Quitugua v. Camacho et al
Plaintiff: Darcie T. Quitugua
Defendant: Department of Community and Cultural Affairs, Division of Youth Services, Commonwealth of the Northern Mariana Islands and Julian R. Camacho
Case Number: 1:2019cv00003
Filed: February 22, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Mariana Islands
Presiding Judge: Ramona V Manglona
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Jobs
Cause of Action: 42:2000e
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 23, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 23, 2019 Filing 5 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Chief Judge Ramona V. Manglona: Status Conference held on 4/23/2019. Status Conference set for 5/7/2019 09:00 AM (ChST) in Courtroom 101 before Chief Judge Ramona V. Manglona. Plaintiff is ordered to appear telephonically for this hearing. (Court Reporter FTR) (TPM)
April 9, 2019 Set/Reset Hearing: Status Conference set for 4/23/2019 at 9:00 AM is rescheduled to 10:00 AM, the same day, in Courtroom 101 before Chief Judge Ramona V. Manglona. (ACH)
March 22, 2019 Filing 3 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Chief Judge Ramona V. Manglona: Motion Hearing held on 3/22/2019 re Ex Parte 2 MOTION to Withdraw and to Appoint Counsel, filed by Darcie T. Quitugua. Status Conference set for 4/23/2019 09:00 AM in Courtroom 101 before Chief Judge Ramona V. Manglona. (Court Reporter FTR) (TPM)
February 25, 2019 Summons Issued as to Julian R. Camacho. (FPA)
February 25, 2019 Summons Issued as to Department of Community and Cultural Affairs. (FPA)
February 22, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Julian R. Camacho, Commonwealth of the Northern Mariana Islands, Department of Community and Cultural Affairs, Division of Youth Services with Jury Demand (Filing Fee: $400.00, Receipt Number: MPX100005403.), filed by Darcie T. Quitugua. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (ADE)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Northern Mariana Islands District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Quitugua v. Camacho et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Department of Community and Cultural Affairs
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Division of Youth Services
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Commonwealth of the Northern Mariana Islands
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Julian R. Camacho
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Darcie T. Quitugua
Represented By: Joseph E. Horey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?