REDNER'S MARKETS, INC. v. JOPPATOWNE G.P. LIMITED PARTNERSHIP
Plaintiff: REDNER'S MARKETS, INC.
Defendant: JOPPATOWNE G.P. LIMITED PARTNERSHIP
Case Number: 1:2011cv01864
Filed: July 6, 2011
Court: US District Court for the District of Maryland
Office: Baltimore Office
County: 88888
Presiding Judge: Benson Everett Legg
Nature of Suit: Other Contract
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
March 17, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 215 MEMORANDUM OPINION. Signed by Judge Richard D Bennett on 3/17/2015. (dass, Deputy Clerk)
September 17, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 188 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER granting in part and denying in part plaintiff's 185 Motion to Amend Findings of Fact and Conclusions of Law and for a New Trial; denying motion in all respects, with the exception that the Plaintiff is entitled to nominal damages; granting motion to the extent the Defendant is ordered to pay to the Plaintiff nominal damages of $1.00 for each of the two breaches of the restrictive use covenant for which judgment has been entered in Plaintiffs favor, for a total award of $2.00. Signed by Judge Richard D Bennett on 9/17/13. (dass, Deputy Clerk)
July 11, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 179 MEMORANDUM OPINION. Signed by Judge Richard D Bennett on 7/11/13. (dass, Deputy Clerk)
June 13, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 158 MEMORANDUM OPINION. Signed by Judge Richard D Bennett on 6/13/13. (dass, Deputy Clerk)
January 24, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 134 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER denying without prejudice 40 Motion for Judgment on the Pleadings as to Plaintiffs Prayer for Constructive Trust on Defendants Interest in Premises; denying 100 Motion for Leave to File Supplemental Answer to AmendedCompla int; denying 127 Motion to Dismiss All Aspects of Amended Complaint that Relate Directly to Non-Parties; denying 17 Motion for Preliminary Injunction Relief and for Leave to Take Expedited Discovery. Signed by Judge Benson Everett Legg on 1/24/13. (dass, Deputy Clerk)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Maryland District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: REDNER'S MARKETS, INC. v. JOPPATOWNE G.P. LIMITED PARTNERSHIP
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: REDNER'S MARKETS, INC.
Represented By: Samuel W Cortes
Represented By: Jason W Hobbes
Represented By: John J Miravich
Represented By: John Breckenridge Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JOPPATOWNE G.P. LIMITED PARTNERSHIP
Represented By: Charles M Kerr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?