In re: Alger, Columbia, Janus, MFS, One Group, Putnam, Allianz Dresdner
Plaintiff: Harry Jacobs, Edward I. Segel, Jean Stigas, Lorraine Blacker, Joseph Cordani, Peter Kavaler, Jerry Huang, John Hammerslaugh, Warren Pinchuck, Warren Sherman, Jackie Williams, Anil Kapoor, Grace Nugent, Reiko Gagnon, Steven Burda, Lead Plaintiff Ohio Tuition Trust Authority, Richard Befort, Roger Bailey, Harold Beardsley, Mark J. Keane, First Derivative Traders, Irving J. Chasen, Doris Banas, Pamela Yameen, Lori N. Wiswell, Edward L. Murphy, Sr., John Hegstrom, Norma Dweck, Stephen J. Friedman, Harriet Surks, Doreen Duke, Ira Newman, Deborah Clark-Weintraub, David Shaev, Boris Fieldman, Matthew Wiggenhorn, Anthony Antoniello, John E. Morrissey, Linda B Parker, A Plaintiff, Edward Casey, Seth B. Marks, John Asseta, Gerald Born, Settling Plaintiffs, John H. Diamond, Jr., Ohio Tuition Trust Authority, Anita Walker, Mark Schwartz, Barbara Cordani, Howard W. Mathews, Julie Parisi, Debora J. McLaughlin, Todd Klein, George E. Pliska, James W. Yameen, Ann Schneps Dubin, Edward Newman, Joanne S. Baseman, Jason Hung, Rhonda Vladimir, Kenneth Yameen, Roger Kelso, Scott Howe, Paolo LaFrancesca, Delon Brown, Elise M. Diamond, Erik P. Gagnon, Wathena Ann Forsee, Edmund Woodbury, Iris Segel, George Slabe, John Vining, James E. Schultz, Tina Casey, Joseph P. McDonough, Cynthia Puleo, David L. Harris, Joanna Adams, Kathleen Fitzgerald, Employer-Teamsters Local Nos. 175 & 505 Pension Trust Fund, Sharon Gaines, Zachary Alan Starr, Robert K. Finnell, Virginia Wilcox, Donna Gaffney, Michael Gaines, Lead Class Counsel for the One Group Subtrack, Combined Welfare Fund, Jessica Corbett, William Walsh, Leon Brazin, Gail Craven, John Joseph Gillis, Lawrence A. Stigas, William John Glebus, Jr., Kliel Rose, David Grant, Defered Compensation Plan for Employees of Nassau County, Sylvia Volin, George Tsetsekos, Janet Befort, Raquel Benun, Mike Sayegh, Craig J. McLaughlin, Antonio Ioakim, Teresa M. Meehan, Michael J. Meehan, Mayor Sutton, Craig Wangberger, Mark Snyder and Thomas F. Bednarek
Defendant: Charles Schwab Trust Company, Putnam Asia Pacific Growth Fund, Daniel G. Calugar, Morgan Stanley Investments LP, JB Oxford Holdings, Inc., Francis N. Bonsignore, Sun Life of Canada (U.S.) Financial Services Holdings, Inc., Elizabeth T. Kennan, Grant D. Seeger, Richard R. Jandrain, III, Patrick J. Simpson, Putnam PennsylvaniaTax Exempt Income Fund, Putnam Investment Management LLC, Daniel C. Chung, Sun Life Financial, Inc., John T. Sargent, Martin Druffner, George Putnam, III, Skifter Ajro, Pritchard Capital Services LLC, Conseco Securities Inc., Columbia Funds Trust II, Columbia Management Advisors, LLC, Pritchard Capital Partners LLC, Putnam Michigan Tax Exempt Income Fund, Morgan Stanley Investment Advisors Inc., Merrill Lynch, Pierce, Fenner & Smith, Inc., Fred Alger & Company Incorporated, Linda Hutton Heagy, Putnam OTC & Emerging Growth Fund, Wilshire Associates Incorporated, Contro, Jerome S., MFS Fund Distributors, Louis Tasiopoulos, Canary Investment Management, LLC, Steven L. Scheid, UBS AG, Nicholas-Applegate Capital Management LLC, RS Midcap Opportunities Fund, Putnam Convertible Income-Growth Trust, R. Craig Kennedy, Kirlin Securities Inc., AIC Asset Management, LLC, Columbia Funds Distributor, Inc., Latanzi, Damon, JP Morgan Chase and Co., Kaplan & Company Securities, Inc., Putnam Investors Fund, James Tambone, Michael Grady, Jeffrey W. Greenberg, MFS Series Trust IV, One Group Dealer Services, Inc., Arthur M. Dubow, George Putnam III, Ritchie Capital Management, Inc., Janet Langford Kelly, Putnam Minnesota Tax Exempt Income Fund, MFS Series Trust II, Joseph W. Dello Russo, Putnam Funds Trust, Kopstein, Van Alen, Nash & Co., Inc., Bay Island Financial LLP, Putnam Money Market Fund, Putnam New Opportunities Fund, Allianz Dresdner Asset Management of America LP, MFS Fund Distributors, Inc., Van Kampen Funds, Inc., One Group Services Company, Janus Distributors LLC, Putnam Tax Exempt Money Market Fund, Steven M. Cohen, David R. Meuse, CIBC Securities, Inc., Haidar Capital Management LLC, Jerome Kahn, Jr., Putnam Tax Smart Funds Trust, David C. Arch, Circle Trust, Inc., Ralph Wanger, Columbia Management, LLC, Canary Investment, LLC, Credit Suisse First Boston (USA) Inc., Richard F. Powers, Stephen M. Oristaglio, Golden Gate Financial Group, LLC, Putnam Ohio Tax Exempt Income Fund, Putnam Classic Equity Fund, Abby M. O'Neill, Lawrence H. Cohn, PA Fund Management, Ray J. Groves, Van Kampen Investments Inc., A.J.C. Smith, Nathan E. Saint-Amand, Putnam Retail Management, L.P., Canary Capital Partners, LLC, Roger P. Cheever, MFS Family of Funds, D.R. Loeser, Powell, Lawrence S., Marsh & McLennan Companies, Inc. Stock Investment Plan Committee, Gregory Trautman, RS Information Age Fund, Donald P Carter, Robert A. Oden, MFS Government Securities Fund, Robert E. Patterson, RS Emerging Growth Fund, Carmel Peters, Noah Lerner, Alliance Capital Management L.P., Canary Capital Partners, Ltd., Putnam California Tax Exempt Income Fund, Jerry D. Choate, Clyde L. Carter, Jameson Adkins Baxter, Columbia Funds Trust VI, Putnam Retail Management Limited Partnership, Janus Adviser Series, Putnam Investment Management Trust, Columbia Funds Trust VIII, Schwab Capital Markets L.P., NFJ Investment Group LP, Morgan Stanley Investment Management Inc., Trout Trading Management Co., James P. Craig, Robert Shannon, Pentagon Asset Management, Headstart Advisers Ltd., Tandem Financial Services, Columbia Management Distributors, Inc., Sun Life Financial (U.S.) Investments LLC, Mathis Cabiallavetta, Van Kampen Equity Trust, Buffalo Capital Corporation, Ronald J. Jackson, Kenneth Corba, David J. Kundert, Arnold D. Scott, Round Hill Securities, Inc, Wachovia Securities, LLC, Alger Associates, Inc., The Bear Stearns Companies, Inc., Patricia C. Flaherty, Margaret Eisen, Karen Grunst-Johnson, Paul A. Flynn, Kenneth T. Stevens, Putnam Health Sciences Trust, Davidson Companies, Thomas C. Theobald, PA Distributors LLC, Aurum Capital Management Corp., Sta.Ana, Delano N., Columbia Management Advisors, Inc., Putnam Global Equity Fund, Prudential Financial, Inc., J. Atwood Ives, MFS Series Trust V, Michael Christiani, Banc of America Securities, LLC, Putnam U.S. Government Income Trust, Wayne W. Whalen, Hugo F. Sonnenschein, Alliance Capital Management Holding L.P., Columbia Acorn Select, Suzanne H. Woolsey, James L. Callinan, Canadian Imperial Bank of Commerce, Alger Shareholder Services, Inc., Columbia Mid Cap Growth Fund Inc., Global Analytical Capital, Putnam International Equity Fund, John H. Mullin, III, Charles P. McQuaid, Andrew Goodwin, Ian S. Ferguson, Veras Investment Partners, LLP, Janus Capital Group, Inc., Bank of America Securities, LLC, Keith, Peter, Aurum Securities Corp., RS Growth Fund, Variable Annuity Life Insurance Company, The, Prudential Securities, Inc., Robert E. Nason, Citigroup, Inc., Michael Vanin, G. Andrew Cox, PIMCO Funds: Pacific Investment Management Series, William L. Rosoff, Salomon Smith Barney Inc., Lars O. Soderberg, Putnam Vista Fund, Gregory S. Duch, David C. Kleinman, Janus Investment Fund, Charles A. Davis, Helen Y. Hayes, Edward J. Stern, Stephen J Treadway, Ryan Goldberg, Columbia Funds Trust XI, Robert Skidelsky, Allianz Global Investors Fund Management LLC (f/k/a PA Fund Management LLC), AXA Equitable Life Insurance Company, Lord Lang, Bank of America Corp, Signalert Corporation, Theodore C. Sihpol, III, RTE Asset Management, Peter W. Atwater, Rydex Investments, James G. Lewis, Donald A Hoy, Bank One Corp., Round Hill Securities, Inc., RS Partner Fund, Putnam Europe Equity Fund, J. W. Greenberg, Robin Beery, Putnam Preferred Income Fund, J.P. Morgan Chase & Co., Julius Pallone, Putnam High Yield Advantage Fund, Kraig L. Kibble, MFS Series Trust X, Lawrence T. Perera, Parametric Portfolio Associates, . Morgan Stanley, Pimco Funds Multi-Manager Series, MFS Research Fund, Richard W. Vague, Janus Capital Management LLC, Enhanced Investment Technologies LLC, Columbia Funds Services, Inc., Stephen E. O'Neil, Geirulv Lode, Merrill Lynch & Co., Inc., Putnam Management Trust, Canary Capital Partners LLC, Lawrence J Lasser, Janus Capital Group Inc., Putnam Voyager Fund, Bank of America Corporation, Thomas E. Stitzel, Smith Barney Fund Management, LLC, The One Group Services Company, Allianz Global Investors Distributors LLC (f/k/a PA Distributors LLC), Columbia Acorn International Select Fund, Justin Ficken, Oscar Fanjul, Gwendolyn S. King, Marilyn McCoy, John A. Wing, Landon H. Rowland, The Alger Institutional Funds, Marc C. Bilotti, Jemmco Advisers, Bankers Trust Company, Daniel Calugar, Morgan Stanley DW, Mark A. Beeson, Putnam Equity Income Fund, Robert A. Oden, Jr., The Alger Fund, PFPC Distributors, Inc., Putnam Strategic Income Fund, Putnam Tax-Free Income Trust, Liberty Variable Investment Trust, Lester L. Colbert, Jr., Financier John Does 1-100, Robert N. Burt, Schield Management Company, Putnam High Yield Trust, Putnam New York Tax Exempt Money Market Fund, Columbia Fund Services, Inc., Bank One Investment Advisors Corporation, J. Dale Sherratt, Paul F. Balser, Perkins Wolf McDonnell & Company, Jack E. Nelson, MFS Service Center, Inc., Frederick W. Ruebeck, Putnam Utilities Growth and Income Fund, Roger Hertog, Putnam, LLC, The Alger American Fund, Security Brokerage, Inc., Putnam Diversified Income Trust, Charles B. Curtis, Putnam Capital Appreciation Fund, Banc of America Securities LLC, E Philip Cannon, John E. Cashwell, jr., RS Smaller Company Growth Fund, Janus Capital Corporation, Columbia Funds Trust VII, Kirlin Securities, Inc., Wall Street Global, LLC, Mark B. Whiston, Putnam Investments, LLC, Omid Kamshad, The Putnam Fund for Growth and Income, Putnam Investment Management, LLC, Lenore Zarate, J. B. Oxford, Columbia Acorn USA, Frank Perfetuo, Investec (US) Incorporated, Canary Capital Partners Ltd, Putnam Investments Trust, Ilytat, L.P., Banc One Investment Advisors Corporation, Columbia Funds Trust III, Columbia Thermostat Fund, Putnam Retail Management GP, Inc., Alan Waldbaum, Columbia Management Group, LLC, Columbia Acorn Trust, John J. Neuhauser, Samaritan Asset Management, Richard L. Woolworth, Jameson A. Baxter, Putnam Florida Tax Exempt Income Fund, The George Putnam Fund of Boston, RS Investment Trust, DCIP, L.P., PFPC, Inc., Marsh & McLennan Companies, Inc., Security Trust Company, N.A., Bank of America Corp., Putnam Arizona Tax Exempt Income Fund, RS Internet Age Fund, Gerald M Thorne, Putnam California Tax Exempt Money Market Fund, RS Investment Management, LP, Spectrum Financial, Inc., Charles E. Porter, Sr., Facilitator Broker John Does 1-100, Charles F. Baird, Jr., Lance Newcomb, MFS Emerging Growth Fund, Tak-Lung Tsim, W. Thomas Stephens, Van Kampen Equity and Income Fund, David Byck, Columbia Funds Trust V, William R. Gutow, PA Fund Management LLC, Massachusetts Investors Growth Stock Fund, Gordon H. Silver, Circle Trust Company, John W. Ballen, Douglas A. Hacker, Irene M. Esteves, Citigroup Global Markets Holdings Inc., B. Joseph White, Richard W. Lowry, Fred Alger Management, Inc., One Group Mutual Funds, Putnam Intermediate U.S. Government Income Fund, Bank One High Yield Partners, LLC, Ritchie Capital Management, LLC, Tandem Financial Services, Inc., Putnam Global Income Trust, Investments by Planners, Inc., Donald L. Tuttle, McCaffery, Michael G., James Dimon, Smith Barney Citigroup, James Y. Lin, Allianz Global Investors of America L.P. (f/k/a Allianz Dresdner Asset Management of America L.P.), Wachovia Corporation, Paul L. Joskow, Peter Coster, Columbia Acorn Fund, Aurum Capital Management Corporation, Putnam Family of Funds, National Clearing Corporation, Van Kampen Investor Services Inc., One Group Administrative Services Inc., John F. Finn, W Bryant Stooks, Stephen E Gibson, Janus Aspen Series, Nationwide Life Insurance Company, Warren B. Lammert, III, MFS Series Trust IX, A Defendant, James P. Connelly, Jr., Peter C. Marshall, William P. Boardman, Steven N. Kaplan, Bear, Stearns Securities Corp., John Mari, Stephen R. Hardis, RS Contrarian Value Fund, William E. Mayer, Columbia Acorn International Fund, Fund Defendants, Canadian Imperial Holdings, Inc., Mark A. Perry, Liebowitz, Larry, John Peffer, D.R. Loeser & Co., Inc, Columbia Management Group, Inc., Eric Burns, G. Randall Hecht, J. Miles Branagan, Van Kampen Asset Management, Ann-Lee Verville, Columbia Funds Trust IV, Columbia Wanger Asset Management, L.P., Howard J. Kerr, Putnam Balanced Retirement Fund, Leo Guthart, Joseph Palombo, JP Morgan Chase Bank, Inc., Clearing Broker John Does 1-100, William H. Woolverton, Putnam Municipal Income Fund, Prudential Equity Group, LLC, Robert F. Erburu, Bank of America, N.A., Charles F. Michaelman, AIG SunAmerica Life Assurance Co., Fred M. Alger, III, Plan Advisory Committee, Putnam New York Tax Exempt Income Fund, Richard Garland, Massachusetts Investors Trust, Bank One Trust Company, N.A., Eastbourne Capital Management, LLC, Securities America, Inc., Canary Investment Management, L.L.C., Putnam Asset Allocation Fund, Richard R. Wade, Columbia Funds Trust I, Massachusetts Financial Services Company, Salomon Smith Barney, Cantella & Co., Inc., Appalachian Trails, L.P., Putnam American Government Income Fund, Putnam Income Fund, Market Timer John Does 1-100, Citigroup Global Markets, Inc., Putnam Massachusetts Tax Exempt Income Fund, Putnam Discovery Growth Fund, UBS Financial Services, Inc., Lincoln Financial Advisors Corporation, Bank One Corporation, John A. Hill, Marc O. Mayer, BTS Asset Management, David B. Stone, Pritchard Capital Parners LLC, Veras Investment Partners, LLC, Auerbach, Leonard B., Columbia High Yield Fund Inc., PEA Capital LLC, Gary J. Madich, RS Investment Management, Inc., Joseph R. Palombo, Rod Dammeyer, John Does 1 through 100, Peconic Partners, LLC and RCM Capital Management LLC
Petitioner: Steven S. Scholes, Jonathan Lee Riches, The Individual Fund Plaintiffs, Xiao Tian, The Chiumento Group, The Krouse Group, Leven Proposed Lead Plaintiffs, Individual Fund Plaintiffs and The Illinois Police/Firefighter's Public Pension Fund Group
Cross Defendant: Bear Stearns & Co., Inc., Bear Stearns & Co. Inc. and Bear Stearns Securities Corporation
Intervenor: Van Kampen Series Fund Inc.
Amicus Curiae: AVZ, Inc., Invesco Funds Group, Inc. and Amvescap Retirement, Inc.
Case Number: 1:2004md15863
Filed: April 9, 2004
Court: US District Court for the District of Maryland
Office: Baltimore Office
Presiding Judge: J Frederick Motz
Nature of Suit: Other
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 16, 2014. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 16, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 3670 ORDER granting (3669) Motion for Disbursement of Funds in case 1:04-md-15863-JFM; granting (206) Motion for Disbursement of Funds in case 1:04-cv-03798-JFM. Signed by Judge J. Frederick Motz on 10/16/14 Associated Cases: 1:04-md-15863-JFM, 1:04-cv-03798-JFM(cags, Deputy Clerk)
July 23, 2014 Filing 3669 MOTION for Disbursement of Funds by The Krouse Group Responses due by 8/11/2014 (Attachments: #1 Memorandum In Support, #2 Affidavit of M.Rosenbaum, #3 Exhibit A1 to Affidavit, #4 Exhibit A2 to Affidavit, #5 Exhibit A3 to Affidavit, #6 Errata A4 to Affidavit, #7 Exhibit A5 to Affidavit, #8 Exhibit A6 to Affidavit, #9 Exhibit A7 to Affidavit, #10 Exhibit A8 to Affidavit, #11 Exhibit A9 to Affidavit, #12 Exhibit A10 to Affidavit, #13 Exhibit A11 to Affidavit, #14 Exhibit A12 to Affidavit, #15 Exhibit B to Affidavit, #16 Exhibit C to Affidavit, #17 Text of Proposed Order)Associated Cases: 1:04-md-15863-JFM, 1:04-cv-03798-JFM(Isbister, John)
November 27, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 3668 ORDER granting (3662) Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim in case 1:04-md-15863-JFM; granting (36) Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim in case 1:04-cv-02605-JFM in case 1:04-md-15863-JFM. Signed by Judge J. Frederick Motz on 11/27/13 Associated Cases: 1:04-md-15863-JFM, 1:04-cv-02605-JFM(cags, Deputy Clerk)
November 27, 2013 Filing 3667 MEMORANDUM Signed by Judge J. Frederick Motz on 11/27/13. Associated Cases: 1:04-md-15863-JFM, 1:04-cv-02605-JFM(cags, Deputy Clerk)
November 15, 2013 Filing 3666 REPLY to Response to Motion re (36 in 1:04-cv-02605-JFM) MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim, (3662 in 1:04-md-15863-JFM) MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim filed by Putnam, LLC. Associated Cases: 1:04-md-15863-JFM, 1:04-cv-02605-JFM(Carroll, James)
November 8, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 3665 Paperless ORDER granting #3664 Motion for Extension of Time to File Document. Signed by Judge J. Frederick Motz on 11/8/13. (Motz, J.)
November 6, 2013 Filing 3664 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Reply In Further Support Of Its Motion To Dismiss The Amended Complaint (Assented-To) by Putnam, LLC Responses due by 11/25/2013 (Attachments: #1 Memorandum Of Law)Associated Cases: 1:04-md-15863-JFM, 1:04-cv-02605-JFM(Carroll, James)
October 21, 2013 Filing 3663 RESPONSE in Opposition re (36 in 1:04-cv-02605-JFM) MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim filed by Kaveh S. Shahi, Leslie S. Shahi. Replies due by 11/7/2013. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 11-6-03 Putnam Corrsp, #2 Exhibit Certificate of Service)Associated Cases: 1:04-md-15863-JFM, 1:04-cv-02605-JFM(Shahi, Kaveh)
October 10, 2013 Filing 3662 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim by Putnam, LLC Responses due by 10/28/2013 (Attachments: #1 Memorandum of Law, #2 Exhibit A)(Carroll, James)
September 30, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 3661 Paperless ORDER granting (3660) Motion for Extension of Time in case 1:04-md-15863-JFM. Signed by Judge J. Frederick Motz on 12/30/2013. Associated Cases: 1:04-md-15863-JFM, 1:04-cv-02605-JFM(Motz, J.) Modified on 9/30/2013 (cags, Deputy Clerk). Modified on 9/30/2013 (cags, Deputy Clerk).
September 25, 2013 Filing 3660 MOTION for Extension of Time to Respond To Plaintiffs' Amended Complaint (ASSENTED-TO) by Putnam, LLC Responses due by 10/15/2013 (Attachments: #1 Memorandum In Support)Associated Cases: 1:04-md-15863-JFM, 1:04-cv-02605-JFM(Carroll, James)
September 9, 2013 Filing 3659 AMENDED COMPLAINT against Putnam Investment Funds, filed by Kaveh S. Shahi, Leslie S. Shahi. (Attachments: #1 Cert of Service)Associated Cases: 1:04-md-15863-JFM, 1:04-cv-02605-JFM(Shahi, Kaveh)
August 26, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 3658 ORDER in case 1:04-md-15863-JFM; granting in part and denying in part (29) Motion to Dismiss in case 1:04-cv-02605-JFM; Count 4 is dismissed; Plaintiffs are granted leave to amend the complaint. Signed by Judge J. Frederick Motz on 8/16/13 Associated Cases: 1:04-md-15863-JFM, 1:04-cv-02605-JFM(cags, Deputy Clerk)
August 26, 2013 Filing 3657 MEMORANDUM OPINION Signed by Judge J. Frederick Motz on 8/26/13. Associated Cases: 1:04-md-15863-JFM, 1:04-cv-02605-JFM(cags, Deputy Clerk)
August 21, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 3656 ORDER APPROVING DISTRIBUTION Signed by Judge J. Frederick Motz on 8/20/13. Associated Cases: 1:04-md-15863-JFM, 1:04-cv-01924-JFM, 1:04-cv-01933-JFM(cags, Deputy Clerk)
August 2, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 3655 CLASS DISTRIBUTION ORDER. Signed by Judge J. Frederick Motz on 8/2/13. (jnls, Deputy Clerk)
August 1, 2013 Filing 3654 MOTION for Disbursement of Funds Motion for Class Distribution Order by Combined Welfare Fund Responses due by 8/19/2013 (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order [Proposed] Order Approving Distribution, #2 Memorandum in Support of Motion for Approval of Distribution Plan, #3 Affidavit Declaration of Julie Swanson in Support of Motion for Approval of Distribution Plan)Associated Cases: 1:04-md-15863-JFM, 1:04-cv-01933-JFM(Waldman, Chet)
July 15, 2013 Filing 3653 Correspondence from Donald Rice re: settlement. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(jnls, Deputy Clerk)
July 12, 2013 Filing 3652 MOTION for Disbursement of Funds Motion for Class Distribution Order by A Plaintiff Responses due by 7/29/2013 (Attachments: #1 Memorandum of Law in Support, #2 Affidavit, #3 Text of Proposed Order)(Isbister, John)
July 11, 2013 Filing 3651 FILED IN ERROR - MOTION for Disbursement of Funds by A Plaintiff Responses due by 7/29/2013 (Attachments: #1 Affidavit, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(Isbister, John) Modified on 7/12/2013 (jnls, Deputy Clerk).
July 1, 2013 Filing 3650 REPLY to Response to Motion re (29 in 1:04-cv-02605-JFM) MOTION to Dismiss (Hearing Requested), (3647 in 1:04-md-15863-JFM) MOTION to Dismiss (Hearing Requested) filed by Putnam, LLC. Associated Cases: 1:04-md-15863-JFM, 1:04-cv-02605-JFM(Carroll, James)
June 14, 2013 Filing 3649 RESPONSE in Opposition re #3647 MOTION to Dismiss (Hearing Requested) filed by A Plaintiff. Replies due by 7/1/2013. (Shahi, Kaveh)
June 3, 2013 Filing 3648 Memorandum re #3647 MOTION to Dismiss (Hearing Requested) filed by Putnam, LLC. (Carroll, James)
June 3, 2013 Filing 3647 MOTION to Dismiss (Hearing Requested) by Putnam, LLC Responses due by 6/20/2013 (Carroll, James)
May 28, 2013 Filing 3646 Correspondence from Reginald Robert Watkins re: settlement. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(jnls, Deputy Clerk)
April 30, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 3645 PAPERLESS ORDER granting (3644) Motion Entry Of Scheduling Order in case 1:04-md-15863-JFM; granting (27) Motion Entry Of Scheduling Order in case 1:04-cv-02605-JFM. Signed by Judge J. Frederick Motz on 4/30/13 Associated Cases: 1:04-md-15863-JFM, 1:04-cv-02605-JFM(cags, Deputy Clerk)
April 23, 2013 Filing 3644 MOTION Entry Of Scheduling Order (Assented-To) by Putnam, LLC Responses due by 5/10/2013 Associated Cases: 1:04-md-15863-JFM, 1:04-cv-02605-JFM(Carroll, James)
April 9, 2013 Filing 3643 Correspondence confirming matters discussed during the conference. Associated Cases: 1:04-md-15863-JFM, 1:04-cv-02605-JFM(Motz, J.)
March 15, 2013 Filing 3642 A scheduling conference will be held by telephone at 4:30 pm on April 8, 2013. I ask counsel for plaintiffs to make the arrangements for the telephone conference call. Associated Cases: 1:04-md-15863-JFM, 1:04-cv-02605-JFM(Motz, J.)
February 1, 2013 Filing 3641 Correspondence from John Jacobson re: MFS Settlement (cags, Deputy Clerk)
January 23, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 3640 PAPERLESS ORDER Approving (3638 in 1:04-md-15863-JFM) Letter requesting that Robert Gotlieb be withdrawn from the case. Signed by Judge J. Frederick Motz on 1/23/13 Associated Cases: 1:04-md-15863-JFM et al.(cags, Deputy Clerk)
January 16, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 3639 ORDER Authorizing Distribution of Settlement Funds in the Alger Sub-Track. Signed by Judge J. Frederick Motz on 1/16/13 (cags, Deputy Clerk)
January 16, 2013 Filing 3638 NOTICE by Signalert Corporation , Re: Letter From Robert W. Gottlieb, To The Hon. J. Frederick Motz, Dated 1/16/2013, Requesting Removal From The ECF System And Docket, filed by (Gottlieb, Robert)
January 15, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 3637 ORDER APPROVING DISTRIBUTION PLAN. Signed by Judge J. Frederick Motz on 1/15/13 (cags, Deputy Clerk) Modified on 1/15/2013 (cags, Deputy Clerk).
January 15, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 3636 ORDER (3625 in 1:04-md-15863-JFM) Denying MOTION to Remand filed by Kaveh S. Shahi, Leslie S. Shahi. Signed by Judge J. Frederick Motz on 1/15/13 Associated Cases: 1:04-md-15863-JFM, 1:04-cv-02605-JFM(cags, Deputy Clerk) Modified on 1/15/2013 (cags, Deputy Clerk).
January 15, 2013 Filing 3635 MEMORANDUM Signed by Judge J. Frederick Motz on 1/15/13. Associated Cases: 1:04-md-15863-JFM, 1:04-cv-02605-JFM(cags, Deputy Clerk)
December 26, 2012 Filing 3634 MOTION for extension of time to file an opposition to lead plaintiff's motion for approval of distribution plan and APPROVAL. Signed by Judge J. Frederick Motz on 12/26/12. (jnls, Deputy Clerk)
December 26, 2012 Filing 3633 REPLY by Sandra Singer re #3632 REPLY to Response to Motion re 3628 MOTION for Disbursement of Funds INVESTOR CLASS LEAD PLAINTIFFS MOTION FOR APPROVAL OF DISTRIBUTION PLAN filed by City of Chicago Deferred Compensation Plan.. (jnls, Deputy Clerk)
December 20, 2012 Filing 3632 REPLY to Response to Motion re #3628 MOTION for Disbursement of Funds INVESTOR CLASS LEAD PLAINTIFFS MOTION FOR APPROVAL OF DISTRIBUTION PLAN filed by City of Chicago Deferred Compensation Plan. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of John Mills, #2 Supplemental Declaration of Jason Zuena, #3 Certificate of Service)(Luse, Jaime)
December 18, 2012 Filing 3631 MOTION for Disbursement of Funds Investor Class Plaintiffs' Motion for Distribution of Settlement Proceeds in the Alger Sub-Track by Lead Class Plaintiffs Responses due by 1/7/2013 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit 1 - [Proposed] Order Authorizing Distribution of Settlement Funds in the Alger Sub-Track, #2 Memorandum in Support of Investor Class Plaintiffs' Motion for Distribution of Settlement Proceeds in the Alger Sub-Track, #3 Affidavit of Eric S. Schachter in Support of Motion for Distribution of Settlement Proceeds in the Alger Sub-Track)(Luse, Jaime)
December 13, 2012 Filing 3630 NOTICE by Putnam, LLC OF RULING BY JPML DENYING PLAINTIFFS' MOTION TO REMAND (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)Associated Cases: 1:04-md-15863-JFM, 1:04-cv-02605-JFM(Carroll, James)
December 10, 2012 Filing 3629 RESPONSE in Opposition by Sandra Singer to Investor Class Lead Plaintiff's Motion for Approval of Distribution Plan. (cags, Deputy Clerk)
November 13, 2012 Filing 3628 MOTION for Disbursement of Funds INVESTOR CLASS LEAD PLAINTIFFS MOTION FOR APPROVAL OF DISTRIBUTION PLAN by City of Chicago Deferred Compensation Plan Responses due by 11/30/2012 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Proposed Order, #2 Memoranudm in Support of Motion for Approval of Distribution Plan, #3 Declaration Part 1, #4 Declaration Part 2, #5 Certificate of Service)(Luse, Jaime)
November 5, 2012 Filing 3627 RESPONSE in Opposition re (18 in 1:04-cv-02605-JFM, 3625 in 1:04-md-15863-JFM) MOTION to Remand filed by Putnam, LLC. Replies due by 11/26/2012. Associated Cases: 1:04-md-15863-JFM, 1:04-cv-02605-JFM(Carroll, James)
October 26, 2012 Filing 3626 Correspondence from Caroline Cammack re: settlement. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(jnls, Deputy Clerk)
October 17, 2012 Filing 3625 MOTION to Remand by Kaveh S. Shahi, Leslie S. Shahi Responses due by 11/5/2012 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)Associated Cases: 1:04-md-15863-JFM, 1:04-cv-02605-JFM(Shahi, Kaveh)
October 17, 2012 Filing 3624 NOTICE of Appearance by Kaveh S Shahi on behalf of Kaveh S. Shahi, Leslie S. Shahi Associated Cases: 1:04-md-15863-JFM, 1:04-cv-02605-JFM(Shahi, Kaveh)
October 4, 2012 Filing 3623 NOTICE by Lead Class Plaintiffs Notice of Withdrawal of Chad Johnson (Luse, Jaime)
August 17, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 3622 ORDER Administratively closing the listed cases. Signed by Judge J. Frederick Motz on 8/17/12 Associated Cases: 1:04-md-15861-CCB, 1:04-md-15862-JFM, 1:04-md-15863-JFM, 1:04-md-15864-JFM, et al(cags, Deputy Clerk) Modified on 8/20/2012 (cags, Deputy Clerk).
July 18, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 3621 ORDER that unless counsel show good cause to the contrary within 30 days, the cases listed will be administratively closed. Signed by Judge J. Frederick Motz on 7/18/12 Associated Cases: 1:04-md-15863-JFM et al.(cags, Deputy Clerk)
May 8, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 3620 ORDER Approving Residue Payments. Signed by Judge J. Frederick Motz on 5/7/12 (cags, Deputy Clerk)
April 27, 2012 Filing 3619 MOTION for Entry of Order Approving Residue Payments Pursuant to August 9, 2011 Class Distribution Order by John Abunassar, Peter W. Atwater, Banc One Investment Advisors Corporation, Bank One Corporation, Bank One High Yield Partners, LLC, Bank One Trust Company, N.A., Mark A. Beeson, William P. Boardman, Richard R. Jandrain, III, William G. Jurgenson, David J. Kundert, Gary J. Madich, David R. Meuse, One Group Dealer Services, Inc., One Group Services Company, Kenneth T. Stevens, Richard W. Vague, Richard R. Wade Responses due by 5/14/2012 (Attachments: #1 Bank One Defendants' Memorandum of Law in Support of Motion for Entry of Order Approving Residue Payments Pursuant to August 9, 2011 Class Distribution Order, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit C, #5 Affidavit of Jennifer S. Hilton in Support of Motion to Approve Residue Payments, #6 Text of Proposed Order)(Velazquez, Liza)
April 26, 2012 Filing 3618 Correspondence re: Response to Document No. 3617 (Letter from Mark Molumphy to Mr. and Mrs. Santos) (Molumphy, Mark)
April 9, 2012 Filing 3617 Correspondence from Aida R. Santos re: legitimacy of this case. (cag, Deputy Clerk)
January 6, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 3616 MARGINAL ORDER APPROVING (111 in 1:04-cv-00564-JFM, 3614 in 1:04-md-15863-JFM) Stipulation of Dismissal filed by Putnam Retail Management, L.P., Putnam Fiduciary Trust, Co., Putnam Retail Management GP, Inc., Putnam Investment Management, LLC. Signed by Judge J. Frederick Motz on 1/6/12 Associated Cases: 1:04-md-15863-JFM, 1:04-cv-00564-JFM(cags, Deputy Clerk)
December 28, 2011 Filing 3614 STIPULATION of Dismissal by Putnam Fiduciary Trust, Co., Putnam Investment Management, LLC, Putnam Retail Management GP, Inc., Putnam Retail Management, L.P.. Associated Cases: 1:04-md-15863-JFM, 1:04-cv-00564-JFM(Carroll, James)
December 6, 2011 Filing 3612 Correspondence requesting status report. Associated Cases: 1:04-md-15863-JFM, 1:04-cv-00564-JFM(Motz, J.)
November 15, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 3611 ORDER in case 1:04-md-15863-JFM; granting (3) Motion for entry of final judgment of dismissal in case 1:04-cv-02604-JFM. Signed by Judge J. Frederick Motz on 11/15/11 Associated Cases: 1:04-md-15863-JFM, 1:04-cv-02604-JFM(cags, Deputy Clerk)
October 18, 2011 Filing 3610 Correspondence re: Janus Parent Investor Class Subtrack (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit Exhibit C)Associated Cases: 1:04-md-15863-JFM et al.(Perry, Mark)
September 16, 2011 Filing 3609 Correspondence setting conference call in JFM-04-818 - Wiggins v. Janus. (Motz, J.)
September 6, 2011 Filing 3608 Correspondence from Mamie A. Jones re: settlement. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(jnls, Deputy Clerk)
August 25, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 3607 ORDER of USCA "DENYING" motion for clarification of remand instructions and "REMANDING" to the U.S. District Court for further consideration as therein set forth as to #3594 Notice of Appeal filed by Robert Brockway. (slss, Deputy Clerk)
August 22, 2011 Filing 3606 Correspondence from Brenda Paoli re: settlement. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(jnls, Deputy Clerk)
August 9, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 3605 CLASS DISTRIBUTION ORDER granting #3600 Motion for Entry of Class Distribution Order. Signed by Judge J. Frederick Motz on 8/5/11. (dass, Deputy Clerk)
August 8, 2011 Filing 3604 NOTICE by Kevin R. Parke Notice of Withdrawal of Appearance of David M. Ryan (Ryan, David)
August 5, 2011 Filing 3603 Correspondence from William Metzger re: claim. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(jnls, Deputy Clerk)
July 15, 2011 Filing 3602 Correspondence re: Parent Investor Class Plaintiff's Response to Janus Defendants' 7/15/11 letter to the Court re: U.S. Supreme Court Decision in Janus Capital Group Inc. v. First Derivative Traders (Press, Ira)
July 15, 2011 Filing 3601 Correspondence re: U.S. Supreme Court Decision in Janus Capital Group Inc. v. First Derivative Traders (Perry, Mark)
July 12, 2011 Filing 3600 MOTION for Entry of Class Distribution Order by John Abunassar, Peter W. Atwater, Bank One Corporation, Bank One High Yield Partners, LLC, Bank One Investment Advisors Corporation, Bank One Trust Company, N.A., Mark A. Beeson, William P. Boardman, Richard R. Jandrain, III, William G. Jurgenson, David J. Kundert, Gary J. Madich, David R. Meuse, One Group Dealer Services, Inc., Kenneth T. Stevens, The One Group Services Company, Richard W. Vague, Richard R. Wade Responses due by 7/29/2011 (Attachments: #1 Bank One Defendants' Memorandum of Law in Support of Motion for Entry of Class Distribution Order, #2 Affidavit of Madeline J. Fitzgerald in Support of Motion for Class Distribution Order, #3 Text of Proposed Order)(Velazquez, Liza)
June 23, 2011 Filing 3599 Correspondence from Bernard Victorino re: Objection to settlement. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(jnls, Deputy Clerk)
June 10, 2011 Filing 3598 NOTICE of Change of Address by Thomas James McKenna (McKenna, Thomas)
June 8, 2011 Filing 3597 Settlement Hearing held in open court on 6/8/2011 before Judge J. Frederick Motz. (Court Reporter: C. Asif) (pat, Deputy Clerk)
May 25, 2011 Filing 3596 Transmission of Notice of Appeal and Docket Sheet to US Court of Appeals re #3594 Notice of Appeal. IMPORTANT NOTICE: To access forms which you are required to file with the United States Court of Appeals for the Fourth Circuit please go to http://www.ca4.uscourts.gov and click on Forms & Notices. (nrm, Deputy Clerk)
May 25, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 3595 ORDER granting (3593) Motion for Judgment of dismissal in case 1:04-md-15863-JFM. Signed by Judge J. Frederick Motz on 5/25/11 Associated Cases: 1:04-md-15863-JFM, 1:05-cv-02220-JFM(cag, Deputy Clerk)
May 19, 2011 Filing 3594 NOTICE OF APPEAL as to #3588 Order, by Robert Brockway. Appeal Record due by 6/23/2011. (King, Robert)
April 30, 2011 Filing 3593 Joint MOTION for Judgment by MFS Government Securities Fund, MFS Series Trust I, MFS Series Trust II, MFS Series Trust IV, MFS Series Trust IX, MFS Series Trust V, MFS Series Trust X, Massachusetts Investors Growth Stock Fund, Massachusetts Investors Trust Responses due by 5/19/2011 (Willis, Jane)
April 26, 2011 Filing 3592 Correspondence from Thomas Cox and Kimberly Clifton re: Objection to settlement. (jnls, Deputy Clerk)
April 26, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 3591 ORDER approving Plan of Allocation. Signed by Judge J. Frederick Motz on 4/26/11. Associated Cases: 1:04-md-15863-JFM, 1:04-cv-01924-JFM, 1:04-cv-01933-JFM(jnls, Deputy Clerk)
April 26, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 3590 ORDER awarding fees and expenses to plaintiffs' counsel and the plaintiffs' award in connection with the settlement in the Allianz Dresdner Sub-track. Signed by Judge J. Frederick Motz on 4/26/11. Associated Cases: 1:04-md-15863-JFM, 1:04-cv-01924-JFM, 1:04-cv-01933-JFM(jnls, Deputy Clerk)
April 26, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 3589 FINAL Order and JUDGMENT approving settlements and dismissing action against the settling defendants. Signed by Judge J. Frederick Motz on 4/26/11. Associated Cases: 1:04-md-15863-JFM, 1:04-cv-01924-JFM, 1:04-cv-01933-JFM(jnls, Deputy Clerk)
April 20, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 3588 ORDER Granting (27 in 1:10-cv-01887-JFM) MOTION to administratively close and terminate with prejudice the Kircher action filed by Evergreen Investment Management Company, LLC, Evergreen International Trust. Signed by Judge J. Frederick Motz on 4/20/11 Associated Cases: 1:04-md-15863-JFM, 1:10-cv-01887-JFM(cag, Deputy Clerk)
April 20, 2011 Filing 3587 MEMORANDUM Signed by Judge J. Frederick Motz on 4/20/11. Associated Cases: 1:04-md-15863-JFM, 1:10-cv-01887-JFM(cag, Deputy Clerk)
April 20, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 3586 ORDER in case 1:04-cv-00564-JFM, in case 1:04-md-15863-JFM ; granting (3569) Motion to Stay Proceedings pending a decision of the appeal in the Janus subtrack. Signed by Judge J. Frederick Motz on 4/20/11 Associated Cases: 1:04-md-15863-JFM, 1:04-cv-00564-JFM(cag, Deputy Clerk)
April 20, 2011 Filing 3585 MEMORANDUM Signed by Judge J. Frederick Motz on 4/20/11. Associated Cases: 1:04-md-15863-JFM, 1:04-cv-00564-JFM(cag, Deputy Clerk)
March 29, 2011 Filing 3584 NOTICE by John K. Clement, Gail Craven, Simon Denenberg, Simon J. Denenberg, Robin Resnick, Edward I. Segel, Edward Segel, Iris Segel, Zachary Alan Starr, George Tsetsekos Notice of Withdrawal of Attorney Denise Davis Schwartzman As Counsel for Plaintiffs (Schwartzman, Denise)
March 28, 2011 Filing 3583 Correspondence from Hilda N Perez re: settlement. (jnl, Deputy Clerk)
March 23, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 3582 ORDER directing that Kimberly J. Cliftons Objection to the Proposed Settlement and Objection to Attorneys Fees Request is rejected. Signed by Judge J. Frederick Motz on 3/23/11 (cag, Deputy Clerk)
March 23, 2011 Filing 3581 MEMORANDUM Signed by Judge J. Frederick Motz on 3/23/11. (cag, Deputy Clerk)
March 22, 2011 Filing 3580 Fairness Hearing held on 3/22/2011 before Judge J. Frederick Motz. (Court Reporter: Christine Asif) (kmt, Deputy Clerk)
March 2, 2011 Filing 3579 Stipulation of Dismissal and Approval. Signed by Judge J. Frederick Motz on 3/2/11 Associated Cases: 1:04-md-15863-JFM, 1:06-cv-00433-JFM(cags, Deputy Clerk)
February 22, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 3578 ORDER Granting #3575 Motion by Kimberly J. Clifton to Quash without prejudice to the Investor Class Plaintiffs seeking to depose Clifton at a later time if the evidence they seek to obtain by the deposition becomes material to the litigation. Signed by Judge J. Frederick Motz on 2/22/11 (c/m 2/22/11-cag) (cag, Deputy Clerk)
February 22, 2011 Filing 3577 RESPONSE in Support re #3569 MOTION to Stay Proceedings Pending Decision of Appeal in Janus Subtrack filed by Miranda Zuber. Replies due by 3/11/2011. (Prussin, H)
February 16, 2011 Filing 3576 Response by Kimberly J. Clifton to Plaintiff's Opposition to Motion to Quash Deposition (cags, Deputy Clerk)
February 16, 2011 Filing 3575 Kimberly J. Clifton's Amended Objection to Settlement, Objection to Attorneys' fees request, Notice of Intention to Appear and Request to Speak at the Hearing (cags, Deputy Clerk)
February 14, 2011 Filing 3574 RESPONSE re (74 in 1:04-cv-01933-JFM) Miscellaneous Correspondence, Investor Class Plaintiffs' Opposition to Objector's Motion to Quash Deposition, served February 11, 2011, filed by Combined Welfare Fund. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - February 9, 2011 email, #2 Certificate of Service)Associated Cases: 1:04-md-15863-JFM, 1:04-cv-01933-JFM(Waldman, Chet)
February 14, 2011 Filing 3573 NOTICE of Change of Address by Douglas W Baruch (Baruch, Douglas)
February 10, 2011 Filing 3572 NOTICE to Take Deposition of Kimberly J. Clifton. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Certificate of Service)Associated Cases: 1:04-md-15863-JFM, 1:04-cv-01933-JFM(Waldman, Chet)
February 7, 2011 Filing 3571 RESPONSE in Opposition re (3569 in 1:04-md-15863-JFM) MOTION to Stay Proceedings Pending Decision of Appeal in Janus Subtrack filed by Putnam Fiduciary Trust, Co., Putnam Investment Management LLC, Putnam Retail Management GP, Inc., Putnam Retail Management, L.P., Putnam Fiduciary Trust Co., Putnam Investment Management LLC, Putnam Retail Management Limited Partnership. Replies due by 2/25/2011. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)Associated Cases: 1:04-md-15863-JFM, 1:04-cv-00560-JFM(Carroll, James)
January 31, 2011 Filing 3570 RESPONSE re (3566 in 1:04-md-15863-JFM, 74 in 1:04-cv-01933-JFM) Miscellaneous Correspondence, (3568 in 1:04-md-15863-JFM) Correspondence Investor Class Plaintiffs' Response to the Objection of Kimberly J. Clifton filed by Combined Welfare Fund. (Attachments: #1 Supplemental Declaration of Chet B. Waldman in Response to the Objection of Kimberly J. Clifton, #2 Affidavit of Michael Potter of Rust Consulting, Inc., Submitted in Response to the Objection of Kimberly J. Clifton, #3 Certificate of Service)Associated Cases: 1:04-md-15863-JFM, 1:04-cv-01933-JFM(Waldman, Chet)
January 21, 2011 Filing 3569 MOTION to Stay Proceedings Pending Decision of Appeal in Janus Subtrack by Miranda Zuber Responses due by 2/7/2011 (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support of Motion For Stay of Proceedings Pending Decision of Appeal in Janus Subtrack, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit C, #5 Text of Proposed Order)(Prussin, H)
January 19, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 3567 ORDER granting (324) Motion by the Putnam defendants for Entry of separate and final Judgment under Rule 54(b) in case 1:04-cv-00560-JFM; granting (3563) Motion for Entry of Judgment under Rule 54(b) in case 1:04-md-15863-JFM; granting (24) Motion for Entry of Judgment under Rule 54(b) in case 1:10-cv-01887-JFM. Signed by Judge J. Frederick Motz on 1/19/11 Associated Cases: 1:04-md-15863-JFM, 1:04-cv-00560-JFM, 1:10-cv-01887-JFM(cags, Deputy Clerk)
January 19, 2011 Filing 3566 Correspondence re: Objection to Settlement (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Kimberly J. Clifton's Objection to Proposed Settlement, Objection to Attorneys' Fees Request and Notice of Intention to Appear and Request to Speak at the Hearing (With Redacted Exhibits))Associated Cases: 1:04-md-15863-JFM, 1:04-cv-01924-JFM, 1:04-cv-01933-JFM(Waldman, Chet)
January 18, 2011 Filing 3568 Correspondence from Kimberly J. Clifton re: Amended Objections to settlement. (jnls, Deputy Clerk)
January 14, 2011 Filing 3565 Status Report Submitted as requested by the Court by Miranda Zuber (Prussin, H)
January 13, 2011 Filing 3564 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Putnam Investment Management LLC re (324 in 1:04-cv-00560-JFM, 3563 in 1:04-md-15863-JFM) MOTION for Entry of Judgment under Rule 54(b) (Assented-To) MOTION for Entry of Judgment under Rule 54(b) (Assented-To) Associated Cases: 1:04-md-15863-JFM, 1:04-cv-00560-JFM(Carroll, James)
January 13, 2011 Filing 3563 MOTION for Entry of Judgment under Rule 54(b) (Assented-To) by Putnam Funds Trust, Putnam Investment Management LLC Responses due by 1/31/2011 (Attachments: #1 Memorandum of Law, #2 Exhibit 1, #3 [Proposed] Order)Associated Cases: 1:04-md-15863-JFM, 1:04-cv-00560-JFM(Carroll, James)
January 12, 2011 Filing 3562 NOTICE of Change of Address by Ira Lee Sorkin Associated Cases: 1:04-md-15863-JFM et al.(Sorkin, Ira)
January 3, 2011 Filing 3561 Correspondence from Dan Scannell re: settlement. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(jnl, Deputy Clerk)
December 15, 2010 Filing 3560 Correspondence re: Mutual Fund Settlement from plaintiff Timm (Isbister, John)
December 13, 2010 Filing 3559 Correspondence from Karen Cosgrove re: settlement. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(jnl, Deputy Clerk)
December 9, 2010 Filing 3558 Correspondence from JoAnn L. Lipe re: settlement. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(jnl, Deputy Clerk)
December 1, 2010 Filing 3557 Correspondence from Sarah G. Collins re: settlement. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(jnls, Deputy Clerk)
November 29, 2010 Filing 3556 Correspondence from Vicki L. Carter re: settlement. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(jnl, Deputy Clerk)
November 29, 2010 Filing 3555 Correspondence from Jerome M. Libenson re: settlement. (jnl, Deputy Clerk)
November 19, 2010 Filing 3554 Correspondence from Marianne Muscavage re: settlement. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(jnl, Deputy Clerk)
November 15, 2010 Filing 3553 Correspondence from Robert A. Small re: settlement. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(jnl, Deputy Clerk)
November 15, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 3552 ORDER AND FINAL JUDGMENT. Signed by Judge J. Frederick Motz on 11/15/10 (Attachments: #1 Attachment 1)Associated Cases: 1:04-md-15863-JFM, 1:04-cv-00560-JFM(cag, Deputy Clerk)
November 15, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 3551 ORDER granting (316) Motion for Approval of Revised Expenses in case 1:04-cv-00560-JFM. Signed by Judge J. Frederick Motz on 11/15/10 Associated Cases: 1:04-md-15863-JFM, 1:04-cv-00560-JFM(cag, Deputy Clerk)
November 15, 2010 Filing 3550 MEMORANDUM Signed by Judge J. Frederick Motz on 11/15/10. Associated Cases: 1:04-md-15863-JFM, 1:04-cv-00560-JFM(cag, Deputy Clerk)
November 8, 2010 Filing 3549 Correspondence from Curtis Morton III re: settlement. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(jnl, Deputy Clerk)
November 2, 2010 Filing 3548 NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings held on 10/21/2010, before Judge Judge Blake and Motz. Court Reporter/Transcriber Mary M. Zajac, Telephone number 410-962-4544. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained from the Court Reporter or through PACER... Redaction Request due 11/23/2010. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 12/3/2010. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 1/31/2011. Associated Cases: 1:04-md-15863-JFM et al.(mmz, Court Reporter)
November 2, 2010 Filing 3547 NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings held on 10/21/2010, before Judge Judges Blake and Motz. Court Reporter/Transcriber Mary M. Zajac, Telephone number 410-962-4544. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained from the Court Reporter or through PACER... Redaction Request due 11/23/2010. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 12/3/2010. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 1/31/2011. Associated Cases: 1:04-md-15861-CCB et al.(mmz, Court Reporter)
November 1, 2010 Filing 3546 Correspondence from Anthony J. Manning re: settlement. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(jnl, Deputy Clerk)
October 25, 2010 Filing 3545 Correspondence from Elaine Kowalsky re: settlement. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(jnl, Deputy Clerk)
October 25, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 3543 JUDGMENT on Attorney Fees. ORDER AWARDING attorneys' fees and litigation expenses in the MFS Sub-Track. Signed by Judge J. Frederick Motz on 10/25/2010. (das, Deputy Clerk)
October 25, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 3542 ORDER APPROVING Plan of Allocation in the MFS Sub-Track. Signed by Judge J. Frederick Motz on 10/25/2010. (das, Deputy Clerk)
October 25, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 3541 ORDER and FINAL JUDGMENT with respect to Wishire Associates. Signed by Judge J. Frederick Motz on 10/25/10. (das, Deputy Clerk) (Additional attachment(s) added on 11/3/2010: #1 Exhibits) (cags, Deputy Clerk).
October 25, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 3540 ORDER and FINAL JUDGMENT with respect to Tewksbury. Signed by Judge J. Frederick Motz on 10/25/2010. (das, Deputy Clerk) (Additional attachment(s) added on 11/3/2010: #1 Exhibits) (cags, Deputy Clerk).
October 25, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 3539 ORDER and FINAL JUDGMENT respect to the Security Brokerage Parties. Signed by Judge J. Frederick Motz on 10/25/2010. (das, Deputy Clerk) (Additional attachment(s) added on 11/3/2010: #1 Exhibits) (cags, Deputy Clerk).
October 25, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 3538 ORDER and FINAL JUDGMENT with respect to MFS Funds Defendants. Signed by Judge J. Frederick Motz on 10/25/2010. (das, Deputy Clerk) (Additional attachment(s) added on 11/3/2010: #1 Exhibits) (cags, Deputy Clerk).
October 25, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 3537 ORDER and FINAL JUDGMENT with respect to Canary Defendants. Signed by Judge J. Frederick Motz on 10/25/2010. (das, Deputy Clerk) (Additional attachment(s) added on 11/3/2010: #1 Exhibits) (cags, Deputy Clerk).
October 25, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 3536 ORDER and FINAL JUDGMENT with respect to Bear Sterns Defendants. Signed by Judge J. Frederick Motz on 10/25/2010. (das, Deputy Clerk) (Additional attachment(s) added on 11/3/2010: #1 Exhibits) (cags, Deputy Clerk).
October 25, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 3535 ORDER and FINAL JUDGMENT with respect to Banc of America Securities. Signed by Judge J. Frederick Motz on 10/25/2010. (das, Deputy Clerk) (Additional attachment(s) added on 11/3/2010: #1 Exhibits) (cags, Deputy Clerk).
October 25, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 3534 ORDER and FINAL JUDGMENT with respect to MFS Defendants. Signed by Judge J. Frederick Motz on 10/25/2010. (das, Deputy Clerk) (Additional attachment(s) added on 11/3/2010: #1 Exhibits) (cags, Deputy Clerk).
October 25, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 3533 (FILED IN ERROR- WRONG MASTER CASE) FINAL JUDGMENT and ORDER re: 04-cv-1455, and 04-cv-3353. Signed by Judge Catherine C. Blake on 10/25/10. (das, Deputy Clerk) Modified on 10/27/2010 (das, Deputy Clerk).
October 25, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 3532 JUDGMENT on Attorney Fees. ORDER AWARDING Attorneys' Fees and Expenses in the Alger Sub-Track. Signed by Judge J. Frederick Motz on 10/25/10. (das, Deputy Clerk)
October 25, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 3531 ORDER APPROVING Plan of Allocation of Settlement Proceeds in the Alger Sub-Track. Signed by Judge J. Frederick Motz on 10/25/10. (das, Deputy Clerk)
October 25, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 3530 ORDER and FINAL JUDGMENT with respect to the Canary Defendants. Signed by Judge J. Frederick Motz on 10/25/10. (das, Deputy Clerk) (Additional attachment(s) added on 11/4/2010: #1 Exhibits) (cag, Deputy Clerk).
October 25, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 3529 ORDER and FINAL JUDGMENT with respect to Bear Sterns Defendants. Signed by Judge J. Frederick Motz on 10/25/10. (das, Deputy Clerk) (Additional attachment(s) added on 11/4/2010: #1 Exhibits) (cag, Deputy Clerk).
October 25, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 3528 ORDER and FINAL JUDGMENT with respect to Banc of America Securities LLC. Signed by Judge J. Frederick Motz on 10/25/10. (das, Deputy Clerk) (Additional attachment(s) added on 11/4/2010: #1 Exhibits) (cag, Deputy Clerk).
October 25, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 3527 FINAL JUDGMENT and ORDER re: Alger sub-tracks. Signed by Judge J. Frederick Motz on 10/25/10. Associated Cases: 1:04-md-15863-JFM, 1:04-cv-00861-JFM, 1:04-cv-00876-JFM(das, Deputy Clerk) (Additional attachment(s) added on 11/4/2010: #1 Exhibits) (cag, Deputy Clerk).
October 25, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 3526 JUDGMENT on Attorney Fees. ORDER AWARDING Fees and Expenses to Plaintiffs' counsel in connection with the settlements in the One Group sub-Track. Signed by Judge J. Frederick Motz on 10/25/10. (das, Deputy Clerk)
October 25, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 3525 ORDER APPROVING Plan of Allocation in the One Group Sub-Track. Signed by Judge J. Frederick Motz on 10/25/10. (das, Deputy Clerk)
October 25, 2010 Filing 3524 JUDGMENT APPROVING Settlements and DISMISSING Actions against the Settling Defendants in the One Group Subtrack. Signed by Judge J. Frederick Motz on 10/25/10. (das, Deputy Clerk)(.22)
October 25, 2010 Filing 3523 JUDGMENT on Attorney Fees. Fees and Expenses awarded to Plaintiffs' Counsel in connection with the settlement in the Columbia Sub-Track. Signed by Judge J. Frederick Motz on 10/25/10. (das, Deputy Clerk)(.22)
October 25, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 3522 ORDER APPROVING Plan of Distribution in the Columbia Sub-Track. Signed by Judge J. Frederick Motz on 10/25/10. (das, Deputy Clerk)
October 25, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 3521 ORDER and FINAL JUDGMENT with the Settling Defendants in the Columbia Sub-Track. Signed by Judge J. Frederick Motz on 10/25/10. (das, Deputy Clerk) (Additional attachment(s) added on 11/4/2010: #1 Exhibits) (cag, Deputy Clerk).
October 25, 2010 Filing 3520 JUDGMENT on Attorney Fees. Fees awarded to Plaintiffs as therein set forth. Signed by Judge J. Frederick Motz on 10/25/10. (das, Deputy Clerk)(interest rate.22) Modified on 10/27/2010 (das, Deputy Clerk).
October 25, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 3519 ORDER APPRPOVING Plan of Allocation. Signed by Judge J. Frederick Motz on 10/25/10. (das, Deputy Clerk)
October 25, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 3518 ORDER and FINAL JUDGMENT. Signed by Judge J. Frederick Motz on 10/25/10. (das, Deputy Clerk) (Additional attachment(s) added on 11/5/2010: #1 Exhibits) (cags, Deputy Clerk).
October 25, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 3517 FINAL JUDGMENT and ORDER OF DISMISSAL. Signed by Judge J. Frederick Motz on 10/25/10. Associated Cases: 1:04-md-15863-JFM, 1:04-cv-03798-JFM(das, Deputy Clerk)
October 22, 2010 Filing 3544 Correspondence from Donald J. Jacobson re: settlement. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(jnl, Deputy Clerk)
October 22, 2010 Filing 3516 Supplemental to Plaintiffs' Motions for (a) Final Approval of Settlements (b) Final Approval of Plan of Allocation and (c) Application for Award of Attorneys' Fees and Reimbursement of Litigation Expenses.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Approving Plan of Allocation, #2 Text of Proposed Order Granting Plaintiffs' Lead and Liason Counsel's Motin for an Award of Attorneys' Fees and Reimbursement of Expenses)(Molumphy, Mark)
October 22, 2010 Filing 3515 Supplemental to (198 in 1:04-cv-03798-JFM, 3492 in 1:04-md-15863-JFM) Response in Support of Motion, filed by Anthony Cacciola Text of Proposed Order of Final Judgment and Order of Dismissal. (Lahm, James)
October 22, 2010 Filing 3514 Supplemental to #3488 Reply to Response to Motion,,,, filed by A Plaintiff Text of Proposed Judgment Approving Settlements and Dismissing Actions Against the Settling Defendants (One Group Sub-Track). (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Approving Plan of Allocation, #2 Text of Proposed Order Awarding Fees and Expenses)(Goodstein, Clifford)
October 22, 2010 Filing 3513 Supplemental to #3494 Reply to Response to Motion,,,, filed by A Plaintiff Text of Proposed Order and Final Judgment (Columbia Sub-Track). (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Approving Plan of Distribution, #2 Text of Proposed Order Awarding Fees and Expenses)(Goodstein, Clifford)
October 22, 2010 Filing 3512 NOTICE by A Plaintiff Proposed Final Judgment and Order (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Order and Final Judgment With Respect to Banc of America Securities LLC, #2 Text of Proposed Order Order and Final Judgment With Respect to Bear Stearns Defendants, #3 Text of Proposed Order Order and Final Judgment With Respect to the Canary Defendants, #4 Text of Proposed Order Order Approving Plan of Allocation to Settlement Proceeds in the Alger Sub-Track, #5 Text of Proposed Order Order Awarding Attorneys' Fees and Expenses in the Alger Sub-Track)(Newcomer, Michelle)
October 22, 2010 Filing 3511 Supplemental to Plaintiffs' Motions for (a) Final Approval of Settlements (b) Final Approval of Plan of Allocation and (c) Application for Award of Attorneys' Fees and Reimbursement of Litigation Expenses. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order MFS Defendants, #2 Text of Proposed Order BAS Defendants, #3 Text of Proposed Order Bear Stearns Defendants, #4 Text of Proposed Order Canary Defendants, #5 Text of Proposed Order MFS Funds Defendants, #6 Text of Proposed Order Security Brokerage Defendants, #7 Text of Proposed Order Defendant Tewksbury, #8 Text of Proposed Order Defendant Wilshire Associates, #9 Text of Proposed Order Plan of Allocation, #10 Text of Proposed Order Attorneys' Fees & Litigation Expenses)Associated Cases: 1:04-md-15863-JFM, 1:04-cv-01162-JFM(Bien Willner, Jerald)
October 20, 2010 Filing 3510 Correspondence from Brenda Kerzner re: settlement. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(jnls, Deputy Clerk)
October 20, 2010 Filing 3508 Correspondence re: Teleconference Instructions (Isbister, John)
October 20, 2010 Filing 3507 Supplemental to Declaration of Chet Waldman in Support of Final Approval of Class Action and Plan of Allocation, Class Certification, and Award of Attorneys' Fees, Plaintiffs' Award, and Reimbursement of Expenses. Associated Cases: 1:04-md-15863-JFM, 1:04-cv-01924-JFM, 1:04-cv-01933-JFM(Waldman, Chet)
October 19, 2010 Filing 3506 NOTICE of Appearance by Robert P Fletcher on behalf of John E. Cashwell, Jr (Fletcher, Robert)
October 18, 2010 Filing 3509 Correspondence from Bill Bylsma re: settlement. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(jnl, Deputy Clerk)
October 18, 2010 Filing 3505 NOTICE by City of Chicago Deferred Compensation Plan Notice of Filing of Correspondence (relates to Docket No. 3500) Associated Cases: 1:04-md-15863-JFM, 1:04-cv-01162-JFM(Bien Willner, Jerald)
October 18, 2010 Filing 3504 Correspondence re: proposed Supplemental Order regarding mailings per Court conference of October 12, 2010 (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Supplement to Amended Order Preliminarily Approving Settlements of Class Action and Establishing Notice Procedures dated May 19, 2010)Associated Cases: 1:04-md-15863-JFM, 1:04-cv-01924-JFM, 1:04-cv-01933-JFM(Waldman, Chet)
October 15, 2010 Scheduling Conference held on 10/15/2010 before Judge J. Frederick Motz. (mdw, Deputy Clerk)
October 15, 2010 Filing 3503 Correspondence from Walter and Judy Scott re: settlement. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)Associated Cases: 1:04-md-15861-CCB, 1:04-md-15862-JFM, 1:04-md-15863-JFM, 1:04-md-15864-JFM(jnl, Deputy Clerk)
October 14, 2010 Filing 3497 Supplemental to #3446 MOTION for Settlement (Plaintiffs' Motion for Final Approval of Settlements, Approval of Plan of Allocation, and Certification of Settlement Class) MOTION for Settlement (Plaintiffs' Motion for Final Approval of Settlements, Approval of Plan of Allocation, and Certification of Settlement Class) filed by Maloon Powers Pitre & Higgins, LLC Amended [Proposed] Order and Final Judgment. (Molumphy, Mark)
October 13, 2010 Filing 3496 Supplemental to ECF Docket No. 3491. Associated Cases: 1:04-md-15863-JFM, 1:04-cv-01162-JFM(Bien Willner, Jerald)
October 12, 2010 Scheduling Conference held on 10/12/2010 before Judge J. Frederick Motz. (mdw, Deputy Clerk)
October 12, 2010 Filing 3502 Correspondence from Melissa R. Espinoza re: settlement. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(jnl, Deputy Clerk)
October 12, 2010 Filing 3501 Correspondence from Jason G. Espinoza re: settlement. (jnl, Deputy Clerk)
October 12, 2010 Filing 3500 MOTION for discovery on the merits by Jean W. Anthony (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(jnl, Deputy Clerk)
October 12, 2010 Filing 3499 Correspondence from Laraway Financial Advisors re: settlement. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(jnl, Deputy Clerk)
October 12, 2010 Filing 3498 Correspondence from Hutchinson Black and Cook on behalf of Thelma F. Shew re: settlement. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(jnl, Deputy Clerk)
October 8, 2010 Filing 3495 Supplemental to (198 in 1:04-cv-03798-JFM) Response in Support of Motion, filed by Anthony Cacciola [Corrected Amended Proposed] Final Judgment and Order of Dismissal. (Lahm, James)
October 7, 2010 Filing 3494 REPLY to Response to Motion re #3452 MOTION for Settlement PLAINTIFFS MOTION FOR FINAL APPROVAL OF SETTLEMENTS, APPROVAL OF PLAN OF ALLOCATION, CERTIFICATION OF SETTLEMENT CLASS, AND AWARD OF ATTORNEYS FEES AND REIMBURSEMENT OF EXPENSES (Columbia Sub-track) MOTION for Settlement PLAINTIFFS MOTION FOR FINAL APPROVAL OF SETTLEMENTS, APPROVAL OF PLAN OF ALLOCATION, CERTIFICATION OF SETTLEMENT CLASS, AND AWARD OF ATTORNEYS FEES AND REIMBURSEMENT OF EXPENSES (Columbia Sub-track) MOTION for Settlement PLAINTIFFS MOTION FOR FINAL APPROVAL OF SETTLEMENTS, APPROVAL OF PLAN OF ALLOCATION, CERTIFICATION OF SETTLEMENT CLASS, AND AWARD OF ATTORNEYS FEES AND REIMBURSEMENT OF EXPENSES (Columbia Sub-track) MOTION for Settlement PLAINTIFFS MOTION FOR FINAL APPROVAL OF SETTLEMENTS, APPROVAL OF PLAN OF ALLOCATION, CERTIFICATION OF SETTLEMENT CLASS, AND AWARD OF ATTORNEYS FEES AND REIMBURSEMENT OF EXPENSES (Columbia Sub-track) filed by A Plaintiff. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G, #8 Exhibit H, #9 Exhibit I, #10 Certificate of Service)(Goodstein, Clifford)
October 6, 2010 Filing 3493 Correspondence from Moses Briscoe re: settlement. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(jnl, Deputy Clerk)
October 6, 2010 Filing 3492 RESPONSE in Support re (195 in 1:04-cv-03798-JFM) MOTION for Settlement , Final Approval of Settlements and Approval of Plan of Allocation, Certification of Settlement Class, and Approval of Attorneys Fees and Expenses and Plaintiffs Expenses and Costs filed by Anthony Cacciola. Replies due by 10/25/2010. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6, #7 Exhibit 7)(Lahm, James)
October 6, 2010 Filing 3491 Supplemental to ECF Docket Nos. 3455 (Plaintiffs' Motion for Final Approval of the Settlements and Plan of Allocation in the MFS Sub-Track), 3456 (Plaintiffs Counsels Motion for an Award of Attorneys' Fees and Reimbursement of Litigation Expenses in the MFS Sub-Track). (Attachments: #1 Supplemental Declaration, #2 Exhibit 1, #3 Exhibit 2, #4 Exhibit 3, #5 Exhibit 4, #6 Appendix, #7 Exhibit 1 to Appendix, #8 Exhibit 2 to Appendix, #9 Exhibit 3 to Appendix, #10 Exhibit 4 to Appendix, #11 Exhibit 5 to Appendix, #12 Exhibit 6 to Appendix, #13 Exhibit 7 to Appendix, #14 Exhibit 8 to Appendix, #15 Exhibit 9 to Appendix, #16 Exhibit 10 to Appendix)Associated Cases: 1:04-md-15863-JFM, 1:04-cv-01162-JFM(Johnson, C)
October 6, 2010 Filing 3490 Supplemental to Plaintiffs' Motion for Final Approval of Proposed Settlements in the Alger Sub-Track and Motion for an Award of Attorneys' Fees and Expenses to Plaintiffs' Counsel. (Attachments: #1 Appendix, #2 Exhibit 1, #3 Exhibit 2, #4 Exhibit 3, #5 Exhibit 4, #6 Exhibit 5, #7 Exhibit 6, #8 Exhibit 7, #9 Exhibit 8, #10 Exhibit 9, #11 Exhibit 10)(Luse, Jaime)
October 6, 2010 Filing 3489 RESPONSE re #3447 MOTION for Attorney Fees of Cotchett, Pitre & McCarthy and Chimicles & Tikellis LLP for An Award of Attorneys Fees and Reimbursement of Expenses, #3448 Notice (Other), Notice (Other), Notice (Other), Notice (Other), Notice (Other), Notice (Other), Notice (Other), #3446 MOTION for Settlement (Plaintiffs' Motion for Final Approval of Settlements, Approval of Plan of Allocation, and Certification of Settlement Class) MOTION for Settlement (Plaintiffs' Motion for Final Approval of Settlements, Approval of Plan of Allocation, and Certification of Settlement Class), REPLY to Response to Motion filed by Maloon Powers Pitre & Higgins, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Supplemental Appendix, #2 Ex. 15 Waugh Declaration, #3 Ex. 16 Walfish Objection, #4 Ex. 17 Bylsma Objection, #5 Ex. 18 Perlstein Objection, #6 Ex. 19 Hughes Objection, #7 Ex. 20 Bechtold Objection, #8 Proposed Order, #9 Certificate of Service)(Molumphy, Mark)
October 6, 2010 Filing 3488 REPLY to Response to Motion re #3449 MOTION for Settlement PLAINTIFFS MOTION FOR FINAL APPROVAL OF SETTLEMENTS, APPROVAL OF PLAN OF ALLOCATION, CERTIFICATION OF SETTLEMENT CLASSES, AND AWARD OF ATTORNEYS FEES AND REIMBURSEMENT OF EXPENSES (One Group Track) MOTION for Settlement PLAINTIFFS MOTION FOR FINAL APPROVAL OF SETTLEMENTS, APPROVAL OF PLAN OF ALLOCATION, CERTIFICATION OF SETTLEMENT CLASSES, AND AWARD OF ATTORNEYS FEES AND REIMBURSEMENT OF EXPENSES (One Group Track) MOTION for Settlement PLAINTIFFS MOTION FOR FINAL APPROVAL OF SETTLEMENTS, APPROVAL OF PLAN OF ALLOCATION, CERTIFICATION OF SETTLEMENT CLASSES, AND AWARD OF ATTORNEYS FEES AND REIMBURSEMENT OF EXPENSES (One Group Track) MOTION for Settlement PLAINTIFFS MOTION FOR FINAL APPROVAL OF SETTLEMENTS, APPROVAL OF PLAN OF ALLOCATION, CERTIFICATION OF SETTLEMENT CLASSES, AND AWARD OF ATTORNEYS FEES AND REIMBURSEMENT OF EXPENSES (One Group Track) filed by A Plaintiff. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G, #8 Exhibit H, #9 Exhibit I, #10 Certificate of Service)(Goodstein, Clifford)
October 6, 2010 Filing 3487 (FILED IN ERROR) REPLY to Response to Motion re #3452 MOTION for Settlement PLAINTIFFS MOTION FOR FINAL APPROVAL OF SETTLEMENTS, APPROVAL OF PLAN OF ALLOCATION, CERTIFICATION OF SETTLEMENT CLASS, AND AWARD OF ATTORNEYS FEES AND REIMBURSEMENT OF EXPENSES (Columbia Sub-track) MOTION for Settlement PLAINTIFFS MOTION FOR FINAL APPROVAL OF SETTLEMENTS, APPROVAL OF PLAN OF ALLOCATION, CERTIFICATION OF SETTLEMENT CLASS, AND AWARD OF ATTORNEYS FEES AND REIMBURSEMENT OF EXPENSES (Columbia Sub-track) MOTION for Settlement PLAINTIFFS MOTION FOR FINAL APPROVAL OF SETTLEMENTS, APPROVAL OF PLAN OF ALLOCATION, CERTIFICATION OF SETTLEMENT CLASS, AND AWARD OF ATTORNEYS FEES AND REIMBURSEMENT OF EXPENSES (Columbia Sub-track) MOTION for Settlement PLAINTIFFS MOTION FOR FINAL APPROVAL OF SETTLEMENTS, APPROVAL OF PLAN OF ALLOCATION, CERTIFICATION OF SETTLEMENT CLASS, AND AWARD OF ATTORNEYS FEES AND REIMBURSEMENT OF EXPENSES (Columbia Sub-track) filed by A Plaintiff. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G, #8 Exhibit H, #9 Exhibit I, #10 Certificate of Service)(Goodstein, Clifford) Modified on 10/7/2010 (jnls, Deputy Clerk).
October 6, 2010 Filing 3486 RESPONSE re (54 in 1:04-cv-01924-JFM) Notice (Other), (52 in 1:04-cv-01924-JFM) Joint MOTION for Settlement and Attorneys' Fees and Expenses Final Approval : Response to the Objection of Martin Sir (Since Withdrawn) and the Letters of Theodore A. Bechtold, Esq. filed by Combined Welfare Fund. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Sept. 20, 2010 letter from T. Bechtold, #2 Affidavit Certificate of Service)Associated Cases: 1:04-md-15863-JFM, 1:04-cv-01924-JFM, 1:04-cv-01933-JFM(Waldman, Chet)
October 4, 2010 Filing 3485 Correspondence from Cynthia K. Bell re: settlement. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(jnl, Deputy Clerk)
October 4, 2010 Filing 3484 Correspondence from C. Michael Celenza re: Incorrect address. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(jnls, Deputy Clerk)
October 4, 2010 Filing 3483 Correspondence from Sharon Sullivan re: Settlement. (jnls, Deputy Clerk)
October 4, 2010 Filing 3482 NOTICE by Combined Welfare Fund re (3472 in 1:04-md-15863-JFM) Correspondence Withdrawal of Objections of Martin Sir, Custodian for Minors Associated Cases: 1:04-md-15863-JFM, 1:04-cv-01924-JFM, 1:04-cv-01933-JFM(Waldman, Chet)
October 1, 2010 Filing 3481 Correspondence from Darwin Perry Heilman re: Objection to settlement. (Attachments: #1 Envelope, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit C, #5 Exhibit D, #6 Exhibit E, #7 Exhibit F, #8 Exhibit G, #9 Exhibit H, #10 Exhibit I, #11 Exhibit J, #12 Exhibit K, #13 Exhibit L, #14 Exhibit M, #15 Exhibit N)(jnl, Deputy Clerk)
September 29, 2010 Filing 3480 Correspondence re: Settlement - From Louise Byrnes (Luse, Jaime)
September 29, 2010 Filing 3479 Correspondence re: Settlement - From Ronald Holmes (Luse, Jaime)
September 24, 2010 Filing 3478 NOTICE by Combined Welfare Fund of Deposition of Objector Martin Sir Associated Cases: 1:04-md-15863-JFM, 1:04-cv-01924-JFM, 1:04-cv-01933-JFM(Waldman, Chet)
September 24, 2010 Filing 3477 Correspondence from Suresh C. Shreni re: Notice of intention to appear. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(jnl, Deputy Clerk)
September 24, 2010 Filing 3476 Correspondence from Karen Cosgrove re: settlement. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(jnl, Deputy Clerk)
September 23, 2010 Filing 3475 Correspondence from Emile Johnson re: settlement. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(jnl, Deputy Clerk)
September 23, 2010 Filing 3474 Correspondence from S. Broughton Lucks re: settlement. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(jnl, Deputy Clerk)
September 21, 2010 Filing 3472 Correspondence from Martin Sir, custodian of minors through counsel N. Albert Bacharach, Jr., Paul Rothstein re: Objection to Settlement. (cag, Deputy Clerk)
September 20, 2010 Filing 3471 Correspondence from Carol J. Wass re: settlement. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(jnl, Deputy Clerk)
September 20, 2010 Filing 3469 Correspondence from Sharon H. Scott re: settlement. (Attachments: #1 Attachment)(jnl, Deputy Clerk)
September 20, 2010 Filing 3468 Correspondence from Carolyn Dominick re: settlement. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(jnl, Deputy Clerk)
September 20, 2010 Filing 3467 Correspondence from Paul B. Syftestad re: Objection to Settlement. (cag, Deputy Clerk)
September 20, 2010 Filing 3461 NOTICE by A Plaintiff re #3452 MOTION for Settlement PLAINTIFFS MOTION FOR FINAL APPROVAL OF SETTLEMENTS, APPROVAL OF PLAN OF ALLOCATION, CERTIFICATION OF SETTLEMENT CLASS, AND AWARD OF ATTORNEYS FEES AND REIMBURSEMENT OF EXPENSES (Columbia Sub-track) MOTION for Settlement PLAINTIFFS MOTION FOR FINAL APPROVAL OF SETTLEMENTS, APPROVAL OF PLAN OF ALLOCATION, CERTIFICATION OF SETTLEMENT CLASS, AND AWARD OF ATTORNEYS FEES AND REIMBURSEMENT OF EXPENSES (Columbia Sub-track) MOTION for Settlement PLAINTIFFS MOTION FOR FINAL APPROVAL OF SETTLEMENTS, APPROVAL OF PLAN OF ALLOCATION, CERTIFICATION OF SETTLEMENT CLASS, AND AWARD OF ATTORNEYS FEES AND REIMBURSEMENT OF EXPENSES (Columbia Sub-track) MOTION for Settlement PLAINTIFFS MOTION FOR FINAL APPROVAL OF SETTLEMENTS, APPROVAL OF PLAN OF ALLOCATION, CERTIFICATION OF SETTLEMENT CLASS, AND AWARD OF ATTORNEYS FEES AND REIMBURSEMENT OF EXPENSES (Columbia Sub-track) Exhibit 5 - Affidavit of Mark C. Rifkin (Exhibit inadvertently omitted from original filing) (Goodstein, Clifford)
September 17, 2010 Filing 3470 Correspondence from Joseph A. Waller re: settlement. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(jnl, Deputy Clerk)
September 17, 2010 Filing 3466 Correspondence from Kathryn A Skemp re: Objection to Settlement. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(cag, Deputy Clerk) (Additional attachment(s) added on 9/23/2010: #2 Envelope) (cag, Deputy Clerk).
September 16, 2010 Filing 3465 Correspondence from Violet Bollinger re: settlement. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(jnl, Deputy Clerk)
September 15, 2010 Filing 3473 Correspondence from Virginia Rush re: settlement. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(jnl, Deputy Clerk)
September 15, 2010 Filing 3464 Correspondence from Jamie Joan Sutter re: settlement. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(jnl, Deputy Clerk)
September 15, 2010 Filing 3463 Correspondence from Cameron J. Etezady re: Objection to settlement. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(jnl, Deputy Clerk)
September 15, 2010 Filing 3462 Correspondence from Mark Walfish re: settlement. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(jnl, Deputy Clerk)
September 15, 2010 Filing 3460 AFFIDAVIT re (195 in 1:04-cv-03798-JFM) MOTION for Settlement , Final Approval of Settlements and Approval of Plan of Allocation, Certification of Settlement Class, and Approval of Attorneys Fees and Expenses and Plaintiffs Expenses and Costs by The Krouse Group. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 4-2, #6 Exhibit 5, #7 Exhibit 6, #8 Exhibit 7, #9 Exhibit 8, #10 Exhibit 9, #11 Exhibit 10, #12 Exhibit 11, #13 Exhibit 12)(Lahm, James)
September 15, 2010 Filing 3459 Memorandum re (195 in 1:04-cv-03798-JFM) MOTION for Settlement , Final Approval of Settlements and Approval of Plan of Allocation, Certification of Settlement Class, and Approval of Attorneys Fees and Expenses and Plaintiffs Expenses and Costs filed by The Krouse Group. (Lahm, James)
September 15, 2010 Filing 3458 MOTION for Settlement , Final Approval of Settlements and Approval of Plan of Allocation, Certification of Settlement Class, and Approval of Attorneys Fees and Expenses and Plaintiffs Expenses and Costs by Krouse Group Responses due by 10/4/2010 (Lahm, James)
September 14, 2010 Filing 3457 Joint MOTION for Settlement and Attorneys' Fees and Expenses Final Approval by Combined Welfare Fund Responses due by 10/1/2010 (Attachments: #1 Plaintiffs' Memorandum of Law in Support of Final Approval of Proposed Settlements, Plan of Allocation, Class Certification, Award of Attorneys' Fees, Lead Plaintiff Award, and Reimbursement of Expenses, #2 Declaration of Chet B. Waldman in Support of Plaintiffs' Motion for Final Approval of Proposed Settlements, Plan of Allocation, Class Certification, Award of Attorneys' Fees, Lead Plaintiff Award, and Reimbursement of Expenses)Associated Cases: 1:04-md-15863-JFM, 1:04-cv-01924-JFM, 1:04-cv-01933-JFM(Waldman, Chet)
September 14, 2010 Filing 3456 Joint MOTION for Attorney Fees PLAINTIFFS COUNSELS MOTION FOR ATTORNEYS FEES AND REIMBURSEMENT OF LITIGATION EXPENSES IN THE MFS SUB-TRACK by City of Chicago Deferred Compensation Plan Responses due by 10/1/2010 (Attachments: #1 PLAINTIFFS COUNSELS MEMORANDUM OF LAW IN SUPPORT OF MOTION FOR ATTORNEYS FEES AND REIMBURSEMENT OF LITIGATION EXPENSES IN THE MFS SUB-TRACK, #2 DECLARATION OF CHAD JOHNSON, WILLIAM C. FREDERICKS AND JERALD BIEN-WILLNER IN SUPPORT OF FINAL APPROVAL OF PROPOSEDSETTLEMENTS, PLAN OF ALLOCATION OF SETTLEMENT PROCEEDS, AND APPLICATION FOR ATTORNEYS FEES AND REIMBURSEMENT OF LITIGATION EXPENSES IN THE MFS SUB-TRACK, #3 Exhibit 1 to BLB&G Declaration, #4 Exhibit 2 to BLB&G Declaration, #5 Exhibit 3 to BLB&G Declaration, #6 Exhibit 4-A to BLB&G Declaration, #7 Exhibit 4-B to BLB&G Declaration, #8 Exhibit 4-C to BLB&G Declaration, #9 Exhibit 5 to BLB&G Declaration, #10 Affidavit of Derivative Lead Counsel (filed as a courtesy for Derivative Counsel), #11 Affidavit of ERISA Lead Counsel (filed as a courtesy for ERISA Counsel))Associated Cases: 1:04-md-15863-JFM, 1:04-cv-01162-JFM(Johnson, C)
September 14, 2010 Filing 3455 Joint MOTION for Settlement PLAINTIFFS MOTION FOR FINAL APPROVAL OF THE SETTLEMENTS AND PLAN OF ALLOCATION IN THE MFS SUB-TRACK by City of Chicago Deferred Compensation Plan Responses due by 10/1/2010 (Attachments: #1 PLAINTIFFS MEMORANDUM OF LAW IN SUPPORT OF FINAL APPROVAL OF THE SETTLEMENTS AND PLAN OF ALLOCATION IN THE MFS SUB-TRACK, #2 DECLARATION OF CHAD JOHNSON, WILLIAM C. FREDERICKS AND JERALD BIEN-WILLNER IN SUPPORT OF FINAL APPROVAL OF PROPOSED SETTLEMENTS, PLAN OF ALLOCATION OF SETTLEMENT PROCEEDS, ANDAPPLICATION FOR ATTORNEYS FEES AND REIMBURSEMENT OF LITIGATION EXPENSES IN THE MFS SUB-TRACK, #3 1 to BLB&G Declaration, #4 2 to BLB&G Declaration, #5 3 to BLB&G Declaration, #6 4-A to BLB&G Declaration, #7 4-B to BLB&G Declaration, #8 4-C to BLB&G Declaration, #9 5 to BLB&G Declaration, #10 Affidavit of Derivative Lead Counsel (filed as a courtesy for Derivative Lead Counsel), #11 Affidavit of ERISA Lead Counsel (filed as a courtesy for ERISA Lead Counsel))Associated Cases: 1:04-md-15863-JFM, 1:04-cv-01162-JFM(Johnson, C)
September 14, 2010 Filing 3454 MOTION for Attorney Fees (PLAINTIFFS OMNIBUS MEMORANDUM OF LAW IN SUPPORT OF APPLICATIONS FOR ATTORNEYS FEES AND REIMBURSEMENT OF EXPENSES) by A Plaintiff Responses due by 10/1/2010 (Luse, Jaime)
September 14, 2010 Filing 3453 MOTION for Settlement (PLAINTIFFS OMNIBUS MEMORANDUM OF LAW IN SUPPORT OF FINAL APPROVAL OF THE PROPOSED SETTLEMENTS AND PLANS OF ALLOCATION) by A Plaintiff Responses due by 10/1/2010 (Luse, Jaime)
September 14, 2010 Filing 3452 MOTION for Settlement PLAINTIFFS MOTION FOR FINAL APPROVAL OF SETTLEMENTS, APPROVAL OF PLAN OF ALLOCATION, CERTIFICATION OF SETTLEMENT CLASS, AND AWARD OF ATTORNEYS FEES AND REIMBURSEMENT OF EXPENSES (Columbia Sub-track) by A Plaintiff Responses due by 10/1/2010 (Attachments: #1 Memorandum of Law, #2 Declaration of Clifford S. Goodstein, #3 Exhibit 1 - Affidavit of Elizabeth K. Nelson, #4 Exhibit 2 - Declaration of Stephen J. Cirami, #5 Exhibit 3 - Affidavit of Clifford S. Goodstein, #6 Exhibit 4 - Affidavit of Charles J. Piven, #7 Exhibit 6 - Affidavit of Nicholas E. Chimicles, #8 Exhibit 7 - Affidavit of Nadeem Faruqi, #9 Exhibit 8 - Affidavit of Robert D. Hillman, #10 Exhibit 9 - Affidavit of Martin D. Chitwood)(Goodstein, Clifford)
September 14, 2010 Filing 3451 MOTION for Attorney Fees (MOTION FOR AN AWARD OF ATTORNEYS' FEES AND EXPENSES TO PLAINTIFFS' COUNSEL IN ALGER SUB-TRACK) by A Plaintiff Responses due by 10/1/2010 (Attachments: #1 Memorandum of Law, #2 Declaration, #3 Appendix, #4 Exhibit 1, #5 Exhibit 2, #6 Exhibit 3, #7 Exhibit 4, #8 Exhibit 5, #9 Exhibit 6, #10 Exhibit 7, #11 Exhibit 8, #12 Exhibit 9, #13 Exhibit 10, #14 Exhibit 11, #15 Exhibit 12)(Luse, Jaime)
September 14, 2010 Filing 3450 MOTION for Settlement (PLAINTIFFS' MOTION FOR FINAL APPROVAL OF PROPOSED SETTLEMENTS IN THE ALGER SUB-TRACK by A Plaintiff Responses due by 10/1/2010 (Attachments: #1 Memorandum of Law, #2 Declaration, #3 Appendix, #4 Exhibit 1, #5 Exhibit 2, #6 Exhibit 3, #7 Exhibit 4, #8 Exhibit 5, #9 Exhibit 6, #10 Exhibit 7, #11 Exhibit 8, #12 Exhibit 9, #13 Exhibit 10, #14 Exhibit 11, #15 Exhibit 12)(Luse, Jaime)
September 14, 2010 Filing 3449 MOTION for Settlement PLAINTIFFS MOTION FOR FINAL APPROVAL OF SETTLEMENTS, APPROVAL OF PLAN OF ALLOCATION, CERTIFICATION OF SETTLEMENT CLASSES, AND AWARD OF ATTORNEYS FEES AND REIMBURSEMENT OF EXPENSES (One Group Track) by Linda B Parker Responses due by 10/1/2010 (Attachments: #1 Memorandum of Law, #2 Declaration of Nicholas E. Chimicles, #3 Affidavit of Nicholas E. Chimicles, #4 Declaration of Clifford S. Goodstein, #5 Exhibit 1 - Affidavit of Madeline J. Fitzgerald, #6 Exhibit 2 - Declaration of Stephen J. Cirami, #7 Exhibit 3 - Affidavit of of Clifford S. Goodstein, #8 Exhibit 4 - Affidavit of Michael K. Yarnoff, #9 Exhibit 5 - Affidavit of Charles J. Piven, #10 Exhibit 6 - Affidavit of Samuel K. Rosen)(Goodstein, Clifford)
September 14, 2010 Filing 3448 NOTICE by Maloon Powers Pitre & Higgins, LLC re #3447 MOTION for Attorney Fees of Cotchett, Pitre & McCarthy and Chimicles & Tikellis LLP for An Award of Attorneys Fees and Reimbursement of Expenses, #3446 MOTION for Settlement (Plaintiffs' Motion for Final Approval of Settlements, Approval of Plan of Allocation, and Certification of Settlement Class) MOTION for Settlement (Plaintiffs' Motion for Final Approval of Settlements, Approval of Plan of Allocation, and Certification of Settlement Class) PLAINTIFFS' APPENDIX OF EXHIBITS (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1- [Proposed] Order and Final Judgment, #2 Exhibit 2-Stipulation and Agreement of Settlement (Janus Defendants), #3 Exhibit 3-Janus/Canary Severed Agreement and Stipulation of Settlement, #4 Exhibit 4- Master Agreement of Settlement with Canary Defendants, #5 Exhibit 5- Janus/Bear Stearns Severed Agreement and Stipulation of Settlement, #6 Exhibit 6- Master Agreement of Settlement with Bear Stearns Defendants, #7 Exhibit 7- Stipulation and Agreement of Settlement with Round Hill Defendants, #8 Exhibit 8-Rydex Distributors, Inc., Agreement and Stipulation of Settlement, #9 Exhibit 9- Janus/BAS Severed Agreement and Stipulation of Settlement, #10 Exhibit 10- Master Agreement of Settlement with Bank of America, #11 Exhibit 11-Declaration of Mark C. Molumphy, #12 Exhibit 12-Declaration of Mark A. Pitre, #13 Exhibit 13-Declaration of Aaron Waugh, #14 Exhibit 14- Declaration of Stephen J. Cirami)(Molumphy, Mark)
September 14, 2010 Filing 3447 MOTION for Attorney Fees of Cotchett, Pitre & McCarthy and Chimicles & Tikellis LLP for An Award of Attorneys Fees and Reimbursement of Expenses by Maloon Powers Pitre & Higgins, LLC Responses due by 10/1/2010 (Attachments: #1 Memorandum of Law in Support of Plaintiffs' Lead Counsel's Motion)(Molumphy, Mark)
September 14, 2010 Filing 3446 MOTION for Settlement (Plaintiffs' Motion for Final Approval of Settlements, Approval of Plan of Allocation, and Certification of Settlement Class) by Maloon Powers Pitre & Higgins, LLC Responses due by 10/1/2010 (Attachments: #1 Memorandum of Law In Support of Plaintiffs' Motion, #2 [Proposed] Order Approving Plan of Allocation)(Molumphy, Mark)
September 14, 2010 Filing 3445 MOTION for Attorney Fees of Tydings & Rosenberg LLP for Attorneys' Fees and Costs Incurred as Plaintiffs' Liaison and Chief Administrative Counsel by A Plaintiff Responses due by 10/1/2010 (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support, #2 Exhibit A - Affidavit of John B. Isbister (including Affidavit Exhibits 1, 2, 3), #3 Exhibit B - Summary of Settlements)(Isbister, John)
September 14, 2010 Filing 3444 Correspondence re: Settlement (from Thomas G. Lyman) (Luse, Jaime)
September 13, 2010 Filing 3443 Correspondence by David Brewer re: Settlement (Attachments: #1 mailing envelope)(das, Deputy Clerk)
September 13, 2010 Filing 3442 Correspondence by Earline Cooper re: Settlement (Attachments: #1 mailing envelope)(das, Deputy Clerk)
September 13, 2010 Filing 3441 Correspondence by Ranjai and Kiran Singh re: Settlement (Attachments: #1 mailing envelope)(das, Deputy Clerk)
September 13, 2010 Filing 3440 Correspondence by James Simonds re: Settlement (Attachments: #1 mailing envelope)(das, Deputy Clerk)
September 13, 2010 Filing 3439 Correspondence by Donald R. Lomax re: Settlement (Attachments: #1 mailing envelope)(das, Deputy Clerk)
September 10, 2010 Filing 3438 Correspondence from Charles and Carolyn Wickwire re: settlement. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(jnl, Deputy Clerk)
September 10, 2010 Filing 3437 Correspondence from Norbert Drifka re: settlement. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(jnl, Deputy Clerk)
September 9, 2010 Filing 3436 Correspondence from Caroline P. Vo re: settlement. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(jnl, Deputy Clerk)
September 9, 2010 Filing 3435 Correspondence from Brian C. Lock re: settlement. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(jnl, Deputy Clerk)
September 9, 2010 Filing 3434 Correspondence from Joseph A. Waller re: settlement. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(jnl, Deputy Clerk)
September 7, 2010 Filing 3433 Correspondence from Sterling Leon Purser re: settlement. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(jnl, Deputy Clerk)
September 1, 2010 Filing 3432 Correspondence from Joan Dolan re: settlement. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(jnls, Deputy Clerk)
September 1, 2010 Filing 3431 Correspondence from Brenda Kerzner re: settlement. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(jnls, Deputy Clerk)
September 1, 2010 Filing 3430 Correspondence from Brenda Kerzner re: settlement. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(jnls, Deputy Clerk)
September 1, 2010 Filing 3429 Correspondence from Susan Brennen re: settlement. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(jnls, Deputy Clerk)
August 30, 2010 Filing 3428 Correspondence from Ronald L. Chicka re: settlement. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(jnl, Deputy Clerk)
August 30, 2010 Filing 3427 Correspondence from Richard J. Crompton re: Settlement. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(jnl, Deputy Clerk)
August 27, 2010 Filing 3426 Correspondence from Philip M. Perlstein re: settlement. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(jnl, Deputy Clerk)
August 27, 2010 Filing 3425 Correspondence from Loy Don Black re: settlement. (Attachments: #1 Attachment, #2 envelope)(jnl, Deputy Clerk)
August 23, 2010 Filing 3423 Correspondence from Barbara Jacobs Ficklin re: Objection to settlement. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(jnl, Deputy Clerk)
August 23, 2010 Filing 3421 Correspondence re: MFS and Putnam Settlements (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(Geoppinger, Jean)
August 20, 2010 Filing 3424 Correspondence from Donald A. Uliasz re: settlement. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(jnl, Deputy Clerk)
August 20, 2010 Filing 3422 Correspondence from John J. Teti re: settlement. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(jnl, Deputy Clerk)
August 19, 2010 Filing 3419 Correspondence from Jennifer L. Padgett re: settlement. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(jnl, Deputy Clerk)
August 19, 2010 Filing 3418 Correspondence from Jimmy L. Padgett re: settlement. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(jnl, Deputy Clerk)
August 18, 2010 Filing 3415 STATUS REPORT for the RS Sub-Track by Anthony Cacciola. (Lahm, James)
August 18, 2010 Filing 3414 STATUS REPORT as Requested by the Court by Lead Class Counsel for the Putnam Subtrack. (Wayne, Richard)
August 18, 2010 Filing 3413 Status Report Submitted Re: Update on Settlement Administration in the Alger Subtrack by A Plaintiff (Luse, Jaime)
August 18, 2010 Filing 3412 Status Report Submitted regarding claims administration process per Court's July 28, 2010 request by Combined Welfare Fund Associated Cases: 1:04-md-15863-JFM, 1:04-cv-01933-JFM(Waldman, Chet)
August 18, 2010 Filing 3411 Status Report Submitted re: Update on Settlement Administration in the Janus Subtrack by Maloon Powers Pitre & Higgins, LLC (Molumphy, Mark)
August 18, 2010 Filing 3410 Status Report Submitted as Requested by Court (One Group Subtrack) by Linda B Parker (Goodstein, Clifford)
August 18, 2010 Filing 3409 Status Report Submitted as Requested by Court by Jackie Williams (Goodstein, Clifford)
August 18, 2010 Filing 3408 Correspondence re: Update on Settlement Administration (Johnson, C)
August 16, 2010 Filing 3420 Correspondence from Marvin Bartles re: settlement. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(jnl, Deputy Clerk)
August 16, 2010 Filing 3417 Correspondence from David and Nancy Flynn re: settlement. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(jnl, Deputy Clerk)
August 16, 2010 Filing 3416 Correspondence from Laverne and Lucille Franzwa re: settlement. (Attachments: #1 Attachment, #2 envelope)(jnl, Deputy Clerk)
August 13, 2010 Filing 3407 Correspondence from Joseph Frederick re: settlement. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(jnl, Deputy Clerk)
August 13, 2010 Filing 3406 Correspondence from Kathryn M. Johnston re: settlement. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(jnl, Deputy Clerk)
August 4, 2010 Filing 3405 Correspondence from Sheldon M. Gruber re: settlement. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(jnls, Deputy Clerk)
August 3, 2010 Filing 3404 Correspondence from Emmett Cunningham re: Objection to settlement. (jnl, Deputy Clerk)
August 2, 2010 Filing 3403 Correspondence from Richard K. Foster re: Objection to settlement. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(jnl, Deputy Clerk)
August 2, 2010 Filing 3402 Correspondence from John Knowles re: settlement. (jnl, Deputy Clerk)
August 2, 2010 Filing 3401 Correspondence from Philip Perlstein re: Objection to settlement. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(jnl, Deputy Clerk)
August 2, 2010 Filing 3400 Correspondence from Philip Perlstein re: Objection to settlement. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(jnl, Deputy Clerk)
August 2, 2010 Filing 3399 Correspondence from George W. Ramey re: settlement. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(jnl, Deputy Clerk)
August 2, 2010 Filing 3398 Correspondence from William Bylsma re: Objection to settlement. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(jnl, Deputy Clerk)
July 28, 2010 Filing 3397 Correspondence from Donna M. Nolte re: settlement. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(jnl, Deputy Clerk)
July 28, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 3396 PAPERLESS ORDER granting #3376 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Michael R Bromwich terminated. Signed by Judge J. Frederick Motz on 7/19/10 (cag, Deputy Clerk)
July 23, 2010 Filing 3395 Correspondence from Carl Hanzelik re: Objection to settlement. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(jnl, Deputy Clerk)
July 23, 2010 Filing 3394 Correspondence from Arthur A. Romano re: Objection to settlement. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(jnl, Deputy Clerk)
July 19, 2010 Filing 3393 Correspondence from Frederic E. Michels on behalf of Sandra Marie Johnson re: settlement. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(jnl, Deputy Clerk)
July 16, 2010 Filing 3392 Correspondence from James E. Atkins re: Objection to settlement. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(jnl, Deputy Clerk)
July 16, 2010 Filing 3390 Correspondence re: One Group's notice mailing (Isbister, John)
July 16, 2010 Filing 3389 Correspondence re: Settlement Administration Associated Cases: 1:04-md-15863-JFM et al.(Johnson, C)
July 15, 2010 Filing 3385 Correspondence from Leo L. Lindeman re: settlement. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(jnl, Deputy Clerk)
July 15, 2010 Filing 3384 Correspondence from Robert S. Moore re: Objection to attorney's fees. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(jnl, Deputy Clerk)
July 14, 2010 Filing 3388 Correspondence from Gerald P. Hutchinson Jr. re: proof of claim. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(jnl, Deputy Clerk)
July 14, 2010 Filing 3387 Correspondence from George W. Kandle re: withdrawal from class action. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(jnl, Deputy Clerk)
July 14, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 3383 ORDER in JFM-04-818 Granting #3377 parties request for stay. Signed by Judge J. Frederick Motz on 7/14/10 (cags, Deputy Clerk)
July 13, 2010 Filing 3386 Correspondence from William N. Bracey re: Change of address. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(jnl, Deputy Clerk)
July 12, 2010 Filing 3391 Correspondence from Mark Walfish re: Objection to settlement. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(jnl, Deputy Clerk)
July 9, 2010 Filing 3381 Correspondence from David Murray re: request for forms to be added to class action suit. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(jnls, Deputy Clerk)
July 9, 2010 Filing 3379 Correspondence from Kim Bartel re: Objection to settlement. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(jnls, Deputy Clerk)
July 8, 2010 Filing 3378 Correspondence from Donald and Patricia Harshbarger re: Objection to and exclusion from settlements. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(jnls, Deputy Clerk)
July 6, 2010 Filing 3382 Correspondence from Naomi Vanek re: settlement. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(jnls, Deputy Clerk)
July 6, 2010 Filing 3380 Correspondence from Joseph Fitch re: settlement hearing. (jnls, Deputy Clerk)
July 6, 2010 Filing 3377 Correspondence re: stay of pretrial proceedings pending U.S. Supreme Court decision (Perry, Mark)
June 30, 2010 Filing 3376 MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney Michael R. Bromwich by Ritchie Capital Management, Inc. Responses due by 7/19/2010 (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Bromwich, Michael)
June 30, 2010 Filing 3375 NOTICE of Appearance by Douglas W Baruch on behalf of Ritchie Capital Management, Inc. (Baruch, Douglas)
June 8, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 3374 ORDER granting #3372 Plaintiff's Motion to Amend Preliminary Approval Order to Authorize Postcard Notice. Signed by Judge J. Frederick Motz on 6/7/10 (cag, Deputy Clerk)
June 3, 2010 Filing 3373 Correspondence re: MDL-15863 (Janus Track)/Motion to Amend Preliminary Approval Order to Authorize Postcard Notice (Molumphy, Mark)
June 3, 2010 Filing 3372 MOTION to Amend/Correct Preliminary Approval Order to Authorize Postcard Notice (Plaintiff's Uncontested Motion) by Maloon Powers Pitre & Higgins, LLC Responses due by 6/21/2010 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Proposed Order)(Molumphy, Mark)
May 19, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 3371 PRELIMINARY ORDER for Notice and Hearing in Connection with Settlement Proceedings in the MFS Sub-Track. Signed by Judge J. Frederick Motz on 5/19/10 (cags, Deputy Clerk)
May 19, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 3370 PRELIMINARY ORDER for Notice and Hearing in Connection with Settlement Proceedings in the One Group Subtrack. Signed by Judge J. Frederick Motz on 5/19/10 (cags, Deputy Clerk)
May 19, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 3369 PRELIMINARY ORDER for notice and hearing in connection with settlement proceedings in the Columbia sub-track. Signed by Judge J. Frederick Motz on 5/19/10. (jnl, Deputy Clerk)
May 19, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 3368 PRELIMINARY ORDER for notice and hearing in connection with settlement proceedings in the Alger sub-track. Signed by Judge J. Frederick Motz on 5/19/10. (jnl, Deputy Clerk)
May 19, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 3367 PRELIMINARY ORDER for notice and hearing in connection with settlement proceedings in the Janus subtrack. Signed by Judge J. Frederick Motz on 5/19/10. (jnl, Deputy Clerk)
May 19, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 3366 ORDER preliminarily approving the proposed settlements, preliminarily certifying class for settlement proposes only, approving form and manner of notice and setting fairness hearing. Signed by Judge J. Frederick Motz on 5/19/10. Associated Cases: 1:04-md-15863-JFM, 1:04-cv-03798-JFM(jnl, Deputy Clerk)
May 19, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 3365 AMENDED ORDER preliminarily approving settlements of class action and establishing notice procedures. Signed by Judge J. Frederick Motz on 5/19/10. Associated Cases: 1:04-md-15863-JFM, 1:04-cv-01924-JFM, 1:04-cv-01933-JFM(jnl, Deputy Clerk)
May 19, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 3364 ORDER of preliminary approval. Signed by Judge J. Frederick Motz on 5/19/10. Associated Cases: 1:04-md-15863-JFM, 1:04-cv-00560-JFM, 1:04-cv-00564-JFM(jnl, Deputy Clerk)
May 13, 2010 Filing 3363 Supplemental to (3336 in 1:04-md-15863-JFM) MOTION for Settlement Approval in Allianz Dresdner Sub-track filed by Combined Welfare Fund Amended [Proposed] Order Preliminarily Approving Settlements of Class Action and Establishing Notice Procedures. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Long Form Notice as amended, #2 Exhibit Mailed Postcard Notice as amended, #3 Exhibit Proof of Claim and Release as amended, #4 Exhibit Amended Order Awarding Fees and Expenses, #5 Exhibit Final Order and Judgment as amended)Associated Cases: 1:04-md-15863-JFM, 1:04-cv-01924-JFM, 1:04-cv-01933-JFM(Waldman, Chet)
May 13, 2010 Filing 3362 Supplemental to (188 in 1:04-cv-03798-JFM, 3340 in 1:04-md-15863-JFM) MOTION for Settlement - Plaintiffs' Motion for an Order Preliminarily Approving the Proposed Settlements, Preliminarily Certifying Class for Settlement Purposes Only, Approving Form and Manner of Notice, and Setting Fairness Hearing filed by The Krouse Group [Proposed] Order Preliminarily Approving the Proposed Settlements, Preliminarily Certifying Class for Settlement Purposes Only, Approving Form and Manner of Notice, and Setting Fairness Hearing. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Amended Long Form Notice, #2 Exhibit Amended Short Form (Direct Mailing) Notice)(Lahm, James)
May 12, 2010 Filing 3361 Supplemental to #3347 MOTION for Settlement Plaintiffs' Motion for Preliminary Approval of Settlements in the Janus Sub-Track, Approval of Notice, and Certification of the Class for Settlement Purposes filed by Maloon Powers Pitre & Higgins, LLC [UPDATED]. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Notice of Pendency & Proposed Settlements (Short Form), #2 Exhibit 2 - Long Form Notice of Pendency & Proposed Settlements, #3 Exhibit 3 - Proof of Claim & Release, #4 Exhibit 4 - Summary Notice of Proposed Settlements)(Molumphy, Mark)
May 12, 2010 Filing 3360 Supplemental to #3339 MOTION for Settlement PLAINTIFFS' MOTION FOR PRELIMINARY APPROVAL OF SETTLEMENTS IN THE ALGER SUB-TRACK, APPROVAL OF NOTICE PLAN, AND CERTIFICATION OF CLASS FOR SETTLEMENT PURPOSES MOTION to Certify Class filed by A Plaintiff [Proposed] Preliminary Order for Notice and Hearing in Connection with Settlement Proceedings in the Alger Sub-Track. (Attachments: #1 Short Form Notice, #2 Long Form Notice, #3 Proof of Claim)(Luse, Jaime)
May 12, 2010 Filing 3359 Supplemental to (3337 in 1:04-md-15863-JFM) MOTION for Settlement PLAINTIFFS MOTION FOR PRELIMINARY APPROVAL OF SETTLEMENTS IN THE MFS SUB-TRACK, APPROVAL OF NOTICE, AND CERTIFICATION OF THE CLASSES FOR SETTLEMENT PURPOSES filed by City of Chicago Deferred Compensation Plan [Updated] Plaintiffs' [Proposed] Preliminary Order for Notice and Hearing in Connection with Settlement Proceedings in the MFS Sub-Track. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit [Updated]Notice of Pendency and Proposed Settlements of Class Actions, Motion for Attorneys Fees and Expenses, and Settlement Hearing, #2 Exhibit [Updated]Long-Form Notice of Pendency and Proposed Settlements of Class and Derivative Actions, Motions For Attorneys Fees and Expenses, and Settlement Hearing, #3 Exhibit [Updated] Proof of Claim and Release, #4 Exhibit [Updated]Summary Notice of Proposed Settlements in the In re Mutual Funds Investment Litigation and Settlement Fairness Hearing)Associated Cases: 1:04-md-15863-JFM, 1:04-cv-01162-JFM(Bien Willner, Jerald)
May 12, 2010 Filing 3358 Supplemental to #3344 MOTION for Settlement MOTION FOR PRELIMINARY APPROVAL OF SETTLEMENT IN COLUMBIA SUB-TRACK filed by A Plaintiff [proposed] Preliminary Order For Notice and Hearing in Connection with Settlement Proceedings in the Columbia Sub-Track. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit List, #2 Exhibit A - Short Form, #3 Exhibit B- Long Form, #4 Exhibit C- Proof of Claim)(Luse, Jaime)
May 12, 2010 Filing 3357 Supplemental to #3343 MOTION for Settlement MOTION FOR PRELIMINARY APPROVAL OF SETTLEMENT IN ONE GROUP TRACK filed by A Plaintiff [Proposed] Preliminary Order for Notice and Hearing in Connection with Settlement Proceedings in the One Group Subtrack. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit List, #2 Exhibit A - Short Form Notice, #3 Exhibit B- Long Form Notice)(Luse, Jaime)
May 11, 2010 Filing 3356 Supplemental to (99 in 1:04-cv-00564-JFM, 3346 in 1:04-md-15863-JFM, 306 in 1:04-cv-00560-JFM) MOTION MOTION FOR PRELIMINARY APPROVAL OF CLASS SETTLEMENT, CERTIFICATION OF SETTLEMENT CLASS AND APPOINTMENT OF CLASS COUNSEL filed by Lead Plaintiff Ohio Tuition Trust Authority Revised proposed preliminary approval order and. (Attachments: #1 revised long form notice)Associated Cases: 1:04-md-15863-JFM, 1:04-cv-00560-JFM, 1:04-cv-00564-JFM(Heuck, Robert)
May 6, 2010 Filing 3355 NOTICE by Maloon Powers Pitre & Higgins, LLC re #3348 Notice (Other), Notice (Other), Notice (Other) Revised Exhibit 1.1 (Notice of Pendency and Proposed Settlements of Class and Derivative Actions, Motion for Attorneys' Fees and Expenses, and Settlement Hearing and Revised Exhibit 1.2-Long Form Notice of Pendency and Proposed Settlements of Class and Derivative Actions (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1.2 Long Form Notice of Pendency and Proposed Settlements of Class and Derivative Actions)(Molumphy, Mark)
May 6, 2010 Filing 3354 NOTICE by A Plaintiff re (99 in 1:04-cv-00564-JFM, 3346 in 1:04-md-15863-JFM, 306 in 1:04-cv-00560-JFM) MOTION MOTION FOR PRELIMINARY APPROVAL OF CLASS SETTLEMENT, CERTIFICATION OF SETTLEMENT CLASS AND APPOINTMENT OF CLASS COUNSEL Second Revised Proposed Preliminary Approval Order and Long Form Notice (Attachments: #1 Supplement)Associated Cases: 1:04-md-15863-JFM, 1:04-cv-00560-JFM, 1:04-cv-00564-JFM(Heuck, Robert)
May 5, 2010 Filing 3353 Correspondence re: Friday, May 7, 2010, Hearing Dial-In Information (Isbister, John)
May 5, 2010 Filing 3352 Correspondence re: Parent Investor Class Plaintiff's Response to Janus Defendants' 5/5/10 letter to the Court (Press, Ira)
May 5, 2010 Filing 3351 Correspondence re: Janus Defendants' Response to Parent Investor Class Plaintiff's Letter to the Court (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A)(Perry, Mark)
May 4, 2010 Filing 3350 Correspondence re: 3347 in 1:04-md-15863-JFM (Press, Ira)
May 4, 2010 Filing 3349 NOTICE by A Plaintiff re (99 in 1:04-cv-00564-JFM, 3346 in 1:04-md-15863-JFM, 306 in 1:04-cv-00560-JFM) MOTION MOTION FOR PRELIMINARY APPROVAL OF CLASS SETTLEMENT, CERTIFICATION OF SETTLEMENT CLASS AND APPOINTMENT OF CLASS COUNSEL REVISED PROPOSED PRELIMINARY APPROVAL ORDER (Attachments: #1 REVISED LONG FORM NOTICE)Associated Cases: 1:04-md-15863-JFM, 1:04-cv-00560-JFM, 1:04-cv-00564-JFM(Heuck, Robert)
May 4, 2010 Filing 3348 NOTICE by Maloon Powers Pitre & Higgins, LLC re (3347 in 1:04-md-15863-JFM) MOTION for Settlement Plaintiffs' Motion for Preliminary Approval of Settlements in the Janus Sub-Track, Approval of Notice, and Certification of the Class for Settlement Purposes Notice of [Revised Proposed] Preliminary Order for Notice and Hearing in Connection With Settlement Proceedings in the Janus Subtrack (Attachments: #1 Revised Proposed Order)Associated Cases: 1:04-md-15863-JFM, 1:04-cv-00514-JFM(Molumphy, Mark)
April 27, 2010 Filing 3347 MOTION for Settlement Plaintiffs' Motion for Preliminary Approval of Settlements in the Janus Sub-Track, Approval of Notice, and Certification of the Class for Settlement Purposes by Maloon Powers Pitre & Higgins, LLC Responses due by 5/14/2010 (Attachments: #1 Memorandum of Law In Support of Preliminary Approval of Settlements in The Janus Sub-Track, Approval of Notice, and Certification of a Class for Settlement Purposes, #2 Appendix, #3 Exhibit 1 Proposed Preliminary Order, #4 Exhibit 1.1 Notice of Pendency, #5 Exhibit 1.2 Long-Form Notice, #6 Exhibit 1.3 Proof of Claim, #7 Exhibit 1.4 Summary Notice of Proposed Settlements, #8 Exhibit 2 Stip. and Agreement of Settlement of Janus Defendants, #9 Exhibit 3 Janus/Canary Severed Agreement, #10 Exhibit 4 Canary Master Agreement, #11 Exhibit 5 Janus/Bear Stearns Severed Agreement, #12 Exhibit 6 Bear Stearns Master Agreement, #13 Exhibit 7 Round Hill Stipulation and Agreement, #14 Exhibit 8 Rydex Stipulation and Agreement, #15 Exhibit 9 Janus/BAS Severed Agreement, #16 Exhibit 10 BAS Master Agreement, #17 Exhibit 11 Proposed Order and Final Judgment)(Molumphy, Mark)
April 26, 2010 Filing 3346 MOTION MOTION FOR PRELIMINARY APPROVAL OF CLASS SETTLEMENT, CERTIFICATION OF SETTLEMENT CLASS AND APPOINTMENT OF CLASS COUNSEL by Additional Class Counsel for the Putnam Subtrack Responses due by 5/13/2010 (Attachments: #1 Memorandum, #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit, #4 Exhibit, #5 Exhibit, #6 Exhibit, #7 Exhibit, #8 Exhibit, #9 Exhibit, #10 Exhibit, #11 Exhibit, #12 Exhibit, #13 Exhibit, #14 Exhibit, #15 Exhibit, #16 Exhibit)Associated Cases: 1:04-md-15863-JFM, 1:04-cv-00560-JFM, 1:04-cv-00564-JFM(Heuck, Robert)
April 26, 2010 Filing 3345 NOTICE of Appearance by Jill Marie Pfenning on behalf of Janus Capital Group Inc., Janus Capital Management LLC, Janus Distributors LLC (Pfenning, Jill)
April 23, 2010 Filing 3344 MOTION for Settlement MOTION FOR PRELIMINARY APPROVAL OF SETTLEMENT IN COLUMBIA SUB-TRACK by Harold Beardsley, Jackie Williams Responses due by 5/10/2010 (Attachments: #1 Memorandum of Law, #2 Exhibit List, #3 Exhibit A, #4 Exhibit B, #5 Exhibit C, #6 Exhibit D, #7 Exhibit E, #8 Exhibit F, #9 Exhibit G, #10 Exhibit H, #11 Exhibit I, #12 Exhibit J)(Luse, Jaime)
April 23, 2010 Filing 3343 MOTION for Settlement MOTION FOR PRELIMINARY APPROVAL OF SETTLEMENT IN ONE GROUP TRACK by Linda B Parker, Datren Williams, Datren Williams f/u/b/o Ledelous Little Responses due by 5/10/2010 (Attachments: #1 Memorandum of Law, #2 Exhibit List, #3 Exhibit A, #4 Exhibit B, #5 Exhibit C, #6 Exhibit D, #7 Exhibit E, #8 Exhibit F, #9 Exhibit G, #10 Exhibit H, #11 Exhibit I, #12 Exhibit J)(Luse, Jaime)
April 22, 2010 Filing 3342 MOTION for Settlement Corrected Class Lead Plaintiffs' Memorandum in Support of Motion for Preliminary Approval of Proposed Settlement by Combined Welfare Fund Responses due by 5/10/2010 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit C (Corrected) to Exhibit 1 to Corrected Memorandum)Associated Cases: 1:04-md-15863-JFM, 1:04-cv-01924-JFM, 1:04-cv-01933-JFM(Waldman, Chet)
April 22, 2010 Filing 3341 Memorandum re (188 in 1:04-cv-03798-JFM, 3340 in 1:04-md-15863-JFM) MOTION for Settlement - Plaintiffs' Motion for an Order Preliminarily Approving the Proposed Settlements, Preliminarily Certifying Class for Settlement Purposes Only, Approving Form and Manner of Notice, and Setting Fairness Hearing filed by The Krouse Group. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit BAS Severed Agreement, #2 Exhibit Bear Stearns Severed Agreement, #3 Exhibit Canary Severed Agreement, #4 Exhibit BAS Master Agreement, #5 Exhibit Bear Stearns Master Agreement, #6 Exhibit Canary Master Agreement, #7 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Final Judgment, #8 Exhibit Direct Mailing Notice, #9 Exhibit Long-form Notice, #10 Exhibit Global Summary Notice, #11 Exhibit Cacciola Certification, #12 Exhibit Report of Marc Vellrath, #13 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Preliminary Approval Order)(Lahm, James)
April 22, 2010 Filing 3340 MOTION for Settlement - Plaintiffs' Motion for an Order Preliminarily Approving the Proposed Settlements, Preliminarily Certifying Class for Settlement Purposes Only, Approving Form and Manner of Notice, and Setting Fairness Hearing by The Krouse Group Responses due by 5/10/2010 (Lahm, James)
April 21, 2010 Filing 3339 MOTION for Settlement PLAINTIFFS' MOTION FOR PRELIMINARY APPROVAL OF SETTLEMENTS IN THE ALGER SUB-TRACK, APPROVAL OF NOTICE PLAN, AND CERTIFICATION OF CLASS FOR SETTLEMENT PURPOSES, MOTION to Certify Class by Gerald Born, Jonathan Clain, Barbara Cordani, Joseph Cordani, Donna Gaffney, David Grant, James Laufer, Harry Schipper, John Vining Responses due by 5/10/2010 (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order [Proposed] Preliminary Order for Notice and Hearing, #2 Memorandum of Law, #3 Appendix to Memorandum of Law, #4 Exhibit 1 - Preliminary Order for Notice and Hearing, #5 Exhibit 1.1 - Notice of Pendency - Short Form, #6 Exhibit 1.2 - Notice of Pendency - Long Form, #7 Exhibit 1.3 - Summary Notice, #8 Exhibit 1.4 - Proof of Claim and Release, #9 Exhibit 2 - Stipulation of Settlement with the Alger Defendants and Wilshire Associates, #10 Exhibit 3 - [Proposed] Final Order and Judgment for Alger Defendants and Wilshire Associates, #11 Exhibit 4 - Bear Stearns Severed Agreement, #12 Exhibit 5 - Bear Stearns Master Agreement, #13 Exhibit 6 - Bear Stearns Proposed Final Order, #14 Exhibit 7 - Canary Severed Agreement, #15 Exhibit 8 - Canary Master Agreement, #16 Exhibit 9 - Canary Proposed Final Order, #17 Exhibit 10 - BAS Severed Agreement, #18 Exhibit 11 - BAS Master Agreement, #19 Exhibit 12 - BAS Proposed Order)(Luse, Jaime)
April 21, 2010 Filing 3338 MOTION for Settlement PLAINTIFFS' OMNIBUS MEMORANDUM OF LAW IN SUPPORT OF PRELIMINARY APPROVAL OF PROPOSED SETTLEMENTS by Settling Plaintiffs Responses due by 5/10/2010 (Luse, Jaime)
April 21, 2010 Filing 3337 MOTION for Settlement PLAINTIFFS MOTION FOR PRELIMINARY APPROVAL OF SETTLEMENTS IN THE MFS SUB-TRACK, APPROVAL OF NOTICE, AND CERTIFICATION OF THE CLASSES FOR SETTLEMENT PURPOSES by City of Chicago Deferred Compensation Plan Responses due by 5/10/2010 (Attachments: #1 PLAINTIFFS MEMORANDUM OF LAW IN SUPPORT OF PRELIMINARY APPROVAL OF SETTLEMENTS IN THE MFS SUB-TRACK, APPROVAL OF NOTICE, AND CERTIFICATION OF THE CLASSES FOR SETTLEMENT PURPOSES, #2 Appendix to Memorandum of Law, #3 Exhibit 1 - Plaintiffs' [Proposed] Preliminary Order for Notice and Hearing in Connection with Settlement Proceedings in MFS Sub-Track, #4 Exhibit 1.1 - Notice of Pendency and Proposed Settlements of Class Actions, Motion for Attorneys Fees and Expenses, and Settlement Hearing, #5 Exhibit 1.2 - Long-Form Notice of Pendency and Proposed Settlements of Class, ERISA and Derivative Actions, Motions for Attorneys Fees and Expenses, and Settlement Hearing, #6 Exhibit 1.3 - Proof of Claim and Release, #7 Exhibit 1.4 - Summary Notice of Proposed Settlements in the In re Mutual Funds Investment Litigation and Settlement Fairness Hearing, #8 Exhibit 2 - MFS/Security Brokerage Severed Agreement and Stipulation of Settlement, #9 Exhibit 3 - Master Agreement of Settlement with Security Brokerage Parties, #10 Exhibit 4 - Stipulation and Agreement of Settlement (MFS Defendants), #11 Exhibit 5 - Stipulation and Agreement of Settlement (MFS Funds Defendants), #12 Exhibit 6 - MFS/BAS Severed Agreement and Stipulation of Settlement, #13 Exhibit 7 - Master Agreement of Settlement with Banc of America Securities LLC, #14 Exhibit 8 - MFS/Bear Stearns Severed Agreement and Stipulation of Settlement, #15 Exhibit 9 - Master Agreement of Settlement with Bear Stearns Defendants, #16 Exhibit 10 - MFS/Canary Severed Agreement and Stipulation of Settlement, #17 Exhibit 11 - Master Agreement of Settlement with Canary Defendants, #18 Exhibit 12 - Stipulation and Agreement of Settlement with Tewksbury, #19 Exhibit 13 - Stipulation and Agreement with Wilshire Associates, #20 Exhibit 14 - [Proposed] Order and Final Judgment with Respect to the Security Brokerage Parties, #21 Exhibit 15 - [Proposed] Order and Final Judgment with Respect to MFS Defendants, #22 Exhibit 16 - [Proposed] Order and Final Judgment with Respect to MFS Funds Defendants, #23 Exhibit 17 - [Proposed] Order and Final Judgment with Respect to Banc of America Securities, #24 Exhibit 18 - [Proposed] Order and Final Judgment with Respect to Canary Defendants, #25 Exhibit 19 - [Proposed] Order and Final Judgment with Respect to Tewksbury, #26 Exhibit 20 - [Proposed] Order and Final Judgment with Respect to Wilshire Associates)Associated Cases: 1:04-md-15863-JFM, 1:04-cv-01162-JFM(Johnson, C)
April 21, 2010 Filing 3336 MOTION for Settlement Approval in Allianz Dresdner Sub-track by Combined Welfare Fund Responses due by 5/10/2010 (Attachments: #1 Class Lead Plaintiffs' Memorandum in Support of Preliminary Approval of Settlement in Allianz Dresdner Sub-track, #2 Text of Proposed Order Exhibit 1 to Memorandum: Proposed Order Preliminarily Approving Settlements of Class Action and Establishing Notice Procedures, #3 Exhibit Exhibit A to Preliminary Approval Order: Summary Postcard Mailed Notice, #4 Exhibit Exhibit B to Preliminary Approval Order: Joint Cross-Track Publication Notice, #5 Exhibit Exhibit C to Preliminary Approval Order: Long-Form Notice, #6 Exhibit Exhibit D to Preliminary Approval Order: Proof of Claim and Release Form, #7 Appendix Appendix - Exhibit 1a: Stipulation and Agreement of Settlement (Allianz Defendants) dated June 17, 2009, #8 Appendix Appendix - Exhibit 1b: Amendment to Stipulation and Agreement of Settlement (Allianz Defendants) dated January 27, 2010, #9 Appendix Appendix - Exhibit 1c: Amendment to Stipulation and Agreement of Settlement (Allianz Defendants) dated April 20, 2010, #10 Appendix Appendix - Exhibit 2: Declaration of Shannon R. Wheatman, Ph.D., Regarding Notice, #11 Appendix Appendix - Exhibit 3A: Bear Stearns Master Agreement, #12 Appendix Appendix - Exhibit 3B: Banc of America Master Agreement, #13 Appendix Appendix - Exhibit 3C: Canary Master Agreement, #14 Appendix Appendix - Exhibit 4A: Bear Stearns Severed Agreement, #15 Appendix Appendix - Exhibit 4B: Banc of America Severed Agreement, #16 Appendix Appendix - Exhibit 4C: Canary Severed Agreement, #17 Appendix Appendix - Exhibit 5: Order Approving Plan of Allocation, #18 Appendix Appendix - Exhibit 6: Order Awarding Fees and Expenses, #19 Appendix Appendix - Exhibit 7: Final Order and Judgment)Associated Cases: 1:04-md-15863-JFM, 1:04-cv-01924-JFM, 1:04-cv-01933-JFM(Waldman, Chet)
April 21, 2010 Filing 3335 NOTICE of Appearance by Jasand Patric Mock on behalf of Banc of America Securities, LLC (Mock, Jasand)
April 14, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 3334 MARGINAL ORDER approving Stipulation of Dismissal in JFM-04-888. Signed by Judge J. Frederick Motz on 4/14/10. (jnls, Deputy Clerk)
April 14, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 3333 MARGINAL ORDER approving Stipulation of Dismissal in JFM-04-883. Signed by Judge J. Frederick Motz on 4/14/10. (jnls, Deputy Clerk)
March 30, 2010 Filing 3332 Correspondence re: MDL-1586 In re Mutual Funds Investment Litigation (Motz, J.)
March 5, 2010 Filing 3331 NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT for dates of 12/10/2008, before Judge J. Frederick Motz, re #3326 Notice of Appeal,, Court Reporter/Transcriber Christine T. Asif, Telephone number 410-962-4492. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained from the Court Reporter or through PACER. Redaction Request due 3/26/2010. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 4/5/2010. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 6/3/2010. (ca, Court Reporter)
March 5, 2010 Filing 3330 NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT for dates of 12/11/2008, before Judge J. Frederick Motz, re #3326 Notice of Appeal,, Court Reporter/Transcriber Christine T. Asif, Telephone number 410-962-4492. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained from the Court Reporter or through PACER. Redaction Request due 3/26/2010. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 4/5/2010. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 6/3/2010. (ca, Court Reporter)
March 2, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 3329 Paperless ORDER granting #3328 Motion for Extension of Time. Signed by Judge J. Frederick Motz on 3/2/10. (Motz, J.)
March 1, 2010 Filing 3328 MOTION for Extension of Time to File a Bill of Costs by Janus Capital Group Inc., Janus Capital Management LLC, Janus Distributors LLC Responses due by 3/18/2010 (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Perry, Mark)
February 18, 2010 Filing 3327 Transmission of Notice of Appeal and Docket Sheet to US Court of Appeals re #3326 Notice of Appeal,,. IMPORTANT NOTICE: To access forms which you are required to file with the United States Court of Appeals for the Fourth Circuit please go to http://www.ca4.uscourts.gov and click on Forms & Notices. (nrm, Deputy Clerk)
February 17, 2010 Filing 3326 NOTICE OF APPEAL as to #3322 Order on Motion for Summary Judgment,,, by Lauri C. Bader, Roger Bailey, Gerald Chait, Sherry Chait, Katharine Clark, Barbara Cordani, Joseph Cordani, Doreen Duke, Robert K. Finnell, Erik P. Gagnon, Reiko Gagnon, Michael Gaines, Sharon Gaines, Jason Hung, Mei Hung, Mark J. Keane, Michael Lipstein, Robin Resnick, James E. Schultz, Gloria Steinberg, Jean Stigas, Lawrence A. Stigas, George Tsetsekos, Rhonda Vladimir, Sylvia Volin. Filing fee $ 455, receipt number 0416-2418379. Appeal Record due by 3/22/2010. (Mathews, Timothy)
February 4, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 3325 Paperless ORDER granting #3324 Motion for Extension of Time to File Document. Signed by Judge J. Frederick Motz on 2/4/10. (Motz, J.)
February 3, 2010 Filing 3324 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Bill of Costs by Janus Capital Management LLC Responses due by 2/22/2010 (Attachments: #1 Memorandum Of Law In Support, #2 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order)(Perry, Mark)
January 26, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 3323 PAPERLESS ORDER approving #3317 Miscellaneous Correspondence. Signed by Judge J. Frederick Motz on 01/26/2010. (Motz, J.)
January 20, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 3322 ORDER granting (42) Motion for Summary Judgment in case 1:04-cv-00518-JFM; granting (3242) Motion for Summary Judgment in case 1:04-md-15863-JFM; ENTERING Judgment in favor of Defendants against Plaintiffs. Signed by Judge J. Frederick Motz on 1/20/10 Associated Cases: 1:04-md-15863-JFM, 1:04-cv-00518-JFM(cag, Deputy Clerk)
January 20, 2010 Filing 3321 MEMORANDUM Signed by Judge J. Frederick Motz on 1/20/10 Associated Cases: 1:04-md-15863-JFM, 1:04-cv-00518-JFM(cag, Deputy Clerk)
January 20, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 3320 PAPERLESS ORDER approving #3319 Notice of voluntary dismissal filed by First Derivative Traders. Signed by Judge J. Frederick Motz on 1/20/10. (jnls, Deputy Clerk)
January 15, 2010 Filing 3319 NOTICE by First Derivative Traders of Voluntary Dismissal With Prejudice of Plaintiff Craig Wiggins and Order Pursuant to FRCP 41(a)(1) (Press, Ira)
January 14, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 3318 ORDER granting (3279) Amended Motion to Dismiss the open cases in the ERISA, Fund Investor Class and Parent Derivative subtracks in case 1:04-md-15863-JFM, et al; DISMISSING the actions listed in Exhibit A attached. Signed by Judge J. Frederick Motz on 1/14/10 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A) Associated Cases: 1:04-md-15863-JFM et al(cag, Deputy Clerk)
January 14, 2010 Filing 3317 Correspondence re: Stay Pending Petition for Writ of Certiorari (Perry, Mark)
January 6, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 3316 PAPERLESS ORDER denying as moot #3277 Motion to Dismiss. Signed by Judge J. Frederick Motz on 1/6/10. (jnls, Deputy Clerk)
January 4, 2010 Filing 3315 Correspondence re: MDL-1586 - In re Mutual Funds Investment Litigation (Motz, J.)
December 30, 2009 Filing 3314 NOTICE by First Derivative Traders to Take Deposition of Thomas A. Early (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Press, Ira)
December 30, 2009 Filing 3313 NOTICE by First Derivative Traders to Take Deposition of Bonnie M. Howe (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Press, Ira)
December 30, 2009 Filing 3312 NOTICE by First Derivative Traders to Take Deposition of Kelly Abbott Howes (Press, Ira)
December 30, 2009 Filing 3311 NOTICE by First Derivative Traders of Plaintiff's Responses to Janus Defendants' Second Set of Requests for Admission (Press, Ira)
December 30, 2009 Filing 3310 NOTICE by First Derivative Traders of Plaintiff's Responses to Janus Defendants' Second Set of Interrogatories (Press, Ira)
December 30, 2009 Filing 3309 NOTICE by First Derivative Traders of Plaintiff's Responses to Janus Defendants' Second Set of Requests for Documents (Press, Ira)
December 30, 2009 Filing 3308 NOTICE by First Derivative Traders of Plaintiff's Responses to Janus Defendants' Second Set of Interrogatories (Press, Ira)
December 30, 2009 Filing 3307 RESPONSE re #3290 Notice (Other) Janus Defendants' Response to Plaintiffs' First Request for Production of Documents filed by Janus Capital Group Inc.. (Perry, Mark)
December 30, 2009 Filing 3306 RESPONSE re #3289 Notice (Other) Janus Defendants' Response to Plaintiffs' First Set of Requests for Admission filed by Janus Capital Group Inc.. (Perry, Mark)
December 30, 2009 Filing 3305 RESPONSE re #3288 Notice (Other) Plaintiffs' First Set of Interrogatories filed by Janus Capital Group Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A to Janus's Response to Plaintiffs' First Set of Interrogatories)(Perry, Mark)
December 21, 2009 Filing 3304 NOTICE by First Derivative Traders of Plaintiff's Responses to Janus Defendants' First Set of Requests for Documents (Press, Ira)
December 21, 2009 Filing 3303 NOTICE by First Derivative Traders of Plaintiff's Responses to Janus Defendants' First Set of Requests for Admission (Press, Ira)
December 21, 2009 Filing 3302 NOTICE by First Derivative Traders of Plaintiff's Responses to Janus Defendants' First Set of Interrogatories (Press, Ira)
December 15, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 3301 ORDER approving (3282 in 1:04-md-15863-JFM) Stipulation of Dismissal, (3 in 1:04-cv-00921-JFM) Stipulation of Dismissal. Signed by Judge J. Frederick Motz on 12/15/09. Associated Cases: 1:04-md-15863-JFM, 1:04-cv-00921-JFM(jnl, Deputy Clerk)
December 15, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 3300 ORDER approving (12 in 1:04-cv-00877-JFM) Stipulation of Dismissal, (3281 in 1:04-md-15863-JFM) Stipulation of Dismissal,. Signed by Judge J. Frederick Motz on 12/15/09. Associated Cases: 1:04-md-15863-JFM, 1:04-cv-00877-JFM(jnl, Deputy Clerk)
December 15, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 3299 PAPERLESS ORDER APPROVING (12 in 1:04-cv-00877-JFM) Stipulation of Dismissal, (3282 in 1:04-md-15863-JFM) Stipulation of Dismissal, (3 in 1:04-cv-00921-JFM) Stipulation of Dismissal, (3281 in 1:04-md-15863-JFM) Stipulation of Dismissal,. Signed by Judge J. Frederick Motz on 12/15/09. Associated Cases: 1:04-md-15863-JFM, 1:04-cv-00877-JFM, 1:04-cv-00921-JFM(jnl, Deputy Clerk)
December 1, 2009 Filing 3298 NOTICE by Janus Capital Group Inc., Janus Capital Management LLC of Defendants' Second Set of Requests for Admission (Perry, Mark)
December 1, 2009 Filing 3297 NOTICE by Janus Capital Group Inc., Janus Capital Management LLC of Defendants' Second Set of Interrogatories (Perry, Mark)
December 1, 2009 Filing 3296 NOTICE by Janus Capital Group Inc., Janus Capital Management LLC of Defendants' Second Request for Production of Documents (Perry, Mark)
December 1, 2009 Filing 3295 NOTICE to Take Deposition of Rule 30(b)(6) Wayne County Employees' Retirement System. (Perry, Mark)
December 1, 2009 Filing 3294 NOTICE to Take Deposition of Rule 30(b)(6) First Derivative Traders. (Perry, Mark)
December 1, 2009 Filing 3293 NOTICE to Take Deposition of Sherman Frager. (Perry, Mark)
December 1, 2009 Filing 3292 NOTICE to Take Deposition of Marten Hirsh. (Perry, Mark)
December 1, 2009 Filing 3291 NOTICE to Take Deposition of Craig Wiggins. (Perry, Mark)
December 1, 2009 Filing 3290 NOTICE by First Derivative Traders of Plaintiff's First Request for Production of Documents (Press, Ira)
December 1, 2009 Filing 3289 NOTICE by First Derivative Traders of Plaintiff's First Set of Requests for Admission (Press, Ira)
December 1, 2009 Filing 3288 NOTICE by First Derivative Traders of Plaintiff's First Set of Interrogatories (Press, Ira)
November 23, 2009 Filing 3287 RESPONSE to Motion re (3279 in 1:04-md-15863-JFM) Amended MOTION to Dismiss Lead Plaintiffs' Limited Non-Opposition filed by Maloon Powers Pitre & Higgins, LLC. Replies due by 12/7/2009. Associated Cases: 1:04-md-15863-JFM, 1:04-cv-00497-JFM(Molumphy, Mark)
November 20, 2009 Filing 3286 Local Rule 104. (Perry, Mark)
November 20, 2009 Filing 3285 Local Rule 104. (Perry, Mark)
November 20, 2009 Filing 3284 Local Rule 104. (Perry, Mark)
November 19, 2009 Filing 3283 Correspondence regarding the briefing schedule. (Motz, J.)
November 18, 2009 Filing 3282 STIPULATION of Dismissal by Lord Lang, A.J.C. Smith, Adele Simmons, Morton O. Schapiro, Stephen R. Hardis, Jeffrey W. Greenberg, Ray J. Groves, Oscar Fanjul, Mathis Cabiallavetta, Lewis W. Bernard, David A. Olsen, Gwendolyn S. King, Charles A. Davis, Peter Coster, Francis N. Bonsignore. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Luboja, Jeanne)
November 18, 2009 Filing 3281 STIPULATION of Dismissal by Lord Lang, A.J.C. Smith, Adele Simmons, Morton O. Schapiro, Stephen R. Hardis, Jeffrey W. Greenberg, Ray J. Groves, Oscar Fanjul, Robert F. Erburu, Mathis Cabiallavetta, Lewis W. Bernard, David A. Olsen, Gwendolyn S. King, Charles A. Davis, Peter Coster. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Luboja, Jeanne)
November 16, 2009 Filing 3280 ANSWER to Complaint (Second Amended) by Janus Capital Management LLC, Janus Capital Group Inc..(Perry, Mark)
November 16, 2009 Filing 3279 Amended MOTION to Dismiss by Janus Capital Group, Inc. Responses due by 12/3/2009 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Cases For Which Dismissal Is Sought, #2 Exhibit Cases For Which Dismissal Is Not Sought)(Perry, Mark)
November 13, 2009 Filing 3278 Correspondence re: Proposed Modified Schedule (Perry, Mark)
November 10, 2009 Filing 3277 MOTION to Dismiss by Janus Capital Management LLC, Janus Capital Group Inc. Responses due by 11/30/2009 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Cases for Which Dismissal Is Sought, #2 Exhibit Cases for Which Dismissal Is Not Sought)(Perry, Mark)
October 21, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 3276 PAPERLESS ORDER granting (45) Motion to Seal in case 1:04-cv-00518-JFM; granting (3266) Motion to Seal in case 1:04-md-15863-JFM. Signed by Judge J. Frederick Motz on 10/21/09. Associated Cases: 1:04-md-15863-JFM, 1:04-cv-00518-JFM(jnl, Deputy Clerk)
October 7, 2009 Filing 3275 NOTICE to Substitute Attorney Associated Cases: 1:04-md-15863-JFM, 1:04-cv-00560-JFM(Pollack, Daniel)
October 5, 2009 Filing 3274 NOTICE of Change of Address by Ira Lee Sorkin Associated Cases: 1:04-md-15861-CCB, 1:04-md-15862-JFM, 1:04-md-15863-JFM, 1:04-md-15864-JFM(Sorkin, Ira)
October 1, 2009 Filing 3273 NOTICE by Janus Capital Management LLC, Janus Capital Group Inc. Fed. R. Civ. P. 26(a)(1) Initial Disclosures (Perry, Mark)
October 1, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 3272 ORDER APPROVING (186 in 1:04-cv-03798-JFM, 3268 in 1:04-md-15863-JFM) Notice of Voluntary Dismissal of AIC Asset Management, LLC and Security Trust Compnay, N.A.. Signed by Judge J. Frederick Motz on 10/1/09 Associated Cases: 1:04-md-15863-JFM, 1:04-cv-03798-JFM(cag, Deputy Clerk)
September 29, 2009 Filing 3271 RESPONSE in Support re (42 in 1:04-cv-00518-JFM) MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by Janus Capital Management LLC, Janus Capital Group, Inc.. Replies due by 10/13/2009. Associated Cases: 1:04-md-15863-JFM, 1:04-cv-00518-JFM(Perry, Mark)
September 23, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 3270 PAPERLESS ORDER granting #3269 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Robert A Gaumont terminated. Signed by Judge J. Frederick Motz on 9/23/09. (jnl, Deputy Clerk)
September 22, 2009 Filing 3269 MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney by Banc of America Securities LLC, Bank of America, N.A., Bank of America Corporation, Columbia Management Advisors, LLC, Columbia Management Distributors, Inc., Columbia Management Group, LLC, Bacap Distributors, LLC, Banc of America Capital Management LLC, Columbia Wanger Asset Management, L.P., Bank of America, NA Responses due by 10/9/2009 Associated Cases: 1:04-md-15861-CCB, 1:04-md-15862-AMD, 1:04-md-15863-JFM, 1:04-md-15864-JFM(Gaumont, Robert)
September 18, 2009 Filing 3268 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by Krouse Group (Lahm, James)
September 18, 2009 Filing 3267 RESPONSE in Opposition re (3242 in 1:04-md-15863-JFM) MOTION for Summary Judgment, (42 in 1:04-cv-00518-JFM) MOTION for Summary Judgment -- Fund Derivative Plaintiffs' Memorandum of Law in Opposition to Janus Defendants' Motion for Summary Judgment (Offset) -- Filed Under Seal filed by Mei Hung, Jason Hung, Robin Resnick, Doreen Duke, Lauri C. Bader, Sylvia Volin, George Tsetsekos, Lawrence A. Stigas, Jean Stigas, Erik P. Gagnon, Mark J. Keane, Reiko Gagnon, Katharine Clark, Gloria Steinberg, Michael Gaines, Sharon Gaines, Roger Bailey, Joseph Cordani, Barbara Cordani, Michael Lipstein, James E. Schultz, Rhonda Vladimir, Robert K. Finnell, Sherry Chait, Gerald Chait, Janus Adviser Series, Sharon Gaines, A Plaintiff, Smith Barney Fund Management, LLC. Replies due by 10/2/2009. Associated Cases: 1:04-md-15863-JFM, 1:04-cv-00518-JFM(Chimicles, Nicholas) (Additional attachment(s) added on 9/21/2009: #1 Sealed Opposition, #2 Sealed Exhibit A, #3 Sealed Exhibit B, #4 Sealed Exhibit C, #5 Sealed Exhibit D, #6 Sealed Exhibit E, #7 Sealed Exhibit F, #8 Sealed Exhibit G, #9 Sealed Exhibit H) (jnl, Deputy Clerk). Modified on 9/21/2009 (jnl, Deputy Clerk).
September 18, 2009 Filing 3266 MOTION to Seal Fund Derivative Plaintiffs' Memorandum of Law in Opposition to Janus Defendants' Motion for Summary Judgment (Offset) by Mei Hung, Jason Hung, Robin Resnick, Doreen Duke, Lauri C. Bader, Sylvia Volin, George Tsetsekos, Lawrence A. Stigas, Jean Stigas, Erik P. Gagnon, Mark J. Keane, Reiko Gagnon, Katharine Clark, Gloria Steinberg, Michael Gaines, Sharon Gaines, Roger Bailey, Joseph Cordani, Barbara Cordani, Michael Lipstein, James E. Schultz, Rhonda Vladimir, Robert K. Finnell, Sherry Chait, Gerald Chait, Katherine Clark, Sharon Gaines, A Plaintiff Responses due by 10/5/2009 (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)Associated Cases: 1:04-md-15863-JFM, 1:04-cv-00518-JFM(Chimicles, Nicholas)
September 16, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 3265 Paperless ORDER approving #3264 Request for Extension of Time to File filed by Janus Capital Management LLC, Janus Capital Group, Inc.. Signed by Judge J. Frederick Motz on 9/16/09. (Motz, J.)
September 15, 2009 Filing 3264 Joint REQUEST for Extension of Time to File Answer to the Complaint, for Serving and Responding to Discovery Requests and for the Fact Discovery (Perry, Mark)
September 15, 2009 Filing 3263 NOTICE by Janus Capital Group, Inc., Janus Capital Management LLC of Provision of Discovery in Parallel Actions (Perry, Mark)
September 15, 2009 Filing 3262 Correspondence re: Status of Remaining Defendants in the RS Subtrack (Lahm, James)
September 3, 2009 Filing 3261 Correspondence regarding proposed scheduling order. (Motz, J.)
September 3, 2009 Filing 3260 FILED IN ERROR Correspondence re proposed scheduling order. (Motz, J.) Modified on 9/3/2009 (cag, Deputy Clerk).
September 3, 2009 Filing 3259 Correspondence regarding remaining defendants in the RS Investment subtrack. (Motz, J.)
August 28, 2009 Filing 3258 Correspondence re: Proposed Scheduling Order (Perry, Mark)
August 25, 2009 Filing 3257 Correspondence re: Remaining Defendants in the RS Investment subtrack (Lahm, James)
August 19, 2009 Filing 3256 Correspondence regarding stipulation of dismissal in Parthasarathy - JFM-04-3798 (Motz, J.)
August 17, 2009 Filing 3255 STIPULATION of Dismissal by Krouse Group. (Lahm, James)
August 10, 2009 Filing 3254 TRANSCRIPT REQUEST by Putnam Investment Management, LLC, Putnam, LLC, Putnam Retail Management Limited Partnership, Stephen M. Oristaglio, Robert F. Lucey, Irene M. Esteves, Gordon H. Silver, Putnam Investments Trust, Putnam Investment Management Trust (Carroll, James)
August 4, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 3253 Paperless ORDER granting #3252 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply. Signed by Judge J. Frederick Motz on 8/4/09. (Motz, J.)
July 30, 2009 Filing 3252 Second MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to (172 in 1:04-cv-03798-JFM) Bill of Costs,, ( Responses due by 8/17/2009) by Krouse Group (Lahm, James)
July 28, 2009 Filing 3251 NOTICE of Change of Address by Peter M Casey Associated Cases: 1:04-md-15863-JFM, 1:04-cv-00560-JFM(Casey, Peter)
July 24, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 3250 Paperless ORDER granting #3247 Motion for Extension of Time to File Document. Signed by Judge J. Frederick Motz on 7/24/09. (Motz, J.)
July 23, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 3249 Paperless ORDER granting re #3246 Miscellaneous Correspondence requesting extension of time.. Signed by Judge J. Frederick Motz on 7/23/09. (Motz, J.)
July 23, 2009 Filing 3248 Second REQUEST for Extension of Time to File A MEMORANDUM IN SUPPORT OF THEIR MOTION FOR (1) MANDATORY COURT FINDINGS PURSUANT TO THE PRIVATE SECURITIES LITIGATION REFORM ACT OF 1995 AND (2) AWARD OF ATTORNEYS FEES (Baucus, Zeno)
July 23, 2009 Filing 3247 Second MOTION for Extension of Time to File MEMORANDUM IN SUPPORT OF THEIR MOTION FOR (1) MANDATORY COURT FINDINGS PURSUANT TO THE PRIVATE SECURITIES LITIGATION REFORM ACT OF 1995 AND (2) AWARD OF ATTORNEYS FEES by RS Investment Management, LP, James L. Callinan, Steven M. Cohen, G. Randall Hecht, Keith, Peter, McCaffery, Michael G., RS Investment Management Co., LLC, RS Investment Management, Inc., RS Investment Trust, RS Contrarian Value Fund, RS Diversified Growth Fund, RS Emerging Growth Fund, RS Global Natural Resources Fund, RS Growth Fund, RS Information Age Fund, RS Internet Age Fund, RS Midcap Opportunities Fund, RS Partner Fund, RS Smaller Company Growth Fund Responses due by 8/10/2009 (Baucus, Zeno)
July 22, 2009 Filing 3246 Correspondence re: Fund Derivative Plaintiffs' Response to Motion for Summary Judgment by Janus Capital Group (Dkt. No. 3242) Associated Cases: 1:04-md-15863-JFM, 1:04-cv-00518-JFM(Mathews, Timothy)
July 17, 2009 Filing 3245 TRANSCRIPT REQUEST by Lead Plaintiff Ohio Tuition Trust Authority (Heuck, Robert)
July 17, 2009 Filing 3244 TRANSCRIPT REQUEST by Lead Plaintiff Ohio Tuition Trust Authority (Heuck, Robert)
July 17, 2009 Filing 3243 TRANSCRIPT REQUEST by Lead Plaintiff Ohio Tuition Trust Authority (Heuck, Robert)
July 16, 2009 Filing 3242 MOTION for Summary Judgment by Janus Capital Group Inc.. Responses due by 8/3/2009 (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support of Janus Defendants Motion for Summary Judgment, #2 John Mari Supplemental Declaration, #3 Certificate of Service)(Perry, Mark)
July 16, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 3241 ORDER directing defendants bill of costs be administratively closed, subject to being reopened upon notice by defendants in the event that this courts rulings are affirmed on appeal. Signed by Judge J. Frederick Motz on 7/16/09. Associated Cases: 1:04-md-15863-JFM, 1:04-cv-00560-JFM(jnls, Deputy Clerk)
July 16, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 3240 ORDER granting #3239 Motion of RS defendants for entry of final Judgment. Signed by Judge J. Frederick Motz on 7/16/09. (jnls, Deputy Clerk)
July 14, 2009 Filing 3239 MOTION for Judgment by RS Investment Management, LP, James L. Callinan, Steven M. Cohen, G. Randall Hecht, Keith, Peter, McCaffery, Michael G., RS Investment Management Co., LLC, RS Investment Management, Inc., RS Investment Trust, RS Contrarian Value Fund, RS Diversified Growth Fund, RS Emerging Growth Fund, RS Global Natural Resources Fund, RS Growth Fund, RS Information Age Fund, RS Internet Age Fund, RS Midcap Opportunities Fund, RS Partner Fund, RS Smaller Company Growth Fund Responses due by 7/31/2009 (Attachments: #1 Memorandum In Support)(Baucus, Zeno)
July 13, 2009 Filing 3238 Mail Returned as Undeliverable. Mail sent to Peng Yinan, Xiao Tian (Attachments: #1 returned envelope) (jnl, Deputy Clerk)
July 8, 2009 Filing 3237 Transmission of Notice of Appeal and Docket Sheet to US Court of Appeals re #3236 Notice of Appeal. IMPORTANT NOTICE: To access forms which you are required to file with the United States Court of Appeals for the Fourth Circuit please go to http://www.ca4.uscourts.gov and click on Forms & Notices. (sls, Deputy Clerk)
July 8, 2009 Filing 3236 NOTICE OF APPEAL as to #3230 Order on Motion for Entry of Judgment under Rule 54(b), Order on Motion for Entry of Judgment under Rule 54(b), #3235 Order on Motion for Entry of Judgment under Rule 54(b), Order on Motion for Entry of Judgment under Rule 54(b), Order on Motion for Entry of Judgment under Rule 54(b), Order on Motion for Entry of Judgment under Rule 54(b), Order on Motion for Entry of Judgment under Rule 54(b), Order on Motion for Entry of Judgment under Rule 54(b)by Ohio Tuition Trust Authority. Filing fee $ 455, receipt number 04160000000002170738 (sls, Deputy Clerk)
July 1, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 3235 ORDER granting (282) Motion for Entry of Judgment under Rule 54(b) in case 1:04-cv-00560-JFM; granting (95) Motion for Entry of Judgment under Rule 54(b) in case 1:04-cv-00564-JFM; granting (3212) Motion for Entry of Judgment under Rule 54(b) in case 1:04-md-15863-JFM. Signed by Judge J. Frederick Motz on 7/1/09. Associated Cases: 1:04-md-15863-JFM, 1:04-cv-00560-JFM, 1:04-cv-00564-JFM(jnl, Deputy Clerk)
June 30, 2009 Filing 3234 Correspondence confirming matters discussed during the conference call held on June 29, 2009. (Motz, J.)
June 29, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 3233 ORDER denying #3197 Motion for reconsideraation en banc and motion to intervenefiled by Peng Yinan, Jonathan Lee Riches, and Xiao Tian. Signed by Judge J. Frederick Motz on 6/29/09. (jnl, Deputy Clerk)
June 24, 2009 Filing 3232 NOTICE of Change of Address by Daniel A Pollack (Pollack, Daniel)
June 24, 2009 Filing 3231 MOTION for Other Relief Submission of Proposed Order by Carmel Peters Responses due by 7/13/2009 (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)Associated Cases: 1:04-md-15863-JFM, 1:04-cv-00560-JFM(Casey, Peter)
June 24, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 3230 ORDER granting (284) Motion for Entry of Judgment under Rule 54(b) in case 1:04-cv-00560-JFM; granting (3214) Motion for Entry of Judgment under Rule 54(b) in case 1:04-md-15863-JFM; ENTERING Judgment in favor of each and all movants as to each and all claims against them in Saunders. Signed by Judge J. Frederick Motz on 6/24/09. Associated Cases: 1:04-md-15863-JFM, 1:04-cv-00560-JFM(dass, Deputy Clerk)
June 23, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 3229 ORDER Concerning Attachment, APPROVING #3225 Stipulation filed by Daniel G. Calugar. Signed by Judge J. Frederick Motz on 6/23/09. (dass, Deputy Clerk)(04-cv-2277)
June 23, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 3228 Paperless ORDER Approving #3225 STIPULATION AND ORDER. Signed by Judge J. Frederick Motz on 6/23/2009. (Motz, J.)
June 22, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 3227 Paperless ORDER granting #3226 Motion for Extension of Time. Signed by Judge J. Frederick Motz on 6/22/2009. (Motz, J.)
June 18, 2009 Filing 3226 MOTION for Extension of Time to Submit Bill of Costs by Janus Distributors LLC, Janus Capital Management LLC, Janus Capital Group Inc. Responses due by 7/6/2009 (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support of Motion to Extend Bill of Costs, #2 Text of Proposed Order)Associated Cases: 1:04-md-15863-JFM, 1:04-cv-00497-JFM(McConkie, John)
June 17, 2009 Filing 3225 STIPULATION Joint Stipulation and [Proposed] Order Concerning Order of Attachment by Daniel G. Calugar. (Scholes, Steven)
June 12, 2009 Filing 3224 RESPONSE in Support re (2327 in 1:04-md-15863-JFM) MOTION for Judgment ENTRY PURSUANT TO RULE 54(b) of the FRCP, (2206 in 1:04-md-15863-JFM, 108 in 1:04-cv-00560-JFM) MOTION for Entry of Judgment under Rule 54(b) Memorandum of Plaintiffs Regarding Motions of the Putnam Employee Defendants, Ian C. Ferguson, William H. Woolverton and Omid Kamshad for Entry of Final Judgment filed by Lead Plaintiff Ohio Tuition Trust Authority. Replies due by 6/26/2009. Associated Cases: 1:04-md-15863-JFM, 1:04-cv-00560-JFM(Heuck, Robert)
June 12, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 3223 ORDER GRANTING (84 in 1:04-cv-00497-JFM, 2954 in 1:04-md-15863-JFM) MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by Janus Distributors LLC, Janus Capital Management LLC, Janus Capital Group Inc.; ENTERING Judgment in favor of Defendants Janus Capital Group Inc., Janus Capital Management LLC, and Janus Distributors LLC, against Plaintiffs Signed by Judge J. Frederick Motz on 6/12/09. Associated Cases: 1:04-md-15863-JFM, 1:04-cv-00497-JFM(cag, Deputy Clerk)
June 12, 2009 Filing 3222 OPINION Signed by Judge J. Frederick Motz on 6/12/09. Associated Cases: 1:04-md-15863-JFM, 1:04-cv-00497-JFM(cag, Deputy Clerk)
June 11, 2009 Filing 3220 RESPONSE re (281 in 1:04-cv-00560-JFM) Bill of Costs,, Memorandum of Plaintiffs in Opposition to Putnam Defendants' Bill of Costs filed by Lead Plaintiff Ohio Tuition Trust Authority. Associated Cases: 1:04-md-15863-JFM, 1:04-cv-00560-JFM(Heuck, Robert)
June 10, 2009 Filing 3221 MANDATE of USCA as to #2404 Notice of Appeal filed by First Derivative Traders (nrm, Deputy Clerk)
June 9, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 3219 Paperless ORDER granting #3210 Motion for Extension of Time. Signed by Judge J. Frederick Motz on 06/09/2009. (Motz, J.)
June 2, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 3218 ORDER of USCA "Denying" the petition for rehearing en banc as to #2404 Notice of Appeal filed by First Derivative Traders (nrm, Deputy Clerk)
June 1, 2009 Filing 3217 RESPONSE in Opposition re #3208 MOTION to Vacate Attachment Order filed by MFS Emerging Growth Fund, MFS Research Fund, MFS Fund Distributors, Inc., Massachusetts Financial Services Company, Massachusetts Investors Growth Stock Fund, Massachusetts Investors Trust. Replies due by 6/15/2009. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D)(Sheehan, William)
June 1, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 3216 Paperless ORDER granting #3215 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response to RS Defendants' Bill of Costs. Signed by Judge J. Frederick Motz on 06/01/2009. (Motz, J.)
May 29, 2009 Filing 3215 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to (172 in 1:04-cv-03798-JFM) Bill of Costs,, (3206 in 1:04-md-15863-JFM) Bill of Costs,, ( Responses due by 6/15/2009) by Krouse Group (Lahm, James)
May 29, 2009 Filing 3214 MOTION for Entry of Judgment under Rule 54(b) [Unopposed] by Putnam Retail Management Limited Partnership, Stephen M. Oristaglio, Robert F. Lucey, Irene M. Esteves, Gordon H. Silver, Lawrence J. Lasser, Putnam Investment Management Trust, Putnam LLC, Marsh & McLennan Companies, Inc., Putnam Investments Trust, Putnam Investment Management LLC, Putnam Retail Management Limited Partnership, Stephen M. Oristaglio, Robert F. Lucey, Irene M. Esteves, Gordon H. Silver, Putnam Investment Management LLC, Putnam Investments Trust Responses due by 6/15/2009 (Attachments: #1 Memorandum Of Law, #2 [Proposed] Order)Associated Cases: 1:04-md-15863-JFM, 1:04-cv-00560-JFM(Simshauser, Peter)
May 29, 2009 Filing 3213 MOTION for Entry of Judgment under Rule 54(b) Memorandum in Support of Putnam Employee Defendants' Rule 54(b) Motion by Carmel Peters Responses due by 6/15/2009 (Casey, Peter)
May 29, 2009 Filing 3212 MOTION for Entry of Judgment under Rule 54(b) of Putnam Employee Defendants by Carmel Peters Responses due by 6/15/2009 (Casey, Peter)
May 28, 2009 Filing 3211 BILL OF COSTS by Putnam Retail Management Limited Partnership, Stephen M. Oristaglio, Robert F. Lucey, Irene M. Esteves, Gordon H. Silver, Putnam Investment Management Trust, Putnam LLC, Putnam Investments Trust, Putnam Investment Management LLC, Putnam Retail Management Limited Partnership, Stephen M. Oristaglio, Robert F. Lucey, Irene M. Esteves, Gordon H. Silver, Putnam Investment Management LLC, Putnam Investments Trust. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum Of Law In Support Of The Putnam Defendants' Bill Of Costs, #2 Declaration Of Peter Simshauser, #3 Exhibit 1, #4 Exhibit 2, #5 Exhibit 3, #6 Exhibit 4)Associated Cases: 1:04-md-15863-JFM, 1:04-cv-00560-JFM(Simshauser, Peter)
May 28, 2009 Filing 3210 MOTION for Extension of Time to file Memorandum in Support of Motion for (1) Mandatory Court Findings Pursuant to the Private Securities Litigation Reform Act of 1995 and (2) Award of Attorneys' Fees by RS Investment Management, LP, James L. Callinan, Steven M. Cohen, G. Randall Hecht, Keith, Peter, McCaffery, Michael G., RS Investment Management Co., LLC, RS Investment Management, Inc., RS Investment Trust, RS Contrarian Value Fund, RS Diversified Growth Fund, RS Emerging Growth Fund, RS Global Natural Resources Fund, RS Growth Fund, RS Information Age Fund, RS Internet Age Fund, RS Midcap Opportunities Fund, RS Partner Fund, RS Smaller Company Growth Fund Responses due by 6/15/2009 (Baucus, Zeno)
May 19, 2009 Filing 3209 Memorandum re #3208 MOTION to Vacate Attachment Order In Support filed by Daniel Calugar. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G)(Scholes, Steven)
May 19, 2009 Filing 3208 MOTION to Vacate Attachment Order by Daniel Calugar Responses due by 6/5/2009 (Scholes, Steven)
May 15, 2009 Filing 3207 RESPONSE in Opposition re (171 in 1:04-cv-03798-JFM) MOTION for Attorney Fees and for Court Findings Pursuant to the Private Securities Ligitation Reform Act of 1995 ( Replies due by 5/29/2009.) filed by Krouse Group. (Lahm, James)
May 14, 2009 Filing 3206 BILL OF COSTS by RS Investment Management, LP, James L. Callinan, Steven M. Cohen, G. Randall Hecht, Keith, Peter, McCaffery, Michael G., RS Investment Management Co., LLC, RS Investment Management, Inc., RS Investment Trust, RS Contrarian Value Fund, RS Diversified Growth Fund, RS Emerging Growth Fund, RS Global Natural Resources Fund, RS Growth Fund, RS Information Age Fund, RS Internet Age Fund, RS Midcap Opportunities Fund, RS Partner Fund, RS Smaller Company Growth Fund. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum In Support of Bill of Costs, #2 Affidavit Affidavit of Z. Baucus ISO Bill of Costs, #3 Exhibit Exhibits to Affidavit of Z. Baucus, #4 Certificate of Service)(Baucus, Zeno)
May 14, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 3205 ORDER re (275 in 1:04-cv-00560-JFM, 3192 in 1:04-md-15863-JFM); the order entered by this court on April 14, 2009 is modified for the purpose of clarifying that summary judgment was entered only on behalf of the Putnam Defendants (Putnam Investments Trust, Putnam, LLC, Putnam Investment Management Trust, Putnam Investment Management, LLC, Putnam Retail Management Limited Partnership, Irene M. Esteves, Robert F. Lucey, Stephen M. Oristaglio, Gordon H. Silver) and Lawrence J. Lasser; Paragraph two of the April 14, 2009 order is hereby modified to enter judgment only on behalf of the Putnam Defendants, and Lawrence J. Lasser. Signed by Judge J. Frederick Motz on 5/14/09. Associated Cases: 1:04-md-15863-JFM, 1:04-cv-00560-JFM(jnl, Deputy Clerk)
May 13, 2009 Filing 3204 Correspondence re: May 13, 2009 Teleconference Associated Cases: 1:04-md-15863-JFM, 1:04-cv-00560-JFM(Simshauser, Peter)
May 13, 2009 Filing 3203 Correspondence re: request for clarification (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)Associated Cases: 1:04-md-15863-JFM, 1:04-cv-00560-JFM(Heuck, Robert)
May 11, 2009 Filing 3202 RESPONSE re #3197 MOTION to Intervene MOTION for Reconsideration filed by RS Investment Management, LP, James L. Callinan, Steven M. Cohen, G. Randall Hecht, Keith, Peter, McCaffery, Michael G., RS Investment Management Co., LLC, RS Investment Management, Inc.. (Gallagher, Richard)
May 7, 2009 Filing 3201 JUDGMENT of USCA (certified copy) "Reversing" the judgment of the District Court and "Remanding" case to the District Court for further proceedings consistent with the Court's decision as to #2404 Notice of Appeal filed by First Derivative Traders (Attachments: #1 opinion)(nrm, Deputy Clerk)
April 28, 2009 Filing 3200 MOTION for Attorney Fees and for Court Finding Pursuant to Private Securities Litigation Reform Act of 1995 by RS Investment Management, LP, James L. Callinan, Steven M. Cohen, G. Randall Hecht, Keith, Peter, McCaffery, Michael G., RS Investment Management Co., LLC, RS Investment Management, Inc., RS Investment Trust, RS Contrarian Value Fund, RS Diversified Growth Fund, RS Emerging Growth Fund, RS Global Natural Resources Fund, RS Growth Fund, RS Information Age Fund, RS Internet Age Fund, RS Midcap Opportunities Fund, RS Partner Fund, RS Smaller Company Growth Fund Responses due by 5/15/2009 (Baucus, Zeno)
April 24, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 3199 Paperless ORDER granting (276) Motion for Extension of Time in case 1:04-cv-00560-JFM; granting (3198) Motion for Extension of Time in case 1:04-md-15863-JFM. Signed by Judge J. Frederick Motz on 4/24/2009. Associated Cases: 1:04-md-15863-JFM, 1:04-cv-00560-JFM(Motz, J.)
April 24, 2009 Filing 3198 MOTION for Extension of Time To File A Bill Of Costs by Putnam Retail Management Limited Partnership, Stephen M. Oristaglio, Robert F. Lucey, Irene M. Esteves, Gordon H. Silver, Putnam Investment Management Trust, Putnam LLC, Putnam Investments Trust, Putnam Investment Management LLC, Putnam Retail Management Limited Partnership, Stephen M. Oristaglio, Robert F. Lucey, Irene M. Esteves, Gordon H. Silver, Putnam Investment Management LLC, Putnam Investments Trust Responses due by 5/11/2009 (Attachments: #1 Memorandum of Law In Support, #2 [Proposed] Order)Associated Cases: 1:04-md-15863-JFM, 1:04-cv-00560-JFM(Simshauser, Peter)
April 24, 2009 Filing 3197 MOTION to Intervene, MOTION for Reconsideration by Jonathan Lee Riches, Peng Yinan, Xiao Tian (cag, Deputy Clerk) (Additional attachment(s) added on 4/24/2009: #1 Unredacted) (cag, Deputy Clerk).
April 24, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 3196 Paperless ORDER granting #3195 Motion for Extension of Time. Signed by Judge J. Frederick Motz on 4/24/09. (Motz, J.)
April 23, 2009 Filing 3195 MOTION for Extension of Time to File a Bill of Costs by RS Investment Management, LP, James L. Callinan, Steven M. Cohen, G. Randall Hecht, Keith, Peter, McCaffery, Michael G., RS Investment Management Co., LLC, RS Investment Management, Inc., RS Investment Trust, RS Contrarian Value Fund, RS Diversified Growth Fund, RS Emerging Growth Fund, RS Global Natural Resources Fund, RS Growth Fund, RS Information Age Fund, RS Internet Age Fund, RS Midcap Opportunities Fund, RS Partner Fund, RS Smaller Company Growth Fund Responses due by 5/11/2009 (Baucus, Zeno)
April 22, 2009 Filing 3194 Substantive legal issues - addressing Associated Cases: 1:04-md-15863-JFM, 1:04-cv-00497-JFM(Molumphy, Mark)
April 21, 2009 Filing 3193 Substantive legal issues - addressing Associated Cases: 1:04-md-15863-JFM, 1:04-cv-00497-JFM(McConkie, John)
April 14, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 3192 ORDER Granting (219 in 1:04-cv-00560-JFM, 2956 in 1:04-md-15863-JFM) MOTION for Summary Judgment, (220 in 1:04-cv-00560-JFM, 2957 in 1:04-md-15863-JFM) MOTION for Summary Judgment, (2949 in 1:04-md-15863-JFM, 216 in 1:04-cv-00560-JFM) MOTION for Summary Judgment, (2959 in 1:04-md-15863-JFM, 222 in 1:04-cv-00560-JFM) MOTION for Summary Judgment; Entering Judgment in favor of Defendants against plaintiffs. Signed by Judge J. Frederick Motz on 4/14/09 Associated Cases: 1:04-md-15863-JFM, 1:04-cv-00560-JFM(cag, Deputy Clerk)
April 14, 2009 Filing 3191 MEMORANDUM Signed by Judge J. Frederick Motz on 4/14/09. Associated Cases: 1:04-md-15863-JFM, 1:04-cv-00560-JFM(cag, Deputy Clerk)
April 14, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 3190 ORDER denying (128) Motion for Reconsideration in case 1:04-cv-00497-JFM; denying (3157) Motion for Reconsideration ; denying (3158) Motion for Reconsideration in case 1:04-md-15863-JFM. Signed by Judge J. Frederick Motz on 4/14/09 Associated Cases: 1:04-md-15863-JFM, 1:04-cv-00497-JFM(cag, Deputy Clerk)
April 14, 2009 Filing 3189 MEMORANDUM Signed by Judge J. Frederick Motz on 4/14/09. Associated Cases: 1:04-md-15863-JFM, 1:04-cv-00497-JFM(cag, Deputy Clerk)
April 14, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 3188 ORDER granting (2965) Motion for Summary Judgment; granting (2968) Motion for Summary Judgment in case 1:04-md-15863-JFM; granting (126) Motion for Summary Judgment; granting (128) Motion for Summary Judgment in case 1:04-cv-03798-JFM; Entering Judgment in favor of Defendants against plaintiffs. Signed by Judge J. Frederick Motz on 4/14/09 Associated Cases: 1:04-md-15863-JFM, 1:04-cv-03798-JFM(cag, Deputy Clerk)
April 14, 2009 Filing 3187 MEMORANDUM Signed by Judge J. Frederick Motz on 4/14/09 Associated Cases: 1:04-md-15863-JFM, 1:04-cv-03798-JFM(cag, Deputy Clerk)
April 14, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 3186 Paperless ORDER granting (266); (268); (270); (272) Motions to Seal in case 1:04-cv-00560-JFM; granting (3156); (3165); (3172); (3177); (3179); (3180) Motions to Seal in case 1:04-md-15863-JFM. Signed by Judge J. Frederick Motz on 04/14/2009. Associated Cases: 1:04-md-15863-JFM, 1:04-cv-00560-JFM(Motz, J.)
April 10, 2009 Filing 3185 NOTICE of Change of Address by Michael Thomas Gass (Gass, Michael)
March 31, 2009 Filing 3184 REPLY to Response to Motion re (128 in 1:04-cv-00497-JFM) MOTION for Reconsideration filed by Maloon Powers Pitre & Higgins, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Appendix of Authorities)Associated Cases: 1:04-md-15863-JFM, 1:04-cv-00497-JFM(Ponist, Sean)
March 31, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 3183 PAPERLESS ORDER approving #3182 Notice to Substitute Attorney filed by Theodore C. Sihpol, III. Signed by Judge J. Frederick Motz on 3/31/09. (jnl, Deputy Clerk)
March 30, 2009 Filing 3182 NOTICE to Substitute Attorney NOTICE to Substitute Attorney for Defendant Theodore C. Sihpol, III (Margolis, Daniel)
March 30, 2009 Filing 3181 REPLY to Response to Motion re #3157 MOTION for Reconsideration re #3140 Memorandum Opinion, #3141 Order on Motion for Summary Judgment,,,,,,,,,,,,,,, MOTION for Reconsideration re #3140 Memorandum Opinion, #3141 Order on Motion for Summary Judgment,,,,,,,,,,,,,,, MOTION for Reconsideration re #3140 Memorandum Opinion, #3141 Order on Motion for Summary Judgment,,,,,,,,,,,,,,, MOTION for Reconsideration re #3140 Memorandum Opinion, #3141 Order on Motion for Summary Judgment,,,,,,,,,,,,,,, filed by Joseph Shanis, Ohio Tuition Trust Authority. (Wayne, Richard) (Additional attachment(s) added on 3/31/2009: #1 Sealed Reply Memorandum) (jnl, Deputy Clerk). Modified on 3/31/2009 (jnl, Deputy Clerk).
March 30, 2009 Filing 3180 MOTION to Seal Reply Memorandum in Support of Plaintiffs' Motion for Reconsideration of the Court's Decision Granting in Part Defendants' Motions for Summary Judgment Entered on December 30, 2008 by Joseph Shanis, Ohio Tuition Trust Authority Responses due by 4/16/2009 (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Wayne, Richard)
March 9, 2009 Filing 3179 Second MOTION to Seal In Connection With Their Opposition Memorandum by Putnam LLC, Putnam Investment Management, LLC, Putnam Retail Management Limited Partnership, Stephen M. Oristaglio, Robert F. Lucey, Irene M. Esteves, Gordon H. Silver, Putnam Investments Trust, Putnam Investment Management Trust Responses due by 3/26/2009 (Attachments: #1 Memorandum Of Law In Support Of The Putnam Defendants' Second Interim Sealing Motion In Connection With Their Opposition Memorandum, #2 [Proposed] Order)Associated Cases: 1:04-md-15863-JFM, 1:04-cv-00560-JFM(Simshauser, Peter)
March 9, 2009 Filing 3178 RESPONSE in Opposition re (3157 in 1:04-md-15863-JFM) MOTION for Reconsideration re (3140) Memorandum Opinion, (3141) Order on Motion for Summary Judgment,,,,,,,,,,,,,,, MOTION for Reconsideration re (3140) Memorandum Opinion, (3141) Order on Motion for Summary Judgment,,,,,,,,,,,,,,, MOTION for Reconsideration re (3140) Memorandum Opinion, (3141) Order on Motion for Summary Judgment,,,,,,,,,,,,,,, MOTION for Reconsideration re (3140) Memorandum Opinion, (3141) Order on Motion for Summary Judgment,,,,,,,,,,,,,,, Putnam Defendants' Memorandum Of Law In Opposition To Plaintiffs' Motion For Reconsideration filed by Putnam LLC, Putnam Retail Management Limited Partnership, Stephen M. Oristaglio, Robert F. Lucey, Irene M. Esteves, Gordon H. Silver, Putnam Investment Management LLC, Putnam Investments Trust, Putnam Investment Management Trust. Replies due by 3/23/2009. (Attachments: #1 Transmittal Affidavit, #2 Supplemental Appendix 164, #3 Supplemental Appendix 166, #4 Supplemental Appendix 167, #5 Supplemental Appendix 165, 168, 169)Associated Cases: 1:04-md-15863-JFM, 1:04-cv-00560-JFM(Simshauser, Peter) (Additional attachment(s) added on 3/11/2009: #6 Sealed Opposition, #7 Sealed Exhibit, #8 Sealed Exhibit, #9 Sealed Exhibit) (jnl, Deputy Clerk). Modified on 3/11/2009 (jnl, Deputy Clerk).
March 9, 2009 Filing 3177 MOTION to Seal In Connection With Their Opposition Memorandum by Putnam LLC, Putnam Investment Management, LLC, Putnam Retail Management Limited Partnership, Stephen M. Oristaglio, Robert F. Lucey, Irene M. Esteves, Gordon H. Silver, Putnam Investments Trust, Putnam Investment Management Trust Responses due by 3/26/2009 (Attachments: #1 Memorandum Of Law In Support Of The Putnam Defendants' Interim Sealing Motion In Connection With Their Opposition Memorandum, #2 [Proposed] Order)Associated Cases: 1:04-md-15863-JFM, 1:04-cv-00560-JFM(Simshauser, Peter)
March 9, 2009 Filing 3176 RESPONSE in Opposition re (3158 in 1:04-md-15863-JFM, 128 in 1:04-cv-00497-JFM) MOTION for Reconsideration of the Court's December 30, 2008 Order filed by Janus Distributors LLC, Janus Capital Management LLC, Janus Capital Group Inc.. Replies due by 3/23/2009. Associated Cases: 1:04-md-15863-JFM, 1:04-cv-00497-JFM(McConkie, John)
February 25, 2009 Filing 3175 RESPONSE re (131 in 1:04-cv-00497-JFM) Supplemental Plaintiff California Financial Advisors' Responsive Memorandum Addressing Scienter filed by Maloon Powers Pitre & Higgins, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Combined Exhibit Index, #2 Exhibit 62, #3 Exhibit 63, #4 Exhibit 64, #5 Exhibit 65, #6 Exhibit 66, #7 Exhibit 67)Associated Cases: 1:04-md-15863-JFM, 1:04-cv-00497-JFM(Ponist, Sean)
February 25, 2009 Filing 3174 RESPONSE re (132 in 1:04-cv-00497-JFM) Supplemental Responsive Memorandum Addressing Scienter filed by Janus Distributors LLC, Janus Capital Management LLC, Janus Capital Group Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Composite Index of Exhibits)Associated Cases: 1:04-md-15863-JFM, 1:04-cv-00497-JFM(McConkie, John)
February 25, 2009 Filing 3173 RESPONSE re (3166 in 1:04-md-15863-JFM) Memorandum,,, Regarding Fair Funds Offset filed by Putnam LLC, Stephen M. Oristaglio, Robert F. Lucey, Irene M. Esteves, Gordon H. Silver, Putnam Investment Management LLC, Putnam Investments Trust, Putnam Investment Management Trust. (Attachments: #1 Transmittal Affidavit Of Peter Simshauser, #2 Supplemental Appendix 163)Associated Cases: 1:04-md-15863-JFM, 1:04-cv-00560-JFM(Simshauser, Peter) (Additional attachment(s) added on 3/3/2009: #3 Sealed Response, #4 Sealed Supplemental Appendix) (jnl, Deputy Clerk). Modified on 3/3/2009 (jnl, Deputy Clerk).
February 25, 2009 Filing 3172 MOTION to Seal In Connection With Their Supplemental Memorandum In Response by Putnam Retail Management Limited Partnership, Stephen M. Oristaglio, Robert F. Lucey, Irene M. Esteves, Gordon H. Silver, Putnam Investment Management LLC, Putnam Investments Trust, Putnam Investment Management Trust Responses due by 3/16/2009 (Attachments: #1 Memornadum Of Law In Support Of The Putnam Defendants' Interrim Sealing Motion In Connection With Their Supplemental Memorandum In Response, #2 [Proposed] Order)Associated Cases: 1:04-md-15863-JFM, 1:04-cv-00560-JFM(Simshauser, Peter)
February 25, 2009 Filing 3171 RESPONSE in Opposition re #2956 MOTION for Summary Judgment On All Remaining Claims Lead Plaintiffs' Memorandum in Response to the Putnam Defendants' Supplemental Memorandum of Law in Further Support of Their Motion for Summary Judgment filed by Joseph Shanis, Ohio Tuition Trust Authority. Replies due by 3/11/2009. (Wayne, Richard)
February 23, 2009 Filing 3170 MANDATE of USCA as to #2105 Notice of Appeal filed by Matthew Wiggenhorn (nrm, Deputy Clerk)
February 18, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 3169 ORDER granting in part and denying in part #3148 Motion of Mr. Borstein to Withdraw as Attorney for Trautman Wasserman & Co. Inc. and Gregory O. Trautman.. Signed by Judge J. Frederick Motz on 2/17/09. (jnl, Deputy Clerk)
February 11, 2009 Filing 3168 Supplemental to Plaintiff California Financial Advisors' Supplemental Memorandum Addressing Scienter. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Index)Associated Cases: 1:04-md-15863-JFM, 1:04-cv-00497-JFM(Ponist, Sean) (Exhibits 50-60 rec'd 2/18/09) Modified on 2/19/2009 (jnl, Deputy Clerk).
February 11, 2009 Filing 3167 Supplemental to #2956 The Putnam Defendants' Supplemental Memorandum Of Law In Further Support Of Their Motion For Summary Judgment. (Attachments: #1 Transmittal Affidavit Of Peter Simshauser)Associated Cases: 1:04-md-15863-JFM, 1:04-cv-00560-JFM(Simshauser, Peter) (Additional attachment(s) added on 2/18/2009: #2 Sealed Supplemental Memorandum) (jnl, Deputy Clerk). Modified on 2/18/2009 (jnl, Deputy Clerk).
February 11, 2009 Filing 3166 Memorandum re #3157 MOTION for Reconsideration re #3140 Memorandum Opinion, #3141 Order on Motion for Summary Judgment,,,,,,,,,,,,,,, MOTION for Reconsideration re #3140 Memorandum Opinion, #3141 Order on Motion for Summary Judgment,,,,,,,,,,,,,,, MOTION for Reconsideration re #3140 Memorandum Opinion, #3141 Order on Motion for Summary Judgment,,,,,,,,,,,,,,, MOTION for Reconsideration re #3140 Memorandum Opinion, #3141 Order on Motion for Summary Judgment,,,,,,,,,,,,,,, filed by Joseph Shanis, Ohio Tuition Trust Authority. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit Exhibit 4, Part 1, #5 Exhibit Exhibit 4, Part 2, #6 Exhibit Exhibit 5, #7 Exhibit Exhibit 6 Part 1, #8 Exhibit Exhibit 6 Part 2)(Wayne, Richard)
February 11, 2009 Filing 3165 MOTION to Seal Putnam Defendants' Interim Sealing Motion In Connection With Their Supplemental Memorandum by Putnam LLC, Putnam Retail Management Limited Partnership, Stephen M. Oristaglio, Robert F. Lucey, Irene M. Esteves, Gordon H. Silver, Putnam Investment Management LLC, Putnam Investments Trust, Putnam Investment Management Trust Responses due by 3/2/2009 (Attachments: #1 Memorandum Of Law In Support Of The Putnam Defendants' Interim Sealing Motion In Connection With Their Supplemental Memorandum, #2 [Proposed] Order)Associated Cases: 1:04-md-15863-JFM, 1:04-cv-00560-JFM(Simshauser, Peter)
February 11, 2009 Filing 3164 Supplemental to Memorandum of Points and Authorities Addressing Scienter. (Attachments: #1 Appendix, #2 Supplement Index of Exhibits)Associated Cases: 1:04-md-15863-JFM, 1:04-cv-00497-JFM(McConkie, John)
January 30, 2009 Filing 3163 JUDGMENT of USCA (certified copy) "Affirming" the judgment of the District Court as to #2107 Notice of Appeal filed by Edmund Woodbury, #2105 Notice of Appeal filed by Matthew Wiggenhorn, #2109 Notice of Appeal filed by Nitika Mehta (nrm, Deputy Clerk)
January 30, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 3162 Paperless ORDER approving the schedule proposed in re #3161 Miscellaneous Correspondence. Signed by Judge J. Frederick Motz on 1/30/09. (Motz, J.)
January 26, 2009 Filing 3161 Correspondence re: Responses to Plaintiffs' Motions for Reconsideration Associated Cases: 1:04-md-15863-JFM, 1:04-cv-00497-JFM(McConkie, John)
January 22, 2009 Filing 3160 Correspondence re: January 27, 2009 hearing in the RS Subtrack (Isbister, John)
January 21, 2009 Filing 3159 Memorandum re (3158 in 1:04-md-15863-JFM, 128 in 1:04-cv-00497-JFM) MOTION for Reconsideration of the Court's December 30, 2008 Order filed by Maloon Powers Pitre & Higgins, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)Associated Cases: 1:04-md-15863-JFM, 1:04-cv-00497-JFM(Ponist, Sean)
January 21, 2009 Filing 3158 MOTION for Reconsideration of the Court's December 30, 2008 Order by Maloon Powers Pitre & Higgins, LLC Responses due by 2/9/2009 Associated Cases: 1:04-md-15863-JFM, 1:04-cv-00497-JFM(Ponist, Sean)
January 21, 2009 Filing 3157 MOTION for Reconsideration re #3140 Memorandum Opinion, #3141 Order on Motion for Summary Judgment,by Joseph Shanis, Ohio Tuition Trust Authority Responses due by 2/9/2009 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Memorandum in Support of Plaintiffs' Motion for Reconsideration of the Court's Decision Granting in Part Defendants' Motions for Summary Judgment Entered on December 31, 2008 (NOTICE OF FILING OF DOCUMENTS UNDER SEAL), #2 Text of Proposed Order)(Wayne, Richard) Modified on 1/22/2009 (cags, Deputy Clerk). (Additional attachment(s) added on 1/22/2009: #3 Memorandum in Support, #4 Sealed Appendix of Exhibits, #5 Sealed Exhibit 1, #6 Sealed Exhibit 2, #7 Sealed Exhibit 3, #8 Sealed Exhibit 4, #9 Sealed Exhibit 5, #10 Sealed Exhibit 6, #11 Sealed Exhibit 7, #12 Sealed Exhibit 8, #13 Sealed Exhibit 9, #14 Sealed Exhibit 10) (cags, Deputy Clerk). Modified on 1/22/2009 (cags, Deputy Clerk).
January 21, 2009 Filing 3156 MOTION to Seal Memorandum in Support of Plaintiffs Ohio Tuition Trust Authority and Joseph Shanis Motion for Reconsideration of the Court's Decision Granting in Part Defendants' Motions for Summary Judgment Entered on December 31, 2008 and Exhibits Thereto by Joseph Shanis, Ohio Tuition Trust Authority Responses due by 2/9/2009 (Wayne, Richard)
January 15, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 3155 Paperless ORDER granting #3114 Motion to Seal. Signed by Judge J. Frederick Motz on 1/15/2009. (Motz, J.)
January 15, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 3154 Paperless ORDER granting (258) Motion to Seal in case 1:04-cv-00560-JFM; granting (91) Motion to Seal in case 1:04-cv-00564-JFM; granting (3133) Motion to Seal in case 1:04-md-15863-JFM. Signed by Judge J. Frederick Motz on 1/15/2009. Associated Cases: 1:04-md-15863-JFM, 1:04-cv-00560-JFM, 1:04-cv-00564-JFM(Motz, J.)
January 15, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 3153 Paperless ORDER granting (3123) Motion to Seal in case 1:04-md-15863-JFM; granting (163) Motion to Seal in case 1:04-cv-03798-JFM. Signed by Judge J. Frederick Motz on 1/15/2009. Associated Cases: 1:04-md-15863-JFM, 1:04-cv-03798-JFM(Motz, J.)
January 15, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 3152 Paperless ORDER Approving Briefing Schedule Proposed in (3151 in 1:04-md-15863-JFM). Signed by Judge J. Frederick Motz on 1/15/2009. Associated Cases: 1:04-md-15863-JFM, 1:04-cv-00497-JFM, 1:04-cv-00560-JFM(Motz, J.)
January 14, 2009 Filing 3151 Correspondence re: Response to Judge Motz letter dated 01/06/09 (ECF #3146) regarding supplemental briefing (Isbister, John)
January 9, 2009 Filing 3150 NOTICE of Hearing: A hearing on the RS subtrack summary judgment, class certification, and Daubert motions will be held on January 27, 2009 at 2:15 PM. Associated Cases: 1:04-md-15863-JFM, 1:04-cv-03798-JFM(Motz, J.)
January 7, 2009 Filing 3149 RESPONSE in Support Notice of Filing of Document Under Seal (Omnibus Reply Memorandum in Support of Motion to Supplement Plaintiffs' Omnibus Memorandum of Law in Opposition to Defendants' Motion to Exclude the Testimony and Reports of Marc Vellrath, Ph.D., CFA) filed by Ohio Tuition Trust Authority, Joseph Shanis, Joseph Shanis. Replies due by 1/21/2009. Associated Cases: 1:04-md-15861-CCB, 1:04-md-15862-AMD, 1:04-md-15863-JFM, 1:04-md-15864-JFM(Wayne, Richard)
January 7, 2009 Filing 3148 MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney by Trautman Wasserman & Company, Inc., Gregory Trautman (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(jnl, Deputy Clerk)
January 7, 2009 Filing 3147 Substantive legal issues - addressing (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Funds in Which Plaintiff OTTA Invested, #2 Exhibit B - Funds in Which Plaintiff Joseph Shannis Invested, #3 Exhibit C - Dilution Damages Using Delta NAV Method by Account Type and Fund (FILED UNDER SEAL), #4 Exhibit D - Timers Purchases as a Share of Total Purchases by Fund)Associated Cases: 1:04-md-15861-CCB, 1:04-md-15863-JFM(Wayne, Richard)
January 6, 2009 Filing 3146 Correspondence Setting Conference Call re: Janus and Putnam Briefing Schedules Associated Cases: 1:04-md-15863-JFM, 1:04-cv-00497-JFM, 1:04-cv-00560-JFM(Motz, J.)
January 5, 2009 Filing 3145 (FILED IN ERROR) RESPONSE in Support Notice of Filing of Document Under Seal (Omnibus Reply Memorandum in Support of Motion to Supplement Plaintiffs Omnibus Memorandum of Law in Opposition to Defendants Motion to Exclude the Testimony and Reports of Marc Vellrath, Ph.D., CFA) filed by Ohio Tuition Trust Authority, Joseph Shanis, Joseph Shanis. Replies due by 1/20/2009. Associated Cases: 1:04-md-15861-CCB, 1:04-md-15862-AMD, 1:04-md-15863-JFM, 1:04-md-15864-JFM(Wayne, Richard) Modified on 1/7/2009 (jnl, Deputy Clerk).
December 30, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 3144 Paperless ORDER finding as moot (94) Motion for Summary Judgment in case 1:04-cv-00497-JFM; finding as moot (2981) Motion for Summary Judgment in case 1:04-md-15863-JFM. Signed by Judge J. Frederick Motz on 12/30/08. Associated Cases: 1:04-md-15863-JFM, 1:04-cv-00497-JFM(Motz, J.)
December 30, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 3143 ORDER granting #2982 Motion for Default Judgment on the issue of liability as to Defendants Trautman Wasserman Co. and Gregory Trautman. Signed by Judge J. Frederick Motz on 12/30/08. (Motz, J.)
December 30, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 3142 ORDER granting in part, denying in part and dismissing in part (84) Motion for Summary Judgment in case 1:04-cv-00497-JFM; denying (31) Motion for Summary Judgment in case 1:04-cv-00518-JFM; granting in part, denying in part and dismissing in part (2954) Motion for Summary Judgment in case 1:04-md-15863-JFM. Signed by Judge J. Frederick Motz on 12/30/08. Associated Cases: 1:04-md-15863-JFM, 1:04-cv-00497-JFM, 1:04-cv-00518-JFM(Motz, J.)
December 30, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 3141 ORDER granting in part and denying in part (216) Motion for Summary Judgment; granting in part and denying in part (219) Motion for Summary Judgment; granting in part and denying in part (220) Motion for Summary Judgment; granting in part and denying in part (222) Motion for Summary Judgment in case 1:04-cv-00560-JFM; denying (64) Motion for Summary Judgment in case 1:04-cv-00564-JFM; granting in part and denying in part (2949) Motion for Summary Judgment; granting in part and denying in part (2956) Motion for Summary Judgment; granting in part and denying in part (2957) Motion for Summary Judgment; granting in part and denying in part (2959) Motion for Summary Judgment in case 1:04-md-15863-JFM. Signed by Judge J. Frederick Motz on 12/30/08. Associated Cases: 1:04-md-15863-JFM, 1:04-cv-00560-JFM, 1:04-cv-00564-JFM(Motz, J.)
December 30, 2008 Filing 3140 MEMORANDUM OPINION. Signed by Judge J. Frederick Motz on 12/30/08. Associated Cases: 1:04-md-15863-JFM, 1:04-cv-00497-JFM, 1:04-cv-00518-JFM, 1:04-cv-00560-JFM, 1:04-cv-00564-JFM(Motz, J.)
December 24, 2008 Filing 3138 Substantive legal issues - addressing (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G, #8 Exhibit H)Associated Cases: 1:04-md-15863-JFM, 1:04-cv-00497-JFM(Ponist, Sean)
December 17, 2008 Filing 3137 Substantive legal issues - addressing (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)Associated Cases: 1:04-md-15863-JFM, 1:04-cv-00497-JFM, 1:04-cv-00518-JFM(McConkie, John)
December 17, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 3136 PAPERLESS ORDER granting (259) Joint MOTION to Stay action against Defendant Prudential Equity Group LLC1:04-cv-00560-JFM; granting (3135) Joint MOTION to Stay action against Defendant Prudential Equity Group LLC in case 1:04-md-15863-JFM. Signed by Judge J. Frederick Motz on 12/17/08. Associated Cases: 1:04-md-15863-JFM, 1:04-cv-00560-JFM(jnl, Deputy Clerk)
December 16, 2008 Filing 3135 Joint MOTION to Stay action against Defendant Prudential Equity Group LLC by Prudential Equity Group, LLC Responses due by 1/2/2009 (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Thier, Jonathan)
December 11, 2008 Filing 3139 Motion Hearing on 12/11/2008 re: Pending Motions held before Judge J. Frederick Motz and Judge Catherine C. Blake. (Court Reporter: Christine Asif) (kam, Deputy Clerk)
December 10, 2008 Filing 3134 Motion for Summary Judgment Hearing held on 12/10/2008 before Judge J. Frederick Motz and Judge Catherine C. Blake re (2956 in 1:04-md-15863-JFM) MOTION for Summary Judgment On All Remaining Claims filed by Robert F. Lucey, Putnam Retail Management Limited Partnership, Putnam Investment Management LLC, Stephen M. Oristaglio, Putnam LLC, Irene M. Esteves, Putnam Investments Trust, Putnam Investment Management Trust, (2954 in 1:04-md-15863-JFM) MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by Janus Distributors LLC, Janus Capital Group Inc., Janus Capital Management LLC, (2949 in 1:04-md-15863-JFM) Motion for Summary Judgment by Lawrence Lasser, (2957 in 1:04-md-15863-JFM) Motion for Summary Judgment by Gordon Silver (Court Reporter C. Asif.) Associated Cases: 1:04-md-15861-CCB, 1:04-md-15863-JFM(ggpb, Deputy Clerk) Modified on 12/18/2008 (cag, Deputy Clerk).
December 10, 2008 Filing 3133 MOTION to Seal The Putnam Defendants' Motion To Seal In Connection With Their Opposition To Plaintiffs' Motion To Supplement by Putnam LLC, Putnam Investment Management, LLC, Putnam Retail Management Limited Partnership, Stephen M. Oristaglio, Robert F. Lucey, Irene M. Esteves, Gordon H. Silver, Putnam Investments Trust, Putnam Investment Management Trust Responses due by 12/29/2008 (Attachments: #1 Memorandum Of Law In Support Of The Putnam Defendants' Motion To Seal In Connection With Their Opposition To Plaintiffs' Motion To Supplement, #2 (Proposed) Order)Associated Cases: 1:04-md-15863-JFM, 1:04-cv-00560-JFM, 1:04-cv-00564-JFM(Simshauser, Peter)
December 10, 2008 Filing 3132 RESPONSE in Opposition re ( #3122 in 1:04-md-15863-JFM) Motion To Supplement Plaintiffs' Omnibus Memorandum Of Law In Opposition To Defendants' Motion To Exclude The Testimony And Reports Of Marc Vellrath filed by Putnam LLC, Putnam Investment Management, LLC, Putnam Retail Management Limited Partnership, Stephen M. Oristaglio, Robert F. Lucey, Irene M. Esteves, Gordon H. Silver, Putnam Investments Trust, Putnam Investment Management Trust. Replies due by 12/24/2008. Associated Cases: 1:04-md-15863-JFM, 1:04-cv-00560-JFM, 1:04-cv-00564-JFM(Simshauser, Peter) (Additional attachment(s) added on 12/12/2008: #1 Sealed Opposition to Motion to Supplement) (cag, Deputy Clerk). Modified on 12/12/2008 (cag, Deputy Clerk).
December 8, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 3131 PAPERLESS ORDER granting (119) Joint MOTION to Stay the Action Against Defendant Round hill Securities, Inc. in Contemplation of Settlement in case 1:04-cv-00497-JFM; granting (3128) Motion to Stay in case 1:04-md-15863-JFM. Signed by Judge J. Frederick Motz on 12/8/08. Associated Cases: 1:04-md-15863-JFM, 1:04-cv-00497-JFM(jnl, Deputy Clerk)
December 8, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 3130 Paperless ORDER approving #3129 Stipulation Concerning Confidential Material. Signed by Judge J. Frederick Motz on 12/08/2008. (Motz, J.)
December 8, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 3129 STIPULATION and Order Concerning Confidential Material for the December 10 and 11, 2008 Hearing by A Plaintiff. (Isbister, John)
December 8, 2008 Filing 3128 Joint MOTION to Stay the Action Against Defendant Round hill Securities, Inc. in Contemplation of Settlement by Maloon Powers Pitre & Higgins, LLC Responses due by 12/26/2008 (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)Associated Cases: 1:04-md-15863-JFM, 1:04-cv-00497-JFM(Molumphy, Mark)
December 8, 2008 Filing 3127 Correspondence re: Teleconference Instructions for the December 10 and 11 Hearing (Isbister, John)
December 3, 2008 Filing 3126 NOTICE by Post-retirement Health Insurance Plan and Trust to Seal Corrected Exhibits and Redlined Memoranda Pages (Abramson, Glen)
December 3, 2008 Filing 3125 MOTION to Seal Corrected Exhibits and Redlined Memoranda Pages ( Responses due by 12/22/2008) by Post-retirement Health Insurance Plan and Trust (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Abramson, Glen)
December 1, 2008 Filing 3124 RESPONSE in Support re (143 in 1:04-cv-03798-JFM, 3008 in 1:04-md-15863-JFM) MOTION MOTION TO EXCLUDE TESTIMONY OF EDWARD S. O'NEAL NOTICE OF FILING OF DOCUMENTS UNDER SEAL ( Replies due by 12/15/2008.) filed by RS Investment Management, LP, James L. Callinan, Steven M. Cohen, G. Randall Hecht, Keith, Peter, McCaffery, Michael G., RS Investment Management Co., LLC, RS Investment Management, Inc., RS Investment Management, L.P.. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit of Service)(Burns, James) (Additional attachment(s) added on 12/4/2008: #2 Sealed Response in Support) (jnl, Deputy Clerk). Modified on 12/4/2008 (jnl, Deputy Clerk).
December 1, 2008 Filing 3123 MOTION to Seal RS DEFENDANTS' REPLY MEMORANDUM IN SUPPORT OF MOTION TO EXCLUDE TESTIMONY OF EDWARD S. O'NEAL ( Responses due by 12/18/2008) by RS Investment Management, LP, James L. Callinan, Steven M. Cohen, G. Randall Hecht, Keith, Peter, McCaffery, Michael G., RS Investment Management Co., LLC, RS Investment Management, Inc., RS Investment Management, L.P. (Attachments: #1 Supplement Memorandum in Support of Motion, #2 Text of Proposed Order [Proposed] Order)(Burns, James)
December 1, 2008 Filing 3122 MOTION Supplement Plaintiffs' Omnibus Memorandum of Law in Opposition to Defendants' Motion to Exclude the Testimony and Reports of Marc Vellrath, Ph.D., CFA and exhibits thereto by Joseph Shanis, Ohio Tuition Trust Authority Responses due by 12/18/2008 (Wayne, Richard) Modified on 12/1/2008 (jnls, Deputy Clerk). (Additional attachment(s) added on 12/1/2008: #1 Sealed Motion, #2 Sealed Exhibit 1, #3 Sealed Exhibit 2, #4 Sealed Exhibit 3, #5 Sealed Exhibit 4, #6 Sealed Exhibit 5, #7 Sealed Exhibit 6) (jnls, Deputy Clerk). Modified on 12/1/2008 (jnls, Deputy Clerk).
November 25, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 3121 Paperless ORDER granting #3109 Motion to Seal. Signed by Judge J. Frederick Motz on 11/25/2008. (Motz, J.)
November 25, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 3120 Paperless ORDER granting #3107 Motion to Seal. Signed by Judge J. Frederick Motz on 11/25/2008. (Motz, J.)
November 25, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 3119 Paperless ORDER granting #3101 Motion to Seal. Signed by Judge J. Frederick Motz on 11/25/2008. (Motz, J.)
November 25, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 3118 Paperless ORDER granting #3094 Motion to Seal. Signed by Judge J. Frederick Motz on 11/25/2008. (Motz, J.)
November 25, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 3117 Paperless ORDER granting #3091 Motion to Seal. Signed by Judge J. Frederick Motz on 11/25/2008. (Motz, J.)
November 25, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 3116 Paperless ORDER granting #3090 Motion to Seal. Signed by Judge J. Frederick Motz on 11/25/2008. (Motz, J.)
November 24, 2008 Filing 3115 (FILED IN ERROR) NOTICE by Joseph Shanis, Ohio Tuition Trust Authority of Filing Documents Under Seal (Levy, John) Modified on 12/1/2008 (jnls, Deputy Clerk).
November 24, 2008 Filing 3114 MOTION for Leave to File Under Seal Motion to Supplement Plaintiffs' Omnibus Memorandum of Law in Opposition to Defendants' Motion to Exclude the Testimony and Reports of Marc Vellrath, Ph.D, CFA by Joseph Shanis, Ohio Tuition Trust Authority Responses due by 12/11/2008 (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Order)(Levy, John)
November 12, 2008 Filing 3113 RESPONSE in Support re (94 in 1:04-cv-00497-JFM) MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by Maloon Powers Pitre & Higgins, LLC. Replies due by 11/26/2008. (Attachments: #1 Supplemental Appedix of Exhibits, #2 Exhibit 17, #3 Exhibit 18, #4 Exhibit 19)Associated Cases: 1:04-md-15863-JFM, 1:04-cv-00497-JFM(Ponist, Sean)
November 12, 2008 Filing 3112 RESPONSE in Support re (2982 in 1:04-md-15863-JFM) MOTION for Default Judgment as to Motion for Terminating Sanctions rendering Judgment by Default Against Defendants Round Hill Securities Inc. filed by Maloon Powers Pitre & Higgins, LLC. Replies due by 11/26/2008. (Attachments: #1 Supplemental Appendix of Exhibits, #2 Exhibit 21, #3 Exhibit 22, #4 Exhibit 23, #5 Exhibit 24, #6 Exhibit 25, #7 Exhibit 26, #8 Exhibit 27, #9 Exhibit 28, #10 Exhibit 29, #11 Exhibit 30, #12 Exhibit 31, #13 Exhibit 32, #14 Exhibit 33, #15 Exhibit 34, #16 Exhibit 35, #17 Exhibit 36)Associated Cases: 1:04-md-15863-JFM, 1:04-cv-00497-JFM(Ponist, Sean)
November 5, 2008 Filing 3111 REPLY to Response to Motion re (93 in 1:04-cv-00497-JFM) MOTION to Certify Class PLAINTIFF CALIFORNIA FINANCIAL ADVISORS REPLY IN SUPPORT OFMOTION FOR CLASS CERTIFICATION UNDER FEDERAL RULE OF CIVIL PROCEDURE 23 filed by Maloon Powers Pitre & Higgins, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Appendix of Exhibits, #2 Exhibit 26, #3 Exhibit 27, #4 Exhibit 28, #5 Exhibit 29, #6 Text of Proposed Order)Associated Cases: 1:04-md-15863-JFM, 1:04-cv-00497-JFM(Ponist, Sean)
November 5, 2008 Filing 3110 RESPONSE in Opposition re (143 in 1:04-cv-03798-JFM, 3008 in 1:04-md-15863-JFM) MOTION MOTION TO EXCLUDE TESTIMONY OF EDWARD S. O'NEAL (RS Subtrack) ( Replies due by 11/19/2008.) filed by Krouse Group. (Lahm, James) (Additional attachment(s) added on 11/10/2008: #1 Sealed Reply, #2 Sealed Exhibit A, #3 Sealed Exhibit B, #4 Sealed Exhibit C) (jnl, Deputy Clerk). Modified on 11/10/2008 (jnl, Deputy Clerk).
November 5, 2008 Filing 3109 MOTION to Seal Plaintiffs Memorandum of Law in Opposition to the RS Defendants Motion to Exclude Testimony of Edward S. ONeal (RS Subtrack) ( Responses due by 11/24/2008) by Krouse Group (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Lahm, James)
November 5, 2008 Filing 3108 REPLY to Response to Motion re (130 in 1:04-cv-03798-JFM) MOTION to Certify Class Pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P. 23 (RS Subtrack) filed by Krouse Group. (Lahm, James) (Additional attachment(s) added on 11/10/2008: #1 Sealed Opposition, #2 Sealed Exhibit A, #3 Sealed Exhibit B, #4 Sealed Exhibit C, #5 Sealed Exhibit D) (jnl, Deputy Clerk). Modified on 11/10/2008 (jnl, Deputy Clerk).
November 5, 2008 Filing 3107 MOTION to Seal Plaintiffs Reply Memorandum of Law in Support of Plaintiffs Motion for Class Certification (RS Subtrack) ( Responses due by 11/24/2008) by Krouse Group (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Lahm, James)
November 5, 2008 Filing 3106 REPLY to Response to Motion re (2959 in 1:04-md-15863-JFM, 222 in 1:04-cv-00560-JFM) MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by Stephen M. Oristaglio, Robert F. Lucey, Irene M. Esteves. Associated Cases: 1:04-md-15863-JFM, 1:04-cv-00560-JFM(Simshauser, Peter) (Additional attachment(s) added on 11/14/2008: #1 Reply) (cags, Deputy Clerk). Modified on 11/14/2008 (cags, Deputy Clerk).
November 5, 2008 Filing 3105 REPLY to Response to Motion re (219 in 1:04-cv-00560-JFM, 64 in 1:04-cv-00564-JFM, 2956 in 1:04-md-15863-JFM) MOTION for Summary Judgment On All Remaining Claims filed by Putnam LLC, Putnam Investment Management, LLC, Putnam Retail Management Limited Partnership, Stephen M. Oristaglio, Robert F. Lucey, Irene M. Esteves, Gordon H. Silver, Putnam Investments Trust, Putnam Investment Management Trust. (Attachments: #1 Transmittal Affidavit Of Peter Simshauser, #2 Reply Appendix Of Exhibits To The Putnam Defendants' Motion For Summary Judgment On All Remaining Claims)Associated Cases: 1:04-md-15863-JFM, 1:04-cv-00560-JFM, 1:04-cv-00564-JFM(Simshauser, Peter) (Additional attachment(s) added on 11/14/2008: #3 reply) (cags, Deputy Clerk). (Additional attachment(s) added on 11/14/2008: #4 Cover Volume, #5 Appendix 0152, #6 Appendix 0153, #7 Appendix 0154, #8 Appendix 0155, #9 Appendix 0156) (cags, Deputy Clerk). (Additional attachment(s) added on 11/14/2008: #10 Appendix 0157, #11 Appendix 0158) (cags, Deputy Clerk). (Additional attachment(s) added on 11/14/2008: #12 Appendix 0159, #13 Appendix 0160, #14 Appendix 0161) (cags, Deputy Clerk). Modified on 11/14/2008 (cags, Deputy Clerk).
November 5, 2008 Filing 3104 REPLY to Response to Motion re (2975 in 1:04-md-15863-JFM, 68 in 1:04-cv-00564-JFM, 226 in 1:04-cv-00560-JFM) MOTION for Other Relief Motion To Exclude Proposed Expert Opinions Of Marc Vellrath filed by Putnam LLC, Putnam Investment Management, LLC, Putnam Retail Management Limited Partnership, Stephen M. Oristaglio, Robert F. Lucey, Irene M. Esteves, Gordon H. Silver, Putnam Investments Trust, Putnam Investment Management Trust. Associated Cases: 1:04-md-15863-JFM, 1:04-cv-00560-JFM, 1:04-cv-00564-JFM(Simshauser, Peter) (Additional attachment(s) added on 11/14/2008: #1 Reply) (cags, Deputy Clerk). Modified on 11/14/2008 (cags, Deputy Clerk).
November 5, 2008 Filing 3103 REPLY to Response to Motion re (2974 in 1:04-md-15863-JFM, 225 in 1:04-cv-00560-JFM, 67 in 1:04-cv-00564-JFM) MOTION for Other Relief Motion To Exclude Proposed Expert Opinions Of M. Kathleen Leugers And Edward S. O'Neal filed by Putnam LLC, Putnam Investment Management, LLC, Putnam Retail Management Limited Partnership, Stephen M. Oristaglio, Robert F. Lucey, Irene M. Esteves, Gordon H. Silver, Putnam Investments Trust, Putnam Investment Management Trust. Associated Cases: 1:04-md-15863-JFM, 1:04-cv-00560-JFM, 1:04-cv-00564-JFM(Simshauser, Peter) (Additional attachment(s) added on 11/14/2008: #1 Reply) (cags, Deputy Clerk). Modified on 11/14/2008 (cags, Deputy Clerk).
November 5, 2008 Filing 3102 REPLY to Response to Motion re (2967 in 1:04-md-15863-JFM, 224 in 1:04-cv-00560-JFM, 66 in 1:04-cv-00564-JFM) MOTION for Other Relief Motion To Exclude Proposed Expert Opinions Of Mercer E. Bullard filed by Putnam LLC, Putnam Investment Management, LLC, Putnam Retail Management Limited Partnership, Stephen M. Oristaglio, Robert F. Lucey, Irene M. Esteves, Gordon H. Silver, Putnam Investments Trust, Putnam Investment Management Trust. Associated Cases: 1:04-md-15863-JFM, 1:04-cv-00560-JFM, 1:04-cv-00564-JFM(Simshauser, Peter) (Additional attachment(s) added on 11/14/2008: #1 Reply) (cags, Deputy Clerk). Modified on 11/14/2008 (cags, Deputy Clerk).
November 5, 2008 Filing 3101 MOTION to Seal The Putnam Defendants' Interim Sealing Motion In Connection With Their Reply Memoranda by Putnam LLC, Putnam Investment Management, LLC, Putnam Retail Management Limited Partnership, Stephen M. Oristaglio, Robert F. Lucey, Irene M. Esteves, Gordon H. Silver, Putnam Investments Trust, Putnam Investment Management Trust Responses due by 11/24/2008 (Attachments: #1 Memorandum Of Law In Support Of The Putnam Defendants' Interim Sealing Motion In Connection With Their Reply Memoranda, #2 [Proposed] Order)Associated Cases: 1:04-md-15863-JFM, 1:04-cv-00560-JFM, 1:04-cv-00564-JFM(Simshauser, Peter)
November 5, 2008 Filing 3100 REPLY to Response to Motion re (31 in 1:04-cv-00518-JFM, 2954 in 1:04-md-15863-JFM) MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by Janus Distributors, LLC, Janus Capital Management LLC, Janus Capital Group, Inc.. Associated Cases: 1:04-md-15863-JFM, 1:04-cv-00518-JFM(McConkie, John)
November 5, 2008 Filing 3099 RESPONSE in Support re #2949 MOTION for Summary Judgment REPLY MEMORANDUM IN SUPPORT OF MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT BY LAWRENCE J. LASSER filed by Lawrence J. Lasser. Replies due by 11/19/2008. (Pollack, Daniel)
November 5, 2008 Filing 3098 REPLY to Response to Motion re (84 in 1:04-cv-00497-JFM, 2954 in 1:04-md-15863-JFM) MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by Janus Distributors, LLC, Janus Capital Management LLC, Janus Capital Group Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Notice of Filing Consolidated Statement of Material Facts, #2 Exhibit Combined Index of Exhibits)Associated Cases: 1:04-md-15863-JFM, 1:04-cv-00497-JFM(McConkie, John)
November 5, 2008 Filing 3097 REPLY to Response to Motion re #2960 MOTION to Certify Class Pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P. 23 filed by Joseph Shanis, Ohio Tuition Trust Authority. (Attachments: #1 Notice of Filing Document Under Seal)(Geoppinger, Jean) (Additional attachment(s) added on 11/10/2008: #2 Sealed Exhibit 1, #3 Sealed Exhibit 2, #4 Sealed Exhibit 3, #5 Sealed Exhibit 4, #6 Sealed Exhibit 5) (jnl, Deputy Clerk). (Additional attachment(s) added on 11/10/2008: #7 Sealed Reply) (jnl, Deputy Clerk). Modified on 11/10/2008 (jnl, Deputy Clerk).
November 5, 2008 Filing 3095 RESPONSE in Support re (128 in 1:04-cv-03798-JFM, 2968 in 1:04-md-15863-JFM) MOTION for Summary Judgment [NOTICE OF FILING OF DOCUMENTS UNDER SEAL] ( Replies due by 11/19/2008.) filed by RS Investment Management, LP, RS Investment Management Co., LLC, RS Investment Management, Inc., RS Investment Management, L.P.. (Gallagher, Richard) (Additional attachment(s) added on 11/6/2008: #1 Sealed Reply) (jnl, Deputy Clerk). Modified on 11/6/2008 (jnl, Deputy Clerk).
November 5, 2008 Filing 3094 Interim MOTION to Seal Reply Brief of Defendant Gordon H. Silver in Support of His Motion for Summary Judgment by Gordon H. Silver, Gordon H. Silver Responses due by 11/24/2008 (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support of Motion to Seal, #2 Text of Proposed Order)Associated Cases: 1:04-md-15863-JFM, 1:04-cv-00560-JFM(Bagger, Paula)
November 5, 2008 Filing 3093 RESPONSE in Support re (126 in 1:04-cv-03798-JFM) MOTION for Summary Judgment [NOTICE OF FILING OF DOCUMENTS UNDER SEAL] ( Replies due by 11/19/2008.) filed by James L. Callinan, Steven M. Cohen, G. Randall Hecht, Keith, Peter, McCaffery, Michael G.. (Gallagher, Richard) (Additional attachment(s) added on 11/6/2008: #1 Sealed Reply) (jnl, Deputy Clerk). Modified on 11/6/2008 (jnl, Deputy Clerk).
November 5, 2008 Filing 3092 RESPONSE in Support re (127 in 1:04-cv-03798-JFM, 2966 in 1:04-md-15863-JFM) MOTION Motion to Exclude Testimony of Marc Vellrath [NOTICE OF FILING OF DOCUMENTS UNDER SEAL] ( Replies due by 11/19/2008.) filed by RS Investment Management, LP, James L. Callinan, Steven M. Cohen, G. Randall Hecht, Keith, Peter, McCaffery, Michael G., RS Investment Management Co., LLC, RS Investment Management, Inc., RS Investment Management, L.P.. (Gallagher, Richard) (Additional attachment(s) added on 11/6/2008: #1 Sealed Reply) (jnl, Deputy Clerk). Modified on 11/6/2008 (jnl, Deputy Clerk).
November 5, 2008 Filing 3091 MOTION to Seal Plaintiffs' Reply in Support of Their Motion for Class Certification by Joseph Shanis, Ohio Tuition Trust Authority Responses due by 11/24/2008 (Geoppinger, Jean)
November 5, 2008 Filing 3090 MOTION to Seal RS DEFENDANTS' MOTION TO FILE UNDER SEAL: (1) RS ADVISERS' REPLY BRIEF IN SUPPORT OF MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT; (2) RS INDIVIDUALS' REPLY BRIEF IN SUPPORT OF MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT; AND (3) RS DEFENDANTS' REPLY MEMORANDUM IN SUPPORT OF MOTION TO EXCLUDE TESTIMONY OF MARC VELLRATH ( Responses due by 11/24/2008) by RS Investment Management, LP, James L. Callinan, Steven M. Cohen, G. Randall Hecht, Keith, Peter, McCaffery, Michael G., RS Investment Management Co., LLC, RS Investment Management, Inc., RS Investment Management, L.P. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum In Support of Motion, #2 Text of Proposed Order [Proposed] Order)(Burns, James)
November 5, 2008 Filing 3089 REPLY to Response to Motion re #2952 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by Prudential Equity Group, LLC. (Thier, Jonathan)
November 5, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 3088 Paperless ORDER granting #3087 Unopposed Motion to File a Combined Memorandum in Reply. Signed by Judge J. Frederick Motz on 11/05/2008. (Motz, J.)
November 4, 2008 Filing 3087 MOTION The Putnam Defendants' Unopposed Motion To File A Combined Memorandum In Reply To The Oppositions Of The Investor And Derivative Class Plaintiffs To The Putnam Defendants' Motion For Summary Judgment On All Remaining Claims by Putnam LLC, Putnam Retail Management Limited Partnership, Stephen M. Oristaglio, Robert F. Lucey, Irene M. Esteves, Putnam Investment Management LLC, Putnam Investments Trust, Putnam Investment Management Trust Responses due by 11/21/2008 Associated Cases: 1:04-md-15863-JFM, 1:04-cv-00560-JFM, 1:04-cv-00564-JFM(Simshauser, Peter)
November 4, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 3086 Paperless ORDER approving #3085 Stipulation. Signed by Judge J. Frederick Motz on 11/04/2008. (Motz, J.)
November 3, 2008 Filing 3085 STIPULATION and [Proposed] Order Extending Time For Plaintiff California Financial Advisors to File Its Reply In Support of Motion for Summary Judgment of Liability and Terminating Sanctions Rendering Default Judgment by Maloon Powers Pitre & Higgins, LLC. Associated Cases: 1:04-md-15863-JFM, 1:04-cv-00497-JFM(Ponist, Sean)
October 28, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 3084 PAPERLESS ORDER granting (109) Motion to Stay in case 1:04-cv-00497-JFM; granting (3071) Motion to Stay in case 1:04-md-15863-JFM. Signed by Judge J. Frederick Motz on 10/28/08. Associated Cases: 1:04-md-15863-JFM, 1:04-cv-00497-JFM(jnl, Deputy Clerk)
October 24, 2008 Filing 3083 NOTICE of Appearance by Paula M Bagger on behalf of Gordon H. Silver (Bagger, Paula)
October 23, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 3082 Paperless ORDER granting #3039 Motion to Seal. Signed by Judge J. Frederick Motz on 10/23/2008. (Motz, J.)
October 23, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 3081 Paperless ORDER granting #3035 Motion to Seal. Signed by Judge J. Frederick Motz on 10/23/2008. (Motz, J.)
October 23, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 3080 Paperless ORDER granting #3007 Motion to Seal. Signed by Judge J. Frederick Motz on 10/23/2008. (Motz, J.)
October 23, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 3079 Paperless ORDER granting #3029 Motion to Seal. Signed by Judge J. Frederick Motz on 10/23/2008. (Motz, J.)
October 23, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 3078 Paperless ORDER granting #3026 Motion to Seal. Signed by Judge J. Frederick Motz on 10/23/2008. (Motz, J.)
October 23, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 3077 Paperless ORDER granting #3017 Motion to Seal. Signed by Judge J. Frederick Motz on 10/23/2008. (Motz, J.)
October 23, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 3076 Paperless ORDER granting #3022 Motion to Seal. Signed by Judge J. Frederick Motz on 10/23/2008. (Motz, J.)
October 23, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 3075 Paperless ORDER granting #3019 Motion to Seal. Signed by Judge J. Frederick Motz on 10/23/2008. (Motz, J.)
October 23, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 3074 Paperless ORDER granting #3016 Motion to Seal. Signed by Judge J. Frederick Motz on 10/23/2008. (Motz, J.)
October 23, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 3073 Paperless ORDER granting #3013 Motion to Seal. Signed by Judge J. Frederick Motz on 10/23/2008. (Motz, J.)
October 23, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 3072 Paperless ORDER granting #3037 Motion to Seal. Signed by Judge J. Frederick Motz on 10/23/2008. (Motz, J.)
October 23, 2008 Filing 3071 Joint MOTION to Stay THE ACTION AGAINST DEFENDANT RYDEX INVESTMENTS IN CONTEMPLATION OF SETTLEMENT by Maloon Powers Pitre & Higgins, LLC Responses due by 11/10/2008 (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order STAYING THE ACTION AGAINST DEFENDANT RYDEX INVESTMENTS IN CONTEMPLATION OF SETTLEMENT)Associated Cases: 1:04-md-15863-JFM, 1:04-cv-00497-JFM(Ponist, Sean)
October 8, 2008 Filing 3070 RESPONSE in Opposition re (101 in 1:04-cv-00497-JFM, 3028 in 1:04-md-15863-JFM) MOTION to Amend/Correct filed by Rydex Investments. Replies due by 10/22/2008. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)Associated Cases: 1:04-md-15863-JFM, 1:04-cv-00497-JFM(Wilson, Michael)
October 7, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 3069 Paperless ORDER approving #3067 Stipulation filed by Round Hill Securities, Inc. Signed by Judge J. Frederick Motz on 10/7/08. (Motz, J.)
October 7, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 3068 Paperless ORDER approving #3064 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply. Signed by Judge J. Frederick Motz on 10/7/08. (Motz, J.)
October 3, 2008 Filing 3067 STIPULATION By lead Plaintiff and Round Hill Securities, Inc. by Round Hill Securities, Inc. (Ward, Gregory)
October 3, 2008 Filing 3066 RESPONSE in Opposition re #2981 MOTION for Summary Judgment of Liability Against Trader Defendants Round Hill securities, Inc. filed by Round Hill Securities, Inc. Replies due by 10/17/2008. (Ward, Gregory)
October 3, 2008 Filing 3065 RESPONSE in Opposition re #2982 MOTION for Default Judgment as to Motion for Terminating Sanctions rendering Judgment by Default Against Defendants Round Hill Securities, Inc filed by Round Hill Securities, Inc. Replies due by 10/17/2008. (Ward, Gregory)
October 3, 2008 Filing 3064 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #3008 MOTION MOTION TO EXCLUDE TESTIMONY OF EDWARD S. O'NEAL by The Krouse Group. Responses due by 10/20/2008 (Lahm, James)
September 29, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 3063 ORDER granting (3002) Motion for Voluntary Dismissal in case 1:04-md-15863-JFM; granting (140) Motion for Voluntary Dismissal in case 1:04-cv-03798-JFM. Signed by Judge J. Frederick Motz. Associated Cases: 1:04-md-15863-JFM, 1:04-cv-03798-JFM(jnl, Deputy Clerk)
September 29, 2008 Filing 3062 RESPONSE in Opposition re (1220 in 1:04-md-15861-CCB) MOTION in Limine to Exclude the Testimony and Reports of Plaintiffs' Proffered Expert Marc Vellrath, (2975 in 1:04-md-15863-JFM) MOTION for Other Relief Motion To Exclude Proposed Expert Opinions Of Marc Vellrath, (2955 in 1:04-md-15863-JFM) MOTION Joinder of the Janus Defendants in Motions to Exclude Expert Evidence, (2966 in 1:04-md-15863-JFM) MOTION Motion to Exclude Testimony of Marc Vellrath ( Replies due by 10/14/2008.) filed by A Plaintiff. (Lahm, James) (Additional attachment(s) added on 9/30/2008: #1 Sealed Omnibus Brief) (jnls, Deputy Clerk). (Additional attachment(s) added on 9/30/2008: #2 Sealed Exhibit 2, #3 Sealed Exhibit 4, #4 Sealed Exhibit 5, #5 Sealed Exhibit 6, #6 Sealed Exhibit 7, #7 Sealed Exhibit 8, #8 Sealed Exhibit 9, #9 Sealed Exhibit 10, #10 Sealed Exhibit 11, #11 Sealed Exhibit 12, #12 Sealed Exhibit 13, #13 Sealed Exhibit 14, #14 Sealed Exhibit 1) (jnls, Deputy Clerk). Modified on 9/30/2008 (jnls, Deputy Clerk).
September 29, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 3061 Paperless ORDER granting #2983 Motion to Redact Documents Filed in Connection with Motion for Summary Judgment. Signed by Judge J. Frederick Motz on 09/29/2008. (Motz, J.)
September 29, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 3060 Paperless ORDER granting #2980 Motion to Seal. Signed by Judge J. Frederick Motz on 09/29/2008. (Motz, J.)
September 26, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 3059 Paperless ORDER granting #3005 Motion for Leave to File Unopposed a Combined Memorandum in Opposition to all Defendants' Motions for Summary Judgment. Signed by Judge J. Frederick Motz on 09/26/2008. (Motz, J.)
September 26, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 3058 Paperless ORDER granting #2972 Motion to Seal. Signed by Judge J. Frederick Motz on 09/26/2008. (Motz, J.)
September 26, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 3057 Paperless ORDER granting #2978 Motion to Seal. Signed by Judge J. Frederick Motz on 09/26/2008. (Motz, J.)
September 26, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 3056 Paperless ORDER granting (2971) Motion for Leave to File Memorandum in Support of Motion for Class Certification and Exhibits Thereto Under Seal in case 1:04-md-15863-JFM; granting (131) Motion for Leave to File Memorandum in Support of Motion for Class Certification and Exhibits Thereto Under Seal in case 1:04-cv-03798-JFM. Signed by Judge J. Frederick Motz on 09/26/2008. Associated Cases: 1:04-md-15863-JFM, 1:04-cv-03798-JFM(Motz, J.)
September 26, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 3055 Paperless ORDER granting #2961 Motion for Leave to File Supplemental Memorandum of Plaintiffs Ohio Tuition Trust Authority and Joseph Shanis in Support of Class Certification and Exhibits Thereto Under Seal. Signed by Judge J. Frederick Motz on 09/26/2008. (Motz, J.)
September 26, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 3054 Paperless ORDER granting (227) Motion to Seal in case 1:04-cv-00560-JFM; granting (69) Motion to Seal in case 1:04-cv-00564-JFM; granting (2977) Motion to Seal in case 1:04-md-15863-JFM. Signed by Judge J. Frederick Motz on 09/26/2008. Associated Cases: 1:04-md-15863-JFM, 1:04-cv-00560-JFM, 1:04-cv-00564-JFM(Motz, J.)
September 26, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 3053 Paperless ORDER granting (223) Motion to Seal in case 1:04-cv-00560-JFM; granting (65) Motion to Seal in case 1:04-cv-00564-JFM; granting (2963) Motion to Seal in case 1:04-md-15863-JFM. Signed by Judge J. Frederick Motz on 09/26/2008. Associated Cases: 1:04-md-15863-JFM, 1:04-cv-00560-JFM, 1:04-cv-00564-JFM(Motz, J.)
September 26, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 3052 Paperless ORDER granting (221) Motion to Seal in case 1:04-cv-00560-JFM; granting (2958) Motion to Seal in case 1:04-md-15863-JFM. Signed by Judge J. Frederick Motz on 08/26/2008. Associated Cases: 1:04-md-15863-JFM, 1:04-cv-00560-JFM(Motz, J.)
September 26, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 3051 Paperless ORDER granting (2964) Motion to Seal in case 1:04-md-15863-JFM; granting (125) Motion to Seal in case 1:04-cv-03798-JFM. Signed by Judge J. Frederick Motz on 9/26/08. Associated Cases: 1:04-md-15863-JFM, 1:04-cv-03798-JFM(Motz, J.)
September 26, 2008 Filing 3050 RESPONSE in Opposition re #2966 MOTION Motion to Exclude Testimony of Marc Vellrath (supplemental) filed by The Krouse Group. Replies due by 10/10/2008. (Lahm, James) (Additional attachment(s) added on 9/30/2008: #13 Sealed Supplemental Memorandum, #14 Sealed Exhibit One, #15 Sealed Exhibit Three) (jnls, Deputy Clerk). Modified on 9/30/2008 (jnls, Deputy Clerk). Modified on 9/30/2008 (jnl, Deputy Clerk).
September 26, 2008 Filing 3049 RESPONSE in Opposition re #2965 MOTION for Summary Judgment ON BEHALF OF RS INDIVIDUALS filed by The Krouse Group. Replies due by 10/10/2008. (Lahm, James) (Additional attachment(s) added on 9/30/2008: #1 Sealed Opposition) (jnls, Deputy Clerk). Modified on 9/30/2008 (jnls, Deputy Clerk).
September 26, 2008 Filing 3048 RESPONSE in Opposition re #2968 MOTION for Summary Judgment ON BEHALF OF RS ADVISERS filed by The Krouse Group. Replies due by 10/10/2008. (Lahm, James) (Additional attachment(s) added on 9/30/2008: #1 Sealed Opposition) (jnls, Deputy Clerk). (Additional attachment(s) added on 9/30/2008: #2 Sealed Exhibit A, #3 Sealed Exhibit AA, #4 Sealed Exhibit B, #5 Sealed Exhibit BB, #6 Sealed Exhibit C, #7 Sealed Exhibit CC, #8 Sealed Exhibit D, #9 Sealed Exhibit DD, #10 Sealed Exhibit E, #11 Sealed Exhibit EE, #12 Sealed Exhibit F, #13 Sealed Exhibit FF, #14 Sealed Exhibit G, #15 Sealed Exhibit GG) (jnls, Deputy Clerk). (Additional attachment(s) added on 9/30/2008: #16 Sealed Exhibit HH, #17 Sealed Exhibit I, #18 Sealed Exhibit II, #19 Sealed Exhibit J, #20 Sealed Exhibit JJ, #21 Sealed Exhibit K, #22 Sealed Exhibit KK, #23 Sealed Exhibit L, #24 Sealed Exhibit LL, #25 Sealed Exhibit M, #26 Sealed Exhibit MM, #27 Sealed Exhibit N, #28 Sealed Exhibit NN) (jnls, Deputy Clerk). (Additional attachment(s) added on 9/30/2008: #29 Sealed Exhibit O, #30 Sealed Exhibit OO, #31 Sealed Exhibit P, #32 Sealed Exhibit PP, #33 Sealed Exhibit Q, #34 Sealed Exhibit QQ, #35 Sealed Exhibit R, #36 Sealed Exhibit RR, #37 Sealed Exhibit S, #38 Sealed Exhibit SS, #39 Sealed Exhibit T, #40 Sealed Exhibit TT, #41 Sealed Exhibit U, #42 Sealed Exhibit UU) (jnls, Deputy Clerk). (Additional attachment(s) added on 9/30/2008: #43 Sealed Exhibit V, #44 Sealed Exhibit VV, #45 Sealed Exhibit W, #46 Sealed Exhibit WW, #47 Sealed Exhibit X, #48 Sealed Exhibit XX, #49 Sealed Exhibit Y, #50 Sealed Exhibit Z) (jnls, Deputy Clerk). (Additional attachment(s) added on 9/30/2008: #51 Sealed Exhibit H) (jnl, Deputy Clerk). Modified on 9/30/2008 (jnl, Deputy Clerk).
September 26, 2008 Filing 3047 RESPONSE in Opposition re #2975 MOTION for Other Relief Motion To Exclude Proposed Expert Opinions Of Marc Vellrath, #2955 MOTION Joinder of the Janus Defendants in Motions to Exclude Expert Evidence, #2966 MOTION Motion to Exclude Testimony of Marc Vellrath and [04-md-15861: 1220] MOTION in Limine to Exclude the Testimony and Reports of Plaintiffs' Proffered Expert Marc Vellrath by Scudder Distributors Inc., et al. (OMNIBUS RESPONSE) filed by The Krouse Group. Replies due by 10/10/2008. (Lahm, James) (Additional attachment(s) added on 9/26/2008: #1 Sealed Omnibus Memorandum in opposition) (jnl, Deputy Clerk). Modified on 9/26/2008 (jnl, Deputy Clerk).
September 25, 2008 Filing 3046 RESPONSE in Opposition re #2956 MOTION for Summary Judgment On All Remaining Claims by Fund Derivative Plaintiffs' filed by Miranda Zuber. Replies due by 10/9/2008. (Prussin, H) (Additional attachment(s) added on 9/25/2008: #1 Sealed Memorandum in opposition, #2 Sealed Exhibit 1) (jnl, Deputy Clerk). Modified on 9/25/2008 (jnl, Deputy Clerk).
September 25, 2008 Filing 3045 RESPONSE in Opposition re #2975 MOTION for Other Relief Motion To Exclude Proposed Expert Opinions Of Marc Vellrath filed by Lead Plaintiff Ohio Tuition Trust Authority. Replies due by 10/9/2008. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(Heuck, Robert) (Additional attachment(s) added on 9/26/2008: #2 Sealed Supplemental Memorandum in opposition, #3 Sealed Exhibit 1, #4 Sealed Exhibit 2, #5 Sealed Exhibit 3, #6 Sealed Exhibit 4, #7 Sealed Exhibit 5) (jnl, Deputy Clerk). (Additional attachment(s) added on 9/26/2008: #8 Sealed Exhibit 6, #9 Sealed Exhibit 7, #10 Sealed Exhibit 8, #11 Sealed Exhibit 9, #12 Sealed Exhibit 10, #13 Sealed Exhibit 11, #14 Sealed Exhibit 12, #15 Sealed Exhibit 13) (jnl, Deputy Clerk). Modified on 9/26/2008 (jnl, Deputy Clerk).
September 25, 2008 Filing 3044 RESPONSE in Opposition re #2975 MOTION for Other Relief Motion To Exclude Proposed Expert Opinions Of Marc Vellrath, #2955 MOTION Joinder of the Janus Defendants in Motions to Exclude Expert Evidence, #2966 MOTION Motion to Exclude Testimony of Marc Vellrath, #2952 MOTION for Summary Judgment of Prudential Securities [Omnibus Filing by Plaintiffs in all Subtacks] filed by Lead Plaintiff Ohio Tuition Trust Authority. Replies due by 10/9/2008. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(Heuck, Robert)
September 25, 2008 Filing 3043 RESPONSE in Opposition re #2967 MOTION for Other Relief Motion To Exclude Proposed Expert Opinions Of Mercer E. Bullard filed by Lead Plaintiff Ohio Tuition Trust Authority. Replies due by 10/9/2008. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(Heuck, Robert) (Additional attachment(s) added on 9/26/2008: #2 Sealed Opposition, #3 Sealed Exhibit A) (jnl, Deputy Clerk). Modified on 9/26/2008 (jnl, Deputy Clerk).
September 25, 2008 Filing 3042 RESPONSE in Opposition re #2974 MOTION for Other Relief Motion To Exclude Proposed Expert Opinions Of M. Kathleen Leugers And Edward S. O'Neal filed by Lead Plaintiff Ohio Tuition Trust Authority. Replies due by 10/9/2008. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Notice of Filing Under Seal)(Heuck, Robert) (Additional attachment(s) added on 9/26/2008: #2 Sealed Opposition, #3 Sealed Exhibit 1, #4 Sealed Exhibit 2, #5 Sealed Exhibit 3, #6 Sealed Exhibit 4) (jnl, Deputy Clerk). Modified on 9/26/2008 (jnl, Deputy Clerk).
September 25, 2008 Filing 3041 RESPONSE in Opposition re #2952 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by Lead Plaintiff Ohio Tuition Trust Authority. Replies due by 10/9/2008. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Notice of Filing Under Seal)(Heuck, Robert) (Additional attachment(s) added on 9/26/2008: #2 Sealed Memorandum in opposition) (jnl, Deputy Clerk). Modified on 9/26/2008 (jnl, Deputy Clerk).
September 25, 2008 Filing 3040 NOTICE by The Krouse Group of Filing Under Seal Memorandum of Law in Opposition to the RS Advisers Motion for Summary Judgment, including all exhibits attached thereto; (2) Memorandum of Law in Opposition to the RS Individuals Motion for Summary Judgment; (3) Plaintiffs Supplemental Memorandum of Law in Opposition to the RS Defendants Motion to Exclude Testimony of Marc Vellrath (Lahm, James)
September 24, 2008 Filing 3039 MOTION to Seal Memorandum of Law in Opposition to the RS Advisers Motion for Summary Judgment, including all exhibits attached thereto; (2) Memorandum of Law in Opposition to the RS Individuals Motion for Summary Judgment; (3) Plaintiffs Supplemental Memorandum of Law in Opposition to the RS Defendants Motion to Exclude Testimony of Marc Vellrath by The Krouse Group Responses due by 10/14/2008 (Lahm, James)
September 24, 2008 Filing 3038 NOTICE by The Krouse Group of Filing Under Seal Plaintiffs' Omnibus Memorandum of Law in Opposition to Defendants' Motions to Exclude the Testimony and Reports of Dr. Marc Vellrath (Lahm, James)
September 24, 2008 Filing 3037 MOTION to Seal Plaintiffs' Omnibus Memorandum of Law in Opposition to Defendants' Motions to Exclude the Testimony and Reports of Dr. Marc Vellrath by The Krouse Group Responses due by 10/14/2008 (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Lahm, James)
September 24, 2008 Filing 3036 RESPONSE in Opposition re (130 in 1:04-cv-03798-JFM) MOTION to Certify Class Pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P. 23 ( Replies due by 10/8/2008.) filed by RS Investment Management, LP, James L. Callinan, Steven M. Cohen, G. Randall Hecht, Keith, Peter, McCaffery, Michael G., RS Investment Management Co., LLC, RS Investment Management, Inc., RS Investment Management, L.P.. (Attachments: #1 DECLARATION OF RICHARD GALLAGHER, #2 DECLARATION OF PROFESSOR ALLEN FERRELL)(Burns, James) (Additional attachment(s) added on 9/26/2008: #3 Sealed Opposition, #4 Sealed Declaration - Ferrell, #5 Sealed Declaration Gallagher, #6 Sealed Exhibit 1, #7 Sealed Exhibit 2, #8 Sealed Exhibit 3) (jnl, Deputy Clerk). Modified on 9/26/2008 (jnl, Deputy Clerk).
September 24, 2008 Filing 3035 MOTION to Seal RS DEFENDANTS' MOTION TO FILE UNDER SEAL: (1) RS DEFENDANTS' OPPOSITION TO PLAINTIFFS' MOTION FOR CLASS CERTIFICATION; (2) DECLARATION OF RICHARD GALLAGHER IN SUPPORT OF RS DEFENDANTS' OPPOSITION TO PLAINTIFFS' MOTION FOR CLASS CERTIFICATION; (3) DECLARATION OF PROFESSOR ALLEN FARRELL IN SUPPORT OF RS DEFENDANTS' OPPOSITION TO CLASS CERTIFICATION ( Responses due by 10/14/2008) by RS Investment Management, LP, James L. Callinan, Steven M. Cohen, G. Randall Hecht, Keith, Peter, McCaffery, Michael G., RS Investment Management Co., LLC, RS Investment Management, Inc., RS Investment Management, L.P. (Attachments: #1 MEMORANDUM ISO MOTION, #2 Text of Proposed Order [PROPOSED] ORDER)(Burns, James)
September 24, 2008 Filing 3034 RESPONSE in Opposition re (86 in 1:04-cv-00497-JFM, 2976 in 1:04-md-15863-JFM) MOTION for Summary Judgment APPENDIX OF AUTHORITIES IN SUPPORT OF PLAINTIFF CALIFORNIA FINANCIAL ADVISORS OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANT RYDEX DISTRIBUTORS INC.S MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT filed by Maloon Powers Pitre & Higgins, LLC. Replies due by 10/8/2008. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)Associated Cases: 1:04-md-15863-JFM, 1:04-cv-00497-JFM(Molumphy, Mark)
September 24, 2008 Filing 3033 RESPONSE re (105 in 1:04-cv-00497-JFM) Response in Opposition to Motion, (86 in 1:04-cv-00497-JFM) MOTION for Summary Judgment PLAINTIFF CALIFORNIA FINANCIAL ADVISORS OBJECTIONS TO DECLARATION OF KEVIN M. FARRAGHER ON DEFENDANT RYDEXS MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT filed by Maloon Powers Pitre & Higgins, LLC. Associated Cases: 1:04-md-15863-JFM, 1:04-cv-00497-JFM(Molumphy, Mark)
September 24, 2008 Filing 3032 RESPONSE in Opposition re (86 in 1:04-cv-00497-JFM, 2976 in 1:04-md-15863-JFM) MOTION for Summary Judgment DECLARATION OF MARK C. MOLUMPHY IN SUPPORT OF PLAINTIFF CALIFORNIA FINANCIAL ADVISORS OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANT RYDEX DISTRIBUTORS, INC.S MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT filed by Maloon Powers Pitre & Higgins, LLC. Replies due by 10/8/2008. Associated Cases: 1:04-md-15863-JFM, 1:04-cv-00497-JFM(Molumphy, Mark)
September 24, 2008 Filing 3031 RESPONSE in Opposition re (2975 in 1:04-md-15863-JFM) MOTION for Other Relief Motion To Exclude Proposed Expert Opinions Of Marc Vellrath, (85 in 1:04-cv-00497-JFM) MOTION Joinder of the Janus Defendants in Motions to Exclude Expert Evidence (Joinder of Plaintiff California Financial Advisors) In Plaintiffs' Opposition to Defendant's Motion to Exclude Expert Evidence filed by Maloon Powers Pitre & Higgins, LLC. Replies due by 10/8/2008. Associated Cases: 1:04-md-15863-JFM, 1:04-cv-00497-JFM(Molumphy, Mark)
September 24, 2008 Filing 3030 Memorandum re (102 in 1:04-cv-00497-JFM) MOTION to Seal Notice of Filing of Documents Under Seal (Opposition to Defendant Rydex's Motion for Summary Judgment) filed by Maloon Powers Pitre & Higgins, LLC. Associated Cases: 1:04-md-15863-JFM, 1:04-cv-00497-JFM(Molumphy, Mark) (Additional attachment(s) added on 9/26/2008: #1 Sealed Memorandum, #2 Sealed Declaration, #3 Sealed Appendix, #4 Sealed Exhibit 1, #5 Sealed Exhibit 2, #6 Sealed Exhibit 3, #7 Sealed Exhibit 4, #8 Sealed Exhibit 5, #9 Sealed Exhibit 6, #10 Sealed Exhibit 7, #11 Sealed Exhibit 8, #12 Sealed Exhibit 9, #13 Sealed Exhibit 10) (jnl, Deputy Clerk). (Additional attachment(s) added on 9/26/2008: #14 Sealed Exhibit 11, #15 Sealed Exhibit 12, #16 Sealed Exhibit 13, #17 Sealed Exhibit 14, #18 Sealed Exhibit 15, #19 Sealed Exhibit 16, #20 Sealed Exhibit 17, #21 Sealed Exhibit 18) (jnl, Deputy Clerk). Modified on 9/26/2008 (jnl, Deputy Clerk).
September 24, 2008 Filing 3029 MOTION to Seal Plaintiff California Financial Advisors' Opposition to Defendant Rydex's Motion for Summary Judgment by Maloon Powers Pitre & Higgins, LLC Responses due by 10/14/2008 (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)Associated Cases: 1:04-md-15863-JFM, 1:04-cv-00497-JFM(Molumphy, Mark)
September 24, 2008 Filing 3028 MOTION to Amend/Correct Motion For Leave to File a Third Amended Consolidated Complaint Under FRCP 15 by Maloon Powers Pitre & Higgins, LLC Responses due by 10/14/2008 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1-Third Amended Complaint w/o Edits, #2 Exhibit 2-Third Amended Complaint with Edits, #3 Declaration of Mark C. Molumphy In Support of Plaintiff California Advisors' Motion For Leave To File A Third Amended Consolidated Complaint Under FRCP 15, #4 Exhibit 1 to MCM Declaration iso Motion to Amend Complaint, #5 Exhibit 2 to MCM Declaration iso Motion to Amend Complaint, #6 Ex. 3 to MCM Declaration iso Motion to Amend, #7 Ex. 4 to MCM Declaration iso Motion to Amend, #8 Ex 5 to MCM Declaration iso Motion to Amend, #9 Ex. 6 to MCM Declaration iso Motion to Amend, #10 Ex 7 to MCM Declaration iso Motion to Amend, #11 Ex 8 to MCM Declaration iso Motion to Amend, #12 Ex 9 to MCM Declaration iso Motion to Amend, #13 Text of Proposed Order)Associated Cases: 1:04-md-15863-JFM, 1:04-cv-00497-JFM(Molumphy, Mark)
September 24, 2008 Filing 3027 Memorandum re (99 in 1:04-cv-00497-JFM) MOTION to Seal Notice of Filing of Documents Under Seal (Opposition to Janus Defendants' Motion for Summary Judgment) filed by Maloon Powers Pitre & Higgins, LLC. Associated Cases: 1:04-md-15863-JFM, 1:04-cv-00497-JFM(Molumphy, Mark) (Additional attachment(s) added on 11/6/2008: #1 Sealed Memorandum in opposition, #2 Sealed Appendix, #3 Sealed Declaration, #4 Sealed Statement, #5 Sealed Exhibit 1, #6 Sealed Exhibit 2, #7 Sealed Exhibit 3, #8 Sealed Exhibit 4, #9 Sealed Exhibit 5, #10 Sealed Exhibit 6, #11 Sealed Exhibit 7, #12 Sealed Exhibit 8, #13 Sealed Exhibit 9, #14 Sealed Exhibit 10, #15 Sealed Exhibit 11, #16 Sealed Exhibit 12, #17 Sealed Exhibit 13) (jnl, Deputy Clerk). (Additional attachment(s) added on 11/6/2008: #18 Sealed Exhibit 14, #19 Sealed Exhibit 15, #20 Sealed Exhibit 16, #21 Sealed Exhibit 17, #22 Sealed Exhibit 18, #23 Sealed Exhibit 19, #24 Sealed Exhibit 20, #25 Sealed Exhibit 21, #26 Sealed Exhibit 22, #27 Sealed Exhibit 23, #28 Sealed Exhibit 24, #29 Sealed Exhibit 25, #30 Sealed Exhibit 26, #31 Sealed Exhibit 27, #32 Sealed Exhibit 28) (jnl, Deputy Clerk). (Additional attachment(s) added on 11/6/2008: #33 Sealed Exhibit 29, #34 Sealed Exhibit 30, #35 Sealed Exhibit 31, #36 Sealed Exhibit 32, #37 Sealed Exhibit 33, #38 Sealed Exhibit 34, #39 Sealed Exhibit 35, #40 Sealed Exhibit 36, #41 Sealed Exhibit 37, #42 Sealed Exhibit 38, #43 Sealed Exhibit 39, #44 Sealed Exhibit 40, #45 Sealed Exhibit 41, #46 Sealed Exhibit 42, #47 Sealed Exhibit 43, #48 Sealed Exhibit 44, #49 Sealed Exhibit 45, #50 Sealed Exhibit 46) (jnl, Deputy Clerk). (Additional attachment(s) added on 11/6/2008: #51 Sealed Exhibit 47, #52 Sealed Exhibit 47, #53 Sealed Exhibit 47) (jnl, Deputy Clerk). (Additional attachment(s) added on 11/6/2008: #54 Sealed Exhibit 48) (jnl, Deputy Clerk). (Additional attachment(s) added on 11/6/2008: #55 Sealed Exhibit 48, #56 Sealed Exhibit 47) (jnls, Deputy Clerk). Modified on 11/6/2008 (jnls, Deputy Clerk).
September 24, 2008 Filing 3026 MOTION to Seal Plaintiff California Financial Advisors' Opposition to Janus Defendants' Motion for Summary Judgment by Maloon Powers Pitre & Higgins, LLC Responses due by 10/14/2008 (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)Associated Cases: 1:04-md-15863-JFM, 1:04-cv-00497-JFM(Molumphy, Mark)
September 24, 2008 Filing 3025 Memorandum re (31 in 1:04-cv-00518-JFM, 2954 in 1:04-md-15863-JFM) MOTION for Summary Judgment -- Fund Derivative Plaintiffs' Opposition to Janus Defendants' Motion for Summary Judgment -- filed by Gloria Steinberg, Joseph Cordani, Barbara Cordani, Jean Stigas, Lawrence A. Stigas, Katherine Clark, Michael Lipstein, Rhonda Vladimir, Robert K. Finnell, Sherry Chait, Gerald Chait, Mei Hung, Jason Hung, Robin Resnick, Doreen Duke, Lauri C. Bader, Sylvia Volin, George Tsetsekos, Sharon Gaines, Michael Gaines, Erik P. Gagnon, Mark J. Keane, Reiko Gagnon, Katharine Clark. Associated Cases: 1:04-md-15863-JFM, 1:04-cv-00518-JFM(Chimicles, Nicholas)
September 24, 2008 Filing 3024 Memorandum re #2960 MOTION to Certify Class Pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P. 23 (Opposition) filed by Prudential Equity Group, LLC. (Thier, Jonathan) (Additional attachment(s) added on 9/26/2008: #1 Sealed Memorandum, #2 Sealed Tab B) (jnl, Deputy Clerk). Modified on 9/26/2008 (jnl, Deputy Clerk).
September 24, 2008 Filing 3023 RESPONSE re #2960 MOTION to Certify Class Pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P. 23 Declaration of J. Thier filed by Prudential Equity Group, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Appendix A, #2 Appendix B)(Thier, Jonathan)
September 24, 2008 Filing 3022 MOTION to Seal in connection with Opposition to Lead Plaintiffs' Motion for Class Certification by Prudential Equity Group, LLC Responses due by 10/14/2008 (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Thier, Jonathan)
September 24, 2008 Filing 3021 RESPONSE in Opposition re (94 in 1:04-cv-00497-JFM) MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by Rydex Investments. Replies due by 10/8/2008. Associated Cases: 1:04-md-15863-JFM, 1:04-cv-00497-JFM(Wilson, Michael)
September 24, 2008 Filing 3020 NOTICE by Joseph Shanis, Ohio Tuition Trust Authority of Submission of Memoranda for Filing Under Seal (Geoppinger, Jean)
September 24, 2008 Filing 3019 MOTION to Seal Memoranda by Joseph Shanis, Ohio Tuition Trust Authority Responses due by 10/14/2008 (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Geoppinger, Jean)
September 24, 2008 Filing 3018 NOTICE by Miranda Zuber of filing of Fund Derivative Plaintiffs document under seal (Prussin, H)
September 24, 2008 Filing 3017 MOTION to Seal Memorandum of Fund Derivative Plaintiffs in opposition to Putnam Defendants' Motion for Summary Judgment by Miranda Zuber Responses due by 10/14/2008 (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Prussin, H)
September 24, 2008 Filing 3016 MOTION to Seal The Putnam Defendants' Interim Sealing Motion In Connection With Their Opposition To The Motion Of Plaintiffs Ohio Tuition Trust Authority And Joseph Shains For Class Certification by Putnam LLC, Lawrence J. Lasser, Putnam Retail Management Limited Partnership, Stephen M. Oristaglio, Robert F. Lucey, Irene M. Esteves, Gordon H. Silver, Putnam Investment Management LLC, Putnam Investments Trust, Putnam Investment Management Trust Responses due by 10/14/2008 (Attachments: #1 Memorandum Of Law In Support Of The Putnam Defendants' Interim Sealing Motion In Connection With Their Opposition To The Motion Of Plaintiffs Ohio Tuition Trust Authority And Joseph Shains For Class Certification, #2 (Proposed) Order)Associated Cases: 1:04-md-15863-JFM, 1:04-cv-00560-JFM(Simshauser, Peter)
September 24, 2008 Filing 3015 RESPONSE in Opposition re (2960 in 1:04-md-15863-JFM) MOTION to Certify Class Pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P. 23 The Putnam Defendants' Opposition To The Motion Of Plaintiffs Ohio Tuition Trust Authority And Joseph Shains For Class Cerification filed by Putnam LLC, Lawrence J. Lasser, Putnam Retail Management Limited Partnership, Stephen M. Oristaglio, Robert F. Lucey, Irene M. Esteves, Gordon H. Silver, Putnam Investment Management LLC, Putnam Investments Trust, Putnam Investment Management Trust. Replies due by 10/8/2008. Associated Cases: 1:04-md-15863-JFM, 1:04-cv-00560-JFM(Simshauser, Peter) (Additional attachment(s) added on 9/26/2008: #1 Seal Opposition) (jnl, Deputy Clerk). Modified on 9/26/2008 (jnl, Deputy Clerk).
September 24, 2008 Filing 3014 RESPONSE in Opposition re #2973 MOTION to Certify Class filed by Rydex Investments. Replies due by 10/8/2008. (Wilson, Michael)
September 24, 2008 Filing 3013 MOTION to Seal (1) Combined Memorandum in Opposition to the Motions for Summary Judgment of the Putnam Defendants, Lawrence J. Lasser, Stephen M. Oristaglio, Robert F. Lucey, Gordon Silver, and Irene Esteves; (2) Statement of Facts in Support of Plaintiffs Combined Memorandum in Opposition to the Motions for Summary Judgment of the Putnam Defendants, Lawrence J. Lasser, Stephen M. Oristaglio, Robert F. Lucey, Gordon Silver, and Irene Esteves; and (3) Appendix of Exhibits by Joseph Shanis, Ohio Tuition Trust Authority Responses due by 10/14/2008 (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Amended)(Wayne, Richard)
September 24, 2008 Filing 3012 RESPONSE in Opposition re #2949 MOTION for Summary Judgment, #2956 MOTION for Summary Judgment On All Remaining Claims, #2959 MOTION for Summary Judgment, #2957 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by Salomon Smith Barney, Securities America, Inc., Peconic Partners, LLC, Nathan E. Saint-Amand, John T. Sargent, Harry Schipper, Salomon Smith Barney Inc., Pritchard Capital Partners LLC, Edward Segel, Iris Segel, Pritchard Capital Services LLC, Joseph R. Palombo, Steven L. Scheid, Landon H. Rowland, Dina Rozenbaum, Mark Schwartz, David Shaev, Security Brokerage, Inc., Pritchard Capital Parners LLC, Arnold D. Scott, William J. Poorvu, Lawrence T. Perera, Jeffrey L. Shames, Kevin R. Parke, Warren Pinchuck, Morton O. Schapiro, David A. Olsen, Prudential Securities, Inc., Round Hill Securities, Inc, Rydex Investments, One Group Mutual Funds, Charles I. Post, Julius Pallone, Frederick W. Ruebeck, One Group Dealer Services, Inc., Kliel Rose, Aurora Santos, Giacoma Ruggeri, George E. Pliska, Edward I. Segel, Putnam Family of Funds, Robert E. Patterson, George Putnam III, Carmel Peters, Charles E. Porter, Sr, Putnam Retail Management GP, Inc., Putnam Retail Management, L.P., Putnam Investment Management, LLC, Putnam, LLC, James E. Schultz, Robin Resnick, Julie Parisi, Pritchard Capital Partners LLC, Perkins Wolf McDonnell & Company, Grant D. Seeger, Security Trust Company, N.A., John Peffer, Prudential Financial, Inc., Salomon Smith Barney, Inc., Linda B Parker, Schield Management Company, Samaritan Asset Management, Joseph Palombo, Joseph Shanis, RTE Asset Management, Frank Perfetuo, James Prusko, Justin Scott, George Putnam, III, Putnam New York Tax Exempt Money Market Fund, Putnam California Tax Exempt Money Market Fund, Putnam PennsylvaniaTax Exempt Income Fund, Putnam New Jersey Tax Exempt Income Fund, Putnam Michigan Tax Exempt Income Fund, Putnam Florida Tax Exempt Income Fund, Putnam California Tax Exempt Income Fund, Putnam Arizona Tax Exempt Income Fund, Putnam Intermediate U.S. Government Income Fund, Putnam Income Fund, Putnam High Yield Trust, Putnam High Yield Advantage Fund, Putnam Health Sciences Trust, Putnam Global Natural Resources Fund, Putnam Global Income Trust, Putnam Global Equity Fund, Putnam Europe Equity Fund, Putnam Equity Income Fund, Putnam Diversified Income Trust, Putnam Discovery Growth Fund, Putnam Convertible Income-Growth Trust, Putnam Classic Equity Fund, Putnam Capital Appreciation Fund, Putnam Balanced Retirement Fund, Putnam Asia Pacific Growth Fund, Putnam American Government Income Fund, Putnam Voyager Fund, Putnam Vista Fund, Putnam Utilities Growth and Income Fund, Putnam U.S. Government Income Trust, Putnam Tax Exempt Money Market Fund, Putnam Tax Exempt Income Fund, Putnam Strategic Income Fund, Putnam Preferred Income Fund, Putnam OTC & Emerging Growth Fund, Putnam New Opportunities Fund, Putnam Municipal Income Fund, Putnam Money Market Fund, Putnam Investors Fund, Putnam International Equity Fund, Putnam Tax Smart Funds Trust, Putnam Asset Allocation Fund, Putnam Tax-Free Income Trust, Putnam Funds Trust, Putnam Investment Funds, Putnam Retail Management Limited Partnership, Stephen M. Oristaglio, Putnam Investment Management LLC, Putnam Investments Trust, Plan Advisory Committee, William L. Rosoff, Robert Rubin, Parametric Portfolio Associates, PA Fund Management, RCM Capital Management LLC, PEA Capital LLC, Pimco Advisors Distributors LLC, Putnam Investments, LLC, Putnam Investment Management Trust, Putnam Management Trust, Putnam Fiduciary Trust, Co., One Group Administrative Services Inc., Schwab Capital Markets L.P., J. B. Oxford, Putnam Ohio Tax Exempt Income Fund, Putnam New York Tax Exempt Income Fund, Putnam Minnesota Tax Exempt Income Fund, Putnam Massachusetts Tax Exempt Income Fund, One Group Services Company, Pentagon Asset Management, Ritchie Capital Management, LLC, PA Distributors LLC, PA Fund Management LLC, Pimco Funds Multi-Manager Series, PIMCO Funds: Pacific Investment Management Series, Richard F. Powers, RS Investment Management, LP, James Peterson, PFPC Distributors, Inc., PFPC, Inc., Powell, Lawrence S., RS Investment Management Co., LLC, RS Investment Management, Inc., Roger Hertog, RS Investment Trust, Steven S. Scholes, Mark A. Perry, Mike Sayegh, Ohio Tuition Trust Authority, RS Contrarian Value Fund, RS Diversified Growth Fund, RS Emerging Growth Fund, RS Global Natural Resources Fund, RS Growth Fund, RS Information Age Fund, RS Internet Age Fund, RS Midcap Opportunities Fund, RS Partner Fund, RS Smaller Company Growth Fund, Cynthia Puleo, Ritchie Capital Management, Inc., Round Hill Securities, Inc., Prudential Equity Group, LLC. Replies due by 10/8/2008. (Wayne, Richard) (Additional attachment(s) added on 9/29/2008: #1 Sealed Memorandum in opposition, #2 Sealed Statement of Facts, #3 Sealed Appendix of Exhibits, #4 Sealed Exhibit 1) (jnl, Deputy Clerk). (Additional attachment(s) added on 9/29/2008: #5 Sealed Exhibit 2, #6 Sealed Exhibit 3, #7 Sealed Exhibit 4, #8 Sealed Exhibit 5, #9 Sealed Exhibit 6, #10 Sealed Exhibit 7, #11 Sealed Exhibit 8, #12 Sealed Exhibit 9, #13 Sealed Exhibit 10, #14 Sealed Exhibit 11, #15 Sealed Exhibit 12, #16 Sealed Exhibit 13, #17 Sealed Exhibit 14, #18 Sealed Exhibit 15) (jnl, Deputy Clerk). (Additional attachment(s) added on 9/29/2008: #19 Sealed Exhibit 16, #20 Sealed Exhibit 17, #21 Sealed Exhibit 18, #22 Sealed Exhibit 19, #23 Sealed Exhibit 20, #24 Sealed Exhibit 21, #25 Sealed Exhibit 22, #26 Sealed Exhibit 23, #27 Sealed Exhibit 24, #28 Sealed Exhibit 25, #29 Sealed Exhibit 26, #30 Sealed Exhibit 27, #31 Sealed Exhibit 28, #32 Sealed Exhibit 29, #33 Sealed Exhibit 30) (jnl, Deputy Clerk). (Additional attachment(s) added on 9/29/2008: #34 Sealed Exhibit 31, #35 Sealed Exhibit 32, #36 Sealed Exhibit 33, #37 Sealed Exhibit 34, #38 Sealed Exhibit 35, #39 Sealed Exhibit 36, #40 Sealed Exhibit 37, #41 Sealed Exhibit 38, #42 Sealed Exhibit 39, #43 Sealed Exhibit 40, #44 Sealed Exhibit 41, #45 Sealed Exhibit 42, #46 Sealed Exhibit 43, #47 Sealed Exhibit 44, #48 Sealed Exhibit 45) (jnl, Deputy Clerk). (Additional attachment(s) added on 9/29/2008: #49 Sealed Exhibit 46, #50 Sealed Exhibit 47, #51 Sealed Exhibit 48, #52 Sealed Exhibit 49, #53 Sealed Exhibit 50, #54 Sealed Exhibit 51, #55 Sealed Exhibit 52, #56 Sealed Exhibit 53, #57 Sealed Exhibit 54, #58 Sealed Exhibit 55, #59 Sealed Exhibit 56, #60 Sealed Exhibit 57, #61 Sealed Exhibit 58, #62 Sealed Exhibit 59, #63 Sealed Exhibit 60) (jnl, Deputy Clerk). (Additional attachment(s) added on 9/29/2008: #64 Sealed Exhibit 61, #65 Sealed Exhibit 62, #66 Sealed Exhibit 63, #67 Sealed Exhibit 64, #68 Sealed Exhibit 65, #69 Sealed Exhibit 66, #70 Sealed Exhibit 67, #71 Sealed Exhibit 68, #72 Sealed Exhibit 69, #73 Sealed Exhibit 70, #74 Sealed Exhibit 71, #75 Sealed Exhibit 72, #76 Sealed Exhibit 73, #77 Sealed Exhibit 74, #78 Sealed Exhibit 75) (jnl, Deputy Clerk). (Additional attachment(s) added on 9/29/2008: #79 Sealed Exhibit 76, #80 Sealed Exhibit 77, #81 Sealed Exhibit 78, #82 Sealed Exhibit 79, #83 Sealed Exhibit 80, #84 Sealed Exhibit 81, #85 Sealed Exhibit 82, #86 Sealed Exhibit 83, #87 Sealed Exhibit 84, #88 Sealed Exhibit 85, #89 Sealed Exhibit 86, #90 Sealed Exhibit 87, #91 Sealed Exhibit 88, #92 Sealed Exhibit 89, #93 Sealed Exhibit 90) (jnl, Deputy Clerk). (Additional attachment(s) added on 9/29/2008: #94 Sealed Exhibit 91, #95 Sealed Exhibit 92, #96 Sealed Exhibit 93, #97 Sealed Exhibit 94, #98 Sealed Exhibit 95, #99 Sealed Exhibit 96, #100 Sealed Exhibit 97, #101 Sealed Exhibit 98, #102 Sealed Exhibit 99, #103 Sealed Exhibit 100, #104 Sealed Exhibit 101, #105 Sealed Exhibit 102, #106 Sealed Exhibit 103, #107 Sealed Exhibit 104, #108 Sealed Exhibit 105) (jnl, Deputy Clerk). (Additional attachment(s) added on 9/29/2008: #109 Sealed Exhibit 106, #110 Sealed Exhibit 107, #111 Sealed Exhibit 108, #112 Sealed Exhibit 109, #113 Sealed Exhibit 110, #114 Sealed Exhibit 111, #115 Sealed Exhibit 112, #116 Sealed Exhibit 113, #117 Sealed Exhibit 114, #118 Sealed Exhibit 115, #119 Sealed Exhibit 116, #120 Sealed Exhibit 117, #121 Sealed Exhibit 118, #122 Sealed Exhibit 119, #123 Sealed Exhibit 120) (jnl, Deputy Clerk). (Additional attachment(s) added on 9/29/2008: #124 Sealed Exhibit 121, #125 Sealed Exhibit 122, #126 Sealed Exhibit 123, #127 Sealed Exhibit 124, #128 Sealed Exhibit 125, #129 Sealed Exhibit 126, #130 Sealed Exhibit 127, #131 Sealed Exhibit 128, #132 Sealed Exhibit 129, #133 Sealed Exhibit 130, #134 Sealed Exhibit 131, #135 Sealed Exhibit 132, #136 Sealed Exhibit 133, #137 Sealed Exhibit 134, #138 Sealed Exhibit 135) (jnl, Deputy Clerk). (Additional attachment(s) added on 9/29/2008: #139 Sealed Exhibit 136, #140 Sealed Exhibit 137, #141 Sealed Exhibit 138, #142 Sealed Exhibit 139, #143 Sealed Exhibit 140, #144 Sealed Exhibit 141, #145 Sealed Exhibit 142, #146 Sealed Exhibit 143, #147 Sealed Exhibit 144, #148 Sealed Exhibit 145, #149 Sealed Exhibit 146, #150 Sealed Exhibit 147, #151 Sealed Exhibit 148, #152 Sealed Exhibit 149, #153 Sealed Exhibit 150) (jnl, Deputy Clerk). (Additional attachment(s) added on 9/29/2008: #154 Sealed Exhibit 151, #155 Sealed Exhibit 152, #156 Sealed Exhibit 153, #157 Sealed Exhibit 154, #158 Sealed Exhibit 155, #159 Sealed Exhibit 156, #160 Sealed Exhibit 157, #161 Sealed Exhibit 158, #162 Sealed Exhibit 159, #163 Sealed Exhibit 160, #164 Sealed Exhibit 161, #165 Sealed Exhibit 162, #166 Sealed Exhibit 163, #167 Sealed Exhibit 164, #168 Sealed Exhibit 165) (jnl, Deputy Clerk). (Additional attachment(s) added on 9/29/2008: #169 Sealed Exhibit 166, #170 Sealed Exhibit 167, #171 Sealed Exhibit 168, #172 Sealed Exhibit 169, #173 Sealed Exhibit 170, #174 Sealed Exhibit 171, #175 Sealed Exhibit 172, #176 Sealed Exhibit 173, #177 Sealed Exhibit 174, #178 Sealed Exhibit 175, #179 Sealed Exhibit 176, #180 Sealed Exhibit 177, #181 Sealed Exhibit 178, #182 Sealed Exhibit 179, #183 Sealed Exhibit 180) (jnl, Deputy Clerk). (Additional attachment(s) added on 9/29/2008: #184 Sealed Exhibit 181, #185 Sealed Exhibit 182, #186 Sealed Exhibit 183, #187 Sealed Exhibit 184, #188 Sealed Exhibit 185, #189 Sealed Exhibit 186, #190 Sealed Exhibit 187, #191 Sealed Exhibit 188, #192 Sealed
September 24, 2008 Filing 3011 (FILED IN ERROR - WILL REFILE) MOTION to Seal (1) Combined Memorandum in Opposition to the Motions for Summary Judgment of the Putnam Defendants, Lawrence J. Lasser, Stephen M. Oristaglio, Robert F. Lucey, Gordon Silver, and Irene Esteves; (2) Statement of Facts in Support of Plaintiffs Combined Memorandum in Opposition to the Motions for Summary Judgment of the Putnam Defendants, Lawrence J. Lasser, Stephen M. Oristaglio, Robert F. Lucey, Gordon Silver, and Irene Esteves; and (3) Appendix of Exhibits by Joseph Shanis, Ohio Tuition Trust Authority Responses due by 10/14/2008 (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Wayne, Richard) Modified on 9/24/2008 (jnl, Deputy Clerk).
September 24, 2008 Filing 3010 RESPONSE in Opposition re (93 in 1:04-cv-00497-JFM) MOTION to Certify Class Memorandum for the Janus Defendants in Opposition to Lead Plaintiff's Motion for Class Certification filed by Janus Distributors LLC, Janus Capital Management LLC, Janus Capital Group Inc.. Replies due by 10/8/2008. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Index to Exhibits Submitted by the Janus Defendants)Associated Cases: 1:04-md-15863-JFM, 1:04-cv-00497-JFM(Perry, Mark)
September 24, 2008 Filing 3009 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by RS Investment Management, LP, James L. Callinan, Steven M. Cohen, G. Randall Hecht, Keith, Peter, McCaffery, Michael G., RS Investment Management Co., LLC, RS Investment Management, Inc., RS Investment Trust, RS Contrarian Value Fund, RS Diversified Growth Fund, RS Emerging Growth Fund, RS Global Natural Resources Fund, RS Growth Fund, RS Information Age Fund, RS Internet Age Fund, RS Midcap Opportunities Fund, RS Partner Fund, RS Smaller Company Growth Fund re #3008 MOTION MOTION TO EXCLUDE TESTIMONY OF EDWARD S. O'NEAL, #3007 MOTION to Seal [CORRECTED VERSION] RS DEFENDANTS' MOTION TO FILE UNDER SEAL: (1) MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES IN SUPPORT OF RS DEFENDANTS' MOTION TO EXCLUDE TESTIMONY OF EDWARD S. O'NEAL; AND (2) DECLARATION OF JOSHUA WATTS I MOTION to Seal [CORRECTED VERSION] RS DEFENDANTS' MOTION TO FILE UNDER SEAL: (1) MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES IN SUPPORT OF RS DEFENDANTS' MOTION TO EXCLUDE TESTIMONY OF EDWARD S. O'NEAL; AND (2) DECLARATION OF JOSHUA WATTS I MOTION to Seal [CORRECTED VERSION] RS DEFENDANTS' MOTION TO FILE UNDER SEAL: (1) MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES IN SUPPORT OF RS DEFENDANTS' MOTION TO EXCLUDE TESTIMONY OF EDWARD S. O'NEAL; AND (2) DECLARATION OF JOSHUA WATTS I, #3006 MOTION to Seal RS DEFENDANTS' MOTION TO FILE UNDER SEAL: (1) MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES IN SUPPORT OF RS DEFENDANTS' MOTION TO EXCLUDE TESTIMONY OF EDWARD S. O'NEAL; AND (2) DECLARATION OF JOSHUA WATTS IN SUPPORT OF RS DEFE MOTION to Seal RS DEFENDANTS' MOTION TO FILE UNDER SEAL: (1) MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES IN SUPPORT OF RS DEFENDANTS' MOTION TO EXCLUDE TESTIMONY OF EDWARD S. O'NEAL; AND (2) DECLARATION OF JOSHUA WATTS IN SUPPORT OF RS DEFE MOTION to Seal RS DEFENDANTS' MOTION TO FILE UNDER SEAL: (1) MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES IN SUPPORT OF RS DEFENDANTS' MOTION TO EXCLUDE TESTIMONY OF EDWARD S. O'NEAL; AND (2) DECLARATION OF JOSHUA WATTS IN SUPPORT OF RS DEFE (Burns, James)
September 23, 2008 Filing 3008 MOTION MOTION TO EXCLUDE TESTIMONY OF EDWARD S. O'NEAL ( Responses due by 10/10/2008) by RS Investment Management, LP, James L. Callinan, Steven M. Cohen, G. Randall Hecht, Keith, Peter, McCaffery, Michael G., RS Investment Management Co., LLC, RS Investment Management, Inc., RS Investment Management, L.P. (Attachments: #1 NOTICE OF FILING DOCUMENT UNDER SEAL, #2 NOTICE OF FILING DOCUMENT UNDER SEAL, #3 Text of Proposed Order [PROPOSED] ORDER)(Burns, James) (Additional attachment(s) added on 9/25/2008: #4 Sealed Memorandum, #5 Sealed Declaration, #6 Sealed Exhibit 1, #7 Sealed Exhibit 2) (jnl, Deputy Clerk). Modified on 9/25/2008 (jnl, Deputy Clerk).
September 23, 2008 Filing 3007 MOTION to Seal [CORRECTED VERSION] RS DEFENDANTS' MOTION TO FILE UNDER SEAL: (1) MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES IN SUPPORT OF RS DEFENDANTS' MOTION TO EXCLUDE TESTIMONY OF EDWARD S. O'NEAL; AND (2) DECLARATION OF JOSHUA WATTS IN SUPPORT OF RS DEFENDANTS' MOTION TO EXCLUDE TESTIMONY OF EDWARD S. O'NEAL AND EXHIBITS 1-2 ( Responses due by 10/10/2008) by RS Investment Management, LP, James L. Callinan, Steven M. Cohen, G. Randall Hecht, Keith, Peter, McCaffery, Michael G., RS Investment Management Co., LLC, RS Investment Management, Inc., RS Investment Management, L.P. (Attachments: #1 MEMORANDUM IN SUPPORT OF MOTION, #2 Text of Proposed Order [PROPOSED] ORDER)(Burns, James)
September 23, 2008 Filing 3006 FILED IN ERROR - COUNSEL WILL RE-FILE MOTION to Seal RS DEFENDANTS' MOTION TO FILE UNDER SEAL: (1) MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES IN SUPPORT OF RS DEFENDANTS' MOTION TO EXCLUDE TESTIMONY OF EDWARD S. O'NEAL; AND (2) DECLARATION OF JOSHUA WATTS IN SUPPORT OF RS DEFENDANTS' MOTION TO EXCLUDE TESTIMONY OF EDWARD S. O'NEAL AND EXHIBITS 1-2 ( Responses due by 10/10/2008) by RS Investment Management, LP, James L. Callinan, Steven M. Cohen, G. Randall Hecht, Keith, Peter, McCaffery, Michael G., RS Investment Management Co., LLC, RS Investment Management, Inc., RS Investment Management, L.P. (Burns, James) Modified on 9/24/2008 (cag, Deputy Clerk).
September 23, 2008 Filing 3005 MOTION for Leave to File Unopposed a Combined Memorandum in Opposition to all Defendants' Motions for Summary Judgment by Joseph Shanis, Ohio Tuition Trust Authority Responses due by 10/10/2008 (Levy, John)
September 18, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 3004 ORDER granting #3001 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Andrew James Munro and Andrew Michael Zack terminated. Signed by Judge J. Frederick Motz on 9/18/08 (cag, Deputy Clerk)
September 10, 2008 Filing 3003 NOTICE by Ohio Tuition Trust Authority of Deposition of Christopher James (Revised) (Geoppinger, Jean)
August 29, 2008 Filing 3002 MOTION for Voluntary Dismissal of Defendant PFPC Distributors, Inc. by The Krouse Group Responses due by 9/15/2008 (Lahm, James)
August 4, 2008 Filing 3001 MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney Responses due by 8/21/2008 (Munro, Andrew)
July 30, 2008 Filing 3000 Joint REQUEST for Extension of Time to File Motion for Summary Judgment (Lantieri, Paul)
July 28, 2008 Filing 2999 NOTICE by The Krouse Group of Deposition of Michael G. McCaffery (Lahm, James)
July 24, 2008 Filing 2998 Correspondence re: Briefing Schedule (Motz, J.)
July 22, 2008 Filing 2997 NOTICE by Ohio Tuition Trust Authority of Postponement of Deposition of Mukesh Bajaj, Ph.D. (Geoppinger, Jean)
July 17, 2008 Filing 2996 NOTICE by Ohio Tuition Trust Authority of Deposition of Mukesh Bajaj, Ph.D. (Revised) (Geoppinger, Jean)
July 16, 2008 Filing 2995 NOTICE by Omid Kamshad OF ATTORNEY WITHDRAWAL. DEFENDANT KAMSHAD TERMINATED SHEPPARD MULLIN RICHTER & HAMPTON LLP'S REPRESENTATION OF HIM IN THIS MATTER ON OR ABOUT 6/21/07. (Filardo, Vincent)
July 16, 2008 Filing 2994 Correspondence re: Index of Exhibits to Investor Class Plaintiffs' Omnibus Memorandum of Law in Support of Motions for Class Certification Under Fed. R. Civ. P. 23 (Attachments: #1 Index of Exhibits)(Abramson, Glen)
July 16, 2008 Filing 2993 MOTION for Joinder In Putnam Defendants' Motion For Summary Judgment (Docket No. #2956 ) And Motions To Exclude (Docket Nos. #2975 , #2974 And #2967 ) by Gordon H. Silver Responses due by 8/4/2008 Associated Cases: 1:04-md-15863-JFM, 1:04-cv-00560-JFM, 1:04-cv-00564-JFM(Simshauser, Peter)
July 15, 2008 Filing 2992 NOTICE of Change of Address by Kenneth Gerard Walsh Associated Cases: 1:04-md-15863-JFM et al.(Walsh, Kenneth)
July 14, 2008 Filing 2991 NOTICE by Ohio Tuition Trust Authority of Deposition of Geoffrey Bobroff (Revised) (Geoppinger, Jean)
July 9, 2008 Filing 2990 Correcting Earlier Submission (Attachments: #1 Notice of Filing Under Seal)Associated Cases: 1:04-md-15863-JFM, 1:04-cv-00497-JFM(Luse, Jaime) (Additional attachment(s) added on 7/14/2008: #2 Sealed Declaration) (jnl, Deputy Clerk). Modified on 7/14/2008 (jnl, Deputy Clerk).
July 7, 2008 Filing 2989 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Maloon Powers Pitre & Higgins, LLC Associated Cases: 1:04-md-15863-JFM, 1:04-cv-00497-JFM(Ponist, Sean)
July 7, 2008 Filing 2988 Memorandum re (50 in 1:04-cv-01313-JFM, 50 in 1:04-cv-01314-JFM, 52 in 1:04-cv-01299-JFM, 50 in 1:04-cv-01302-JFM, 50 in 1:04-cv-01308-JFM, 50 in 1:04-cv-01309-JFM, 20 in 1:04-cv-01301-JFM, 49 in 1:04-cv-01623-JFM, 139 in 1:04-cv-01298-JFM, 1227 in 1:04-md-15861-CCB, 50 in 1:04-cv-01312-JFM, 77 in 1:04-cv-01288-JFM) MOTION to Certify Class, (2969 in 1:04-md-15863-JFM) MOTION to Certify Class Pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P. 23, (2973 in 1:04-md-15863-JFM) MOTION to Certify Class re Filing of Omnibus Memorandum in Support of Class Certification Under Seal filed by Post-retirement Health Insurance Plan and Trust. Associated Cases: 1:04-md-15861-CCB et al.(Luse, Jaime)
July 7, 2008 Filing 2987 Memorandum re (50 in 1:04-cv-01313-JFM, 50 in 1:04-cv-01314-JFM, 52 in 1:04-cv-01299-JFM, 50 in 1:04-cv-01302-JFM, 50 in 1:04-cv-01308-JFM, 50 in 1:04-cv-01309-JFM, 20 in 1:04-cv-01301-JFM, 49 in 1:04-cv-01623-JFM, 139 in 1:04-cv-01298-JFM, 1227 in 1:04-md-15861-CCB, 50 in 1:04-cv-01312-JFM, 77 in 1:04-cv-01288-JFM) MOTION to Certify Class filed by Post-retirement Health Insurance Plan and Trust. Associated Cases: 1:04-md-15861-CCB et al.(Luse, Jaime)
July 7, 2008 Filing 2986 Memorandum re (2973 in 1:04-md-15863-JFM) MOTION to Certify Class Under Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 23 filed by Maloon Powers Pitre & Higgins, LLC. Associated Cases: 1:04-md-15863-JFM, 1:04-cv-00497-JFM(Ponist, Sean)
July 7, 2008 Filing 2985 Memorandum re (2969 in 1:04-md-15863-JFM) MOTION to Certify Class Pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P. 23, (130 in 1:04-cv-03798-JFM) MOTION to Certify Class Pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P. 23 filed by Anthony Cacciola, John Hegstrom. Associated Cases: 1:04-md-15863-JFM et al.(Luse, Jaime)
July 7, 2008 Filing 2984 Memorandum re (2981 in 1:04-md-15863-JFM) MOTION for Summary Judgment of Liability Against Trader Defendants filed by Maloon Powers Pitre & Higgins, LLC. Associated Cases: 1:04-md-15863-JFM et al.(Luse, Jaime) (Additional attachment(s) added on 7/8/2008: #1 Sealed Memorandum in support, #2 Sealed Declaration, #3 Sealed Appendix of Exhibits, #4 Sealed Exhibit 1, #5 Sealed Exhibit 2, #6 Sealed Exhibit 3, #7 Sealed Exhibit 4, #8 Sealed Exhibit 5, #9 Sealed Exhibit 6, #10 Sealed Exhibit 7, #11 Sealed Exhibit 8) (jnl, Deputy Clerk). (Additional attachment(s) added on 7/8/2008: #12 Sealed Exhibit 9, #13 Sealed Exhibit 10, #14 Sealed Exhibit 11, #15 Sealed Exhibit 12, #16 Sealed Exhibit 13, #17 Sealed Exhibit 14, #18 Sealed Exhibit 15, #19 Sealed Exhibit 16) (jnl, Deputy Clerk). Modified on 7/8/2008 (jnl, Deputy Clerk).
July 3, 2008 Filing 2983 MOTION for Other Relief to Redact Documents Filed in Connection with Motion for Summary Judgment by Prudential Equity Group, LLC Responses due by 7/21/2008 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Proposed Order)(Thier, Jonathan)
July 3, 2008 Filing 2982 MOTION for Default Judgment as to Motion for Terminating Sanctions rendering Judgment by Default Against Defendants by Maloon Powers Pitre & Higgins, LLC Responses due by 7/21/2008 (Attachments: #1 Memorandum of Points and Authorities In Support, #2 Declaration of Sean E. Ponist, #3 Appedix of Exhibits, #4 Exhibit 1, #5 Exhibit2, #6 Ex 3, #7 Ex 4, #8 Ex 5, #9 ex. 6, #10 Ex 7, #11 Ex 8, #12 ex 9, #13 ex 10, #14 Ex 12, #15 ex 14, #16 ex 15, #17 ex 16, #18 ex 17, #19 ex 19, #20 ex 20, #21 ex 13, #22 Appendix of authorities, #23 Ex A to Appendix of Authorities, #24 Exhibit B to the Appendix of Authorities, #25 proposed order)(Ponist, Sean)
July 2, 2008 Filing 2981 MOTION for Summary Judgment of Liability Against Trader Defendants by Maloon Powers Pitre & Higgins, LLC Responses due by 7/21/2008 (Attachments: #1 Appendix Appendix of Authorities in support of Motion for Summary Judgement of Liability Against Trader Defendants, #2 Exhibit Exhibit A to Appendix of Authorities, #3 Exhibit Exhibit B to Appendix of Authorities, #4 Text of Proposed Order (Proposed) Judgement Granting Plaintiff California Financial Advisors' Motion for Summary Judgement)(Ponist, Sean) (Additional attachment(s) added on 11/20/2008: #5 Sealed Memorandum in support, #6 Sealed Declaration, #7 Sealed Declaration, #8 Sealed Appendix, #9 Sealed Exhibit 1, #10 Sealed Exhibit 2, #11 Sealed Exhibit 3, #12 Sealed Exhibit 4, #13 Sealed Exhibit 5, #14 Sealed Exhibit 6) (jnl, Deputy Clerk). (Additional attachment(s) added on 11/20/2008: #15 Sealed Exhibit 7, #16 Sealed Exhibit 8, #17 Sealed Exhibit 9, #18 Sealed Exhibit 10, #19 Sealed Exhibit 11, #20 Sealed Exhibit 12, #21 Sealed Exhibit 13, #22 Sealed Exhibit 14, #23 Sealed Exhibit 15, #24 Sealed Exhibit 16) (jnl, Deputy Clerk). Modified on 11/20/2008 (jnl, Deputy Clerk).
July 2, 2008 Filing 2980 MOTION to Seal Plaintiffs' Omnibus Memorandum of Law in Support of Motion for Class Certification ( Responses due by 7/21/2008) by Post-retirement Health Insurance Plan and Trust (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Abramson, Glen)
July 2, 2008 Filing 2979 NOTICE by Post-retirement Health Insurance Plan and Trust Filing of Omnibus Memorandum in Support of Class Certification Under Seal (Abramson, Glen)
July 2, 2008 Filing 2978 MOTION to Seal Notice of Filing of Documents Under Seal (Motion for Summary Judgement) by Maloon Powers Pitre & Higgins, LLC Responses due by 7/21/2008 (Attachments: #1 Plaintiff California Financial Advisors' Motion to File Document Under Seal (Motion for Summary Judgement))(Ponist, Sean)
July 2, 2008 Filing 2977 MOTION to Seal In Connection With Motions To Exclude Proposed Expert Opinions by Putnam LLC, Putnam Retail Management Limited Partnership, Stephen M. Oristaglio, Robert F. Lucey, Irene M. Esteves, Putnam Investment Management LLC, Putnam Investments Trust, Putnam Investment Management Trust Responses due by 7/21/2008 (Attachments: #1 Memorandum Of Law In Support Of The Putnam Defendants' Interim Sealing Motion In Connection With Their Motions To Exclude Proposed Expert Opinions, #2 (Proposed) Order)Associated Cases: 1:04-md-15863-JFM, 1:04-cv-00560-JFM, 1:04-cv-00564-JFM(Simshauser, Peter)
July 2, 2008 Filing 2976 MOTION for Summary Judgment by Rydex Investments. Responses due by 7/21/2008 (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Declarattion of Kevin Farragher, #2 Memorandum In Support of Motion for Summary Judgment)Associated Cases: 1:04-md-15863-JFM, 1:04-cv-00497-JFM(Wilson, Michael)
July 2, 2008 Filing 2975 MOTION for Other Relief Motion To Exclude Proposed Expert Opinions Of Marc Vellrath by Putnam LLC, Putnam Investment Management, LLC, Putnam Retail Management Limited Partnership, Stephen M. Oristaglio, Robert F. Lucey, Irene M. Esteves, Putnam Investments Trust, Putnam Investment Management Trust Responses due by 7/21/2008 (Attachments: #1 Memorandum Of Law In Support Of The Putnam Defendants' Motion To Exclude Proposed Expert Opinions Of Marc Vellrath, #2 Appendix Of Exhibits To The Putnam Defendants' Motion To Exclude Proposed Expert Opinions Of Marc Vellrath)Associated Cases: 1:04-md-15863-JFM, 1:04-cv-00560-JFM, 1:04-cv-00564-JFM(Simshauser, Peter) (Additional attachment(s) added on 7/7/2008: #3 Sealed Memorandum in support, #4 Sealed Appendix of Exhibits, #5 Sealed Exhibit 1, #6 Sealed Exhibit 2, #7 Sealed Exhibit 3, #8 Sealed Exhibit 4, #9 Sealed Exhibit 5, #10 Sealed Certificate of Service) (jnl, Deputy Clerk). Modified on 7/7/2008 (jnl, Deputy Clerk).
July 2, 2008 Filing 2974 MOTION for Other Relief Motion To Exclude Proposed Expert Opinions Of M. Kathleen Leugers And Edward S. O'Neal by Putnam LLC, Putnam Investment Management, LLC, Putnam Retail Management Limited Partnership, Stephen M. Oristaglio, Robert F. Lucey, Irene M. Esteves, Putnam Investments Trust, Putnam Investment Management Trust Responses due by 7/21/2008 (Attachments: #1 Memorandum Of Law In Support Of The Putnam Defendants' Motion To Exclude Proposed Expert Opinions Of M. Kathleen Leugers And Edward S. O'Neal, #2 Appendix Of Exhibits To The Putnam Defendants' Motion To Exclude Proposed Expert Opinions Of M. Kathleen Leugers And Edward S. O'Neal)Associated Cases: 1:04-md-15863-JFM, 1:04-cv-00560-JFM, 1:04-cv-00564-JFM(Simshauser, Peter) (Additional attachment(s) added on 7/7/2008: #3 Sealed Memorandum in support, #4 Sealed Appendix of Exhibits, #5 Sealed Exhibit 1, #6 Sealed Exhibit 2, #7 Sealed Exhibit 3, #8 Sealed Exhibit 4, #9 Sealed Exhibit 5, #10 Sealed Exhibit 6) (jnl, Deputy Clerk). (Additional attachment(s) added on 7/7/2008: #11 Sealed Exhibit 7, #12 Sealed Exhibit 8, #13 Sealed Exhibit 9, #14 Sealed Exhibit 10, #15 Sealed Exhibit 11, #16 Sealed Certificate of Service) (jnl, Deputy Clerk). Modified on 7/7/2008 (jnl, Deputy Clerk).
July 2, 2008 Filing 2973 MOTION to Certify Class by Maloon Powers Pitre & Higgins, LLC Responses due by 7/21/2008 (Attachments: #1 Appendix of Authorities, #2 Attachment A to Appendix, #3 Attachement B to Appendix, #4 Proposed Order)(Ponist, Sean) (Additional attachment(s) added on 11/20/2008: #5 Sealed Memorandum in support, #6 Sealed Declaration, #7 Sealed Appendix, #8 Sealed Exhibit 1, #9 Sealed Exhibit 2, #10 Sealed Exhibit 3, #11 Sealed Exhibit 4, #12 Sealed Exhibit 5, #13 Sealed Exhibit 6, #14 Sealed Exhibit 7, #15 Sealed Exhibit 8, #16 Sealed Exhibit 9, #17 Sealed Exhibit 10) (jnl, Deputy Clerk). (Additional attachment(s) added on 11/20/2008: #18 Sealed Exhibit 11, #19 Sealed Exhibit 12, #20 Sealed Exhibit 13, #21 Sealed Exhibit 14, #22 Sealed Exhibit 15, #23 Sealed Exhibit 16, #24 Sealed Exhibit 17, #25 Sealed Exhibit 18, #26 Sealed Exhibit 19, #27 Sealed Exhibit 20, #28 Sealed Exhibit 21, #29 Sealed Exhibit 22, #30 Sealed Exhibit 23, #31 Sealed Exhibit 24, #32 Sealed Exhibit 25) (jnl, Deputy Clerk). Modified on 11/20/2008 (jnl, Deputy Clerk).
July 2, 2008 Filing 2972 MOTION to Seal -Notice of Motion to File Documents Under Seal (Class Certification) by Maloon Powers Pitre & Higgins, LLC Responses due by 7/21/2008 (Attachments: #1 Motion to File Documents Under Seal (Class Certification))(Ponist, Sean)
July 2, 2008 Filing 2971 MOTION for Leave to File Memorandum in Support of Motion for Class Certification and Exhibits Thereto Under Seal by Anthony Cacciola, John Hegstrom Responses due by 7/21/2008 (Lahm, James)
July 2, 2008 Filing 2970 NOTICE by Anthony Cacciola, John Hegstrom of Filing of Document Under Seal (Lahm, James)
July 2, 2008 Filing 2969 MOTION to Certify Class Pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P. 23 by Anthony Cacciola, John Hegstrom Responses due by 7/21/2008 (Lahm, James) (Additional attachment(s) added on 7/14/2008: #1 Sealed Memorandum in support, #2 Sealed Exhibit A, #3 Sealed Exhibit B, #4 Sealed Exhibit C, #5 Sealed Exhibit D, #6 Sealed Exhibit E, #7 Sealed Exhibit F, #8 Sealed Exhibit G, #9 Sealed Exhibit H) (jnls, Deputy Clerk). (Additional attachment(s) added on 7/14/2008: #10 Sealed Exhibit I, #11 Sealed Exhibit J, #12 Sealed Exhibit K, #13 Sealed Exhibit L, #14 Sealed Exhibit M, #15 Sealed Exhibit N, #16 Sealed Exhibit O, #17 Sealed Exhibit P) (jnls, Deputy Clerk). (Additional attachment(s) added on 7/14/2008: #18 Sealed Exhibit Q, #20 Sealed Exhibit R, #21 Sealed Exhibit S, #22 Sealed Exhibit T, #23 Sealed Exhibit U, #24 Sealed Exhibit V) (jnls, Deputy Clerk). Modified on 7/14/2008 (jnls, Deputy Clerk).
July 2, 2008 Filing 2968 MOTION for Summary Judgment ON BEHALF OF RS ADVISERS ( Responses due by 7/21/2008) by RS Investment Management, LP, RS Investment Management Co., LLC, RS Investment Management, Inc., RS Investment Management, L.P. (Attachments: #1 NOTICE OF FILING OF DOCUMENT UNDER SEAL [RS ADVISERS' MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES IN SUPPORT OF MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT], #2 Text of Proposed Order [PROPOSED] ORDER GRANTING THE RS ADVISERS' MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT, #3 NOTICE OF FILING OF DOCUMENTS UNDER SEAL [DECLARATION OF RICHARD GALLAGHER IN SUPPORT OF THE RS ADVISERS' MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT, THE RS INDIVIDUALS' MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT, AND THE RS DEFENDANTS' MOTION TO EXCLUDE TESTIMONY OF MARC VELLRATH, #4 DECLARATION OF MARIANNE CLARK IN SUPPORT OF THE RS ADVISERS' MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT AND THE RS INDIVIDUALS' MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT, #5 NOTICE OF FILING OF DOCUMENTS UNDER SEAL [DECLARATION OF PROFESSOR ALLEN FERRELL IN SUPPORT OF THE RS ADVISERS' MOT. FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT, THE RS INDIVIDUALS' MOT. FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT, AND THE RS DEFENDANTS' MOT. TO EXCLUDE TESTIMONY OF MARC VELLRATH], #6 NOTICE OF FILING OF DOCUMENTS UNDER SEAL [DECLARATION OF DANIEL M. GARRETT IN SUPPORT OF THE RS ADVISERS' MOT. FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT, THE RS INDIVIDUALS' MOT. FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT, AND THE RS DEFENDANTS' MOT. TO EXCLUDE TESTIMONY OF MARC VELLRATH])(Burns, James) (Additional attachment(s) added on 7/8/2008: #7 Sealed Memorandum in support, #8 Sealed Declaration of Allen Ferrell, #9 Sealed Declaration of Richard Gallagher, #10 Sealed Declaration of Daniel Garrett, #11 Sealed Exhibit 1, #12 Sealed Exhibit 2, #13 Sealed Exhibit 3, #14 Sealed Exhibit 4, #15 Sealed Exhibit 5) (jnl, Deputy Clerk). (Additional attachment(s) added on 7/8/2008: #16 Sealed Exhibit 6, #17 Sealed Exhibit 7, #18 Sealed Exhibit 8, #19 Sealed Exhibit 9, #20 Sealed Exhibit 10, #21 Sealed Exhibit 11, #22 Sealed Exhibit 12, #23 Sealed Exhibit 13, #24 Sealed Exhibit 14, #25 Sealed Exhibit 15, #26 Sealed Exhibit 16, #27 Sealed Exhibit 17, #28 Sealed Exhibit 18, #29 Sealed Exhibit 19, #30 Sealed Exhibit 20) (jnl, Deputy Clerk). (Additional attachment(s) added on 7/8/2008: #31 Sealed Exhibit 21, #32 Sealed Exhibit 22, #33 Sealed Exhibit 23, #34 Sealed Exhibit 24, #35 Sealed Exhibit 25, #36 Sealed Exhibit 26, #37 Sealed Exhibit 27) (jnl, Deputy Clerk). (Additional attachment(s) added on 7/8/2008: #38 Sealed Exhibit 28, #39 Sealed Exhibit 29, #40 Sealed Exhibit 30, #41 Sealed Exhibit 31, #42 Sealed Exhibit 32, #43 Sealed Exhibit 33, #44 Sealed Exhibit 34, #45 Sealed Exhibit 35, #46 Sealed Exhibit 36, #47 Sealed Exhibit 37) (jnl, Deputy Clerk). Modified on 7/8/2008 (jnl, Deputy Clerk).
July 2, 2008 Filing 2967 MOTION for Other Relief Motion To Exclude Proposed Expert Opinions Of Mercer E. Bullard by Putnam LLC, Putnam Investment Management, LLC, Putnam Retail Management Limited Partnership, Stephen M. Oristaglio, Robert F. Lucey, Irene M. Esteves, Putnam Investments Trust, Putnam Investment Management Trust Responses due by 7/21/2008 (Attachments: #1 Memorandum Of Law In Support Of The Putnam Defendants' Motion To Exclude Proposed Expert Opinions Of Mercer E. Bullard, #2 Appendix Of Exhibits To The Putnam Defendants' Motion To Exclude Proposed Expert Opinions Of Mercer E. Bullard (Vol. 1), #3 Appendix Of Exhibits To The Putnam Defendants' Motion To Exclude Proposed Expert Opinions Of Mercer E. Bullard (Vol. 2))Associated Cases: 1:04-md-15863-JFM, 1:04-cv-00560-JFM, 1:04-cv-00564-JFM(Simshauser, Peter) (Additional attachment(s) added on 7/7/2008: #4 Sealed Memorandum in support, #5 Sealed Appendix Cov Vol I, #6 Sealed Exhibit 1, #7 Sealed Exhibit 2, #8 Sealed Exhibit 4, #9 Sealed Certificate of Service) (Sealed Exhibit 3 rec'd in paper format 7/16/08) (jnl, Deputy Clerk). Modified on 7/7/2008 (jnl, Deputy Clerk). Modified on 7/14/2008 (jnl, Deputy Clerk). Modified on 7/14/2008 (jnl, Deputy Clerk). Modified on 7/16/2008 (jnl, Deputy Clerk).
July 2, 2008 Filing 2966 MOTION Motion to Exclude Testimony of Marc Vellrath ( Responses due by 7/21/2008) by RS Investment Management, LP, James L. Callinan, Steven M. Cohen, G. Randall Hecht, Keith, Peter, McCaffery, Michael G., RS Investment Management Co., LLC, RS Investment Management, Inc., RS Investment Management, L.P. (Attachments: #1 Notice of Filing Document Under Seal, #2 Text of Proposed Order [Proposed] Order)(Herzinger, Kenneth) (Additional attachment(s) added on 7/8/2008: #3 Sealed Memorandum in support) (jnl, Deputy Clerk). Modified on 7/8/2008 (jnl, Deputy Clerk).
July 2, 2008 Filing 2965 MOTION for Summary Judgment ON BEHALF OF RS INDIVIDUALS ( Responses due by 7/21/2008) by James L. Callinan, Steven M. Cohen, G. Randall Hecht, Keith, Peter, McCaffery, Michael G.. (Attachments: #1 Notice of Filing of Document Under Seal [RS INDIVIDUALS' MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES IN SUPPORT OF MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT], #2 Text of Proposed Order [PROPOSED] ORDER GRANTING THE RS INDIVIDUALS' MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT, #3 DECLARATION OF JAMES L. CALLINAN IN SUPPORT OF THE RS INDIVIDUALS' MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT AND THE RS ADVISERS' MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT, #4 DECLARATION OF STEVEN M. COHEN IN SUPPORT OF THE RS INDIVIDUALS' MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT AND THE RS ADVISERS' MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT, #5 DECLARATION OF G. RANDALL HECHT IN SUPPORT OF THE RS INDIVIDUALS' MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT AND THE RS ADVISERS' MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT, #6 DECLARATION OF PETER KEITH IN SUPPORT OF THE RS INDIVIDUALS' MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT AND THE RS ADVISERS' MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT, #7 DECLARATION OF MICHAEL G. MCCAFFERY IN SUPPORT OF THE RS INDIVIDUALS' MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT AND THE RS ADVISERS' MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT)(Gallagher, Richard) (Additional attachment(s) added on 7/8/2008: #8 Sealed Memorandum in support) (jnl, Deputy Clerk). Modified on 7/8/2008 (jnl, Deputy Clerk).
July 2, 2008 Filing 2964 MOTION to Seal (1) MEMORANDUM IN SUPPORT OF RS ADVISERS' MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT; (2) MEMORANDUM IN SUPPORT OF RS INDIVIDUALS' MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT; (3) MEMORANDUM IN SUPPORT OF RS DEFENDANTS' MOTION TO EXCLUDE TESTIMONY OF MARC VELLRATH; (4) DECLARATION OF RICHARD GALLAGHER IN SUPPORT OF MOTIONS; (5) DECLARATION OF PROFESSOR ALLEN FERRELL IN SUPPORT OF MOTIONS; AND (6) DECLARATION OF DANIEL M. GARRETT IN SUPPORT OF MOTIONS ( Responses due by 7/21/2008) by RS Investment Management, LP, James L. Callinan, Steven M. Cohen, G. Randall Hecht, Keith, Peter, McCaffery, Michael G., RS Investment Management Co., LLC, RS Investment Management, Inc., RS Investment Management, L.P. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum In Support of Motion, #2 Text of Proposed Order [Proposed] Order)(Burns, James)
July 2, 2008 Filing 2963 MOTION to Seal In Connection With Motions For Summary Judgment by Putnam LLC, Putnam Investment Management, LLC, Putnam Retail Management Limited Partnership, Stephen M. Oristaglio, Robert F. Lucey, Irene M. Esteves, Putnam Investments Trust, Putnam Investment Management Trust Responses due by 7/21/2008 (Attachments: #1 Memorandum Of Law In Support Of The Putnam Defendants' Interim Sealing Motion In Connection With Their Motions For Summary Judgment, #2 (Proposed) Order)Associated Cases: 1:04-md-15863-JFM, 1:04-cv-00560-JFM, 1:04-cv-00564-JFM(Simshauser, Peter)
July 2, 2008 Filing 2962 NOTICE by Joseph Shanis, Ohio Tuition Trust Authority of Filing of Document Under Seal (Wayne, Richard)
July 2, 2008 Filing 2961 MOTION for Leave to File Supplemental Memorandum of Plaintiffs Ohio Tuition Trust Authority and Joseph Shanis in Support of Class Certification and Exhibits Thereto Under Seal by Joseph Shanis, Ohio Tuition Trust Authority Responses due by 7/21/2008 (Wayne, Richard) (Additional attachment(s) added on 7/3/2008: #1 Sealed Supplemental Memorandum in support, #2 Sealed Exhibit 1, #3 Sealed Exhibit 2, #4 Sealed Exhibit 3, #5 Sealed Exhibit 4, #6 Sealed Exhibit 5, #7 Sealed Exhibit 6, #8 Sealed Exhibit 7, #9 Sealed Exhibit 8, #10 Sealed Exhibit 9, #11 Sealed Exhibit 10, #12 Sealed Exhibit 11, #13 Sealed Exhibit 12, #14 Sealed Exhibit 13, #15 Sealed Exhibit 14, #16 Sealed Exhibit 15) (jnl, Deputy Clerk). (Additional attachment(s) added on 7/3/2008: #17 Sealed Exhibit 16, #18 Sealed Exhibit 17, #19 Sealed Exhibit 18, #20 Sealed Exhibit 19, #21 Sealed Exhibit 20, #22 Sealed Exhibit 21, #23 Sealed Exhibit 22, #24 Sealed Exhibit 23, #25 Sealed Exhibit 24, #26 Sealed Exhibit 25, #27 Sealed Exhibit 26, #28 Sealed Exhibit 27, #29 Sealed Exhibit 28, #30 Sealed Exhibit 29, #31 Sealed Exhibit 30) (jnl, Deputy Clerk). (Additional attachment(s) added on 7/3/2008: #32 Sealed Exhibit 31, #33 Sealed Exhibit 32, #34 Sealed Exhibit 33, #35 Sealed Exhibit 34, #36 Sealed Exhibit 35, #37 Sealed Exhibit 36, #38 Sealed Exhibit 37, #39 Sealed Exhibit 38, #40 Sealed Exhibit 39, #41 Sealed Exhibit 40, #42 Sealed Exhibit 41, #43 Sealed Exhibit 42, #44 Sealed Exhibit 43, #45 Sealed Exhibit 44, #46 Sealed Exhibit 45, #47 Sealed Exhibit 46, #48 Sealed Exhibit 47, #49 Sealed Exhibit 48, #50 Sealed Exhibit 49, #51 Sealed Exhibit 50) (jnl, Deputy Clerk). Modified on 7/3/2008 (jnl, Deputy Clerk).
July 2, 2008 Filing 2960 MOTION to Certify Class Pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P. 23 by Joseph Shanis, Ohio Tuition Trust Authority Responses due by 7/21/2008 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Putnam Damaged Funds)(Wayne, Richard)
July 2, 2008 Filing 2959 MOTION for Summary Judgment by Stephen M. Oristaglio, Robert F. Lucey, Irene M. Esteves Responses due by 7/21/2008 (Attachments: #1 Memorandum Of Law In Support Of The Motion For Summary Judgment Of Defendants Irene M. Esteves, Robert F. Lucey, And Stephen M. Oristaglio)Associated Cases: 1:04-md-15863-JFM, 1:04-cv-00560-JFM(Simshauser, Peter) (Additional attachment(s) added on 7/7/2008: #2 Sealed Memorandum in support) (jnls, Deputy Clerk). Modified on 7/7/2008 (jnls, Deputy Clerk).
July 2, 2008 Filing 2958 Interim MOTION to Seal by Gordon H. Silver, Gordon H. Silver Responses due by 7/21/2008 (Attachments: #1 Memorandum of Law in Support of Defendant Gordon H. Silver's Interim Sealing Motion, #2 Text of Proposed Order on Interim Sealing Motion)Associated Cases: 1:04-md-15863-JFM, 1:04-cv-00560-JFM(Cooke, Marjorie)
July 2, 2008 Filing 2957 MOTION for Summary Judgment by Gordon H. Silver, Gordon H. Silver Responses due by 7/21/2008 (Attachments: #1 Affidavit of Transmittal by Marjorie Sommer Cooke, #2 Appendix of Exhibits to Gordon H. Silver's Motion for Summary Judgment, #3 Memorandum of Law in Support of Defendant Gordon H. Silver's Motion for Summary Judgment)Associated Cases: 1:04-md-15863-JFM, 1:04-cv-00560-JFM(Cooke, Marjorie) (Additional attachment(s) added on 7/7/2008: #4 Sealed Memorandum in support, #5 Sealed Appendix of Exhibits, #6 Sealed Appendix 1, #7 Sealed Appendix 2, #8 Sealed Appendix 3, #9 Sealed Appendix 4, #10 Sealed Appendix 5, #11 Sealed Appendix 6, #12 Sealed Appendix 7) (jnl, Deputy Clerk). (Additional attachment(s) added on 7/7/2008: #13 Sealed Appendix 8, #14 Sealed Appendix 9, #15 Sealed Appendix 10, #16 Sealed Appendix 11, #17 Sealed Appendix 12, #18 Sealed Appendix 13, #19 Sealed Appendix 14, #20 Sealed Certificate of Service) (jnl, Deputy Clerk). Modified on 7/7/2008 (jnl, Deputy Clerk).
July 2, 2008 Filing 2956 MOTION for Summary Judgment On All Remaining Claims by Putnam LLC, Putnam Retail Management Limited Partnership, Stephen M. Oristaglio, Robert F. Lucey, Irene M. Esteves, Putnam Investment Management LLC, Putnam Investments Trust, Putnam Investment Management Trust Responses due by 7/21/2008 (Attachments: #1 Statement Of Undisputed Facts In Support Of The Putnam Defendants' Motion For Summary Judgment On All Remaining Claims, #2 Memorandum Of Law In Support Of The Putnam Defendants' Motion For Summary Judgment On All Remaining Claims, #3 Transmittal Affidavit Of Peter Simshauser, #4 Appendix Of Exhibits To The Putnam Defendants' Motion For Summary Judgment On All Remaining Claims (Vol.1-5), #5 Appendix Of Exhibits To The Putnam Defendants' Motion For Summary Judgment On All Remaining Claims (Vol. 6))Associated Cases: 1:04-md-15863-JFM, 1:04-cv-00560-JFM, 1:04-cv-00564-JFM(Simshauser, Peter) (Additional attachment(s) added on 7/3/2008: #6 Sealed Memorandum in support, #7 Sealed Statement of Undisputed Facts) (jnl, Deputy Clerk). (Additional attachment(s) added on 7/3/2008: #8 Sealed Cover Vol I, #9 Sealed Appendix I, #10 Sealed Appendix 2, #11 Sealed Appendix 3, #12 Sealed Appendix 4, #13 Sealed Appendix 5, #14 Sealed Appendix 6, #15 Sealed Appendix 7, #16 Sealed Appendix 8, #17 Sealed Appendix 9, #18 Sealed Appendix 10, #19 Sealed Appendix 11, #20 Sealed Appendix 12, #21 Sealed Appendix 13, #22 Sealed Appendix 14, #23 Sealed Appendix 15, #24 Sealed Appendix 16, #25 Sealed Appendix 17, #26 Sealed Appendix 18, #27 Sealed Appendix 19, #28 Sealed Appendix 20, #29 Sealed Appendix 21, #30 Sealed Appendix 22, #31 Sealed Appendix 23, #32 Sealed Appendix 24, #33 Sealed Appendix 25, #34 Sealed Appendix 26, #35 Sealed Appendix 27, #36 Sealed Appendix 28, #37 Sealed Appendix 29, #38 Sealed Appendix 30, #39 Sealed Appendix 31, #40 Sealed Appendix 32, #41 Sealed Appendix 33, #42 Sealed Appendix 34, #43 Sealed Appendix 35, #44 Sealed Appendix 36, #45 Sealed Appendix 37, #46 Sealed Certificate of Service) (jnl, Deputy Clerk). Modified on 7/3/2008 (jnl, Deputy Clerk). (Additional attachment(s) added on 7/7/2008: #47 Cover Vol VI) (jnls, Deputy Clerk). (Additional attachment(s) added on 7/7/2008: #48 Sealed Appendix 111, #49 Sealed Appendix 112, #50 Sealed Appendix 113, #51 Sealed Appendix 114, #52 Sealed Appendix 115) (jnls, Deputy Clerk). (Additional attachment(s) added on 7/7/2008: #53 Sealed Appendix 116, #54 Sealed Appendix 117, #55 Sealed Appendix 118, #56 Sealed Appendix 119, #57 Sealed Appendix 120, #58 Sealed Appendix 121, #59 Sealed Appendix 122, #60 Sealed Appendix 123, #61 Sealed Appendix 124) (jnls, Deputy Clerk). (Additional attachment(s) added on 7/7/2008: #62 Sealed Appendix 125, #63 Sealed Appendix 126, #64 Sealed Appendix 127, #65 Sealed Appendix 128, #66 Sealed Appendix 129, #67 Sealed Appendix 130, #68 Sealed Appendix 131, #69 Sealed Appendix 132, #70 Sealed Appendix 133, #71 Sealed Appendix 134, #72 Sealed Appendix 135) (jnls, Deputy Clerk). (Additional attachment(s) added on 7/7/2008: #73 Sealed Appendix 136, #74 Sealed Appendix 137, #75 Sealed Appendix 138, #76 Sealed Appendix 139, #77 Sealed Appendix 140, #78 Sealed Appendix 141, #79 Sealed Appendix 142, #80 Sealed Appendix 143, #81 Sealed Appendix 144, #82 Sealed Appendix 145) (jnls, Deputy Clerk). (Additional attachment(s) added on 7/7/2008: #83 Sealed Appendix 146, #84 Sealed Appendix 147, #85 Sealed Appendix 148, #86 Sealed Appendix 149, #87 Sealed Appendix 150, #88 Sealed Appendix 151, #89 Sealed Certificate of Service) (jnls, Deputy Clerk). (Additional attachment(s) added on 7/7/2008: #90 Sealed Cover Vol II, #91 Sealed Appendix 38, #92 Sealed Appendix 39, #93 Sealed Appendix 40, #94 Sealed Appendix 41, #95 Sealed Appendix 42, #96 Sealed Appendix 43, #97 Sealed Appendix 44, #98 Sealed Appendix 45) (jnls, Deputy Clerk). (Additional attachment(s) added on 7/7/2008: #99 Sealed Appendix 46, #100 Sealed Appendix 47, #101 Sealed Appendix 48, #102 Sealed Appendix 49, #103 Sealed Appendix 50, #104 Sealed Appendix 52, #105 Sealed Appendix 53) (jnls, Deputy Clerk). (Additional attachment(s) added on 7/7/2008: #106 Sealed Appendix 55, #107 Sealed Appendix 56, #108 Sealed Appendix 57, #109 Sealed Appendix 58, #110 Sealed Appendix 59, #111 Sealed Certificate of Service) (jnls, Deputy Clerk). (Additional attachment(s) added on 7/7/2008: #112 Sealed Cover Vol III, #113 Sealed Appendix 60, #114 Sealed Appendix 61, #115 Sealed Appendix 62, #116 Sealed Appendix 65, #117 Sealed Appendix 66, #118 Sealed Appendix 67, #119 Sealed Appendix 69, #120 Sealed Appendix 70) (jnls, Deputy Clerk). (Additional attachment(s) added on 7/7/2008: #121 Sealed Appendix 72, #122 Sealed Appendix 73, #123 Sealed Appendix 74, #124 Sealed Appendix 75, #125 Sealed Appendix 76, #126 Sealed Certificate of Service) (jnls, Deputy Clerk). (Additional attachment(s) added on 7/7/2008: #127 Sealed Cover Vol IV, #128 Sealed Appendix 77, #129 Sealed Appendix 78, #130 Sealed Appendix 79, #131 Sealed Appendix 80, #132 Sealed Appendix 81, #133 Sealed Appendix 82, #134 Sealed Appendix 83, #135 Sealed Appendix 84, #136 Sealed Appendix 85) (jnls, Deputy Clerk). (Additional attachment(s) added on 7/7/2008: #137 Sealed Appendix 86, #138 Sealed Appendix 87, #139 Sealed Appendix 88, #140 Sealed Appendix 89, #141 Sealed Appendix 90, #142 Sealed Appendix 91) (jnls, Deputy Clerk). (Additional attachment(s) added on 7/7/2008: #143 Sealed Appendix 92, #144 Sealed Appendix 93, #145 Sealed Appendix 94, #146 Sealed Appendix 95, #147 Sealed Certificate of Service) (jnls, Deputy Clerk). (Additional attachment(s) added on 7/7/2008: #148 Sealed Cover Vol V, #149 Sealed Appendix 96, #150 Sealed Appendix 97, #151 Sealed Appendix 98, #152 Sealed Appendix 99, #153 Sealed Appendix 100, #154 Sealed Appendix 102) (jnls, Deputy Clerk). (Additional attachment(s) added on 7/7/2008: #155 Sealed Appendix 103, #156 Sealed Appendix 104, #157 Sealed Appendix 106, #158 Sealed Appendix 107, #159 Sealed Appendix 108, #160 Sealed Appendix 109, #161 Sealed Appendix 110, #162 Sealed Certificate of Service) (Sealed Exhibits 51,54,63,64,71,101 and 105 rec'd in paper format 7/16/08) (jnls, Deputy Clerk). Modified on 7/7/2008 (jnls, Deputy Clerk). Modified on 7/14/2008 (jnl, Deputy Clerk). Modified on 7/16/2008 (jnl, Deputy Clerk).
July 2, 2008 Filing 2955 MOTION Joinder of the Janus Defendants in Motions to Exclude Expert Evidence by Janus Distributors LLC, Janus Capital Management LLC, Janus Capital Group Inc. Responses due by 7/21/2008 Associated Cases: 1:04-md-15863-JFM, 1:04-cv-00497-JFM, 1:04-cv-00518-JFM(Perry, Mark)
July 2, 2008 Filing 2954 MOTION for Summary Judgment by Janus Distributors LLC, Janus Capital Management LLC, Janus Capital Group Inc. Responses due by 7/21/2008 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Memorandum for the Janus Defendants In Support of Their Motion for Summary Judgment, #2 Exhibit Separate Statement of Undisputed Facts, #3 Exhibit Index to Exhibits Submitted by the Janus Defendants in Support of Their Motion for Summary Judgment)Associated Cases: 1:04-md-15863-JFM, 1:04-cv-00497-JFM, 1:04-cv-00518-JFM(Perry, Mark)
July 2, 2008 Filing 2953 Memorandum re #2952 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by Prudential Equity Group, LLC. (Thier, Jonathan)
July 2, 2008 Filing 2952 MOTION for Summary Judgment by Prudential Equity Group, LLC. Responses due by 7/21/2008 (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Jonathan D. Thier)(Thier, Jonathan)
July 1, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 2951 ORDER approving (2948 in 1:04-md-15863-JFM) Notice of Voluntary Dismissal filed by Gerald Born, Donna Gaffney, (80 in 1:04-cv-00876-JFM) Notice of Voluntary Dismissal filed by Gerald Born, Donna Gaffney. Signed by Judge J. Frederick Motz on 7/1/08. Associated Cases: 1:04-md-15863-JFM, 1:04-cv-00876-JFM(jnl, Deputy Clerk)
July 1, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 2950 ORDER staying actions against the Alger defendants in comtemplation of settlement. Signed by Judge J. Frederick Motz on 7/1/08. (jnl, Deputy Clerk)
July 1, 2008 Filing 2949 MOTION for Summary Judgment by Lawrence J Lasser. Responses due by 7/18/2008 (Attachments: #1 Memorandum of Law, #2 Appendix, #3 Affidavit, #4 Text of Proposed Order)Associated Cases: 1:04-md-15863-JFM, 1:04-cv-00560-JFM(Pollack, Daniel)
June 30, 2008 Filing 2948 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by Gerald Born, Donna Gaffney (Newcomer, Michelle)
June 30, 2008 Filing 2947 NOTICE by Gerald Born, Donna Gaffney [Proposed] Order Staying Actions Against the Alger Defendants in Contemplation of Settlement (Newcomer, Michelle)
June 30, 2008 Filing 2946 Joint MOTION to Stay Joint Motion to Stay Actions Against the Alger Defendants in Contemplation of Settlement by Gerald Born, Donna Gaffney Responses due by 7/17/2008 (Newcomer, Michelle)
June 30, 2008 Filing 2945 Status Report Submitted Correspondence to Court Advising of Settlement by Gerald Born, Donna Gaffney (Newcomer, Michelle)
June 30, 2008 Filing 2944 NOTICE by Ohio Tuition Trust Authority of Postponement of Deposition of Christopher James (Geoppinger, Jean)
June 30, 2008 Filing 2943 NOTICE by Ohio Tuition Trust Authority of Postponement of Deposition of Geoffrey H. Bobroff (Geoppinger, Jean)
June 30, 2008 Filing 2942 NOTICE by Ohio Tuition Trust Authority of Deposition of Mukesh Bajaj, Ph.D. (Revised) (Geoppinger, Jean)
June 29, 2008 Filing 2941 Joint REQUEST for Extension of Time to File PFPC's Motion For Summary Judgment (Lantieri, Paul)
June 26, 2008 Filing 2940 NOTICE to Take Deposition of Edward O'Neal. (Watts, Joshua)
June 19, 2008 Filing 2939 NOTICE by The Krouse Group of Deposition of Dr. Daniel M. Garrett (Lahm, James)
June 19, 2008 Filing 2938 NOTICE by The Krouse Group of Deposition of Dr. Allen Ferrell (Lahm, James)
June 18, 2008 Filing 2937 NOTICE by Maloon Powers Pitre & Higgins, LLC Second Amended Notice of Deposition of Chudozie Okongwu (Ponist, Sean)
June 17, 2008 Filing 2936 NOTICE by Ohio Tuition Trust Authority of Postponement of Deposition of Mukesh Bajaj, Ph.D. (Geoppinger, Jean)
June 9, 2008 Filing 2935 NOTICE to Take Deposition of M. Kathleen Leugers (Amended). Associated Cases: 1:04-md-15863-JFM, 1:04-cv-00560-JFM(Simshauser, Peter)
June 6, 2008 Filing 2934 NOTICE by Ohio Tuition Trust Authority of Deposition of Christopher James (Revised) (Geoppinger, Jean)
June 6, 2008 Filing 2933 NOTICE by Ohio Tuition Trust Authority of Deposition of Geoffrey Bobroff (Revised) (Geoppinger, Jean)
June 5, 2008 Filing 2932 NOTICE by Janus Distributors LLC, Janus Capital Management LLC, Janus Capital Group Inc. Second Amended Supplemental Response to Fund Derivative Plaintiffs' Second Set of Interrogatories to Janus Defendants (Attachments: #1 Appendix A)Associated Cases: 1:04-md-15863-JFM, 1:04-cv-00497-JFM, 1:04-cv-00518-JFM(Perry, Mark)
June 5, 2008 Filing 2931 NOTICE by Ohio Tuition Trust Authority of Service of Responses to Prudential's Substituted Interrogatories (Geoppinger, Jean)
June 4, 2008 Filing 2930 NOTICE by Maloon Powers Pitre & Higgins, LLC Amended Notice of Deposition of Chudozie Okongwu Associated Cases: 1:04-md-15863-JFM, 1:04-cv-00497-JFM(Ponist, Sean)
May 30, 2008 Filing 2929 NOTICE by Ohio Tuition Trust Authority of Deposition of Christopher James (Geoppinger, Jean)
May 30, 2008 Filing 2928 NOTICE by Ohio Tuition Trust Authority of Deposition to Jennifer E. Bethel (Geoppinger, Jean)
May 30, 2008 Filing 2927 NOTICE by Ohio Tuition Trust Authority of Deposition of Geoffrey H. Bobroff (Geoppinger, Jean)
May 30, 2008 Filing 2926 NOTICE by Ohio Tuition Trust Authority of Deposition of Roger M. Edelen (Geoppinger, Jean)
May 30, 2008 Filing 2925 NOTICE by Ohio Tuition Trust Authority of Deposition of Richard M. Phillips (Geoppinger, Jean)
May 29, 2008 Filing 2924 NOTICE to Substitute Attorney -- Notice Of Withdrawal Of Appearance by Marshall N Perkins -- Associated Cases: 1:04-md-15861-CCB et al.(Perkins, Marshall)
May 23, 2008 Filing 2923 NOTICE by The Krouse Group of Deposition of Damon LaTanzi (Lahm, James)
May 23, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 2922 PAPERLESS ORDER granting re #2921 Request for Extension of Time to File filed by Gerald Born, Donna Gaffney. Signed by Judge J. Frederick Motz on 5/23/08. (Motz, J.)
May 22, 2008 Filing 2921 Joint REQUEST for Extension of Time to File Request for Extension of Expert Discovery Deadlines (Newcomer, Michelle)
May 22, 2008 Filing 2920 NOTICE by Ohio Tuition Trust Authority of Postponement of Deposition of Michael Silver (Geoppinger, Jean)
May 21, 2008 Filing 2919 ANSWER to Complaint Answer to the Second Amended Consolidated Complaint by Janus Distributors LLC, Janus Capital Group, Inc., Janus Capital Management LLC.Associated Cases: 1:04-md-15863-JFM, 1:04-cv-00497-JFM(Perry, Mark)
May 21, 2008 Filing 2918 NOTICE of Appearance by Jason Michael Hall on behalf of Prudential Securities, Inc. (Hall, Jason)
May 19, 2008 Filing 2917 Correspondence re: Deposition of Steven M. Cohen (Lahm, James)
May 14, 2008 Filing 2916 NOTICE by Putnam Investment Management LLC Of Continuance Of Deposition Of M. Kathleen Leugers Associated Cases: 1:04-md-15863-JFM, 1:04-cv-00560-JFM(Simshauser, Peter)
May 14, 2008 Filing 2915 NOTICE by Ohio Tuition Trust Authority of Deposition of Mukesh Bajaj, Ph.D. (Revised) (Geoppinger, Jean)
May 14, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 2914 Paperless order granting request for extension made in re #2912 . Signed by Judge J. Frederick Motz on 5/14/08. (Motz, J.)
May 14, 2008 Filing 2913 Correspondence re: Outstanding Discovery (Duncan, Russell)
May 13, 2008 Filing 2912 NOTICE by RS Investment Management, LP, James L. Callinan, G. Randall Hecht, Keith, Peter, McCaffery, Michael G., RS Investment Management Co., LLC, RS Investment Management, Inc., RS Investment Trust, RS Contrarian Value Fund, RS Diversified Growth Fund, RS Emerging Growth Fund, RS Global Natural Resources Fund, RS Growth Fund, RS Information Age Fund, RS Internet Age Fund, RS Midcap Opportunities Fund, RS Partner Fund, RS Smaller Company Growth Fund, Steven M. Cohen, RS Contrarian Value Fund, RS Partner Fund, RS Investment Management, L.P. Joint Request for Extension to Expert Discovery Deadlines in the RS Subtrack (Purdy, Andrew)
May 12, 2008 Filing 2911 Correspondence re: Discovery Dispute in the RS Subtrack (Lahm, James)
May 12, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 2910 Paperless ORDER granting #2897 Motion for Leave to File. Signed by Judge J. Frederick Motz on 5/12/08. (Motz, J.)
May 9, 2008 Filing 2909 NOTICE by Maloon Powers Pitre & Higgins, LLC Notice of Deposition of Chudozie Okongwu (Ponist, Sean)
May 9, 2008 Filing 2908 NOTICE by Janus Distributors LLC, Janus Capital Management LLC, Janus Capital Group Inc. Amended Notice of Deposition of Marc Vellrath, Ph.D., CFA Associated Cases: 1:04-md-15863-JFM, 1:04-cv-00497-JFM(Perry, Mark)
May 8, 2008 Filing 2907 Joint REQUEST for Extension of Time to File Letter to Judges Motz, Davis and Blake confirming extension of time for all summary judgment motions and all class certification motions filed no later than July 2, 2008 (Isbister, John)
May 6, 2008 Filing 2906 NOTICE to Take Deposition of M. Kathleen Leugers. Associated Cases: 1:04-md-15863-JFM, 1:04-cv-00560-JFM(Simshauser, Peter)
May 6, 2008 Filing 2905 NOTICE to Take Deposition of Edward S. O'Neal, Ph.D. (Amended). Associated Cases: 1:04-md-15863-JFM, 1:04-cv-00560-JFM(Simshauser, Peter)
May 5, 2008 Filing 2904 NOTICE by Ohio Tuition Trust Authority of Deposition of Mukesh Bajaj, Ph.D. (Geoppinger, Jean)
May 5, 2008 Filing 2903 NOTICE by Janus Distributors LLC, Janus Capital Management LLC, Janus Capital Group Inc. Janus Defendants' Notice of Service of Supplemental Expert Report of Chudozie Okongwu Associated Cases: 1:04-md-15863-JFM, 1:04-cv-00497-JFM, 1:04-cv-00518-JFM(Perry, Mark)
May 2, 2008 Filing 2902 NOTICE by Maloon Powers Pitre & Higgins, LLC Lead Fund Investor Plaintiff's Notice of Service of Rebuttal Expert Report Associated Cases: 1:04-md-15863-JFM, 1:04-cv-00497-JFM(Ponist, Sean)
May 2, 2008 Filing 2901 RESPONSE to Motion re (2897 in 1:04-md-15863-JFM) MOTION for Leave to File A Second Amended Consolidated Complaint; Memorandum of Points and Authorities; Proposed Amended Pleading and "Redline" Copy Identifying Amendments filed by Janus Capital Group Inc.. Replies due by 5/16/2008. Associated Cases: 1:04-md-15863-JFM, 1:04-cv-00497-JFM(Perry, Mark)
May 1, 2008 Filing 2900 NOTICE by Prudential Equity Group, LLC of Objections and Responses to Lead Plaintiff's Second Request for Production of Documents to Defendant Prudential Securities Incorporated, n/k/a Prudential Equity Group, LLC (Thier, Jonathan)
May 1, 2008 Filing 2899 NOTICE by Putnam LLC, Putnam Retail Management Limited Partnership, Putnam Investment Management LLC, Putnam Investments Trust, Putnam Investment Management Trust Objections And Responses To "Lead Plaintiff's Fourth Set Of Requests For The Production Of Documents" Associated Cases: 1:04-md-15863-JFM, 1:04-cv-00560-JFM(Simshauser, Peter)
April 30, 2008 Filing 2898 NOTICE to Take Deposition of Edward S. O'Neal, Ph.D. Associated Cases: 1:04-md-15863-JFM, 1:04-cv-00560-JFM(Simshauser, Peter)
April 30, 2008 Filing 2897 MOTION for Leave to File A Second Amended Consolidated Complaint; Memorandum of Points and Authorities; Proposed Amended Pleading and "Redline" Copy Identifying Amendments by Maloon Powers Pitre & Higgins, LLC Responses due by 5/19/2008 (Attachments: #1 Attachment # 1-proposed Amended Pleading, #2 Attachment #2-"Redline"Copy Identifying Amendments, #3 Declaration of Mark C. Molumphy In Support of Motion to Leave to File Second Amended Consolidated Complaint with Exhibits, #4 Proposed Order Granting Lead Plaintiff's Motion For Leave To File Second Amended Complaint)(Molumphy, Mark)
April 29, 2008 Filing 2896 NOTICE to Take Deposition of Mercer E. Bullard (Amended). Associated Cases: 1:04-md-15863-JFM, 1:04-cv-00560-JFM(Simshauser, Peter)
April 28, 2008 Filing 2895 NOTICE to Take Deposition of Mercer E. Bullard. Associated Cases: 1:04-md-15863-JFM, 1:04-cv-00560-JFM(Simshauser, Peter)
April 25, 2008 Filing 2894 NOTICE by The Krouse Group Amended Notice of Deposition of George Randall Hecht (Lahm, James)
April 25, 2008 Filing 2893 NOTICE by The Krouse Group Amended Notice of Deposition of George Randall Hecht (Lahm, James)
April 25, 2008 Filing 2892 NOTICE by The Krouse Group Amended Notice of Deposition of James L. Callinan (Lahm, James)
April 25, 2008 Filing 2891 NOTICE by The Krouse Group of Postponement of Deposition of Michael G. McCaffery (Lahm, James)
April 23, 2008 Filing 2890 NOTICE by RS Investment Management, LP, James L. Callinan, Steven M. Cohen, G. Randall Hecht, Keith, Peter, McCaffery, Michael G., RS Investment Management Co., LLC, RS Investment Management, Inc., RS Investment Trust, RS Contrarian Value Fund, RS Diversified Growth Fund, RS Emerging Growth Fund, RS Global Natural Resources Fund, RS Growth Fund, RS Information Age Fund, RS Internet Age Fund, RS Midcap Opportunities Fund, RS Partner Fund, RS Smaller Company Growth Fund re #2883 Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery and for Pre-Trial Deadlines of Withdrawal of Motion (Baucus, Zeno)
April 21, 2008 Filing 2889 NOTICE by Ohio Tuition Trust Authority of Service of Expert Rebuttal Reports (Geoppinger, Jean)
April 21, 2008 Filing 2888 NOTICE by Ohio Tuition Trust Authority of Service of Plaintiffs' Supplemental Responses to Prudential Equity Group, LLC's First Set of Interrogatories (Geoppinger, Jean)
April 21, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 2887 Paperless ORDER granting re #2885 Request for Extension of Time to File. Signed by Judge J. Frederick Motz on 4/21/08. (Motz, J.)
April 18, 2008 Filing 2886 NOTICE by Ohio Tuition Trust Authority of Postponement of Deposition of Michael Silver (Geoppinger, Jean)
April 18, 2008 Filing 2885 Joint REQUEST for Extension of Time to File Request for Extension of Expert Discovery Deadlines (Newcomer, Michelle)
April 17, 2008 Filing 2884 NOTICE of Appearance by Gareth T Evans on behalf of Janus Distributors, LLC, Janus Capital Management LLC, Janus Capital Group Inc. Associated Cases: 1:04-md-15863-JFM, 1:04-cv-00497-JFM(Evans, Gareth)
April 17, 2008 Filing 2883 Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery and for Pre-Trial Deadlines by RS Investment Management, LP, James L. Callinan, Steven M. Cohen, G. Randall Hecht, Keith, Peter, McCaffery, Michael G., RS Investment Management Co., LLC, RS Investment Management, Inc., RS Investment Trust, RS Contrarian Value Fund, RS Diversified Growth Fund, RS Emerging Growth Fund, RS Global Natural Resources Fund, RS Growth Fund, RS Information Age Fund, RS Internet Age Fund, RS Midcap Opportunities Fund, RS Partner Fund, RS Smaller Company Growth Fund Responses due by 5/5/2008 (Baucus, Zeno)
April 17, 2008 Filing 2882 NOTICE of Appearance by John Taylor McConkie on behalf of Janus Distributors LLC, Janus Capital Management LLC, Janus Capital Group Inc. (McConkie, John)
April 17, 2008 Filing 2881 NOTICE by RS Investment Management, LP, James L. Callinan, Steven M. Cohen, G. Randall Hecht, Keith, Peter, McCaffery, Michael G., RS Investment Management Co., LLC, RS Investment Management, Inc., RS Investment Trust, RS Contrarian Value Fund, RS Diversified Growth Fund, RS Emerging Growth Fund, RS Global Natural Resources Fund, RS Growth Fund, RS Information Age Fund, RS Internet Age Fund, RS Midcap Opportunities Fund, RS Partner Fund, RS Smaller Company Growth Fund of Amended Notice of Deposition of Anthony Cacciola (Baucus, Zeno)
April 17, 2008 Filing 2880 NOTICE by RS Investment Management, LP, James L. Callinan, Steven M. Cohen, G. Randall Hecht, Keith, Peter, McCaffery, Michael G., RS Investment Management Co., LLC, RS Investment Management, Inc., RS Investment Trust, RS Diversified Growth Fund, RS Emerging Growth Fund, RS Global Natural Resources Fund, RS Growth Fund, RS Information Age Fund, RS Internet Age Fund, RS Midcap Opportunities Fund, RS Partner Fund, RS Smaller Company Growth Fund, RS Contrarian Value Fund of Service of Amended Notice of Deposition of Plaintiff Anthony Cacciola (Baucus, Zeno)
April 16, 2008 Filing 2879 NOTICE of Appearance by Kenneth P Herzinger on behalf of RS Investment Management, LP, James L. Callinan, Steven M. Cohen, G. Randall Hecht, Keith, Peter, McCaffery, Michael G., RS Investment Management Co., LLC, RS Investment Management, Inc. (Herzinger, Kenneth)
April 16, 2008 Filing 2878 NOTICE of Appearance by Joshua D Watts on behalf of RS Investment Management, LP, James L. Callinan, Steven M. Cohen, G. Randall Hecht, Keith, Peter, McCaffery, Michael G., RS Investment Management Co., LLC, RS Investment Management, Inc. (Watts, Joshua)
April 16, 2008 Filing 2877 NOTICE by RS Investment Management, LP, James L. Callinan, Steven M. Cohen, G. Randall Hecht, Keith, Peter, McCaffery, Michael G., RS Investment Management Co., LLC, RS Investment Management, Inc., RS Investment Trust, RS Contrarian Value Fund, RS Diversified Growth Fund, RS Emerging Growth Fund, RS Global Natural Resources Fund, RS Growth Fund, RS Information Age Fund, RS Internet Age Fund, RS Midcap Opportunities Fund, RS Partner Fund, RS Smaller Company Growth Fund of Service of First Set of Requests for Admissions on Plaintiffs (Baucus, Zeno)
April 14, 2008 Filing 2876 NOTICE by Janus Distributors LLC, Janus Capital Management LLC, Janus Capital Group Inc. Janus Defendants' Notice of Service of Expert Report (Perry, Mark)
April 11, 2008 Filing 2875 NOTICE by Maloon Powers Pitre & Higgins, LLC Lead Fund Investor Plaintiff's Notice of Service of Supplemental Expert Report (Ponist, Sean)
April 11, 2008 Filing 2874 NOTICE by The Krouse Group of Postponement of Deposition of Steven M. Cohen (Lahm, James)
April 11, 2008 Filing 2873 MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney (Jeffrey Showalter) by RS Investment Management, LP, James L. Callinan, Steven M. Cohen, G. Randall Hecht, Keith, Peter, McCaffery, Michael G., RS Investment Management Co., LLC, RS Investment Management, Inc., RS Investment Trust, RS Contrarian Value Fund, RS Diversified Growth Fund, RS Emerging Growth Fund, RS Global Natural Resources Fund, RS Growth Fund, RS Information Age Fund, RS Internet Age Fund, RS Midcap Opportunities Fund, RS Partner Fund, RS Smaller Company Growth Fund, RS Contrarian Value Fund, RS Partner Fund, RS Investment Management, L.P. Responses due by 4/28/2008 Associated Cases: 1:04-md-15863-JFM, 1:04-cv-03798-JFM(Showalter, Jeffrey)
April 11, 2008 Filing 2872 NOTICE by Janus Distributors LLC, Janus Capital Management LLC, Janus Capital Group Inc. Amended Notice of Cross-Track Deposition of Marc Vellrath, PH.D., CFA Associated Cases: 1:04-md-15863-JFM, 1:04-cv-00497-JFM, 1:04-cv-00518-JFM(Perry, Mark)
April 11, 2008 Filing 2871 NOTICE by Janus Distributors LLC, Janus Capital Management LLC, Janus Capital Group Inc. Supplemental Response to Fund Derivative Plaintiffs' Second Set of Interrogatories to Defendants Janus Capital Group, Inc., Janus Capital Management LLC and Janus Distributors LLC Associated Cases: 1:04-md-15863-JFM, 1:04-cv-00497-JFM, 1:04-cv-00518-JFM(Perry, Mark)
April 10, 2008 Filing 2870 NOTICE by RS Investment Management, LP, James L. Callinan, Steven M. Cohen, G. Randall Hecht, Keith, Peter, McCaffery, Michael G., RS Investment Management Co., LLC, RS Investment Management, Inc., RS Investment Trust, RS Contrarian Value Fund, RS Diversified Growth Fund, RS Emerging Growth Fund, RS Global Natural Resources Fund, RS Growth Fund, RS Information Age Fund, RS Internet Age Fund, RS Midcap Opportunities Fund, RS Partner Fund, RS Smaller Company Growth Fund of Deposition of A. Cacciola (Baucus, Zeno)
April 10, 2008 Filing 2869 Correspondence rescheduling the hearing on the motion to compel. (Motz, J.)
April 9, 2008 Filing 2868 Correspondence setting date for hearing in Marini v. Janus - JFM-04-497. (Motz, J.)
April 8, 2008 Filing 2867 NOTICE by Janus Distributors LLC, Janus Capital Management LLC, Janus Capital Group Inc. of Cross-Track Deposition of Marc Vellrath, Ph.D., CFA Associated Cases: 1:04-md-15861-CCB, 1:04-md-15862-AMD, 1:04-md-15863-JFM, 1:04-md-15864-JFM(Perry, Mark)
April 7, 2008 Filing 2866 NOTICE by RS Investment Management, LP, James L. Callinan, Steven M. Cohen, G. Randall Hecht, Keith, Peter, McCaffery, Michael G., RS Investment Management Co., LLC, RS Investment Management, Inc., RS Investment Trust, RS Contrarian Value Fund, RS Diversified Growth Fund, RS Emerging Growth Fund, RS Global Natural Resources Fund, RS Growth Fund, RS Information Age Fund, RS Internet Age Fund, RS Midcap Opportunities Fund, RS Partner Fund, RS Smaller Company Growth Fund of Service of First Set of Interrogatories on Plaintiffs (Baucus, Zeno)
April 4, 2008 Filing 2865 NOTICE by The Krouse Group of Deposition of Michael McCafferey (Lahm, James)
April 4, 2008 Filing 2864 NOTICE by The Krouse Group of Deposition of James Callinan (Lahm, James)
April 4, 2008 Filing 2863 NOTICE by The Krouse Group of Deposition of George Randall Hecht (Lahm, James)
April 3, 2008 Filing 2862 Correspondence re: Response to Plaintiffs' Correspondence Re Compliance With Court Order (Dkt. 2857) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A (Filed Under Seal), #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C)Associated Cases: 1:04-md-15863-JFM, 1:04-cv-00497-JFM, 1:04-cv-00518-JFM(Perry, Mark) (Additional attachment(s) added on 4/7/2008: #4 Sealed Exhibit A) (jnl, Deputy Clerk). Modified on 4/7/2008 (jnl, Deputy Clerk). Modified on 4/7/2008 (jnl, Deputy Clerk). Modified on 4/7/2008 (jnl, Deputy Clerk).
April 3, 2008 Filing 2861 NOTICE by Prudential Equity Group, LLC of Service of Expert Report (Thier, Jonathan)
March 31, 2008 Filing 2860 NOTICE by Putnam LLC, Putnam Retail Management GP, Inc., Putnam Retail Management Limited Partnership, Stephen M. Oristaglio, Robert F. Lucey, Irene M. Esteves, Gordon H. Silver, Putnam Investment Management LLC, Putnam Investments Trust, Putnam Investment Management Trust, Putnam Fiduciary Trust, Co. Of Service Of Expert Reports Associated Cases: 1:04-md-15863-JFM, 1:04-cv-00560-JFM, 1:04-cv-00564-JFM(Simshauser, Peter)
March 28, 2008 Filing 2859 NOTICE by Lead Plaintiff Ohio Tuition Trust Authority of Filing Lead Plaintiff's Second Set of Requests for the Production of Documents to Defendant Prudential Securities, Inc. (Lundrigan, Nicole)
March 28, 2008 Filing 2858 NOTICE by Lead Plaintiff Ohio Tuition Trust Authority of Filing Lead Plaintiff's Fourth Set of Requests for the Production of Documents to Defendants Putnam LLC, Putnam Investment Management LLC, Putnam Retail Management LP, Lawrence J. Lasser, Gordon H. Silver, Irene M. Esteves, Robert F. Lucey and Stephen M. Oritaglio (Lundrigan, Nicole)
March 27, 2008 Filing 2857 Correspondence re: Compliance with Court Order Associated Cases: 1:04-md-15863-JFM, 1:04-cv-00497-JFM(Ponist, Sean)
March 27, 2008 Filing 2856 NOTICE by Ohio Tuition Trust Authority of Deposition of John Peffer (Geoppinger, Jean)
March 27, 2008 Filing 2855 NOTICE by Ohio Tuition Trust Authority of Deposition of Michael Silver (Geoppinger, Jean)
March 25, 2008 Filing 2854 NOTICE by The Krouse Group of Deposition of Steven M. Cohen (Lahm, James)
March 21, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 2853 Paperless ORDER granting amendment request made in re #2852 Miscellaneous Correspondence. Signed by Judge J. Frederick Motz on 2/21/08. (Motz, J.)
March 21, 2008 Filing 2852 Correspondence re: Request to Amend Expert Discovery Schedule Associated Cases: 1:04-md-15863-JFM, 1:04-cv-00497-JFM(Perry, Mark)
March 20, 2008