Xerox Corporation v. Imperial Pacific International (CNMI), LLC
Plaintiff: Xerox Corporation
Defendant: Imperial Pacific International (CNMI), LLC
Case Number: 1:2020cv00037
Filed: December 28, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Mariana Islands
Presiding Judge: Ramona V Manglona
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 25, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 25, 2021 Filing 18 DECLARATION filed by Xerox Corporation Declaration of David G. Banes Regarding Attorney's Fees and Costs. (Banes, David)
February 25, 2021 Filing 17 MOTION for Attorney Fees Plaintiff's Submission Regarding Prejudgment Interest, Attorney's Fees, and Costs David G. Banes appearing for Plaintiff Xerox Corporation (Banes, David)
February 11, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER Granting Plaintiff #6 Default Judgment and Injunctive Relief by Directing Defendant to Return Plaintiff's Equipment. Signed by Chief Judge Ramona V. Manglona on 2/11/2021. (FPA)
February 10, 2021 Filing 15 NOTICE of Appearance by Stephen J. Nutting on behalf of Imperial Pacific International (CNMI), LLC (Nutting, Stephen)
February 9, 2021 Filing 14 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Chief Judge Ramona V. Manglona: Hearing on #6 Motion for Default Judgment held on 2/9/2021. (Court Reporter HMD) (FPA)
February 9, 2021 Terminate #6 Motion for Default Judgment. (FPA)
February 8, 2021 Filing 13 PROOF OF SERVICE by Xerox Corporation Proof of Service. Served upon Xerox Corporation (Banes, David)
February 5, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER Shortening Time re #9 Motion to Shorten Time. Signed by Chief Judge Ramona V. Manglona on 2/5/2021. (FPA)
February 5, 2021 Set Hearing: Hearing on #6 Motion for Default Judgment is set for 2/9/2021 at 10:30 AM in 3rd Floor Courtroom before Chief Judge Ramona V. Manglona. (FPA)
February 2, 2021 Filing 11 CERTIFICATE filed by Xerox Corporation re #10 Certificate Corrected Certification of Counsel Under Local Rule 7.1(f). (Banes, David)
February 2, 2021 Filing 10 CERTIFICATE filed by Xerox Corporation re #9 MOTION Motion to Shorten Time Under Local Rule 7.1(f) Certification of Counsel Under Local Rule 7.1(f). (Banes, David)
February 2, 2021 Filing 9 MOTION to Shorten Time Under Local Rule 7.1(f) David G. Banes appearing for Plaintiff Xerox Corporation. (Banes, David)
February 2, 2021 Filing 8 DECLARATION of Charles J. Corrigan in Support of Motion for Default Judgment filed by Xerox Corporation . (Banes, David)
February 2, 2021 Filing 7 MEMORANDUM of Law in Support of #6 Motion for Default Judgment by Xerox Corporation . (Banes, David)
February 2, 2021 Filing 6 NOTICE of Motion for Default Judgment as to David G. Banes appearing for Plaintiff Xerox Corporation (Banes, David)
January 26, 2021 Filing 5 Clerk's ENTRY OF DEFAULT as to Imperial Pacific International (CNMI), LLC (DPB)
January 26, 2021 Terminate #3 Motion for Entry of Default. (DPB)
January 22, 2021 Filing 4 DECLARATION filed by Xerox Corporation Declaration of Counsel in Support of Entry of Default. (Banes, David)
January 22, 2021 Filing 3 MOTION for Entry of Default Request For Entry of Default David G. Banes appearing for Plaintiff Xerox Corporation (Banes, David)
January 7, 2021 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Xerox Corporation. Imperial Pacific International (CNMI), LLC served on 12/31/2020, answer due 1/21/2021. (FPA)
January 6, 2021 Filing 2 PROOF of Service filed by Xerox Corporation . (Banes, David)
December 28, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Imperial Pacific International (CNMI), LLC (Filing Fee: $402.00, Receipt Number: MPX100006267.), filed by Xerox Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Civil Cover Sheet) (ADE)
December 28, 2020 Summons Issued as to Imperial Pacific International (CNMI), LLC. (ADE)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Northern Mariana Islands District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Xerox Corporation v. Imperial Pacific International (CNMI), LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Xerox Corporation
Represented By: David G. Banes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Imperial Pacific International (CNMI), LLC
Represented By: Stephen J. Nutting
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?