Wang et al v. Gold Mantis Construction Decoration (CNMI), LLC.

Plaintiff: Duxin Yang, Yongjun Meng, Qingchun Xu, Dong Han, Liangcai Sun, Youli Wang and Tianming Wang
Defendant: Gold Mantis Construction Decoration (CNMI), LLC.
Case Number: 1:2018cv00030
Filed: December 17, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Mariana Islands
Presiding Judge: Ramona V Manglona
Nature of Suit: P.I.: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 12, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 12, 2019 Reset Hearings: Hearing on #3 Motion to Dismiss set for 3/7/2019 is vacated and reset for 4/4/2019 09:30 AM in Courtroom 101 before Chief Judge Ramona V. Manglona. (DPB)
February 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER Extending Plaintiffs' Deadline to Respond to Motion to Dismiss to March 15, 2019. Signed by Chief Judge Ramona V. Manglona on 02/12/2019. (DPB )
February 11, 2019 Filing 4 STIPULATION Allowing Plaintiff's to File an Amended Complaint and Joint Request to Take Off-Calendar Defendant's Motion Hearing by Gold Mantis Construction Decoration (CNMI), LLC. (Mocanu, Tiberius)
January 30, 2019 Set/Reset Hearings: re #3 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction Motion Hearing set for 3/7/2019 09:30 AM in Courtroom 101 before Chief Judge Ramona V. Manglona. (BTC)
January 30, 2019 Filing 3 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction Tiberius Mocanu appearing for Defendant Gold Mantis Construction Decoration (CNMI), LLC. (Mocanu, Tiberius)
January 8, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE of Appearance by Tiberius Mocanu on behalf of Gold Mantis Construction Decoration (CNMI), LLC. (Mocanu, Tiberius)
December 17, 2018 Summons Issued as to Gold Mantis Construction Decoration (CNMI), LLC. (FPA)
December 17, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Gold Mantis Construction Decoration (CNMI), LLC. with Jury Demand (Filing Fee: $400.00, Receipt Number: MPX1 5302) filed by Qingchun Xu, Dong Han, Liangcai Sun, Youli Wang, Tianming Wang, Duxin Yang, Yongjun Meng. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (FPA)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Northern Mariana Islands District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Wang et al v. Gold Mantis Construction Decoration (CNMI), LLC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Duxin Yang
Represented By: Bruce L. Berline
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Yongjun Meng
Represented By: Bruce L. Berline
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Qingchun Xu
Represented By: Bruce L. Berline
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Dong Han
Represented By: Bruce L. Berline
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Liangcai Sun
Represented By: Bruce L. Berline
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Youli Wang
Represented By: Bruce L. Berline
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tianming Wang
Represented By: Bruce L. Berline
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gold Mantis Construction Decoration (CNMI), LLC.
Represented By: Tiberius Mocanu
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?