Lockhart v. United States

Plaintiff: Kenneth Lockhart
Defendant: United States
Case Number: 1:2018cv00026
Filed: October 9, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Mariana Islands
Presiding Judge: Ramona V Manglona
Nature of Suit: Marine
Cause of Action: 46:1101
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 7, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 7, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER Allowing Defendant Additional Time to Answer or Otherwise Respond re #9 Stipulation Allowing Defendant Additional Time to Answer or Otherwise Respond. Signed by Chief Judge Ramona V. Manglona on 12/07/2018. (FPA)
December 7, 2018 Filing 9 STIPULATION ALLOWING DEFENDANT ADDITIONAL TIME TO ANSWER OR OTHERWISE RESPOND by United States Sean E. Frink appearing for Defendant United States (Frink, Sean)
November 28, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER Granting Pro Hac Vice Application of Charles D. Naylor #7 Petition for Admission to Practice Pro Hac Vice for Charles D. Naylor. Signed by Chief Judge Ramona V. Manglona on 11/28/2018. (BTC)
November 28, 2018 Filing 7 CONSENT to Serve as Designee for Charles D. Naylor by William M. Fitzgerald re #6 PETITION for Admission to Practice Pro Hac Vice for Charles D. Naylor. (ADE)
November 28, 2018 Filing 6 PETITION for Admission to Practice Pro Hac Vice for Charles D. Naylor (Filing Fee: $300.00, Receipt Number: MPX100005274.) Charles D. Naylor appearing for Plaintiff Kenneth Lockhart. (ADE)
November 8, 2018 Filing 5 PROOF OF SERVICE by Kenneth Lockhart . Served upon United States (Fitzgerald, William)
October 22, 2018 Filing 4 PROOF OF SERVICE by Kenneth Lockhart . Served upon United States (Fitzgerald, William)
October 12, 2018 Filing 3 SUMMONS Returned Executed Served upon United States (Fitzgerald, William)
October 9, 2018 Summons Issued as to United States of America U.S. Attorney's Office, District of the Northern Mariana Islands. (BTC)
October 9, 2018 Summons Issued as to United States by and through Honorable Shawn N. Anderson United States Attorney District of the Northern Mariana Islands. (BTC)
October 9, 2018 Summons Issued as to United States by and through Honorable Jeff Sessions, Attorney General of the United States. (BTC)
October 9, 2018 Filing 2 CORPORATE Disclosure Statement, FRPC 7.1(a) filed by Kenneth Lockhart re #1 Complaint. (BTC)
October 9, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against United States with Jury Demand, filed by Kenneth Lockhart. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (BTC)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Northern Mariana Islands District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Lockhart v. United States
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United States
Represented By: Sean E. Frink
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kenneth Lockhart
Represented By: William M. Fitzgerald
Represented By: Charles D. Naylor
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?