Topline Solutions, Inc. v. Sandler Systems, Inc.
Plaintiff: Topline Solutions, Inc.
Defendant: Sandler Systems, Inc.
Case Number: 1:2009cv03102
Filed: November 19, 2009
Court: US District Court for the District of Maryland
Office: Baltimore Office
County: 99999
Presiding Judge: William D Quarles
Nature of Suit: Recovery of Overpayment and Enforcement of Judgment
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
May 8, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 357 MEMORANDUM OPINION. Signed by Judge Ellen L. Hollander on 5/8/2017. (bmhs, Deputy Clerk)
April 3, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 348 MEMORANDUM. Signed by Judge Ellen L. Hollander on 4/3/2017. (bmhs, Deputy Clerk)
September 15, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 204 MEMORANDUM OPINION. Signed by Judge William D Quarles, Jr on 9/15/2015. (bmhs, Deputy Clerk)
July 14, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 194 MEMORANDUM OPINION. Signed by Judge William D Quarles, Jr on 7/14/2015. (bmhs, Deputy Clerk)
May 14, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 151 MEMORANDUM. Signed by Judge William D Quarles, Jr on 5/13/13. (bmhs, Deputy Clerk)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Maryland District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Topline Solutions, Inc. v. Sandler Systems, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Topline Solutions, Inc.
Represented By: Koushik Bhattacharya
Represented By: Jeremy W Schulman
Represented By: Alexander Craig Vincent
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sandler Systems, Inc.
Represented By: Russell David Karpook
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?