Hudak et al v. The United States of America Internal Revenue Service

Plaintiff: Timothy J. Hudak and Katherine L. Hudak
Defendant: The United States of America Internal Revenue Service
Case Number: 1:2011cv01271
Filed: May 10, 2011
Court: Maryland District Court
Office: Baltimore Office
County: Baltimore County
Presiding Judge: Marvin J. Garbis
Nature of Suit: Taxes
Cause of Action: 26:7422 IRS: Refund Taxes
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
December 21, 2015 194 Opinion or Order of the Court AMENDED MEMORANDUM AND ORDER RE: SUMMARY JUDGMENT Denying 101 MOTION for Summary Judgment Against Dwight Mules filed by The United States of America Internal Revenue Service. Signed by Judge Marvin J. Garbis on 12/21/2015. (bas, Deputy Clerk) .
December 18, 2015 192 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM AND ORDER denying 101 The United States' Motion for Summary Judgment Against Dwight C. Mules. Signed by Judge Marvin J. Garbis on 12/17/2015. (bmhs, Deputy Clerk)
July 16, 2013 110 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM AND ORDER denying 100 Motion of USA for Summary Judgment. Signed by Judge Marvin J. Garbis on 7/15/13. (jnls, Deputy Clerk)
December 27, 2012 73 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM AND ORDER Re: Motion for Reconsideration. Signed by Judge Marvin J. Garbis on 12/27/12. (bmhs, Deputy Clerk)
December 26, 2012 71 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM AND ORDER granting in part 56 Motion to Disqualify Counsel. Signed by Judge Marvin J. Garbis on 12/26/12. (bmhs, Deputy Clerk)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Maryland District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Hudak et al v. The United States of America Internal Revenue Service
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Timothy J. Hudak
Represented By: Thomas F DeCaro, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Katherine L. Hudak
Represented By: Thomas F DeCaro, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The United States of America Internal Revenue Service
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?