Yuqin Gui v. Brown et al
Plaintiff: Yuqin Gui
Defendant: Imperial Pacific International (CNMI), LLC and Stephen Brown
Case Number: 1:2019cv00019
Filed: October 9, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Mariana Islands
Presiding Judge: Ramona V Manglona
Nature of Suit: P.I.: Other
Cause of Action: 42:2000e
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 4, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 4, 2019 Filing 7 PROOF OF SERVICE by Yuqin Gui . Served upon Stephen Brown (Fitzgerald, William)
December 2, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER RE: Case Management Conference. Case Management Conference is set for 1/9/2020 at 01:30 PM in Courtroom 101 before Chief Judge Ramona V. Manglona. Signed by Chief Judge Ramona V. Manglona on 12/02/2019. (FPA)
November 25, 2019 Filing 5 DEFENDANT Imperial Pacific International (CNMI), LLC'S ANSWER And Affirmative Defenses by Imperial Pacific International (CNMI), LLC. Related document: #1 Complaint filed by Yuqin Gui. (Butcher, Kelley)
November 7, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER Granting #3 Stipulation to Extend Time. Signed by Chief Judge Ramona V. Manglona on 11/07/2019. (ADE)
November 1, 2019 Filing 3 FIRST Stipulation Extending Time for Defendant Imperial Pacific International (CNMI), LLC's Answer to Complaint. (Butcher, Kelley)
October 12, 2019 Filing 2 PROOF OF SERVICE by Yuqin Gui re #1 Complaint . Served upon Imperial Pacific International (CNMI), LLC (Fitzgerald, William)
October 9, 2019 Summons Issued as to Imperial Pacific International (CNMI), LLC. (FPA)
October 9, 2019 Summons Issued as to Stephen Brown. (FPA)
October 9, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Stephen Brown and Imperial Pacific International (CNMI), LLC (Filing Fee: $400.00, Receipt Number: MPX1 - 5683.), filed by Yuqin Gui. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (FPA)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Northern Mariana Islands District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Yuqin Gui v. Brown et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Yuqin Gui
Represented By: William M. Fitzgerald
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Imperial Pacific International (CNMI), LLC
Represented By: Kelley Butcher
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Stephen Brown
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?