EEOC v. Baltimore County et al
Plaintiff: EEOC
Defendant: Baltimore County, American Federation of State, County & Municpal Employees Local #921, Baltimore County Federation of Public Employees, FMT, AFT, AFL-CIO, Baltimore County Sheriff's Office Fraternal Order of Police/Lodge Number 25, Baltimore County Lodge No. 4 Fraternal Order of Police, Inc., Baltimore County Federation of Public Health Nurses and Baltimore County Professional Fire Fighters Association, International Association Fire Fighters Local 1311-AFL-CIO
Case Number: 1:2007cv02500
Filed: September 18, 2007
Court: US District Court for the District of Maryland
Office: Baltimore Office
County: Baltimore County
Presiding Judge: Benson Everett Legg
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Jobs
Cause of Action: 29:626 Job Discrimination (Age)
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
October 28, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 277 MEMORANDUM OPINION. Signed by Judge Richard D. Bennett on 10/28/2019. (bas, Deputy Clerk)
August 24, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 248 MEMORANDUM OPINION. Signed by Judge Richard D. Bennett on 8/24/2016. (bas, Deputy Clerk)
October 17, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 196 MEMORANDUM. Signed by Judge Benson Everett Legg on 10/16/12. (jnls, Deputy Clerk)
November 7, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 163 MEMORANDUM signed by Judge Benson Everett Legg on 11/07/2011. (bf2, Deputy Clerk)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Maryland District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: EEOC v. Baltimore County et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: EEOC
Represented By: Christopher W Lage
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Baltimore County
Represented By: James J Nolan, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: American Federation of State, County & Municpal Employees Local #921
Represented By: David Gray Wright
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Baltimore County Federation of Public Employees, FMT, AFT, AFL-CIO
Represented By: David Gray Wright
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Baltimore County Sheriff's Office Fraternal Order of Police/Lodge Number 25
Represented By: Dilip B Paliath
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Baltimore County Lodge No. 4 Fraternal Order of Police, Inc.
Represented By: Jennifer L Hunter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Baltimore County Federation of Public Health Nurses
Represented By: David Gray Wright
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Baltimore County Professional Fire Fighters Association, International Association Fire Fighters Local 1311-AFL-CIO
Represented By: David Gray Wright
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?