Babauta et al v. John Doe
Plaintiff: Francisco Q. Guerrero, Joaquin R. Lizama, Reynaldo A Manila, Manases Manglona and Luis C. Babauta
Defendant: John Doe
Case Number: 1:2019cv00023
Filed: December 2, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Mariana Islands
Presiding Judge: Ramona V Manglona
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 24, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 24, 2020 Filing 11 CERTIFICATE of Mailing #10 Order Dismissing Action Without Prejudice. (Attachments: #1 Copy of Postage) (BTC)
January 23, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER Dismissing Action Without Prejudice. Signed by Chief Judge Ramona V. Manglona on 01/23/2020. (BTC)
January 22, 2020 Filing 9 MAIL Returned on 1/13/2020 as "No Longer on this Address. Return to Sender" as to Francisco Q. Guerrero. (ADE)
January 22, 2020 Filing 8 MOTION to Dismiss filed by Plaintiff Reynaldo A Manila. (ADE)
December 27, 2019 Filing 7 CERTIFICATE of Mailing #6 Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Amend. (BTC)
December 27, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER Granting #5 Request for Extension of Time to File First Amended Complaint. Signed by Chief Judge Ramona V. Manglona on 12/27/2019. (BTC)
December 23, 2019 Filing 5 REQUEST for Extension of Time to File Amended Complaint #2 Order. filed by Plaintiffs Manases Manglona, Reynaldo A Manila (BTC)
December 13, 2019 Filing 4 MAIL Returned on 12/12/2019 as "Return to Sender. No Longer on this Address" as to Francisco Q. Guerrero. (DPB)
December 2, 2019 Filing 3 CERTIFICATE of Mailing re #1 Letters/Complaint and #2 Order as well as copies of Pro Se Form 14 and AO Form 239 Served upon Luis C. Babauta, Francisco Q. Guerrero, Joaquin R. Lizama, Manases Manglona, Reynaldo A Manila (DPB)
December 2, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 2 ORDER Granting Plaintiffs Leave to Amend. Signed by Chief Judge Ramona V. Manglona on 12/2/2019. (DPB)
December 2, 2019 Filing 1 LETTERS/COMPLAINT against John Doe, filed by Joaquin R. Lizama, Luis C. Babauta, Francisco Q. Guerrero, Reynaldo A. Manila, Manases Manglona. (DPB)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Northern Mariana Islands District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Babauta et al v. John Doe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Francisco Q. Guerrero
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Joaquin R. Lizama
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Reynaldo A Manila
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Manases Manglona
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Luis C. Babauta
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Doe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?