Redding v. Justia, Inc. et al Featured Case
Plaintiff: James Redding
Defendant: Justia, Inc., Elizabeth A. McClanahan, James W. Haley, Jr., Jere M.H. Willis, Jr., Cynthia McCoy, Justin Shelton and Timothy James Stanley
Case Number: 1:2011cv00674
Filed: March 14, 2011
Court: US District Court for the District of Maryland
Office: Baltimore Office
County: 88888
Presiding Judge: Catherine C. Blake
Nature of Suit: Other Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1331
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 13, 2012. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 18, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ORDER granting Justia Inc.'s 15 Motion to Dismiss; granting Cynthia McCoy and Justin Shelton's 9 Motion to Dismiss; Dismissing all remaining Defendants; Closing case. Signed by Judge Catherine C. Blake on 11/18/11. (dass, Deputy Clerk) (c/m chambers)
November 18, 2011 Filing 18 MEMORANDUM. Signed by Judge Catherine C. Blake on 11/18/11. (dass, Deputy Clerk) (c/m chambers)
October 19, 2011 Filing 17 RESPONSE in Opposition to 15 MOTION to Dismiss filed by James Redding. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit, # 2 mailing envelope)(dass, Deputy Clerk)
October 3, 2011 Filing 16 Rule 12/56 letter mailed to Plaintiff re: 15 motion of Justia to dismiss. (dass, Deputy Clerk)
September 30, 2011 Filing 15 MOTION to Dismiss by Justia, Inc. Responses due by 10/17/2011 (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Copy of Filed Complaint, # 2 Exhibit)(Schwartzman, Robert)
September 21, 2011 Filing 14 Supplement to 13 Response in Opposition to Motion to dismiss filed by James Redding re: return mail receipt of Corporation Service Company for service on Justia Inc. (dass, Deputy Clerk)
September 8, 2011 Filing 13 RESPONSE in Opposition to 9 MOTION of McCoy and Shelton to Dismiss, filed by James Redding. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Certified Mail Receipts)(dass, Deputy Clerk)
August 23, 2011 Filing 12 Correspondence re: Clarification of Docket Entry #6 (Schwartzman, Robert)
August 23, 2011 Filing 11 Rule 12/56 letter mailed to pro se plaintiff re: 9 and 10 motions to dismiss. (dass, Deputy Clerk)
August 19, 2011 Filing 10 MOTION to Dismiss Due to Insufficient Service of Process by Justia, Inc. Responses due by 9/6/2011 (Attachments: # 1 Memorandum in Support of Motion to Dismiss, # 2 Order, # 3 Exhibit Certified Mail Return Receipts, # 4 Affidavit Timothy Stanley, Chief Executive Officer of Justia, Inc.)(Schwartzman, Robert)
August 16, 2011 Filing 9 MOTION to Dismiss by Cynthia McCoy, Justin Shelton Responses due by 9/2/2011 (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Memorandum in Support of Motion to Dismiss, # 2 Exhibit, # 3 Exhibit, # 4 Affidavit)(Schwartzman, Robert)
August 8, 2011 Filing 8 RESPONSE in Opposition filed by Pro Se Plaintiff James Redding to 6 MOTION of Justia, Inc., Cynthia McCoy, and Justin Shelton to Dismiss Due to Insufficient Service of Process. (Attachments: # 1 proof of service- certified mail return receipt cards)(dass, Deputy Clerk)
July 21, 2011 Filing 7 Rule 12/56 letter sent to plaintiff. (c/m 7/21/11 jnl, Deputy Clerk)
July 20, 2011 Filing 6 MOTION to Dismiss Due to Insufficient Service of Process by Cynthia McCoy, Justin Shelton Responses due by 8/8/2011 (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Order, # 2 Affidavit Cynthia McCoy, # 3 Affidavit Justin Shelton)(Schwartzman, Robert) Modified on 8/24/2011 (dass, Deputy Clerk).
June 10, 2011 Filing 5 Summons Issued 21 days as to James W. Haley, Jr, Justia, Inc., Elizabeth A. McClanahan, Cynthia McCoy, Justin Shelton, Timothy James Stanley, Jere M.H. Willis, Jr. (raf, Deputy Clerk)
June 10, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER DIRECTING Clerk to issue summons and Plaintiff to effectuate service as therein set forth. Signed by Judge Catherine C. Blake on 6/10/11. (dass, Deputy Clerk) (c/m Plaintiff 6/10/11-das)
March 28, 2011 Filing 3 (FILED IN ERROR) Correspondence from Circuit Court for Baltimore City re: receipt of case. (jnl, Deputy Clerk) Modified on 3/28/2011 (jnl, Deputy Clerk).
March 17, 2011 Filing 2 AMENDED COMPLAINT against James W. Haley, Jr, Justia, Inc., Elizabeth A. McClanahan, Cynthia McCoy, Justin Shelton, Jere M.H. Willis, Jr, Timothy James Stanley, filed by James Redding. (Attachments: # 1 summons)(jnl, Deputy Clerk)
March 14, 2011 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against James W. Haley, Jr, Justia, Inc., Elizabeth A. McClanahan, Cynthia McCoy, Justin Shelton, Jere M.H. Willis, Jr ( Filing fee $ 350 receipt number 14637049440.), filed by James Redding. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet)(raf, Deputy Clerk) Modified on 3/14/2011 (raf, Deputy Clerk).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Maryland District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Redding v. Justia, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: James Redding
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Justia, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Elizabeth A. McClanahan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: James W. Haley, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jere M.H. Willis, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cynthia McCoy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Justin Shelton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Timothy James Stanley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?