Yantze Corporation v. American Sinopan, LLC
Plaintiff: Yantze Corporation
Defendant: American Sinopan, LLC
Case Number: 1:2020cv00015
Filed: July 8, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Mariana Islands
Presiding Judge: Ramona V Manglona
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 7, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 7, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER re Case Management Conference. Case Management Conference is set for 9/17/2020 01:30 PM in 3rd Floor Courtroom before Chief Judge Ramona V. Manglona. Signed by Chief Judge Ramona V. Manglona on 08/7/2020. (DPB)
August 6, 2020 Filing 3 ANSWER to Complaint by American Sinopan, LLC. Related document: #1 Complaint filed by Yantze Corporation. (Hasselback, George)
July 9, 2020 Filing 2 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Yantze Corporation. American Sinopan, LLC served on 7/9/2020, answer due 7/30/2020. (Scoggins, Mark)
July 8, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against American Sinopan, LLC (Filing Fee: $400.00.), filed by Yantze Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (BTC)
July 8, 2020 Summons Issued as to American Sinopan, LLC. (BTC)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Northern Mariana Islands District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Yantze Corporation v. American Sinopan, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Yantze Corporation
Represented By: Mark A. Scoggins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: American Sinopan, LLC
Represented By: George L. Hasselback
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?