Davis v. Rouse et al
Plaintiff: Benjamin Davis
Defendant: Nancy Rouse and J. Harsh
Case Number: 1:2008cv03106
Filed: November 7, 2008
Court: US District Court for the District of Maryland
Office: Baltimore Office
County: Washington
Presiding Judge: William D Quarles
Nature of Suit: None
Cause of Action: 42:1983 Prisoner Civil Rights
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
July 25, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 253 MEMORANDUM OPINION signed by Magistrate Judge Stephanie A. Gallagher on 7/25/2012. (bf2, Deputy Clerk)
May 17, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 210 MEMORANDUM OPINION. Signed by Judge William D Quarles, Jr on 5/15/12. (mps, Deputy Clerk)
March 13, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 160 LETTER OPINION. Signed by Magistrate Judge Stephanie A Gallagher on 3/13/12. (mps, Deputy Clerk)
February 14, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 131 MEMORANDUM. Signed by Magistrate Judge Stephanie A Gallagher on 2/13/12. (mps, Deputy Clerk)
September 13, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 82 MEMORANDUM OPINION. Signed by Judge William D Quarles, Jr on 9/12/11. (mps, Deputy Clerk)
March 10, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 32 MEMORANDUM - Signed by Judge William D Quarles, Jr on 3/10/2010. (sls, Deputy Clerk)
December 3, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 26 MEMORANDUM OPINION. Signed by Judge William D Quarles, Jr on 12/3/09. (apl, Deputy Clerk)(c/m 12/3/09)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Maryland District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Davis v. Rouse et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Benjamin Davis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nancy Rouse
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: J. Harsh
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?