMI, Robert A. Guerrero (Brasington, Charles)
June 9, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 91 CASE MANAGEMENT SCHEDULING ORDER. Hearing on Motion for Summary Judgment set for 7/28/2016 01:30 PM in Courtroom 101 before Chief Judge Ramona V. Manglona. Signed by Magistrate Judge Heather L. Kennedy on 06/09/2016. (DPB)
June 8, 2016 Filing 90 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Heather L. Kennedy: Status Conference held on 6/8/2016. Evidentiary Hearing set for 6/22/2016 01:30 PM in Courtroom 101 before Chief Judge Ramona V. Manglona. (Court Reporter FTR) (DPB)
June 7, 2016 Reset Hearings: Status Conference set for 6/8/2016 09:00 AM in Courtroom 301 before Magistrate Judge Heather L. Kennedy. (DPB)
May 27, 2016 Filing 89 ANSWER to Amended Complaint by Larissa Larson. Related document: #86 Amended Complaint, filed by Paul Murphy. (Brasington, Charles)
May 27, 2016 Filing 88 ANSWER to Amended Complaint by Robert A. Guerrero. Related document: #86 Amended Complaint, filed by Paul Murphy. (Brasington, Charles)
April 29, 2016 Filing 87 MEMORANDUM in support of #86 Fourth Amended Complaint for Declaratory and Injunctive Relief. (DPB)
April 29, 2016 Filing 86 FOURTH AMENDED COMPLAINT For Declaratory and Injunctive Relief against Robert A. Guerrero, Larissa Larson. Filed by Paul Murphy. (Attachments: #1 Plaintiff's List of Exhibits in Support of Fourth Amended Complaint for Declaratory and Injunctive Relief) (DPB)
April 20, 2016 Filing 85 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Chief Judge Ramona V. Manglona: Status Conference held on 4/20/2016. Status Conference set for 6/8/2016 09:00 AM in Courtroom 101 before Chief Judge Ramona V. Manglona. (Court Reporter FTR) (TPM)
April 20, 2016 Filing 84 NOTICE by All Defendants of Lodging of Issue Table (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit 1 - Issue Table) (Brasington, Charles)
April 19, 2016 Filing 83 NOTICE by All Defendants of Lodging of Section By Section Analysis (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Section By Section Analysis) (Brasington, Charles)
April 18, 2016 Terminate Motion: #77 Motion for Response to Defendant's Opposition to Plaintiff's Motion for Summary Judgment, filed by Plaintiff Murphy. (TPM)
April 18, 2016 Terminate Motion: #73 Motion for Response to Defendant's Motion for Summary Judgment, filed by Plaintiff Murphy. (TPM)
April 18, 2016 Set Hearings re #82 Order Denying Cross-Motions for Summary Judgment and Setting a Status Conference. Status Conference set for 4/20/2016 at 2:00 PM in Courtroom 101 before Chief Judge Ramona V. Manglona. (DPB)
April 18, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 82 ORDER Denying Cross-Motions for Summary Judgment and Setting A Status Conference. Signed by Chief Judge Ramona V. Manglona on 4/18/2016. (DPB )
April 11, 2016 Filing 81 NOTICE by All Defendants of Change in Law (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit 1) (Brasington, Charles)
January 22, 2016 Terminate Motion: #79 Motion to Strike, filed by Defendants. (TPM)
January 22, 2016 Terminate Motion: #61 Motion to Withdraw, filed by Plaintiff. (TPM)
January 22, 2016 Terminate Motion: #56 Motion for Summary Judgment, filed by Plaintiff. (TPM)
January 22, 2016 Terminate Motion: #54 Motion for Leave to File, filed by Plaintiff. (TPM)
January 22, 2016 Terminate Motion: #48 Motion for Leave to File, filed by Plaintiff. (TPM)
January 22, 2016 Motions Taken Under Advisement: #67 MOTION for Summary Judgment, filed by Plaintiff, and #71 Cross MOTION for Summary Judgment, filed by Defendants. (TPM)
January 22, 2016 Filing 80 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Chief Judge Ramona V. Manglona: Motions Hearing held on 1/22/2016 re #48 MOTION for Leave to File, filed by Plaintiff, #54 MOTION for Leave to File, filed by Plaintiff, #56 MOTION for Summary Judgment, filed by Plaintiff, #61 MOTION to Withdraw #56 MOTION for Summary Judgment, filed by Plaintiff, #67 MOTION for Summary Judgment, filed by Plaintiff, #71 Cross MOTION for Summary Judgment, filed by Defendants, and #79 MOTION to Strike #78 Memorandum, filed by Defendants. (Court Reporter PAG) (TPM)
January 19, 2016 Filing 79 MOTION to Strike #78 Memorandum,, Charles E. Brasington appearing for Defendants CNMI, James C. Deleon Guerrero, Larissa Larson (Brasington, Charles)
January 14, 2016 Filing 78 MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Response to Defendants' Opposition to Plaintiff's Motion for Summary Judgment by Paul Murphy (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G, #8 Exhibit H, #9 Exhibit I, #10 Exhibit J, #11 Exhibit K, #12 Exhibit L, #13 Exhibit M, #14 Exhibit N, #15 Exhibit O, #16 Exhibit P, #17 Exhibit Q, #18 Exhibit R, #19 Exhibit S, #20 Exhibit T, #21 Exhibit U, #22 Exhibit V, #23 Exhibit W) (DPB)
January 14, 2016 Filing 77 MOTION FOR RESPONSE to Defendants' Opposition to Plaintiff's Motion for Summary Judgement by Plaintiff Paul Murphy (DPB)
January 14, 2016 Filing 76 MEMORANDUM OF LAW IN REPLY TO PLAINTIFFS OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANTS MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT re #75 Opposition to Motion,, for Summary Judgment filed by CNMI, James C. Deleon Guerrero, Larissa Larson. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B) (Brasington, Charles) Modified on 1/14/2016 - changed docket text to match caption on document (DPB).
January 7, 2016 Filing 75 OPPOSITION to Motion re #67 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by CNMI, James C. Deleon Guerrero, Larissa Larson. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Declaration of David Hosono, #2 Affidavit Declaration of John Deleon A. Guerrero, #3 Exhibit A, #4 Exhibit B, #5 Exhibit C, #6 Exhibit D, #7 Exhibit E, #8 Exhibit F, #9 Exhibit G, #10 Exhibit H, #11 Exhibit I, #12 Exhibit J, #13 Exhibit K, #14 Exhibit L, #15 Exhibit M, #16 Exhibit N) (Brasington, Charles)
January 7, 2016 Filing 74 MEMORANDUM in Support of #73 Motion for Response to Defendants' Motion for Summary Judgment by Paul Murphy (DPB)
January 7, 2016 Filing 73 MOTION for Response to Defendants' Motion for Summary Judgment by Plaintiff Paul Murphy (DPB )
December 23, 2015 Filing 72 DECLARATION filed by Larissa Larson, James C. Deleon Guerrero, CNMI re #71 Cross MOTION for Summary Judgment Declaration of David M. Hosono. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G, #8 Exhibit H, #9 Exhibit I, #10 Exhibit J, #11 Exhibit K, #12 Exhibit L, #13 Exhibit M) (Brasington, Charles)
December 23, 2015 Filing 71 Cross MOTION for Summary Judgment Charles E. Brasington appearing for Defendants CNMI, James C. Deleon Guerrero, Larissa Larson Responses due by 1/7/2016 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G, #8 Exhibit H, #9 Exhibit I, #10 Affidavit Declaration of Victoria T. Guerrero) (Brasington, Charles)
December 22, 2015 Filing 70 PALINTIFF'S List of Exhibits filed by Paul Murphy re #68 Memorandum in Support of Motion. (BTC)
December 22, 2015 Filing 69 PLAINTIFF'S Statement of Undisputed Facts filed by Paul Murphy re #68 Memorandum in Support of Motion. (BTC)
December 22, 2015 Filing 68 MEMORANDUM in Support of Plaintiff's Motion for Summary Judgment re #67 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by Paul Murphy. (BTC)
December 22, 2015 Filing 67 MOTION for Summary Judgment by Plaintiff Paul Murphy (BTC)
December 4, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 66 ORDER After Case Management Conference. Hearing on the Cross Motions set for 1/22/2016 09:00 AM in Courtroom 101 before Chief Judge Ramona V. Manglona. Signed by Chief Judge Ramona V. Manglona on 12/4/2015. (DPB)
December 3, 2015 Filing 65 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Chief Judge Ramona V. Manglona: Case Management Conference held on 12/3/2015. Hearing on Motions for Summary Judgment set for 1/22/2016 09:00 AM in Courtroom 101 before Chief Judge Ramona V. Manglona. (Court Reporter FTR) (TPM)
December 1, 2015 Set/Reset Hearings: re #64 Order on Stipulation Case Management Conference set for 12/3/2015 09:00 AM in Courtroom 101 before Chief Judge Ramona V. Manglona. (BTC)
December 1, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 64 ORDER Resetting Case Management Conference re: #63 Stipulation to Reset Case Management Conference. Signed by Chief Judge Ramona V. Manglona on 12/01/2015. (BTC)
November 30, 2015 Filing 63 STIPULATION to Reset Case Management Conference by Larissa Larson, James C. Deleon Guerrero, CNMI Charles E. Brasington appearing for Defendants Larissa Larson, James C. Deleon Guerrero, CNMI (Brasington, Charles)
November 25, 2015 Set/Reset Hearings: re #62 Order on Stipulation. Motion Hearing set for 12/17/2015 01:30 PM in Courtroom 101 before Chief Judge Ramona V. Manglona. Set/Reset Deadlines: re #62 Order on Stipulation.Cross Motions due by 11/20/2015. (BTC)
November 25, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 62 ORDER on Stipulation on Briefing Schedule and Page Limits re: #55 Stipulation on Briefing Schedule and Page Limits. Signed by Chief Judge Ramona V. Manglona on 11/25/2016. (BTC)
November 23, 2015 Filing 61 MOTION to Withdraw #56 Motion for Summary Judgment filed by Plaintiff Paul Murphy. (ADE)
November 20, 2015 Filing 60 NOTICE by All Defendants (Brasington, Charles)
November 18, 2015 Filing 59 PLAINTIFF'S List of Exhibits by Paul Murphy.. (BTC)
November 18, 2015 Filing 58 PLAINTIFF'S Statement of Undisputed Facts filed by Paul Murphy re #57 Memorandum in Support of Motion. (BTC)
November 18, 2015 Filing 57 MEMORANDUM in Support of Plaintiff's Motion for Summary Judgment re #56 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by Paul Murphy. (BTC)
November 18, 2015 Filing 56 PLAINTIFF'S F.R.CIV.P.56(a) MOTION for Summary Judgment by Plaintiff Paul Murphy (BTC)
November 17, 2015 Filing 55 STIPULATION on Briefing Schedule and Page Limits by Larissa Larson, James C. Deleon Guerrero, CNMI Charles E. Brasington appearing for Defendants Larissa Larson, James C. Deleon Guerrero, CNMI (Brasington, Charles)
November 2, 2015 Filing 54 MOTION for Leave to File Motion for Summary Judgment by Plaintiff Paul Murphy (DPB)
October 27, 2015 Set/Reset Hearings: Case Management Conference set for 12/3/2015 10:00 AM in Courtroom 101 before Chief Judge Ramona V. Manglona. (BTC)
October 13, 2015 Filing 53 ANSWER to #51 Defendants' Response to Plaintiff's Statement of Undisputed Facts filed by Paul Murphy. (DPB)
October 13, 2015 Filing 52 RESPONSE to #49 and #50 Defendants' Answer to Third Amended Complaint for Declaratory and Injunctive Relief filed by Paul Murphy. (DPB)
October 5, 2015 Filing 51 RESPONSE filed by James C. Deleon Guerrero re #46 Statement of Undisputed Facts. (Brasington, Charles)
October 5, 2015 Filing 50 ANSWER to Amended Complaint by James C. Deleon Guerrero. Related document: #44 Amended Complaint filed by Paul Murphy. (Brasington, Charles)
October 5, 2015 Filing 49 ANSWER to Amended Complaint by Larissa Larson. Related document: #44 Amended Complaint filed by Paul Murphy. (Brasington, Charles)
September 14, 2015 Filing 48 MOTION for Leave to File Motion for Summary Judgment. Filed by Paul Murphy (DPB)
September 14, 2015 Filing 47 PLAINTIFF'S LIST OF EXHIBITS by Paul Murphy.. (Attachments: #1 Plaintiff's Exhibits, #2 Exhibit 1, #3 Exhibit 2, #4 Exhibit 3, #5 Exhibit 4, #6 Exhibit 5, #7 Exhibit 6, #8 Exhibit 7, #9 Exhibit 8, #10 Exhibit 9, #11 Exhibit 10, #12 Exhibit 11, #13 Exhibit 12, #14 Exhibit 13, #15 Exhibit 14, #16 Exhibit 15, #17 Exhibit 16, #18 Exhibit 17, #19 Exhibit 18, #20 Exhibit 19, #21 Exhibit 20, #22 Exhibit 21, #23 Exhibit 22, #24 Exhibit 23, #25 Exhibit 24) (DPB, )
September 14, 2015 Filing 46 PLAINTIFF'S STATEMENT OF UNDISPUTED FACTS filed by Paul Murphy. (DPB)
September 14, 2015 Filing 45 MEMORANDUM In Support of #44 Third Amended Complaint Filed by Paul Murphy. (DPB)
September 14, 2015 Filing 44 THIRD AMENDED COMPLAINT FOR DECLARATORY AND INJUNCTIVE RELIEF filed by Paul Murphy (DPB )
September 10, 2015 Terminate Motion: #42 Motion to Withdraw #39 Motion for Leave to File Complaint for Declaratory and Injunctive Relief, filed by Plaintiff. (TPM)
September 10, 2015 Terminate Motion: #39 Motion for Leave to File Complaint for Declaratory and Injunctive Relief, filed by Plaintiff. (TPM)
September 10, 2015 Terminate Motion: #38 Motion to Withdraw #26 Complaint, filed by Plaintiff. (TPM)
September 10, 2015 Terminate Motion: #37 Motion to Dismiss or Defer Plaintiff's Motion for Summary Judgment, filed by Defendants. (TPM)
September 10, 2015 Terminate Motion: #32 Motion for Summary Judgment, filed by Plaintiff. (TPM)
September 10, 2015 Terminate Motion: #19 First Motion to Dismiss Amended Complaint, filed by Defendants. (TPM)
September 10, 2015 Filing 43 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Chief Judge Ramona V. Manglona: Motion Hearing held on 9/10/2015 re #19 First MOTION to Dismiss Amended Complaint filed by Defendants, #38 MOTION to Withdraw #26 Complaint, filed by Paul Murphy, #42 MOTION to Withdraw #39 MOTION for Leave to File, filed by Paul Murphy, #39 MOTION for Leave to File, filed by Paul Murphy, #32 MOTION for Summary Judgment, filed by Paul Murphy, and #37 MOTION to Dismiss or Defer Plaintiff's Motion for Summary Judgment filed by Defendants. (Court Reporter FTR) (TPM)
September 1, 2015 Filing 42 PLAINTIFF'S MOTION to Withdraw #39 MOTION for Leave to File Complaint for Declaratory and Injuctive Relief (DPB)
August 31, 2015 Filing 41 OPPOSITION to Motion re #39 MOTION for Leave to File Complaint for Declaratory and Injunctive Relief filed by CNMI, James C. Deleon Guerrero, Larissa Larson. (Brasington, Charles)
August 28, 2015 Filing 40 NOTICE of Appearance by Charles E. Brasington on behalf of CNMI, James C. Deleon Guerrero, Larissa Larson (Brasington, Charles)
August 27, 2015 Filing 39 PLAINTIFF'S MOTION for Leave to File Complaint for Declaratory and Injunctive Relief (DPB )
August 26, 2015 Filing 38 MOTION to Withdraw re: #26 Complaint by Plaintiff Paul Murphy. (BTC)
August 26, 2015 Filing 37 MOTION to Dismiss or Defer Plaintiff's Motion for Summary Judgment James Matthew Zarones appearing for Defendants CNMI, James C. Deleon Guerrero, Larissa Larson (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Notice of Motion to Dismiss or Defer Plaintiff's Motion for Summary Judgment) (Zarones, James)
August 19, 2015 Filing 36 SUMMONS Returned Executed as to CNMI Attorney Generals Office (DPB)
August 19, 2015 Filing 35 SUMMONS Returned Executed as to the Office of the Secretary of Finance Larissa Larson (DPB )
August 19, 2015 Filing 34 SUMMONS Returned Executed as to Department of Public Safety Commissioner James C. Deleon Guerrero (DPB)
August 19, 2015 Filing 33 MEMORANDUM in support of #32 PLAINTIFF'S MOTION for Summary Judgment by Plaintiff Paul Murphy (DPB)
August 19, 2015 Filing 32 PLAINTIFF'S F.R. CIV.P. 56(a) MOTION for Summary Judgment by Plaintiff Paul Murphy (DPB)
August 19, 2015 Summons Issued as to CNMI Attorney Generals Office (DPB)
August 19, 2015 Summons Issued as to the Office of the Secretary of Finance (DPB)
August 19, 2015 Summons Issued as to Department of Public Safety Commissioner James C. Deleon Guerrero. (DPB )
July 29, 2015 Filing 31 PROOF OF SERVICE by Paul Murphy re #26 Complaint, #27 Statement, #28 Exhibit. Served upon Larissa Larson (BTC)
July 29, 2015 Filing 30 PROOF OF SERVICE by Paul Murphy re #26 Complaint, #27 Statement, #28 Exhibit. Served upon Assistant Attorney General Eric Zarones (BTC)
July 29, 2015 Filing 29 PROOF OF SERVICE by Paul Murphy re #26 Complaint, #27 Statement, #28 Exhibit. Served upon CNMI, James C. Deleon Guerrero, Larissa Larson (BTC)
July 29, 2015 Filing 28 PLAINTIFF'S List of L.R.56(a)(1) Exhibits by Paul Murphy.. (BTC)
July 29, 2015 Filing 27 PLAINTIFF'S F.R.CIV.P.56(c)(1) Statement of Undisputed Facts filed by Paul Murphy. (BTC)
July 29, 2015 Filing 26 COMPLAINT for Declaratory and Injunctive Relief against CNMI, James C. Deleon Guerrero, Larissa Larson, filed by Paul Murphy. (BTC) (Court granted Plaintiff's #38 Motion to Withdraw Complaint for Declaratory and Injunctive Relief on 9/10/2015. Modified on 9/10/2015.) (TPM)
July 27, 2015 Filing 25 PROOF OF SERVICE by Paul Murphy re #21 Response to Motion, #22 Exhibit. Served upon Eric Zarones, Assistant Attorney General. (BTC)
July 27, 2015 Filing 24 PROOF OF SERVICE by Paul Murphy re #21 Response to Motion, #22 Exhibit. Served upon James C. Deleon Guerrero (BTC)
July 27, 2015 Filing 23 PROOF OF SERVICE by Paul Murphy re #21 Response to Motion, #22 Exhibit. Served upon Larissa Larson (BTC)
July 24, 2015 Summons Issued as to Attorney General's Office. (BTC)
July 24, 2015 Summons Issued as to James C. Deleon Guerrero. (BTC)
July 24, 2015 Summons Issued as to Larissa Larson. (BTC)
July 24, 2015 Filing 22 PLAINTIFF'S List of L.R.56(a)(1)Exhibits by Paul Murphy. (BTC)
July 24, 2015 Filing 21 RESPONSE to Motion to Dismiss for Lack of Subject Matter Jurisdiction and For Failure to State Claim Upon Which Relief May Be Granted re #19 First MOTION to Dismiss Amended Complaint filed by Paul Murphy. (BTC)
July 23, 2015 Filing 20 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Chief Judge Ramona V. Manglona: Motion Hearing held on 7/23/2015 re #19 . Motion Hearing Continued to 9/10/2015 09:00 AM in Courtroom 101 before Chief Judge Ramona V. Manglona. (Court Reporter PAG) (DPB )
June 19, 2015 Set/Reset Hearings: re #19 First MOTION to Dismiss Amended Complaint Motion Hearing set for 7/23/2015 09:00 AM in Courtroom 101 before Chief Judge Ramona V. Manglona. (BTC)
June 19, 2015 Filing 19 First MOTION to Dismiss Amended Complaint James Matthew Zarones appearing for Plaintiff CNMI, Defendants James C. Deleon Guerrero, Larissa Larson Responses due by 7/2/2015 (Attachments: #1 Notice of Motion) (Zarones, James)
June 4, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER Denying Second #15 Motion to Dismiss. Signed by Chief Judge Ramona V. Manglona on 6/4/2015. (TVW)
April 17, 2015 Filing 17 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Paul Murphy. (BTC)
April 17, 2015 Filing 16 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Paul Murphy. (BTC)
April 17, 2015 Summons Issued as to Larissa Larson. (DPB )
April 17, 2015 Summons Issued as to James C. Deleon Guerrero (DPB)
April 16, 2015 Filing 15 Second MOTION to Dismiss for Insufficient Service Process James Matthew Zarones appearing for Defendants James C. Deleon Guerrero, Larissa Larson (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Notice of Motion to Dismiss for Insufficient Service Process) (Zarones, James)
April 8, 2015 Filing 14 SUMMONS Returned Executed as to Larissa Larson by Paul Murphy. (BTC)
April 8, 2015 Filing 13 SUMMONS Returned Executed as to James C. Deleon Guerrero by Paul Murphy. (BTC)
April 7, 2015 Summons Issued as to Larissa Larson. (BTC)
April 7, 2015 Summons Issued as to James C. Deleon Guerrero. (BTC)
April 7, 2015 Filing 12 AMENDED COMPLAINT against James C. Deleon Guerrero, Larissa Larson, filed by Paul Murphy. (BTC)
April 6, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER Dismissing First Amended Complaint and Granting Leave to Amend. Signed by Chief Judge Ramona V. Manglona on 04/06/2015. (DPB)
March 27, 2015 Set/Reset Hearings: re #10 Second MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction ; Insufficient Process; and Insufficient Service Process Motion Hearing set for 5/7/2015 01:30 PM in Courtroom 101 before Chief Judge Ramona V. Manglona. (BTC)
March 26, 2015 Set/Reset Hearings: re #10 Second MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction ; Insufficient Process; and Insufficient Service Process Motion Hearing set for 5/7/2015 09:00 AM in Courtroom 101 before Chief Judge Ramona V. Manglona. (BTC)
March 26, 2015 Filing 10 Second MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction ; Insufficient Process; and Insufficient Service Process James Matthew Zarones appearing for Plaintiff CNMI (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Declaration of James C. Deleon Guerrero, #2 Supplement Notice of Motion to Dismiss for Lack of Subject Matter Jurisdiction; Insufficient Process; and Insufficient Service of Process) (Zarones, James)
March 5, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER Denying Defendant's Motion to Dismiss as Moot re: #6 . Signed by Chief Judge Ramona V. Manglona on 03/05/2015. (BTC)
March 4, 2015 Filing 8 COMPLAINT for Declaratory and Injunctive Relief against CNMI filed by Paul Murphy (Attachments: #1 Proof of Service to CNMI AG's Office, #2 Proof of Service DPS Commisioner's Office) (DPB )
March 3, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER Vacating Hearing and Enlarging Plaintiff's Time to Respond re #6 MOTION to Dismiss MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction Motion for Failure to State a Claim upon which Relief may be Granted; and in the Alternative, Motion for a More Definite Statement filed by CNMI. Signed by Chief Judge Ramona V. Manglona on 03/03/2015. (BTC)
January 20, 2015 Set/Reset Hearings: re #5 , #6 . Motion Hearing set for 3/12/2015 09:00 AM in Courtroom 101 before Chief Judge Ramona V. Manglona. (BTC)
January 20, 2015 Filing 6 MOTION to Dismiss , MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction Motion for Failure to State a Claim upon which Relief may be Granted; and in the Alternative, Motion for a More Definite Statement James Matthew Zarones appearing for Plaintiff CNMI (Zarones, James)
January 20, 2015 Filing 5 NOTICE by CNMI re #1 Complaint,, Notice of Motion to Dismiss for Lack of Subject Matter Jurisdiction; Motion for Failure to State a Claim Upon which Relief may be Granted; and in the Alternative, Motion for a more Definite Statement (Zarones, James)
December 29, 2014 Filing 4 SUMMONS Returned Executed - Department of Public Safety Commissioner James Deleon Guerero by Paul Murphy. (BTC)
December 29, 2014 Filing 3 SUMMONS Returned Executed - Attorney Generals Office, Attorney General Gilbert Birnbrich by Paul Murphy. (BTC)
December 29, 2014 Summons Issued as to CNMI Government - Department of Public Safety (DPB )
December 29, 2014 Summons Issued as to CNMI Government - Attorney Generals Office (DPB )
December 24, 2014 Filing 2 SUMMONS Returned Executed as to Joey P. San Nicholas by Paul Murphy. (BTC)
December 24, 2014 Summons Issued as to CNMI - Joey P. San Nicholas, Capitol Hill. (BTC)
December 24, 2014 Summons Issued as to CNMI - James Deleon Guerrero. (BTC)
December 24, 2014 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against CNMI with Jury Demand (Filing Fee: $400.00, Receipt Number: MPXI 3514.), filed by Paul Murphy. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit C, #5 Exhibit D, #6 Exhibit E, #7 Exhibit F, #8 Exhibit G, #9 Exhibit H, #10 Exhibit I, #11 Exhibit J, #12 Exhibit K, #13 Exhibit L, #14 Exhibit M, #15 Exhibit N, #16 Exhibit O, #17 Exhibit P, #18 Exhibit Q, #19 Exhibit R, #20 Exhibit S, #21 Exhibit T) (BTC)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Northern Mariana Islands District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Murphy v. CNMI Government
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: James C. Deleon Guerrero
Represented By: Charles E. Brasington
Represented By: James Matthew Zarones
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CNMI
Represented By: Charles E. Brasington
Represented By: James Matthew Zarones
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Larissa Larson
Represented By: Charles E. Brasington
Represented By: James Matthew Zarones
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Robert A. Guerrero
Represented By: Charles E. Brasington
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Paul Murphy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?