Sher v. Pell et al
Plaintiff: Joel I. Sher
Defendant: Amy Pell, Deborah Burns, Larry A. Goldstone, Clarence G. Simmons, III and SAF Financial, Inc.
Debtor: TMST, Inc.
Trustee: Joel I. Sher
Case Number: 1:2010cv01895
Filed: July 13, 2010
Court: US District Court for the District of Maryland
Office: Baltimore Office
County: Baltimore City
Presiding Judge: Richard D Bennett
Nature of Suit: Withdrawal
Cause of Action: 11:101
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
October 11, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 212 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER GRANTING 189 Motion of Burns and Pell for Leave to File Cross-Claim. Signed by Judge Richard D Bennett on 10/11/11. (hmls, Deputy Clerk)
May 11, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 175 MEMORANDUM OPINION. Signed by Judge Richard D Bennett on 5/11/11. (jnl, Deputy Clerk)
April 19, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 162 MEMORANDUM OPINION. Signed by Judge Richard D Bennett on 4/19/11. (jnl, Deputy Clerk)
October 14, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 61 MEMORANDUM ORDER. Signed by Judge Richard D Bennett on 10/14/10. (jnl, Deputy Clerk)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Maryland District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Sher v. Pell et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Joel I. Sher
Represented By: Richard Marc Goldberg
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Amy Pell
Represented By: David Alexander Hickerson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Deborah Burns
Represented By: David Alexander Hickerson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Larry A. Goldstone
Represented By: Barry E Reiferson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Clarence G. Simmons, III
Represented By: Barry E Reiferson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SAF Financial, Inc.
Represented By: Barry E Reiferson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Debtor: TMST, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Trustee: Joel I. Sher
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?