Burt et al v. Maasberg et al
Plaintiff: David R Burt, Janet H Burt, Texas Barrington LLC and Texas Addison Limited Partnership
Defendant: William T Comfort, Jr, William T Comfort, III, Wolfgang Maasberg, Richard McDonald, A. Richard Blair, Bill, Ty, Stuyvesant Pierpont Comfort, James Urry, LDN Stuyvie Partnersip, Meudon Investments Partnership and Hidden Comfort Entities 1 through 5
Case Number: 1:2012cv00464
Filed: February 14, 2012
Court: US District Court for the District of Maryland
Office: Baltimore Office
County: Baltimore County
Presiding Judge: George Levi Russell
Nature of Suit: Securities/Commodities
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1331
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 21, 2017. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 21, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 306 ORDER denying #297 Motion of plaintiff for Leave to File Motion to Vacate, Motion to Disqualify Judge, and Motion for Reconsideration; denying #298 Motion of defendants for Sanctions; granting #300 Motion of defendants to Seal; granting #305 Motion of defendants to Seal. Signed by Judge George Levi Russell, III on 9/21/2017. (c/m 9/21/17 jnls, Deputy Clerk)
March 30, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 305 MOTION to Seal by A. Richard Blair, Stuyvesant Pierpont Comfort, William T Comfort, Jr, William T Comfort, III, LDN Stuyvie Partnersip, Wolfgang Maasberg, Richard McDonald, Meudon Investments Partnership, James Urry(Genth, Geoffrey)
March 30, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 304 -SEALED-REPLY to Response to Motion re #297 MOTION for Leave to File, #298 MOTION to Seal ECF 297 and ECF 297-1 and for Sanctions as a Result of Plaintiff's Violation of the Stipulated Confidentiality Order Reply Memorandum in Support filed by A. Richard Blair, Stuyvesant Pierpont Comfort, William T Comfort, Jr, William T Comfort, III, LDN Stuyvie Partnersip, Wolfgang Maasberg, Richard McDonald, Meudon Investments Partnership, James Urry. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3)(Genth, Geoffrey)
March 16, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 303 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by David R Burt re #301 Reply to Response to Motion, #302 Response to Motion, (jnls, Deputy Clerk)
March 15, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 302 -SEALED- RESPONSE to Motion re #298 MOTION to Seal ECF 297 and ECF 297-1 and for Sanctions as a Result of Plaintiff's Violation of the Stipulated Confidentiality Order filed by David R Burt. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C)(jnls, Deputy Clerk) (Additional attachment(s) added on 3/16/2017: #4 Signature Page) (jnls, Deputy Clerk).
March 15, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 301 -SEALED- REPLY to Response to Motion re #297 for Leave to File Motion to Vacate, Motion to Disqualify Judge, and Motion for Reconsideration by David R Burt(jnls, Deputy Clerk) (Additional attachment(s) added on 3/16/2017: #1 Signature Page) (jnls, Deputy Clerk).
February 16, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 300 MOTION to Seal Memorandum in Opposition to Plaintiff David R. Burt's Motion for Leave to File a Variety of Untimely Motions and Their Motion to Seal ECF 297 and ECF 297-1 and for Sanctions as a Result of Plaintiff's Violation of the Stipulated Confidentiality Order by A. Richard Blair, Stuyvesant Pierpont Comfort, William T Comfort, Jr, William T Comfort, III, LDN Stuyvie Partnersip, Wolfgang Maasberg, Richard McDonald, Meudon Investments Partnership, James Urry(Genth, Geoffrey)
February 16, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 299 -SEALED-RESPONSE in Opposition re #297 MOTION for Leave to File a Variety of Untimely Motions filed by A. Richard Blair, Stuyvesant Pierpont Comfort, William T Comfort, Jr, William T Comfort, III, LDN Stuyvie Partnersip, Wolfgang Maasberg, Richard McDonald, Meudon Investments Partnership, James Urry.(Genth, Geoffrey)
February 16, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 298 -SEALED- MOTION to Seal ECF 297 and ECF 297-1 and for Sanctions as a Result of Plaintiff's Violation of the Stipulated Confidentiality Order by A. Richard Blair, Stuyvesant Pierpont Comfort, William T Comfort, Jr, William T Comfort, III, LDN Stuyvie Partnersip, Wolfgang Maasberg, Richard McDonald, Meudon Investments Partnership, James Urry (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Index of Exhibits, #2 Exhibit 1, #3 Exhibit 2, #4 Exhibit 3, #5 Exhibit 4, #6 Exhibit 5, #7 Exhibit 6, #8 Exhibit 7)(Genth, Geoffrey)
February 2, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 297 MOTION for Leave to File Motion to Vacate, Motion to Disqualify Judge, and Motion for Reconsideration by David R Burt (Attachments: #1 Proposed Motions)(jnls, Deputy Clerk)
November 14, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 296 ORDER denying #284 Motion of plaintiff to Review Clerk's Order Taxing Costs, construed as Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 59(e) Motion to Reconsider #282 Clerks May 2, 2016 Order. Signed by Judge George Levi Russell, III on 11/14/2016. (c/m 11/14/16 jnls, Deputy Clerk)
July 28, 2016 Opinion or Order Case reassigned to Judge George Levi Russell, III. Judge J. Frederick Motz no longer assigned to the case. (cags, Deputy Clerk)
June 30, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 295 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by David R Burt re #291 Stipulation. (hmls, Deputy Clerk)
June 24, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 294 PAPERLESS ORDER granting #292 Motion to Seal. Signed by Judge J. Frederick Motz on 6/24/2016. (jnls, Deputy Clerk)
June 23, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 293 -SEALED-REPLY to Response to #284 MOTION to Review the Clerk's Order Taxing Costs filed by David R Burt. (jnls, Deputy Clerk)
June 23, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 292 MOTION to Seal Reply re Motion of plaintiff to reverse Clerk's Order taxing costs by David R Burt (jnls, Deputy Clerk)
June 23, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 291 STIPULATION for extension to file a reply re Motion by plaintiff for the Court to reverse the Clerk's Order taxing costs by David R Burt. (jnls, Deputy Clerk)
June 14, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 290 ORDER returning document to plaintiff. Signed by Judge J. Frederick Motz on 6/14/2016. (Attachments: #1 Deficient Document)(c/m 6/14/16 jnls, Deputy Clerk)
May 31, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 289 -SEALED- Response in Opposition to Bill of Costs re #284 Motion to Review the Clerk's Order Taxing Costs filed by William T Comfort, III, Wolfgang Maasberg, Richard McDonald, James Urry. (Attachments: #1 Errata A, #2 Exhibit B)(Ulwick, James) Modified on 6/1/2016 (jnls, Deputy Clerk).
May 31, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 288 QC NOTICE: #285 Reply to Response to Motion, filed by Wolfgang Maasberg, William T Comfort, III, Richard McDonald, James Urry was filed incorrectly. Please re-file the document by selecting Responses and Replies > Reply in Opposition to Bill of Costs. It has been noted as FILED IN ERROR, and the document link has been disabled. (jnls, Deputy Clerk)
May 31, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 287 PAPERLESS ORDER granting #283 Motion to Seal; granting #286 Motion to Seal. Signed by Judge J. Frederick Motz on 5/31/2016. (jnls, Deputy Clerk)
May 31, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 286 MOTION to Seal Opposition to Plaintiff's Motion for Review of Clerk's Order Taxing Costs by William T Comfort, III, Wolfgang Maasberg, Richard McDonald, James Urry Responses due by 6/17/2016 (Ulwick, James)
May 31, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 285 FILED IN ERROR - -SEALED-REPLY to Response to Motion re #284 MOTION to Review the Clerk's Order Taxing Costs re #282 Clerk's Order Taxing Costs, #281 Clerk's Order Taxing Costs, filed by William T Comfort, III, Wolfgang Maasberg, Richard McDonald, James Urry. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(Ulwick, James) Modified on 5/31/2016 (jnls, Deputy Clerk).
May 12, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 284 -SEALED- MOTION to Review the Clerk's Order Taxing Costs re #282 Clerk's Order Taxing Costs, #281 Clerk's Order Taxing Costs, by David R Burt (jnls, Deputy Clerk)
May 12, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 283 MOTION to Seal Motion to Review the Clerk's Order Taxing Costs by David R Burt (jnls, Deputy Clerk) Modified on 5/12/2016 (jnls, Deputy Clerk).
May 2, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 282 Clerk's Order Taxing Costs re: #221 Bill of Costs. Costs are taxed in favor of Defendants A. Richard Blair, William T. Comfort, III, Wolfgang Maasberg, Richard McDonald, and James Urry and against Plaintiffs David R. Burt, et al. in the amount of $64609.73 and included in the judgment. Motion to Review due by 5/9/2016. (c/m 5/2/16 jnls, Deputy Clerk) Modified on 5/2/2016 (jnls, Deputy Clerk).
May 2, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 281 Clerk's Order Taxing Costs re: #222 Bill of Costs. Costs are taxed in favor of Defendants Stuyvesant Pierpont Comfort, William T. Comfort, Jr., LDN Stuyvie Partnership, Meudon Investments Partnership, and against Plaintiffs David R. Burt, et al., in the amount of $22,234.86 and included in the judgment. Motion to Review due by 5/9/2016. (c/m 5/2/16 jnls, Deputy Clerk) Modified on 5/2/2016 (jnls, Deputy Clerk).
April 4, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 280 Correspondence re: bills of costs (Ulwick, James)
March 16, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 279 RULE 45 MANDATE of USCA as to #259 Notice of Appeal filed by Texas Addison Limited Partnership, Texas Barrington LLC, David R Burt. (sls, Deputy Clerk)
March 16, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 278 ORDER of USCA "DISMISSING" this proceeding pursuant to Local Rule 45 as to #259 Notice of Appeal filed by Texas Addison Limited Partnership, Texas Barrington LLC, David R Burt. (sls, Deputy Clerk)
January 28, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 277 ORDER of USCA "GRANTING" the motion to withdraw from representation on appeal as to #259 Notice of Appeal filed by Texas Addison Limited Partnership, Texas Barrington LLC, David R Burt. (sls, Deputy Clerk)
January 14, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 276 SUGGESTION OF DEATH Upon the Record by A. Richard Blair. (Genth, Geoffrey)
January 11, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 275 Local Rule 101.2 sent to David and Janet Burt (c/m 1/11/16 jnls, Deputy Clerk)
January 11, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 274 MARGINAL ORDER granting #268 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Thomas W Traxler, Jr; James M Webster, III; Joshua Branson and Jeremy S Newman terminated. Signed by Judge J. Frederick Motz on 1/11/2016. (jnls, Deputy Clerk)
January 8, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 273 Paperless ORDER finding as moot #218 Motion to Stay. Signed by Judge J. Frederick Motz on 1/8/2016. (Motz, J.)
January 7, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 272 ORDER denying #262 Motion to Terminate Representation ; denying #263 Motion to deny defendants' request for costs ; denying #264 Motion for Sanctions; denying #265 Motion to Unseal. Signed by Judge J. Frederick Motz on 1/7/2016. (jnls, Deputy Clerk)
November 10, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 271 PAPERLESS ORDER granting #270 Motion of A. Richard Blair, Stuyvesant Pierpont Comfort, William T Comfort, Jr, William T Comfort, III, LDN Stuyvie Partnersip, Wolfgang Maasberg, Richard McDonald, Meudon Investments Partnership, James Urry to Seal. Signed by Judge J. Frederick Motz on 11/10/2015. (jnls, Deputy Clerk)
November 5, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 270 MOTION to Seal Opposition to ECF 263, 264 and 265 by A. Richard Blair, Stuyvesant Pierpont Comfort, William T Comfort, Jr, William T Comfort, III, LDN Stuyvie Partnersip, Wolfgang Maasberg, Richard McDonald, Meudon Investments Partnership, James Urry Responses due by 11/23/2015 (Genth, Geoffrey)
November 5, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 269 -SEALED-RESPONSE in Opposition re #263 MOTION to deny defendants' request for costs, #265 MOTION to Unseal, #264 MOTION for Sanctions filed by A. Richard Blair, Stuyvesant Pierpont Comfort, William T Comfort, Jr, William T Comfort, III, LDN Stuyvie Partnersip, Wolfgang Maasberg, Richard McDonald, Meudon Investments Partnership, James Urry. Replies due by 11/23/2015. (Genth, Geoffrey)
November 3, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 268 MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney by David R Burt, Janet H Burt, Texas Addison Limited Partnership, Texas Barrington LLC Responses due by 11/20/2015 (Attachments: #1 Memorandum In Support, #2 Exhibit A)(Webster, James)
October 20, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 267 -SEALED- MEMORANDUM in Support re #263 SUPPLEMENTARY MOTION to deny defendants' request for costs, #262 MOTION to Terminate Representation, #264 MOTION for Sanctions filed by David R Burt. (EXHIBITS 1-18 FILED IN PAPER FORMAT ONLY) (jnls, Deputy Clerk)
October 20, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 266 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE re #262 , #263 , #264 #265 by David R Burt (jnls, Deputy Clerk)
October 20, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 265 -SEALED- MOTION to Unseal #262 , #263 , #264 and #265 Motions by David R Burt (jnls, Deputy Clerk)
October 20, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 264 -SEALED- MOTION for Sanctions by David R Burt (jnls, Deputy Clerk)
October 20, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 263 -SEALED-SUPPLEMENTARY MOTION to deny defendants' request for costs by David R Burt (jnls, Deputy Clerk)
October 20, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 262 -SEALED- MOTION to Terminate Representation by David R Burt (jnls, Deputy Clerk)
October 15, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 261 USCA Case Number 15-2247 for #259 Notice of Appeal filed by Texas Addison Limited Partnership, Texas Barrington LLC, David R Burt. Case Manager - Richard H. Sewell. (sls, Deputy Clerk)
October 14, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 260 Transmission of Notice of Appeal and Docket Sheet to US Court of Appeals re #259 Notice of Appeal. IMPORTANT NOTICE: To access forms which you are required to file with the United States Court of Appeals for the Fourth Circuit please go to http://www.ca4.uscourts.gov and click on Forms & Notices. (bmhs, Deputy Clerk)
October 13, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 259 NOTICE OF APPEAL by David R Burt, Texas Addison Limited Partnership, Texas Barrington LLC. Filing fee $ 505, receipt number 0416-5648716. Appeal Record due by 11/16/2015. (Webster, James)
October 5, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 258 ORDER directing the order dated June 5, 2015 entering judgment in favor of defendants against plaintiffs is incorporated by reference; Judgment is entered in favor of counter defendants on the counterclaims filed against them. Signed by Judge J. Frederick Motz on 10/5/2015. (jnls, Deputy Clerk)
September 25, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 257 Correspondence re: Entry of Further Judgment (Genth, Geoffrey)
September 16, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 256 PAPERLESS ORDER granting #251 Motion to Seal. Signed by Judge J. Frederick Motz on 9/16/2015. (jnls, Deputy Clerk)
September 14, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 255 ORDER granting #191 MOTION to Unseal Proposed Third Amended Complaint filed by Janet H Burt, Texas Addison Limited Partnership, Texas Barrington LLC, David R Burt. Signed by Judge J. Frederick Motz on 9/14/2015. (jnls, Deputy Clerk)
September 14, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 254 MEMORANDUM. Signed by Judge J. Frederick Motz on 9/14/2015. (jnls, Deputy Clerk)
September 2, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 253 Substantive legal issues - addressing (Ulwick, James)
August 24, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 252 ORDER granting #224 Motion for Summary Judgment on the O&D Defendants' Counterclaim by David R Burt, Janet H Burt. Signed by Judge J. Frederick Motz on 8/21/2015. (jnls, Deputy Clerk)
August 20, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 251 MOTION to Seal by A. Richard Blair, William T Comfort, III, Wolfgang Maasberg, Richard McDonald, James Urry Responses due by 9/8/2015 (Manofsky, Catherine)
August 20, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 250 -SEALED-RESPONSE in Support re #237 Cross MOTION for Summary Judgment as to David R. Burt's and Janet H. Burt's Liability on the Counterclaim filed by A. Richard Blair, William T Comfort, III, Wolfgang Maasberg, Richard McDonald, James Urry. Replies due by 9/8/2015. (Manofsky, Catherine)
August 5, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 249 PAPERLESS ORDER granting #229 Motion to Seal; granting #233 Motion to Seal; granting #235 Motion to Seal; granting #239 Motion to Seal; granting #242 Motion to Seal; granting #245 Motion to Seal; granting #248 Motion to Seal. Signed by Judge J. Frederick Motz on 8/5/2015. (jnls, Deputy Clerk)
August 3, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 248 MOTION to Seal #247 Plaintiffs' Reply by David R Burt, Janet H Burt, Texas Addison Limited Partnership, Texas Barrington LLC Responses due by 8/20/2015 (Webster, James)
August 3, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 247 -SEALED-RESPONSE in Support re #224 MOTION for Summary Judgment on the O&D Defendants' Counterclaim and Opposition to #237 Cross MOTION for Summary Judgment as to David R. Burt's and Janet H. Burt's Liability on the Counterclaim filed by David R Burt, Janet H Burt. Replies due by 8/20/2015. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(Webster, James)
July 31, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 246 NOTICE by David R Burt, Janet H Burt, Texas Addison Limited Partnership, Texas Barrington LLC of Withdrawal of Counsel W. Joss Nichols (Nichols, William)
July 23, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 245 MOTION to Seal Reply Memorandum in Support of O&D Defendants' Bill of Costs by A. Richard Blair, William T Comfort, Jr, Wolfgang Maasberg, Richard McDonald, James Urry Responses due by 8/10/2015 (Ulwick, James)
July 23, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 244 -SEALED-REPLY to Response in Opposition to Bill of Costs re #221 Bill of Costs, filed by A. Richard Blair, William T Comfort, III, Wolfgang Maasberg, Richard McDonald, James Urry. (Ulwick, James)
July 22, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 243 REPLY to Response in Opposition to Bill of Costs re #234 Response in Opposition to Bill of Costs filed by Stuyvesant Pierpont Comfort, William T Comfort, Jr, LDN Stuyvie Partnersip, Meudon Investments Partnership. (Schrier, Michael)
July 16, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 242 MOTION to Seal by A. Richard Blair, Stuyvesant Pierpont Comfort, William T Comfort, Jr, William T Comfort, III, LDN Stuyvie Partnersip, Wolfgang Maasberg, Richard McDonald, Meudon Investments Partnership, James Urry Responses due by 8/3/2015 (Genth, Geoffrey)
July 16, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 241 -SEALED-REPLY to Response to Motion re #218 MOTION to Stay re #191 MOTION to Unseal Proposed Third Amended Complaint [141-02] filed by A. Richard Blair, Stuyvesant Pierpont Comfort, William T Comfort, Jr, William T Comfort, III, LDN Stuyvie Partnersip, Wolfgang Maasberg, Richard McDonald, Meudon Investments Partnership, James Urry. (Genth, Geoffrey)
July 15, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 240 Paperless ORDER granting #236 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply. Signed by Judge J. Frederick Motz on 7/15/2015. (Motz, J.)
July 15, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 239 MOTION to Seal by A. Richard Blair, William T Comfort, III, Wolfgang Maasberg, Richard McDonald, James Urry Responses due by 8/3/2015 (Ulwick, James)
July 15, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 238 -SEALED-RESPONSE IN OPPOSITION re #224 MOTION for Summary Judgment on the O&D Defendants' Counterclaim and Reply in Support of Cross-Motion for Summary Judgment as to Liability on the Counterclaim filed by A. Richard Blair, William T Comfort, III, Wolfgang Maasberg, Richard McDonald, James Urry. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E)(Ulwick, James) Modified on 7/15/2015 (jnls, Deputy Clerk).
July 15, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 237 Cross MOTION for Summary Judgment as to David R. Burt's and Janet H. Burt's Liability on the Counterclaim by A. Richard Blair, William T Comfort, III, Wolfgang Maasberg, Richard McDonald, James Urry Responses due by 8/3/2015 (Ulwick, James)
July 13, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 236 Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #224 MOTION for Summary Judgment on the O&D Defendants' Counterclaim by A. Richard Blair, William T Comfort, III, Wolfgang Maasberg, Richard McDonald, James Urry Responses due by 7/30/2015 (Manofsky, Catherine)
July 9, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 235 MOTION to Seal #234 Plaintiffs' Opposition Regarding SH Defendants' Bill of Costs by David R Burt, Janet H Burt, Texas Addison Limited Partnership, Texas Barrington LLC Responses due by 7/27/2015 (Webster, James)
July 9, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 234 -SEALED-RESPONSE in Opposition re #222 Bill of Costs, filed by David R Burt, Janet H Burt, Texas Addison Limited Partnership, Texas Barrington LLC. Replies due by 7/27/2015. (Webster, James)
July 9, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 233 MOTION to Seal #232 Plaintiffs' Opposition Regarding O&D Defendants' Bill of Costs by David R Burt, Janet H Burt, Texas Addison Limited Partnership, Texas Barrington LLC Responses due by 7/27/2015 (Webster, James)
July 9, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 232 -SEALED-RESPONSE in Opposition re #221 Bill of Costs, filed by David R Burt, Janet H Burt, Texas Addison Limited Partnership, Texas Barrington LLC. Replies due by 7/27/2015. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4)(Webster, James)
July 6, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 231 PAPERLESS ORDER granting #220 Motion to Seal #218 Motion and #219 Response. Signed by Judge J. Frederick Motz on 7/6/2015. (dass, Deputy Clerk)
June 29, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 230 RESPONSE in Opposition re #218 MOTION to Stay re #191 MOTION to Unseal Proposed Third Amended Complaint [141-02] filed by David R Burt, Janet H Burt, Texas Addison Limited Partnership, Texas Barrington LLC. Replies due by 7/16/2015. (Webster, James)
June 29, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 229 MOTION to Seal Reply in Support of Plaintiffs' Motion to Unseal Their Proposed Third Amended Complaint by David R Burt, Janet H Burt, Texas Addison Limited Partnership, Texas Barrington LLC Responses due by 7/16/2015 (Webster, James)
June 29, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 228 -SEALED-REPLY to Response to Motion re #191 MOTION to Unseal Proposed Third Amended Complaint [141-02] filed by David R Burt, Janet H Burt, Texas Addison Limited Partnership, Texas Barrington LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5)(Webster, James)
June 29, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 227 PAPERLESS ORDER granting David Burt and Janet Burt's #226 Motion to Seal #225 Memorandum in support. Signed by Judge J. Frederick Motz on 6/29/2015. (dass, Deputy Clerk)
June 25, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 226 MOTION to Seal #225 Memorandum In Support of Plaintiffs/Counterdefendants' Motion for Summary Judgment by David R Burt, Janet H Burt Responses due by 7/13/2015 (Webster, James)
June 25, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 225 -SEALED - NOTICE of Filing Under Seal Memorandum In Support of Motion for Summary Judgment by David R Burt, Janet H Burt re #224 MOTION for Summary Judgment on the O&D Defendants' Counterclaim (Webster, James)
June 25, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 224 MOTION for Summary Judgment on the O&D Defendants' Counterclaim by David R Burt, Janet H Burt Responses due by 7/13/2015 (Attachments: #1 Memorandum In Support - Notice of Filing Under Seal)(Webster, James)
June 24, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 223 NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings held on 06/05/2015, before Judge J. Frederick Motz. Court Reporter/Transcriber Christine T. Asif, Telephone number 410-962-4492. Total number of pages filed: 69. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained from the Court Reporter or through PACER. Redaction Request due 7/15/2015. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 7/27/2015. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 9/22/2015. (ca, Court Reporter)
June 19, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 222 BILL OF COSTS by Stuyvesant Pierpont Comfort, William T Comfort, Jr, LDN Stuyvie Partnersip, Meudon Investments Partnership. Replies due by 7/9/2015. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Memorandum In Support, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B)(Stolarz, Brian)
June 19, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 221 BILL OF COSTS by A. Richard Blair, William T Comfort, III, Wolfgang Maasberg, Richard McDonald, James Urry. Replies due by 7/9/2015. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Memo in Support thereof, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit C, #5 Exhibit D)(Genth, Geoffrey)
June 12, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 220 MOTION to Seal docket numbers #218 and #219 by A. Richard Blair, Stuyvesant Pierpont Comfort, William T Comfort, Jr, William T Comfort, III, LDN Stuyvie Partnersip, Wolfgang Maasberg, Richard McDonald, Meudon Investments Partnership, James Urry Responses due by 6/29/2015 (Genth, Geoffrey)
June 12, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 219 -SEALED-RESPONSE in Opposition re #191 MOTION to Unseal Proposed Third Amended Complaint [141-02] And in Support of Defendants' [Docket No. 218] Motion to Stay Plaintiffs' Motion to Unseal filed by A. Richard Blair, Stuyvesant Pierpont Comfort, William T Comfort, Jr, William T Comfort, III, LDN Stuyvie Partnersip, Wolfgang Maasberg, Richard McDonald, Meudon Investments Partnership, James Urry. Replies due by 6/29/2015. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4)(Genth, Geoffrey)
June 12, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 218 -SEALED- MOTION to Stay re #191 MOTION to Unseal Proposed Third Amended Complaint [141-02] by A. Richard Blair, Stuyvesant Pierpont Comfort, William T Comfort, Jr, William T Comfort, III, LDN Stuyvie Partnersip, Wolfgang Maasberg, Richard McDonald, Meudon Investments Partnership, James Urry Responses due by 6/29/2015 (Genth, Geoffrey)
June 5, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 217 ORDER granting #146 Motion of defendants for Summary Judgment on the ground of standing; Judgment is entered in favor of defendants against plaintiffs. Signed by Judge J. Frederick Motz on 6/5/2015. (jnls, Deputy Clerk)
June 5, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 216 Motion Hearing held on 6/5/2015 re #146 MOTION for Summary Judgment As to the Lack of a Proper Plaintiff filed by Wolfgang Maasberg, Meudon Investments Partnership, William T Comfort, III, Richard McDonald, James Urry, William T Comfort, Jr, A. Richard Blair, LDN Stuyvie Partnersip, Stuyvesant Pierpont Comfort before Judge J. Frederick Motz. (Court Reporter: Asif) (rks, Deputy Clerk)
June 3, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 215 PAPERLESS ORDER granting #208 Motion to Seal; granting #210 Motion to Seal. Signed by Judge J. Frederick Motz on 6/3/2015. (jnls, Deputy Clerk)
June 3, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 214 MOTION to Seal #213 Plaintiffs' Reply to Response to Motion by David R Burt, Janet H Burt, Texas Addison Limited Partnership, Texas Barrington LLC Responses due by 6/22/2015 (Webster, James)
June 3, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 213 -SEALED-REPLY to Response to Motion re #169 MOTION for Reconsideration re #159 Order on Motion for Protective Order filed by David R Burt, Janet H Burt, Texas Addison Limited Partnership, Texas Barrington LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2)(Webster, James)
June 3, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 212 NOTICE by A. Richard Blair, Stuyvesant Pierpont Comfort, William T Comfort, Jr, William T Comfort, III, LDN Stuyvie Partnersip, Wolfgang Maasberg, Richard McDonald, Meudon Investments Partnership, James Urry re #182 MOTION for Summary Judgment on the Merits, #141 MOTION for Leave to File Third Amended Complaint Line Regarding Defendants' Opposition to Plaintiffs' Motion for Leave to File Third Amended Complaint (Ulwick, James)
June 2, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 211 Correspondence re: Deposition Testimony (Webster, James)
June 2, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 210 MOTION to Seal by A. Richard Blair, Stuyvesant Pierpont Comfort, William T Comfort, Jr, William T Comfort, III, LDN Stuyvie Partnersip, Wolfgang Maasberg, Richard McDonald, Meudon Investments Partnership, James Urry Responses due by 6/19/2015 (Ulwick, James)
June 2, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 209 -SEALED-RESPONSE in Support re #146 MOTION for Summary Judgment As to the Lack of a Proper Plaintiff filed by A. Richard Blair, Stuyvesant Pierpont Comfort, William T Comfort, Jr, William T Comfort, III, LDN Stuyvie Partnersip, Wolfgang Maasberg, Richard McDonald, Meudon Investments Partnership, James Urry. Replies due by 6/19/2015. (Ulwick, James)
June 2, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 208 MOTION to Seal #207 Plaintiffs' Letter to Judge Motz and Accompanying Exhibits by David R Burt, Janet H Burt, Texas Addison Limited Partnership, Texas Barrington LLC Responses due by 6/19/2015 (Webster, James)
June 2, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 207 -SEALED - NOTICE of Filing Under Seal Letter to Judge Motz re: Recent Unresolved Discovery Disputes and Exhibits 2-9 Thereto by David R Burt, Janet H Burt, Texas Addison Limited Partnership, Texas Barrington LLC re #205 Miscellaneous Correspondence,, (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 2, #2 Exhibit 3, #3 Exhibit 4, #4 Exhibit 5, #5 Exhibit 6, #6 Exhibit 7, #7 Exhibit 8, #8 Exhibit 9)(Webster, James)
June 2, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 206 Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #191 MOTION to Unseal Proposed Third Amended Complaint [141-02] by A. Richard Blair, Stuyvesant Pierpont Comfort, William T Comfort, Jr, William T Comfort, III, LDN Stuyvie Partnersip, Wolfgang Maasberg, Richard McDonald, Meudon Investments Partnership, James Urry. Responses due by 6/19/2015 (Genth, Geoffrey)
June 2, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 205 Correspondence re: Recent Unresolved Discovery Disputes Pursuant to Discovery Guideline 1.f (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2 - Notice of Filing Under Seal, #3 Exhibit 3 - Notice of Filing Under Seal, #4 Exhibit 4 - Notice of Filing Under Seal, #5 Exhibit 5 - Notice of Filing Under Seal, #6 Exhibit 6 - Notice of Filing Under Seal, #7 Exhibit 7 - Notice of Filing Under Seal, #8 Exhibit 8 - Notice of Filing Under Seal, #9 Exhibit 9 - Notice of Filing Under Seal)(Webster, James)
June 1, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 204 Supplemental to #182 MOTION for Summary Judgment on the Merits filed by A. Richard Blair, Stuyvesant Pierpont Comfort, William T Comfort, Jr, William T Comfort, III, LDN Stuyvie Partnersip, Wolfgang Maasberg, Richard McDonald, Meudon Investments Partnership, James Urry . (Attachments: #1 Appendix of Exhibits, #2 Exhibit 26, #3 Exhibit 27)(Genth, Geoffrey)
June 1, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 203 QC NOTICE: #202 Motion for Summary Judgment, filed by Wolfgang Maasberg, Meudon Investments Partnership, William T Comfort, III, Richard McDonald, James Urry, William T Comfort, Jr, A. Richard Blair, LDN Stuyvie Partnersip, Stuyvesant Pierpont Comfort was filed incorrectly. **Please use the event under Other Documents > Supplemental and link the document to your Motion. It has been noted as FILED IN ERROR, and the document link has been disabled. (ca2s, Deputy Clerk)
May 29, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 202 [FILED IN ERROR] Supplemental MOTION for Summary Judgment Statement of Facts in Support of Their Motion for Summary Judgment on the Merits by A. Richard Blair, Stuyvesant Pierpont Comfort, William T Comfort, Jr, William T Comfort, III, LDN Stuyvie Partnersip, Wolfgang Maasberg, Richard McDonald, Meudon Investments Partnership, James Urry Responses due by 6/15/2015 (Attachments: #1 Appendix Amended, #2 Exhibit 26, #3 Exhibit 27)(Genth, Geoffrey) Modified on 6/1/2015 (ca2s, Deputy Clerk).
May 28, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 201 MOTION to Seal by A. Richard Blair, William T Comfort, III, Wolfgang Maasberg, Richard McDonald, James Urry Responses due by 6/15/2015 (Genth, Geoffrey)
May 28, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 200 -SEALED - NOTICE of Filing Under Seal Exhibit 3 to Local Rule 104.7 Certificate by A. Richard Blair, William T Comfort, Jr, Wolfgang Maasberg, Richard McDonald, James Urry re #197 Local Rule (Genth, Geoffrey)
May 28, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 199 -SEALED - NOTICE of Filing Under Seal Exhibit 2 to Local Rule 104.7 Certificate by A. Richard Blair, William T Comfort, Jr, Wolfgang Maasberg, Richard McDonald, James Urry re #197 Local Rule (Genth, Geoffrey)
May 28, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 198 -SEALED - NOTICE of Filing Under Seal Exhibit 1 to Local Rule 104.7 Certificate by A. Richard Blair, William T Comfort, III, Wolfgang Maasberg, Richard McDonald, James Urry re #197 Local Rule (Genth, Geoffrey)
May 28, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 197 Local Rule 104.7 Certificate. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3)(Genth, Geoffrey)
May 27, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 196 PAPERLESS ORDER granting #181 Motion to Seal; granting #183 Motion to Seal. Signed by Judge J. Frederick Motz on 5/27/2015. (jnls, Deputy Clerk)
May 22, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 195 MOTION to Seal #194 Exhibits 6 and 8 to Plaintiffs' Opposition by David R Burt, Janet H Burt, Texas Addison Limited Partnership, Texas Barrington LLC Responses due by 6/8/2015 (Webster, James)
May 22, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 194 -SEALED - NOTICE of Filing Under Seal Exhibit 6 to Opposition to Motion for Summary Judgment by David R Burt, Janet H Burt, Texas Addison Limited Partnership, Texas Barrington LLC re #193 Response in Opposition to Motion,, (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 8 to Opposition to Motion for Summary Judgment)(Webster, James)
May 22, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 193 RESPONSE in Opposition re #146 MOTION for Summary Judgment As to the Lack of a Proper Plaintiff filed by David R Burt, Janet H Burt, Texas Addison Limited Partnership, Texas Barrington LLC. Replies due by 6/8/2015. (Attachments: #1 Index of Exhibits, #2 Exhibit 1, #3 Exhibit 2, #4 Exhibit 3, #5 Exhibit 4, #6 Exhibit 5, #7 Exhibit 6--Notice of Filing Under Seal, #8 Exhibit 7, #9 Exhibit 8--Notice of Filing Under Seal, #10 Exhibit 9, #11 Exhibit 10)(Webster, James)
May 20, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 192 MOTION to Seal #191 Plaintiffs' Motion to Unseal Proposed Third Amended Complaint by David R Burt, Janet H Burt, Texas Addison Limited Partnership, Texas Barrington LLC Responses due by 6/8/2015 (Webster, James)
May 20, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 191 -SEALED- MOTION to Unseal Proposed Third Amended Complaint [141-02] by David R Burt, Janet H Burt, Texas Addison Limited Partnership, Texas Barrington LLC Responses due by 6/8/2015 (Attachments: #1 Memorandum In Support, #2 Exhibit 1, #3 Exhibit 2, #4 Exhibit 3, #5 Exhibit 4, #6 Exhibit 5, #7 Exhibit 6)(Webster, James)
May 18, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 190 MOTION to Seal by A. Richard Blair, Stuyvesant Pierpont Comfort, William T Comfort, Jr, William T Comfort, III, LDN Stuyvie Partnersip, Wolfgang Maasberg, Richard McDonald, Meudon Investments Partnership, James Urry Responses due by 6/4/2015 (Ulwick, James)
May 18, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 189 -SEALED-RESPONSE in Opposition re #169 MOTION for Reconsideration re #159 Order on Motion for Protective Order And In Support of Motion for Sanctions filed by A. Richard Blair, Stuyvesant Pierpont Comfort, William T Comfort, Jr, William T Comfort, III, LDN Stuyvie Partnersip, Wolfgang Maasberg, Richard McDonald, Meudon Investments Partnership, James Urry. Replies due by 6/4/2015. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(Ulwick, James)
May 18, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 188 -SEALED- MOTION for Sanctions Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P.37 by A. Richard Blair, William T Comfort, Jr, William T Comfort, III, LDN Stuyvie Partnersip, Wolfgang Maasberg, Richard McDonald, Meudon Investments Partnership, James Urry Responses due by 6/4/2015 (Ulwick, James)
May 14, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 187 Paperless ORDER approving re #186 Stipulation filed by Janet H Burt, Texas Addison Limited Partnership, Texas Barrington LLC, David R Burt. Signed by Judge J. Frederick Motz on 5/14/2015. (Motz, J.)
May 14, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 186 STIPULATION re #146 MOTION for Summary Judgment As to the Lack of a Proper Plaintiff (Briefing Schedule) by David R Burt, Janet H Burt, Texas Addison Limited Partnership, Texas Barrington LLC. (Webster, James)
May 6, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 185 MOTION to Seal Correspondence to The Honorable J. Frederick Motz by A. Richard Blair, William T Comfort, III, Wolfgang Maasberg, Richard McDonald, James Urry Responses due by 5/26/2015 (Ulwick, James)
May 6, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 184 -SEALED-RESPONSE in Opposition re #179 Miscellaneous Correspondence SEALED Correspondence to The Honorable J. Frederick Motz by A. Richard Blair, William T Comfort, III, Wolfgang Maasberg, Richard McDonald, James Urry. (Ulwick, James)
May 4, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 183 MOTION to Seal Defendants' Motion for Summary Judgment on the Merits by A. Richard Blair, Stuyvesant Pierpont Comfort, William T Comfort, Jr, William T Comfort, III, LDN Stuyvie Partnersip, Wolfgang Maasberg, Richard McDonald, Meudon Investments Partnership, James Urry Responses due by 5/21/2015 (Ulwick, James)
May 4, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 182 -SEALED- MOTION for Summary Judgment on the Merits by A. Richard Blair, Stuyvesant Pierpont Comfort, William T Comfort, Jr, William T Comfort, III, LDN Stuyvie Partnersip, Wolfgang Maasberg, Richard McDonald, Meudon Investments Partnership, James Urry Responses due by 5/21/2015 (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support, #2 Appendix of Exhibits, #3 Exhibit 1, #4 Exhibit 2, #5 Exhibit 3, #6 Exhibit 4, #7 Exhibit 5, #8 Exhibit 6, #9 Exhibit 7, #10 Exhibit 8, #11 Exhibit 9, #12 Exhibit 10, #13 Exhibit 11, #14 Exhibit 12, #15 Exhibit 13, #16 Exhibit 14, #17 Exhibit 15, #18 Exhibit 16, #19 Exhibit 17, #20 Exhibit 18, #21 Exhibit 19, #22 Exhibit 20, #23 Exhibit 21, #24 Exhibit 22, #25 Exhibit 23, #26 Exhibit 24, #27 Exhibit 25)(Ulwick, James)
May 4, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 181 MOTION to Seal Plaintiffs' Letter to Judge Motz Regarding Deposition Hours and Exhibits A & B Thereto by David R Burt, Janet H Burt, Texas Addison Limited Partnership, Texas Barrington LLC Responses due by 5/21/2015 (Webster, James)
May 4, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 180 -SEALED - NOTICE of Filing Under Seal Letter to Judge Motz Regarding Deposition Hours and Exhibits A & B by David R Burt, Janet H Burt, Texas Addison Limited Partnership, Texas Barrington LLC re #179 Miscellaneous Correspondence (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(Webster, James)
May 4, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 179 Correspondence re: Deposition Hours (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A--Notice of Filing Under Seal, #2 Exhibit B--Notice of Filing Under Seal)(Webster, James)
May 4, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 178 Paperless ORDER granting #176 Motion for Extension of Time. Signed by Judge J. Frederick Motz on 5/4/2015. (Motz, J.)
May 1, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 177 PAPERLESS ORDER granting #175 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Jeremy S Newman. Directing attorney Jeremy S Newman to register online for CM/ECF at https://www.mdd.uscourts.gov/attyregB/inputProHac.asp. Signed by Clerk on 5/1/2015. (bu, Deputy Clerk)
May 1, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 176 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time re: Defendants' Motion for Summary Judgment on the Merits by A. Richard Blair, Stuyvesant Pierpont Comfort, William T Comfort, Jr, William T Comfort, III, Wolfgang Maasberg, Richard McDonald, Meudon Investments Partnership, James Urry Responses due by 5/18/2015 (Schrier, Michael)
May 1, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 175 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Jeremy S. Newman ( Filing fee $ 50, receipt number 0416-5359419.) by David R Burt, Janet H Burt, Texas Addison Limited Partnership, Texas Barrington LLC (Webster, James)
May 1, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 174 PAPERLESS ORDER granting #172 Motion to Seal. Signed by Judge J. Frederick Motz on 5/1/2015. (jnls, Deputy Clerk)
April 30, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 173 MOTION for Leave to File Document Ex Parte 171 by Janet H Burt Responses due by 5/18/2015 (Webster, James)
April 30, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 172 MOTION to Seal Memorandum In Support of Plaintiffs' Motion for Reconsideration #170 by Janet H Burt Responses due by 5/18/2015 (Webster, James)
April 30, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 170 -SEALED - NOTICE of Filing Under Seal Memorandum In Support of Motion for Reconsideration by Janet H Burt (Webster, James)
April 30, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 169 MOTION for Reconsideration re #159 Order on Motion for Protective Order by Janet H Burt Responses due by 5/18/2015 (Attachments: #1 Memorandum In Support--Notice of Filing Under Seal, #2 Affidavit Notice of Filing Ex Parte)(Webster, James)
April 29, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 168 RESPONSE in Opposition re #167 MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages for Defendants' Motion for Summary Judgment on the Merits (Partial Opposition) filed by David R Burt, Janet H Burt, Texas Addison Limited Partnership, Texas Barrington LLC. Replies due by 5/18/2015. (Webster, James)
April 29, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 167 MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages for Defendants' Motion for Summary Judgment on the Merits by A. Richard Blair, Stuyvesant Pierpont Comfort, William T Comfort, Jr, William T Comfort, III, LDN Stuyvie Partnersip, Wolfgang Maasberg, Richard McDonald, Meudon Investments Partnership, James Urry Responses due by 5/18/2015 (Ulwick, James)
April 29, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 166 Paperless ORDER granting #165 Motion to Amend/Correct. Signed by Judge J. Frederick Motz on 4/29/2015. (Motz, J.)
April 28, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 165 MOTION to Amend/Correct #65 Scheduling Order (Unopposed) by David R Burt, Janet H Burt, Texas Addison Limited Partnership, Texas Barrington LLC Responses due by 5/15/2015 (Webster, James)
April 27, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 164 MOTION to Seal Plaintiffs' Reply In Support of Motion for Leave to File Third Amended Complaint and Exhibits J-N by David R Burt, Janet H Burt, Texas Addison Limited Partnership, Texas Barrington LLC Responses due by 5/14/2015 (Webster, James)
April 27, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 163 -SEALED - NOTICE of Filing Under Seal Reply In Support of Motion for Leave to File Third Amended Complaint and Exhibits J-N by David R Burt, Janet H Burt, Texas Addison Limited Partnership, Texas Barrington LLC re #162 Reply to Response to Motion,, (Attachments: #1 Exhibit J, #2 Exhibit K, #3 Exhibit L, #4 Exhibit M, #5 Exhibit N)(Webster, James)
April 27, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 162 REPLY to Response to Motion re #141 MOTION for Leave to File Third Amended Complaint filed by David R Burt, Janet H Burt, Texas Addison Limited Partnership, Texas Barrington LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit F, #2 Exhibit G, #3 Exhibit H, #4 Exhibit I, #5 Exhibit J - Notice of Filing Under Seal, #6 Exhibit K - Notice of Filing Under Seal, #7 Exhibit L - Notice of Filing Under Seal, #8 Exhibit M - Notice of Filing Under Seal, #9 Exhibit N - Notice of Filing Under Seal)(Webster, James)
April 21, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 161 ORDER granting #160 Motion for Extension of Time. Signed by Judge J. Frederick Motz on 4/21/2015. (Motz, J.)
April 21, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 160 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time for Defendants to File Motion for Summary Judgment on the Merits by A. Richard Blair, William T Comfort, III, Wolfgang Maasberg, Richard McDonald, James Urry Responses due by 5/8/2015 (Genth, Geoffrey)
April 16, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 159 ORDER denying #129 Motion of Janet Burt for Protective Order. Signed by Judge J. Frederick Motz on 4/16/2015. (jnls, Deputy Clerk)
April 14, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 158 ORDER extending discovery deadline; rescheduling hearing. Signed by Judge J. Frederick Motz on 4/14/2015. (jnls, Deputy Clerk)
April 14, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 157 PAPERLESS ORDER granting #156 Motion to Seal. Signed by Judge J. Frederick Motz on 4/14/2015. (jnls, Deputy Clerk)
April 13, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 156 MOTION to Seal Plaintiffs' Reply Memorandum #155 In Support of Motion for Protective Order by David R Burt, Janet H Burt, Texas Addison Limited Partnership, Texas Barrington LLC Responses due by 4/30/2015 (Webster, James)
April 13, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 155 -SEALED-REPLY to Response to Motion re #129 MOTION for Protective Order filed by David R Burt, Janet H Burt, Texas Addison Limited Partnership, Texas Barrington LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 6, #2 Exhibit 7)(Webster, James)
April 10, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 154 PAPERLESS ORDER granting #153 Motion to Seal. Signed by Judge J. Frederick Motz on 4/10/2015. (jnls, Deputy Clerk)
April 9, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 153 MOTION to Seal Defendants' Memorandum in Opposition to Plaintiffs' Motion for Leave to File Third Amended Complaint by A. Richard Blair, Stuyvesant Pierpont Comfort, William T Comfort, Jr, William T Comfort, III, LDN Stuyvie Partnersip, Wolfgang Maasberg, Richard McDonald, Meudon Investments Partnership, James Urry Responses due by 4/27/2015 (Manofsky, Catherine)
April 9, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 152 -SEALED-RESPONSE in Opposition re #141 MOTION for Leave to File Third Amended Complaint filed by A. Richard Blair, Stuyvesant Pierpont Comfort, William T Comfort, Jr, William T Comfort, III, LDN Stuyvie Partnersip, Wolfgang Maasberg, Richard McDonald, Meudon Investments Partnership, James Urry. Replies due by 4/27/2015. (Manofsky, Catherine)
April 7, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 151 PAPERLESS ORDER granting #147 Motion to Seal. Signed by Judge J. Frederick Motz on 4/7/2015. (jnls, Deputy Clerk)
April 6, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 150 Correspondence re: Scheduling (Webster, James)
April 2, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 149 Correspondence re: Scheduling (Ulwick, James)
March 30, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 148 PAPERLESS ORDER granting #145 Motion to Seal. Signed by Judge J. Frederick Motz on 3/30/2015. (jnls, Deputy Clerk)
March 30, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 147 MOTION to Seal Defendants' Documents by A. Richard Blair, Stuyvesant Pierpont Comfort, William T Comfort, Jr, William T Comfort, III, LDN Stuyvie Partnersip, Wolfgang Maasberg, Richard McDonald, Meudon Investments Partnership, James Urry Responses due by 4/16/2015 (Manofsky, Catherine)
March 30, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 146 -SEALED- MOTION for Summary Judgment As to the Lack of a Proper Plaintiff by A. Richard Blair, Stuyvesant Pierpont Comfort, William T Comfort, Jr, William T Comfort, III, LDN Stuyvie Partnersip, Wolfgang Maasberg, Richard McDonald, Meudon Investments Partnership, James Urry Responses due by 4/16/2015 (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support of Their Motion for Summary Judgment as to the Lack of a Proper Plaintiff, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit C, #5 Exhibit D, #6 Exhibit E, #7 Exhibit F, #8 Exhibit G, #9 Exhibit H, #10 Exhibit I, #11 Exhibit J, #12 Exhibit K, #13 Exhibit L, #14 Exhibit M, #15 Exhibit N, #16 Exhibit O)(Manofsky, Catherine)
March 27, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 145 MOTION to Seal - Defendants' Motion to File Documents Under Seal by A. Richard Blair, Stuyvesant Pierpont Comfort, William T Comfort, Jr, William T Comfort, III, LDN Stuyvie Partnersip, Wolfgang Maasberg, Richard McDonald, Meudon Investments Partnership, James Urry Responses due by 4/13/2015 (Manofsky, Catherine)
March 27, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 144 -SEALED-RESPONSE in Opposition re #129 MOTION for Protective Order - Defendants' Memorandum in Opposition to Plaintiffs' Motion for Protective Order filed by A. Richard Blair, Stuyvesant Pierpont Comfort, William T Comfort, Jr, William T Comfort, III, LDN Stuyvie Partnersip, Wolfgang Maasberg, Richard McDonald, Meudon Investments Partnership, James Urry. Replies due by 4/13/2015. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G, #8 Exhibit H)(Manofsky, Catherine)
March 23, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 143 MOTION to Seal Documents Related to Plaintiffs' Motion For Leave to File Third Amended Complaint #142 by David R Burt, Texas Addison Limited Partnership Responses due by 4/9/2015 (Webster, James)
March 23, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 142 PER #255 ORDER, PROPOSED THIRD AMENDED COMPLAINT IS UNSEALED-SEALED - NOTICE of Filing Under Seal Memorandum In Support of Motion for Leave to File Third Amended Complaint, Exhibits A and B thereto, and Exhibits 25-31 to [Proposed] Third Amended Complaint by David R Burt, Texas Addison Limited Partnership re #141 MOTION for Leave to File Third Amended Complaint (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A--[Proposed] Third Amended Complaint, #2 Exhibit B--Redline of [Proposed] Third Amended Complaint, #3 Exhibit 25 to [Proposed] Third Amended Complaint, #4 Exhibit 26 to [Proposed] Third Amended Complaint, #5 Exhibit 27 to [Proposed] Third Amended Complaint, #6 Exhibit 28 to [Proposed] Third Amended Complaint, #7 Exhibit 29 to [Proposed] Third Amended Complaint, #8 Exhibit 30 to [Proposed] Third Amended Complaint, #9 Exhibit 31 to [Proposed] Third Amended Complaint)(Webster, James) Modified on 9/14/2015 (jnls, Deputy Clerk).
March 23, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 141 MOTION for Leave to File Third Amended Complaint by David R Burt, Texas Addison Limited Partnership Responses due by 4/9/2015 (Attachments: #1 Memorandum In Support of Motion, #2 Exhibit A-- [Proposed] Third Amended Complaint, #3 Exhibit B--Redline of [Proposed] Third Amended Complaint, #4 Exhibit C, #5 Exhibit D, #6 Exhibit 25 to [Proposed] Third Amended Complaint - Notice of Filing Under Seal, #7 Exhibit 26 to [Proposed] Third Amended Complaint - Notice of Filing Under Seal, #8 Exhibit 27 to [Proposed] Third Amended Complaint - Notice of Filing Under Seal, #9 Exhibit 28 to [Proposed] Third Amended Complaint - Notice of Filing Under Seal, #10 Exhibit 29 to [Proposed] Third Amended Complaint - Notice of Filing Under Seal, #11 Exhibit 30 to [Proposed] Third Amended Complaint - Notice of Filing Under Seal, #12 Exhibit 31 to [Proposed] Third Amended Complaint - Notice of Filing Under Seal, #13 Text of Proposed Order)(Webster, James)
March 20, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 140 Correspondence re: response to plaintiffs request for conference (Ulwick, James)
March 20, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 139 PAPERLESS ORDER granting #137 Motion to Seal. Signed by Judge J. Frederick Motz on 3/20/2015. (dass, Deputy Clerk)
March 20, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 138 QC NOTICE RE: #136 Sealed Reply to Response to Motion, filed by Janet H Burt, Texas Addison Limited Partnership, Texas Barrington LLC, David R Burt. **In the future, use the civil event "Notice of Filing Exhibit or Attachment Under Seal" to file the sealed portion of a previously filed document. No further action required. (dass, Deputy Clerk)
March 19, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 137 MOTION to Seal Reply ISO Plaintiffs' Motion to Extend Discovery Deadline and Exhibit B #136 by David R Burt, Janet H Burt, Texas Addison Limited Partnership, Texas Barrington LLC Responses due by 4/6/2015 (Webster, James)
March 19, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 136 -SEALED-REPLY to Response to Motion re #115 MOTION for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery filed by David R Burt, Janet H Burt, Texas Addison Limited Partnership, Texas Barrington LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit B)(Webster, James)
March 19, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 135 REPLY to Response to Motion re #115 MOTION for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery (Redacted) filed by David R Burt, Janet H Burt, Texas Addison Limited Partnership, Texas Barrington LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B--Under Seal, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E)(Webster, James)
March 19, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 134 Request for Conference (Webster, James)
March 13, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 133 A hearing on all pending motions will be held at 10:00 am on Tuesday, April 28, 2015 in courtroom 5A. (Motz, J.)
March 12, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 132 PAPERLESS ORDER granting #130 Motion to Seal. Signed by Judge J. Frederick Motz on 3/12/2015. (jnls, Deputy Clerk)
March 11, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 131 STATUS REPORT Joint Status Report by David R Burt, Janet H Burt, Texas Addison Limited Partnership, Texas Barrington LLC. (Webster, James)
March 10, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 130 MOTION to Seal Plaintiffs' Motion for Protective Order #129 by David R Burt, Janet H Burt Responses due by 3/27/2015 (Webster, James)
March 10, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 129 -SEALED- MOTION for Protective Order by David R Burt, Janet H Burt Responses due by 3/27/2015 (Attachments: #1 Memorandum In Support, #2 Exhibit 1, #3 Exhibit 2, #4 Exhibit 3, #5 Exhibit 4, #6 Exhibit 5, #7 Rule 104.7 Certification, #8 Text of Proposed Order)(Webster, James)
March 6, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 128 PAPERLESS ORDER granting #127 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Thomas W Traxler, Jr. Directing attorney Thomas W Traxler, Jr to register online for CM/ECF at https://www.mdd.uscourts.gov/attyregB/inputProHac.asp. Signed by Clerk on 3/6/2015. (bu, Deputy Clerk)
March 5, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 127 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Thomas W. Traxler, Jr. ( Filing fee $ 50, receipt number 0416-5255434.) by David R Burt, Janet H Burt, Texas Addison Limited Partnership, Texas Barrington LLC (Webster, James)
March 4, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 126 PAPERLESS ORDER granting #124 Motion to Seal Exhibit E to Opposition to Plaintiffs' Motion to Extend Discovery Deadline. Signed by Judge J. Frederick Motz on 3/4/2015. (jnls, Deputy Clerk)
March 2, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 125 RESPONSE in Opposition re #115 MOTION for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery filed by Stuyvesant Pierpont Comfort, William T Comfort, Jr, LDN Stuyvie Partnersip, Meudon Investments Partnership. Replies due by 3/19/2015. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2)(Schrier, Michael)
March 2, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 124 MOTION to Seal Exhibit E to Opposition to Plaintiffs' Motion to Extend Discovery Deadline by A. Richard Blair, William T Comfort, Jr, Wolfgang Maasberg, Richard McDonald, James Urry Responses due by 3/19/2015 (Manofsky, Catherine)
March 2, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 123 -SEALED - NOTICE of Filing Under Seal Exhibit E to Response in Opposition re Motion for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery by A. Richard Blair, William T Comfort, III, Wolfgang Maasberg, Richard McDonald, James Urry re #122 Response in Opposition to Motion, (Manofsky, Catherine)
March 2, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 122 RESPONSE in Opposition re #115 MOTION for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery filed by A. Richard Blair, William T Comfort, III, Wolfgang Maasberg, Richard McDonald, James Urry. Replies due by 3/19/2015. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G)(Manofsky, Catherine)
February 25, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 121 PAPERLESS ORDER granting #120 NOTICE to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Michael N Mulvania terminated. Signed by Judge J. Frederick Motz on 2/25/2015. (jnls, Deputy Clerk)
February 23, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 120 MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney by David R Burt, Janet H Burt, Texas Addison Limited Partnership, Texas Barrington LLC Responses due by 3/12/2015 (Mulvania, Michael)
February 18, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 119 NOTICE of Appearance by James P Ulwick on behalf of A. Richard Blair, William T Comfort, III, Wolfgang Maasberg, Richard McDonald, James Urry (Ulwick, James)
February 15, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 118 PAPERLESS ORDER granting #117 Motion of plaintiffs to Seal Memorandum In Support of Plaintiffs' Motion to Extend the Discovery Deadline and Exhibits A, B, and E. Signed by Judge J. Frederick Motz on 2/15/2015. (jnls, Deputy Clerk)
February 13, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 117 MOTION to Seal Memorandum In Support of Plaintiffs' Motion to Extend the Discovery Deadline and Exhibits A, B, and E thereto by David R Burt, Janet H Burt, Texas Addison Limited Partnership, Texas Barrington LLC Responses due by 3/2/2015 (Webster, James)
February 13, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 116 -SEALED - NOTICE of Filing Under Seal Unredacted Memorandum In Support of Plaintiffs' Motion to Extend the Discovery Deadline and Exhibits A, B, and E thereto by David R Burt, Janet H Burt, Texas Addison Limited Partnership, Texas Barrington LLC re #115 MOTION for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit E)(Webster, James)
February 13, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 115 MOTION for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery by David R Burt, Janet H Burt, Texas Addison Limited Partnership, Texas Barrington LLC Responses due by 3/2/2015 (Attachments: #1 REDACTED Memorandum In Support of Motion, #2 Exhibit A - UNDER SEAL, #3 Exhibit B - UNDER SEAL, #4 Exhibit C, #5 Exhibit D, #6 Exhibit E - UNDER SEAL)(Webster, James)
February 4, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 114 NOTICE of Appearance by William Jacob Harrington on behalf of A. Richard Blair, William T Comfort, III, Wolfgang Maasberg, Richard McDonald, James Urry (Harrington, William)
January 28, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 113 Correspondence re: Discovery (Schrier, Michael)
January 28, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 112 -SEALED- PAPERLESS ORDER Granting #111 Motion to Seal. Signed by Judge J. Frederick Motz on 1/28/2015. (bas, Deputy Clerk)
January 23, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 111 MOTION to Seal January 23, 2015 discovery related letter to the Court with exhibits by A. Richard Blair, William T Comfort, III, Wolfgang Maasberg, Richard McDonald, James Urry Responses due by 2/9/2015 (Ulwick, James)
January 23, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 110 Sealed Document. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit Exhibit G, #8 Exhibit Exhibit H, #9 Exhibit Exhibit I)(Ulwick, James)
January 23, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 109 PAPERLESS ORDER granting #108 Motion to Seal Correspondence Requesting Conference. Signed by Judge J. Frederick Motz on 1/23/2015. (jnls, Deputy Clerk)
January 22, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 108 MOTION to Seal Correspondence Requesting Conference by David R Burt, Janet H Burt, Texas Addison Limited Partnership, Texas Barrington LLC Responses due by 2/9/2015 (Webster, James)
January 22, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 107 UNREDACTED DOCUMENT. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A to Dkt No. 106, Under Seal)(Webster, James)
January 22, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 106 REDACTED DOCUMENT Correspondence Request Conference by David R Burt, Janet H Burt, Texas Addison Limited Partnership, Texas Barrington LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, Notice of Filing Exhibit Under Seal)(Webster, James)
December 23, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 105 Status Report Submitted by A. Richard Blair, William T Comfort, III, Wolfgang Maasberg, Richard McDonald, James Urry (Ulwick, James)
December 22, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 104 Correspondence re: Plaintiffs' Second Motion to Compel [94-05] (Webster, James)
December 11, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 103 Paperless ORDER granting #102 Motion to Amend/Correct. Signed by Judge J. Frederick Motz on 12/11/2014. (Motz, J.)
December 11, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 102 Joint MOTION to Amend/Correct #65 Scheduling Order (Stipulated) by David R Burt, Janet H Burt, Texas Addison Limited Partnership, Texas Barrington LLC Responses due by 1/5/2015 (Webster, James)
November 20, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 101 Correspondence re: Plaintiffs' Second Motion to Compel [94-05] (Webster, James)
November 17, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 100 PAPERLESS ORDER granting #96 Motion to Seal. Signed by Judge J. Frederick Motz on 11/17/2014 (cags, Deputy Clerk)
November 14, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 99 PAPERLESS ORDER granting #98 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Michael N Mulvania. Directing attorney Michael N Mulvania to register online for CM/ECF at https://www.mdd.uscourts.gov/attyregB/inputProHac.asp. Signed by Clerk on 11/14/2014. (decs, Deputy Clerk)
November 13, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 98 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Michael N. Mulvania ( Filing fee $ 50, receipt number 0416-5066871.) by David R Burt, Janet H Burt, Texas Addison Limited Partnership, Texas Barrington LLC (Webster, James)
November 13, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 97 Request for Conference (Manofsky, Catherine)
November 11, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 96 MOTION to Seal Documents Related to Plaintiffs' Second MTC by David R Burt, Janet H Burt, Texas Addison Limited Partnership, Texas Barrington LLC Responses due by 12/1/2014 (Webster, James)
November 11, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 95 -SEALED - NOTICE of Filing Under Seal Memorandum ISO Plaintiffs' Second MTC; Exhibits 2, 3, and 5 thereto; and Reply ISO Plaintiffs' Second MTC by David R Burt, Janet H Burt, Texas Addison Limited Partnership, Texas Barrington LLC re #94 Local Rule,,,, (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 2 to Memo ISO Plaintiffs' Second MTC, #2 Exhibit 3 to Memo ISO Plaintiffs' Second MTC, #3 Exhibit 5 to Memo ISO Plaintiffs' Second MTC, #4 Reply ISO Plaintiffs' Second MTC)(Webster, James)
November 11, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 94 Local Rule 104.7 Certificate. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A to 104.7 Certification, #2 Exhibit B to 104.7 Certification, #3 Exhibit C to 104.7 Certification, #4 Exhibit D to 104.7 Certification, #5 Plaintiffs' Second Motion to Compel, #6 Memorandum ISO Second MTC (Redacted), #7 Exhibit 1 to Memo ISO Second MTC, #8 Exhibit 2 to Memo ISO Second MTC (Under Seal), #9 Exhibit 3 to Memo ISO Second MTC (Under Seal), #10 Exhibit 4 to Memo ISO Second MTC, #11 Exhibit 5 to Memo ISO Second MTC (Under Seal), #12 O&D Defendants' Opposition to Plaintiffs' Second MTC, #13 Exhibit A to O&D Dfts' Opposition to Plfs' Second MTC (Redacted), #14 Exhibit B to O&D Dfts' Opposition to Plfs' Second MTC, #15 SH Defendants' Opposition to Plaintiffs' Second MTC, #16 Exhibit A to SH Dfts' Opposition to Plfs' Second MTC, #17 Reply ISO Plaintiffs' Second MTC (Redacted), #18 Exhibit 6 to Reply ISO Plaintiffs' Second MTC, #19 Exhibit 7 to Reply ISO Plaintiffs' Second MTC, #20 Exhibit 8 to Reply ISO Plaintiffs' Second MTC, #21 Exhibit 9 to Reply ISO Plaintiffs' Second MTC)(Webster, James)
October 15, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 93 Paperless ORDER granting re #90 Request for Extension of Time to File filed by Wolfgang Maasberg, William T Comfort, III, A. Richard Blair, Richard McDonald, James Urry. Signed by Judge J. Frederick Motz on 10/15/14. (Motz, J.)
September 25, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 92 PAPERLESS ORDER CONFIRMING that, as requested, the settlement conference set for November 3, 2014 has been CANCELLED. Counsel are to contact chambers when the parties are ready to reschedule. Signed by Magistrate Judge Stephanie A Gallagher on 9/25/14. (vals, Chambers)
September 25, 2014 Opinion or Order Telephone Settlement Conference held on 9/25/2014 before Magistrate Judge Stephanie A Gallagher. (dass, Deputy Clerk)
September 24, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 91 Correspondence re: Letter to Magistrate Judge Gallagher Regarding November 3, 2014 Settlement Conference (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Webster, James)
September 23, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 90 REQUEST for Extension of Time to File Discovery (Genth, Geoffrey)
September 9, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 89 ORDER denying Plaintiff's #77 Motion to Compel; extending discovery deadline. Signed by Judge J. Frederick Motz on 9/9/14. (dass, Deputy Clerk)
September 9, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 88 MEMORANDUM OPINION. Signed by Judge J. Frederick Motz on 9/9/14. (dass, Deputy Clerk)
September 5, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 87 NOTICE of Appearance by Joshua Branson on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Branson, Joshua)
August 11, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 86 REPLY to Response to Motion re #77 MOTION to Compel Discovery Responses filed by David R Burt, Janet H Burt, Texas Addison Limited Partnership, Texas Barrington LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 10, #2 Exhibit 11)(Webster, James)
July 28, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 85 RESPONSE in Opposition re #77 MOTION to Compel Discovery Responses filed by Stuyvesant Pierpont Comfort, William T Comfort, III, LDN Stuyvie Partnersip, Meudon Investments Partnership. Replies due by 8/14/2014. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Declaration of Michael J. Schrier)(Schrier, Michael)
July 28, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 84 RESPONSE in Opposition re #77 MOTION to Compel Discovery Responses filed by A. Richard Blair, William T Comfort, III, Wolfgang Maasberg, Richard McDonald, James Urry. Replies due by 8/14/2014. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit)(Genth, Geoffrey)
July 18, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 83 NOTICE by David R Burt, Janet H Burt of Withdrawal of Counsel of William J. Rinner (Webster, James)
July 14, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 82 ANSWER to #74 Amended Complaint, by Stuyvesant Pierpont Comfort, William T Comfort, Jr, LDN Stuyvie Partnersip, Meudon Investments Partnership.(Schrier, Michael)
July 14, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 81 O&D Defendants' ANSWER to #74 Amended Complaint, Second, and, COUNTERCLAIM against David R Burt, Janet H Burt by James Urry, William T Comfort, Jr, Wolfgang Maasberg, Richard McDonald, A. Richard Blair. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Manofsky, Catherine)
July 11, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 80 PAPERLESS ORDER granting #79 Motion to Seal Memorandum in Support of Plaintiffs' Motion to Compel and Exhibit 8 thereto. Signed by Judge J. Frederick Motz on 7/11/14. (dass, Deputy Clerk)
July 10, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 79 MOTION to Seal Memorandum in Support of Plaintiffs' Motion to Compel and Exhibit 8 thereto by David R Burt, Janet H Burt, Texas Addison Limited Partnership, Texas Barrington LLC Responses due by 7/28/2014 (Webster, James)
July 10, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 78 -SEALED - NOTICE of Filing Under Seal Unredacted Memorandum in Support of Plaintiffs' Motion to Compel and Exhibit 8 thereto by David R Burt, Janet H Burt, Texas Addison Limited Partnership, Texas Barrington LLC re #77 MOTION to Compel Discovery Responses (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 8)(Webster, James)
July 10, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 77 MOTION to Compel Discovery Responses by David R Burt, Janet H Burt, Texas Addison Limited Partnership, Texas Barrington LLC Responses due by 7/28/2014 (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support (Redacted), #2 Exhibit 1, #3 Exhibit 2, #4 Exhibit 3, #5 Exhibit 4, #6 Exhibit 5, #7 Exhibit 6, #8 Exhibit 7, #9 Exhibit 8 (Under Seal), #10 Exhibit 9, #11 Affidavit of James M. Webster, III, #12 Rule 104.7 Certification, #13 Text of Proposed Order)(Webster, James)
June 25, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 76 STIPULATION re #74 Amended Complaint, Joint Stipulation for Extension of Time by A. Richard Blair, William T Comfort, III, Wolfgang Maasberg, Richard McDonald, James Urry. (Genth, Geoffrey)
June 17, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 75 STIPULATED CONFIDENTIALITY Order of Discovery Material filed by A. Richard Blair, Stuyvesant Pierpont Comfort, William T Comfort, Jr, William T Comfort, III, LDN Stuyvie Partnersip, Wolfgang Maasberg, Richard McDonald, Meudon Investments Partnership, James Urry. Signed by Judge J. Frederick Motz on 6/17/14. (dass, Deputy Clerk)
June 17, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 74 (SECOND) AMENDED COMPLAINT against A. Richard Blair, Stuyvesant Pierpont Comfort, William T Comfort, Jr, William T Comfort, III, Hidden Comfort Entities 1 through 5, LDN Stuyvie Partnersip, Wolfgang Maasberg, Richard McDonald, Meudon Investments Partnership, James Urry, filed by Janet H Burt, David R Burt, Texas Barrington LLC, Texas Addison Limited Partnership.(dass, Deputy Clerk) (ORIGINALLY APPROVED FOR FILING BY PAPERLESS ORDER ON 6/16/14)
June 17, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 73 PAPERLESS ORDER granting #72 Directing attorney to register online for CM/ECF at https://www.mdd.uscourts.gov/attyregB/inputProHac.asp. Signed by Clerk on 6/17/2014. (mrs, Deputy Clerk)
June 17, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 72 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice for W. Joss Nichols ( Filing fee $ 50, receipt number 0416-4805440.) by David R Burt, Janet H Burt (Webster, James)
June 16, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 71 Paperless ORDER granting #70 Motion for Leave to File. Signed by Judge J. Frederick Motz on 6/16/14. (Motz, J.)
June 13, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 70 Consent MOTION for Leave to File Second Amended Complaint by David R Burt, Janet H Burt Responses due by 6/30/2014 (Attachments: #1 [Proposed] Second Amended Complaint, #2 Redline of [Proposed] Second Amended Complaint)(Webster, James)
June 13, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 69 AMENDED ANSWER to #33 Amended Complaint, by Stuyvesant Pierpont Comfort, William T Comfort, Jr, LDN Stuyvie Partnersip, Meudon Investments Partnership. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Answer Comparison)(Schrier, Michael)
June 13, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 68 AMENDED ANSWER to #33 Amended Complaint, by A. Richard Blair, William T Comfort, III, Wolfgang Maasberg, Richard McDonald, James Urry. (Attachments: #1 Amended Answer - redline version, #2 Exhibit)(Manofsky, Catherine)
June 10, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 67 STIPULATION Order Regarding Confidentiality of Discovery Material and Inadvertent Disclosure of Privileged Materials by A. Richard Blair, Stuyvesant Pierpont Comfort, William T Comfort, Jr, William T Comfort, III, LDN Stuyvie Partnersip, Wolfgang Maasberg, Richard McDonald, Meudon Investments Partnership, James Urry. (Manofsky, Catherine)
June 5, 2014 Opinion or Order Case reassigned to Judge J. Frederick Motz. Judge Ellen L. Hollander no longer assigned to the case. (cags, Deputy Clerk)
May 21, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 66 ORDER Scheduling Settlement Conference. Signed by Magistrate Judge Stephanie A Gallagher on 5/21/14. (jnls, Deputy Clerk)
May 20, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 65 SCHEDULING ORDER: Status Report due by 11/24/2014. Signed by Judge Ellen L. Hollander on 5/20/14. (Attachments: #1 Standing Memorandum to Counsel)(mps, Deputy Clerk)
May 20, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 64 ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Stephanie A Gallagher for Settlement. Signed by Judge Ellen L. Hollander on 5/20/14 (cags, Deputy Clerk)
May 19, 2014 Opinion or Order Telephone Status Conference held on 5/19/2014 before Judge Ellen L. Hollander. (mps, Deputy Clerk)
May 1, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 63 PAPERLESS ORDER. The telephone conference scheduled for May 13, 2014 has been rescheduled to May 19, 2014 at 5:15 p.m. Plaintiff's counsel is to initiate the call to defense counsel and then to chambers. Signed by Judge Ellen L. Hollander on May 1, 2014. (kw, Chambers)
May 1, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 62 NOTICE of Change of Address by Brian W Stolarz (Stolarz, Brian)
April 29, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 61 ORDER setting telephone scheduling conference and attached Draft Scheduling Order. Signed by Judge Ellen L. Hollander on 4/29/14. (dass, Deputy Clerk)
April 25, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 60 ANSWER to #58 Answer to Amended Complaint, Counterclaim,, by David R Burt, Janet H Burt.(Webster, James)
April 18, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 59 ANSWER to #33 Amended Complaint, by Stuyvesant Pierpont Comfort, William T Comfort, Jr, LDN Stuyvie Partnersip, Meudon Investments Partnership.(Schrier, Michael)
April 18, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 58 O&D Defendants' ANSWER to #33 Amended Complaint, and, COUNTERCLAIM against David R Burt, Janet H Burt by James Urry, Wolfgang Maasberg, William T Comfort, III, Richard McDonald, A. Richard Blair. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Manofsky, Catherine)
April 9, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 57 MARGINAL ORDER granting #56 STIPULATION for Extension of Time to Answer #33 Amended Complaint; A. Richard Blair answer due 4/18/2014; Stuyvesant Pierpont Comfort answer due 4/18/2014; William T Comfort, Jr answer due 4/18/2014; William T Comfort, III answer due 4/18/2014; LDN Stuyvie Partnersip answer due 4/18/2014; Wolfgang Maasberg answer due 4/18/2014; Richard McDonald answer due 4/18/2014; Meudon Investments Partnership answer due 4/18/2014; James Urry answer due 4/18/2014. Signed by Judge Ellen L. Hollander on 4/8/14. (dass, Deputy Clerk)
April 8, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 56 Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #33 Amended Complaint, by A. Richard Blair, William T Comfort, III, Wolfgang Maasberg, Richard McDonald, James Urry Responses due by 4/25/2014 (Manofsky, Catherine)
March 28, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 55 ORDER granting in part and denying in part #36 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim; granting in part and denying in part #37 Motion to Dismiss. Signed by Judge Ellen L. Hollander on 3/28/14 (cags, Deputy Clerk)
March 28, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 54 MEMORANDUM OPINION Signed by Judge Ellen L. Hollander on 3/28/14. (cags, Deputy Clerk)
December 17, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 53 ORDER granting #52 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney W Joss Nichols terminated. Signed by Judge Ellen L. Hollander on 12/17/13. (dass, Deputy Clerk)
December 16, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 52 MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney W. Joss Nichols by David R Burt, Janet H Burt Responses due by 1/2/2014 (Webster, James)
August 19, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 51 REPLY to Response to Motion re #37 MOTION to Dismiss - Motion of Defendants Wolfgang Maasberg, Richard McDonald, A. Richard Blair, William T. Comfort, III, and James Urry to Dismiss Plaintiffs' Amended Complaint Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12(b)(6) and 12(b)(2) and 15 U.S filed by A. Richard Blair, William T Comfort, III, Wolfgang Maasberg, Richard McDonald, James Urry. (Genth, Geoffrey)
August 19, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 50 QC NOTICE: #49 Response in Support of Motion filed by Wolfgang Maasberg, William T Comfort, III, A. Richard Blair, Richard McDonald, James Urry was filed using the incorrect event. **Please refile document using the "Reply Response to Motion". The document has been marked FILED IN ERROR and its link disabled. (hmls, Deputy Clerk)
August 15, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 49 (FILED IN ERROR - INCORRECT EVENT) RESPONSE in Support re #37 MOTION to Dismiss - Motion of Defendants Wolfgang Maasberg, Richard McDonald, A. Richard Blair, William T. Comfort, III, and James Urry to Dismiss Plaintiffs' Amended Complaint Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12(b)(6) and 12(b)(2) and 15 U.S -- The O&D Defendants' Reply Memorandum in Support of Motion to Dismiss Plaintiffs' Amended Complaint Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12(b)(6) and 12(b)(2) and 15 U.S.C. 78u-4(b)(3)(A) filed by A. Richard Blair, William T Comfort, III, Wolfgang Maasberg, Richard McDonald, James Urry. Replies due by 9/3/2013. (Genth, Geoffrey) Modified on 8/19/2013 (hmls, Deputy Clerk).
August 15, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 48 REPLY to Response to Motion re #36 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claimand Lack of Personal Jurisdiction filed by Stuyvesant Pierpont Comfort, William T Comfort, Jr, LDN Stuyvie Partnersip, Meudon Investments Partnership. (Schrier, Michael)
July 24, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 47 MARGINAL ORDER approving #46 Stipulation of extension of time deadline for filing reply memoranda in further support of their motions to dismiss amended complaint filed by Wolfgang Maasberg, William T Comfort, III, A. Richard Blair, Richard McDonald, James Urry. Signed by Judge Ellen L. Hollander on 7/24/13. (dass, Deputy Clerk)
July 23, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 46 STIPULATION re #37 MOTION to Dismiss - Motion of Defendants Wolfgang Maasberg, Richard McDonald, A. Richard Blair, William T. Comfort, III, and James Urry to Dismiss Plaintiffs' Amended Complaint Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12(b)(6) and 12(b)(2) and 15 U.S Stipulation of Extension of Time by A. Richard Blair, William T Comfort, III, Wolfgang Maasberg, Richard McDonald, James Urry. (Genth, Geoffrey)
July 15, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 45 RESPONSE in Opposition re #37 MOTION to Dismiss - Motion of Defendants Wolfgang Maasberg, Richard McDonald, A. Richard Blair, William T. Comfort, III, and James Urry to Dismiss Plaintiffs' Amended Complaint Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12(b)(6) and 12(b)(2) and 15 U.S, #36 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claimand Lack of Personal Jurisdiction filed by David R Burt, Janet H Burt. Replies due by 8/1/2013. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A)(Webster, James)
July 11, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 44 PAPERLESS ORDER granting #42 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of W Joss Nichols for David R Burt, W Joss Nichols for Janet H Burt. Directing attorney W Joss Nichols to register online for CM/ECF at https://www.mdd.uscourts.gov/attyregB/inputProHac.asp. Signed by Clerk on 7/11/2013. (jbp, Deputy Clerk)
July 11, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 43 PAPERLESS ORDER granting #41 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of William J Rinner for David R Burt,William J Rinner for Janet H Burt. Directing attorney William J Rinner to register online for CM/ECF at https://www.mdd.uscourts.gov/attyregB/inputProHac.asp. Signed by Clerk on 7/11/2013. (jbp, Deputy Clerk)
July 9, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 42 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice for W. Joss Nichols ( Filing fee $ 50, receipt number 0416-4206087.) by David R Burt, Janet H Burt (Webster, James)
July 9, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 41 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice for William J. Rinner ( Filing fee $ 50, receipt number 0416-4206037.) by David R Burt, Janet H Burt (Webster, James)
June 11, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 40 MARGINAL ORDER granting Plainitiffs' #39 Motion for Extension of Time to File Opposition to Defendants' Motions to Dismiss; granting Plaintiffs' #39 Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages for Single Consolidated Opposition Memorandum. Signed by Judge Ellen L. Hollander on 6/10/13. (dass, Deputy Clerk)
June 10, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 39 Corrected MOTION for Extension of Time to File Opposition to Defendants' Motions to Dismiss, MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages for Single Consolidated Opposition Memorandum by David R Burt, Janet H Burt Responses due by 6/27/2013 (Webster, James)
June 10, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 38 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Opposition to Defendants' Motions to Dismiss, MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages for Single Consolidated Opposition Memorandum by David R Burt, Janet H Burt Responses due by 6/27/2013 (Webster, James)
June 6, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 37 MOTION to Dismiss - Motion of Defendants Wolfgang Maasberg, Richard McDonald, A. Richard Blair, William T. Comfort, III, and James Urry to Dismiss Plaintiffs' Amended Complaint Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12(b)(6) and 12(b)(2) and 15 U.S.C. 78u-4(b)(3)(A) by A. Richard Blair, William T Comfort, III, Wolfgang Maasberg, Richard McDonald, James Urry Responses due by 6/24/2013 (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support, #2 Index of Exhibits, #3 Exhibit A, #4 Exhibit B, #5 Exhibit C, #6 Exhibit D, #7 Exhibit E, #8 Exhibit F, #9 Exhibit G, #10 Exhibit H, #11 Exhibit I, #12 Exhibit J)(Genth, Geoffrey)
June 6, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 36 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claimand Lack of Personal Jurisdiction by Stuyvesant Pierpont Comfort, William T Comfort, Jr, LDN Stuyvie Partnersip, Meudon Investments Partnership Responses due by 6/24/2013 (Attachments: #1 Memorandum of Points and Authorities, #2 Exhibit 4, #3 Exhibit 5, #4 Exhibit 6, #5 Exhibit 7, #6 Exhibit 8, #7 Exhibit 9, #8 Exhibit 10, #9 Exhibit 11, #10 Exhibit 12, #11 Exhibit 13, #12 Exhibit 14, #13 Exhibit 15, #14 Exhibit 18, #15 Exhibit 19, #16 Exhibit 20, #17 Exhibit 21)(Schrier, Michael)
May 17, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 35 MARGINAL ORDER Granting #34 Stipulation for extension of time for defendants to respond to plaintiff's amended complaint. Signed by Judge Ellen L. Hollander on 5/17/13. (cags, Deputy Clerk)
May 16, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 34 STIPULATION re #33 Amended Complaint, Stipulation of Extension of Time by A. Richard Blair, William T Comfort, III, Wolfgang Maasberg, Richard McDonald, James Urry. (Genth, Geoffrey)
May 6, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 33 AMENDED COMPLAINT against A. Richard Blair, Stuyvesant Pierpont Comfort, William T Comfort, Jr, William T Comfort, III, LDN Stuyvie Partnersip, Wolfgang Maasberg, Richard McDonald, Meudon Investments Partnership, James Urry, filed by Janet H Burt, David R Burt. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 19, #2 Exhibit 20, #3 Exhibit 21, #4 Exhibit 22, #5 Exhibit 23, #6 Exhibit 24, #7 Complaint Comparison)(Webster, James)
April 17, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 32 MARGINAL ORDER granting #31 Motion for Extension of Time to Amend Pleading. Signed by Judge Ellen L. Hollander on 4/17/13. (dass, Deputy Clerk)
April 17, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 31 MOTION for Extension of Time to Amend By Two Weeks by David R Burt, Janet H Burt Responses due by 5/6/2013 (Webster, James)
March 31, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 30 ORDER granting #13 Motion to Dismiss; granting #14 Motion to Dismiss; Plaintiff shall have 21 days from the date of this order to file an amended complaint. Signed by Judge Ellen L. Hollander on 3/31/13 (cags, Deputy Clerk)
March 31, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 29 MEMORANDUM OPINION Signed by Judge Ellen L. Hollander on 3/31/13. (cags, Deputy Clerk)
March 7, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 28 MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney Michael J. Fischer by David R Burt, Janet H Burt Responses due by 3/25/2013 (Fischer, Michael)
December 21, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 27 REPLY to Response to Motion re #14 MOTION to Dismiss Motion of Defendants Wolfgang Maasberg, Richard McDonald, A. Richard Blair, William T. Comfort, III, and James Urry in Support of Motion to Dismiss Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12(b)(6) and 12(b)(2) and 15 U.S.C. 78u-4 filed by A. Richard Blair, William T Comfort, III, Wolfgang Maasberg, Richard McDonald, James Urry. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit L, #2 Exhibit M)(Genth, Geoffrey)
December 20, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 26 REPLY to Response to Motion re #13 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction filed by Stuyvesant Pierpont Comfort, William T Comfort, Jr, LDN Stuyvie Partnersip, Meudon Investments Partnership. (Schrier, Michael)
December 11, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 25 ORDER granting #24 Motion for Extension of Time to File Replies to #14 MOTION to Dismiss Motion of Defendants Wolfgang Maasberg, Richard McDonald, A. Richard Blair, William T. Comfort, III, and James Urry in Support of Motion to Dismiss Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12(b)(6) and 12(b)(2) and 15 U.S.C. 78u-4, and to #13 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction; Replies due by 12/21/2012. Signed by Judge Ellen L. Hollander on 12/11/12. (dass, Deputy Clerk)
December 11, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 24 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #21 Response in Opposition to Motion, by A. Richard Blair, William T Comfort, III, Wolfgang Maasberg, Richard McDonald, James Urry. Responses due by 1/2/2013 (Genth, Geoffrey)
November 21, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 23 PAPERLESS ORDER granting #22 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice for attorney Michael J Fischer on behalf of David R. Burt and Janet H. Burt. Directing attorney Michael J Fischer to register on-line for CM/ECF at https://www.mdd.uscourts.gov/attyregB/inputProHac.asp. Signed by Clerk on 11/21/12. (cmns, Deputy Clerk)
November 20, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 22 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Michael J. Fischer ( Filing fee $ 50, receipt number 0416-3802692.) by David R Burt, Janet H Burt (Webster, James)
November 13, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 21 RESPONSE in Opposition re #14 MOTION to Dismiss Motion of Defendants Wolfgang Maasberg, Richard McDonald, A. Richard Blair, William T. Comfort, III, and James Urry in Support of Motion to Dismiss Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12(b)(6) and 12(b)(2) and 15 U.S.C. 78u-4, #13 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction filed by David R Burt, Janet H Burt. Replies due by 11/30/2012. (Webster, James)
November 13, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 20 NOTICE of Appearance by James M Webster, III on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Webster, James)
September 19, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 19 MARGINAL ORDER approving #18 Stipulation Regarding Plaintiffs' Opposition to Defendants' Motion to Dismiss, Defendants' Reply to Opposition and Page Limits, filed by William T Comfort, Jr, Meudon Investments Partnership, LDN Stuyvie Partnersip, Stuyvesant Pierpont Comfort. Signed by Judge Ellen L. Hollander on 9/19/12. (dass, Deputy Clerk)
September 18, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 18 STIPULATION Regarding Plaintiffs' Opposition to Defendants' Motion to Dismiss, Defendants' Reply to Opposition and Page Limits by Stuyvesant Pierpont Comfort, William T Comfort, Jr, LDN Stuyvie Partnersip, Meudon Investments Partnership. (Stolarz, Brian)
August 29, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 17 Rule 12/56 letter mailed to Plaintiffs 9/4/12. (das, Deputy Clerk)
August 29, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 16 (FILED IN ERROR- name misspelled) Rule 12/56 letter mailed to Plaintiffs on 9/4/12. (das, Deputy Clerk) Modified on 8/29/2012 (das, Deputy Clerk).
August 28, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 14 MOTION to Dismiss Motion of Defendants Wolfgang Maasberg, Richard McDonald, A. Richard Blair, William T. Comfort, III, and James Urry in Support of Motion to Dismiss Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12(b)(6) and 12(b)(2) and 15 U.S.C. 78u-4(b)(3)(A) by A. Richard Blair, William T Comfort, III, Wolfgang Maasberg, Richard McDonald, James Urry Responses due by 9/14/2012 (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit C, #5 Exhibit D, #6 Exhibit E, #7 Exhibit F, #8 Exhibit G, #9 Exhibit H, #10 Exhibit I, #11 Exhibit J, #12 Exhibit K)(Genth, Geoffrey)
August 28, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 13 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim, MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction by Stuyvesant Pierpont Comfort, William T Comfort, Jr, LDN Stuyvie Partnersip, Meudon Investments Partnership Responses due by 9/14/2012 (Attachments: #1 Memorandum Of Points And Authorities, #2 Exhibit 1, #3 Exhibit 2, #4 Exhibit 3, #5 Exhibit 4, #6 Exhibit 5, #7 Exhibit 6, #8 Exhibit 7, #9 Exhibit 8, #10 Exhibit 9, #11 Exhibit 10, #12 Exhibit 11, #13 Exhibit 12, #14 Exhibit 13, #15 Exhibit 14, #16 Exhibit 15, #17 Exhibit 16, #18 Exhibit 17)(Schrier, Michael)
August 27, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 15 MARGINAL ORDER granting #12 Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages. Signed by Judge Ellen L. Hollander on 8/27/12. (dass, Deputy Clerk)
August 27, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 12 Consent MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages by Stuyvesant Pierpont Comfort, William T Comfort, Jr, LDN Stuyvie Partnersip, Meudon Investments Partnership Responses due by 9/13/2012 (Schrier, Michael)
August 13, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER granting #10 Motion for Extension of Time for all Defendants to Answer A. Richard Blair answer due 8/28/2012; Stuyvesant Pierpont Comfort answer due 8/28/2012; William T Comfort, Jr answer due 8/28/2012; William T Comfort, III answer due 8/28/2012; Hidden Comfort Entities 1 through 5 answer due 8/28/2012; LDN Stuyvie Partnersip answer due 8/28/2012. Signed by Judge Ellen L. Hollander on 8/13/12. (dass, Deputy Clerk)
August 13, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 10 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint, Consent Motion for Extension of Time for All Defendants to Respond to Complaint by A. Richard Blair, William T Comfort, III, Wolfgang Maasberg, Richard McDonald, James Urry Responses due by 8/30/2012 (Genth, Geoffrey)
June 20, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 9 Local Rule 103.3 Disclosure Statement by LDN Stuyvie Partnersip, Meudon Investments Partnership. (Stolarz, Brian)
June 20, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 8 NOTICE of Appearance by Brian W Stolarz on behalf of Stuyvesant Pierpont Comfort, William T Comfort, Jr, LDN Stuyvie Partnersip, Meudon Investments Partnership (Stolarz, Brian)
June 13, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER approving #6 Stipulation Regarding Service of Process and Consolidated Date for All Defendants to Respond to Complaint filed by Wolfgang Maasberg, William T Comfort, III, A. Richard Blair, Richard McDonald, James Urry. Signed by Judge Ellen L. Hollander on 6/13/12. (dass, Deputy Clerk)
June 13, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 6 STIPULATION Regarding Service of Process and Consolidated Date for All Defendants to Respond to Complaint by A. Richard Blair, William T Comfort, III, Wolfgang Maasberg, Richard McDonald, James Urry. (Genth, Geoffrey)
February 22, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 5 Summons Issued 21 days as to A. Richard Blair, Stuyvesant Pierpont Comfort, William T Comfort, Jr, William T Comfort, III, LDN Stuyvie Partnersip, Wolfgang Maasberg, Richard McDonald, Meudon Investments Partnership, James Urry. (dass, Deputy Clerk)
February 22, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER directing pro se plaintiff to serve summons. Signed by Judge Ellen L. Hollander on 2/22/12. (dass, Deputy Clerk) (c/m 2/22/12-das)
February 21, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 3 (FILED IN ERROR- must have order of court directing issuance in pro se cases) Summons Issued 21 days as to A. Richard Blair, Stuyvesant Pierpont Comfort, William T Comfort, Jr, William T Comfort, III, LDN Stuyvie Partnersip, Wolfgang Maasberg, Richard McDonald, Meudon Investments Partnership, James Urry. (dass, Deputy Clerk) Modified on 2/21/2012 (dass, Deputy Clerk).
February 14, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 2 Local Rule 103.3 Disclosure Statement by David R Burt, Janet H Burt. (dass, Deputy Clerk)
February 14, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 1 COMPLAINT against A. Richard Blair, Stuyvesant Pierpont Comfort, William T Comfort, Jr, William T Comfort, III, Hidden Comfort Entities 1 through 5, LDN Stuyvie Partnersip, Wolfgang Maasberg, Richard McDonald, Meudon Investments Partnership, James Urry (Filing fee paid 2/14/12 $ 350.00, Reciept # 14637057379), filed by Janet H Burt, David R Burt. (Attachments: #1 civil cover sheet, #2 Exhibit 1 - 15)(dass, Deputy Clerk) (EXHIBITS 1-15 FILED SEPARATELY IN PAPER FORMAT ONLY)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Maryland District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Burt et al v. Maasberg et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: William T Comfort, Jr
Represented By: Brian W Stolarz
Represented By: Michael Jay Schrier
Represented By: Geoffrey H Genth
Represented By: James P Ulwick
Represented By: Catherine Mary Manofsky
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: William T Comfort, III
Represented By: Catherine Mary Manofsky
Represented By: Geoffrey H Genth
Represented By: James P Ulwick
Represented By: Michael Jay Schrier
Represented By: William Jacob Harrington
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wolfgang Maasberg
Represented By: Catherine Mary Manofsky
Represented By: Geoffrey H Genth
Represented By: James P Ulwick
Represented By: Michael Jay Schrier
Represented By: William Jacob Harrington
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Richard McDonald
Represented By: Catherine Mary Manofsky
Represented By: Geoffrey H Genth
Represented By: James P Ulwick
Represented By: Michael Jay Schrier
Represented By: William Jacob Harrington
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: A. Richard Blair
Represented By: Catherine Mary Manofsky
Represented By: Geoffrey H Genth
Represented By: James P Ulwick
Represented By: Michael Jay Schrier
Represented By: William Jacob Harrington
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bill
Represented By: Brian W Stolarz
Represented By: Michael Jay Schrier
Represented By: Geoffrey H Genth
Represented By: James P Ulwick
Represented By: Catherine Mary Manofsky
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ty
Represented By: Catherine Mary Manofsky
Represented By: Geoffrey H Genth
Represented By: James P Ulwick
Represented By: Michael Jay Schrier
Represented By: William Jacob Harrington
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Stuyvesant Pierpont Comfort
Represented By: Brian W Stolarz
Represented By: Michael Jay Schrier
Represented By: Catherine Mary Manofsky
Represented By: Geoffrey H Genth
Represented By: James P Ulwick
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: James Urry
Represented By: Catherine Mary Manofsky
Represented By: Geoffrey H Genth
Represented By: James P Ulwick
Represented By: Michael Jay Schrier
Represented By: William Jacob Harrington
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: LDN Stuyvie Partnersip
Represented By: Brian W Stolarz
Represented By: Michael Jay Schrier
Represented By: Catherine Mary Manofsky
Represented By: Geoffrey H Genth
Represented By: James P Ulwick
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Meudon Investments Partnership
Represented By: Brian W Stolarz
Represented By: Michael Jay Schrier
Represented By: Catherine Mary Manofsky
Represented By: Geoffrey H Genth
Represented By: James P Ulwick
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hidden Comfort Entities 1 through 5
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: David R Burt
Represented By: William J Rinner
Represented By: James M Webster, III
Represented By: Jeremy S Newman
Represented By: Joshua Branson
Represented By: Michael J Fischer
Represented By: Michael N Mulvania
Represented By: Thomas W Traxler, Jr
Represented By: William Joss Nichols
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Janet H Burt
Represented By: William J Rinner
Represented By: James M Webster, III
Represented By: Jeremy S Newman
Represented By: Joshua Branson
Represented By: Michael J Fischer
Represented By: Michael N Mulvania
Represented By: Thomas W Traxler, Jr
Represented By: William Joss Nichols
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Texas Barrington LLC
Represented By: William J Rinner
Represented By: James M Webster, III
Represented By: Jeremy S Newman
Represented By: Joshua Branson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Texas Addison Limited Partnership
Represented By: William J Rinner
Represented By: James M Webster, III
Represented By: Jeremy S Newman
Represented By: Joshua Branson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?