Winzy Corporation v. Imperial Pacific International (CNMI), LLC
Plaintiff: Winzy Corporation
Defendant: Imperial Pacific International (CNMI), LLC
Case Number: 1:2020cv00028
Filed: October 30, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Mariana Islands
Presiding Judge: Ramona V Manglona
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 18, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 21, 2020 Filing 5 First AMENDED COMPLAINT against Imperial Pacific International (CNMI), LLC, filed by Winzy Corporation. (Scoggins, Mark)
December 21, 2020 AMENDED Summons Issued as to Imperial Pacific International (CNMI), LLC.. (TVW)
December 17, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER Dismissing #1 Complaint with Leave to Amend and Denying #3 Motion for Entry of Default as Moot. Signed by Chief Judge Ramona V. Manglona on 12/17/2020. (ADE)
December 16, 2020 Filing 3 MOTION for Entry of Default Mark A. Scoggins appearing for Plaintiff Winzy Corporation (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Declaration of Counsel) (Scoggins, Mark)
November 6, 2020 Filing 2 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Winzy Corporation. Imperial Pacific International (CNMI), LLC served on 11/6/2020, answer due 11/27/2020. (Scoggins, Mark)
October 30, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Imperial Pacific International (CNMI), LLC (Filing Fee: $400.00, Receipt Number: MPX100006224.), filed by Winzy Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (ADE)
October 30, 2020 Summons Issued as to Imperial Pacific International (CNMI), LLC. (ADE)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Northern Mariana Islands District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Winzy Corporation v. Imperial Pacific International (CNMI), LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Winzy Corporation
Represented By: Mark A. Scoggins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Imperial Pacific International (CNMI), LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?