Shoiter v. Vincent S. Attao, Gregory Castro, Georgia M. Cabrera, Wally Villagomez
Plaintiff: Price Shoiter
Defendant: John Doe, Gregory Castro, Wally Villagomez, Georgia M. Cabrera and Vincent S. Attao
Case Number: 1:2019cv00021
Filed: November 12, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Mariana Islands
Presiding Judge: Ramona V Manglona
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 8, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 8, 2020 Set Hearing: re #13 MOTION to Dismiss Motion to Correct Misjoinder Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P.21 and Motion to Dismiss for Lack of Subject Matter Jurisdiction Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12(b)(1) and Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim Pursuant to Fed. R. C Motion to Dismiss Hearing set for 2/20/2020 at 09:00 AM in Courtroom 101 before Chief Judge Ramona V. Manglona. (BTC)
January 8, 2020 Filing 13 MOTION to Correct Misjoinder Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P.21 and Motion to Dismiss for Lack of Subject Matter Jurisdiction Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12(b)(1) and Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12(b)(6) filed by Leslie A. Healer appearing for Defendants Vincent S. Attao, Georgia M. Cabrera, Gregory Castro, Wally Villagomez (Attachments: #1MEMORANDUM of Law in Support of Defendants' Motion to Correct Misjoinder Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P.21 and Motion to Dismiss for Lack of Subject Matter Jurisdiction Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12(b)(1) and Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12(b)(6)) (Healer, Leslie)
January 8, 2020 Filing 12 NOTICE of Appearance; Certificate of Service filed by Leslie A. Healer on behalf of Vincent S. Attao, Georgia M. Cabrera, Gregory Castro, Wally Villagomez (Healer, Leslie)
December 17, 2019 Filing 11 SUMMONS Returned Executed as to Georgia M. Cabrera served on 12/17/2019. (FPA)
December 17, 2019 Filing 10 SUMMONS Returned Executed as to Wally Villagomez served on 12/17/2019. (FPA)
December 17, 2019 Filing 9 SUMMONS Returned Executed as to Vincent S. Attao served on 12/17/2019. (FPA)
December 17, 2019 Filing 8 SUMMONS Returned Executed as to Gregory Castro served on 12/17/2019. (FPA)
December 6, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER Granting #5 Application to Proceed In Forma Pauperis and Ordering Service of #4 First Amended Complaint. Signed by Chief Judge Ramona V. Manglona on 12/062019. (ADE)
December 6, 2019 Summons Issued as to Wally Villagomez. (ADE)
December 6, 2019 Summons Issued as to Gregory Castro. (ADE)
December 6, 2019 Summons Issued as to Georgia M. Cabrera. (ADE)
December 6, 2019 Summons Issued as to Vincent S. Attao. (ADE)
November 25, 2019 Filing 6 MOTION to Appoint Counsel by Plaintiff Price Shoiter (BTC)
November 25, 2019 Filing 5 APPLICATION to Proceed in District Court Without Prepaying Fees of Costs, filed by Price Shoiter. (BTC)
November 25, 2019 Filing 4 FIRST Amended Complaint against Vincent S. Attao, Gregory Castro, Georgia M. Cabrera, Wally Villagomez, filed by Price Shoiter. (BTC)
November 12, 2019 Filing 3 CERTIFICATE of Mailing re #2 Order to Amend Complaint. (ADE)
November 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 2 ORDER to Amend #1 Complaint filed by Price Shoiter. Signed by Chief Judge Ramona V. Manglona on 11/12/2019. (ADE)
November 12, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT filed by Price Shoiter. (Attachments: #1 Envelope) (ADE)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Northern Mariana Islands District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Shoiter v. Vincent S. Attao, Gregory Castro, Georgia M. Cabrera, Wally Villagomez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Doe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gregory Castro
Represented By: Leslie A. Healer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wally Villagomez
Represented By: Leslie A. Healer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Georgia M. Cabrera
Represented By: Leslie A. Healer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Vincent S. Attao
Represented By: Leslie A. Healer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Price Shoiter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?