Federal Trade Commission v. Loma International Business Group, Inc. et al

Plaintiff: Federal Trade Commission
Defendant: Loma International Business Group, Inc., Servicios LatinoAmericanos De Maryland, Inc., Manuel E. Alban and Lola P. Alban
Case Number: 1:2011cv01483
Filed: June 1, 2011
Court: Maryland District Court
Office: Baltimore Office
County: Baltimore City
Presiding Judge: Marvin J. Garbis
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Cause of Action: 15:0045
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
April 28, 2014 214 Opinion or Order of the Court AMENDED MEMORANDUM AND ORDER: Asset Freeze. Signed by Judge Marvin J. Garbis on 4/25/14. (jnls, Deputy Clerk)
April 22, 2014 212 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM AND ORDER re Asset Freeze. Signed by Judge Marvin J. Garbis on 4/22/14. (jnls, Deputy Clerk)
June 5, 2013 184 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM AND ORDER denying 125 Motion of Marco V. Alban for Summary Judgment; denying 159 Cross-Motion of Federal Trade Commission for Summary Judgment against Marco V. Alban. Signed by Judge Marvin J. Garbis on 6/5/13. (jnls, Deputy Clerk)
May 4, 2012 146 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM AND ORDER re pre-admit evidence. Signed by Judge Marvin J. Garbis on 5/4/12. (jnls, Deputy Clerk)
April 20, 2012 136 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM AND ORDER granting 133 Motion of plaintiff for Leave to File Excess Pages; denying 135 Motion of plaintiff for Summary Judgment. Signed by Judge Marvin J. Garbis on 4/19/12. (jnls, Deputy Clerk)
February 7, 2012 107 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM AND ORDER granting 98 Motion of monitor for Compensation. Signed by Judge Marvin J. Garbis on 2/6/12. (jnls, Deputy Clerk)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Maryland District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Federal Trade Commission v. Loma International Business Group, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Federal Trade Commission
Represented By: Eliseo N Padilla
Represented By: Deanya T Kueckelhan
Represented By: Gary D Kennedy
Represented By: Luis H Gallegos
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Loma International Business Group, Inc.
Represented By: John Augustine Bourgeois
Represented By: Andrew Jay Graham
Represented By: Eric Lawrence Klein
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Servicios LatinoAmericanos De Maryland, Inc.
Represented By: John Augustine Bourgeois
Represented By: Andrew Jay Graham
Represented By: Eric Lawrence Klein
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Manuel E. Alban
Represented By: John Augustine Bourgeois
Represented By: Andrew Jay Graham
Represented By: Eric Lawrence Klein
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lola P. Alban
Represented By: John Augustine Bourgeois
Represented By: Andrew Jay Graham
Represented By: Eric Lawrence Klein
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?