Harrison v. O'Malley et al

Plaintiff: Mary M. Harris
Defendant: Hon. Governor Martin O'Malley, Lee Robinson, Cheryl A. Lotz and Daniel Smith
Case Number: 1:2013cv02579
Filed: September 5, 2013
Court: Maryland District Court
Office: Baltimore Office
County: Baltimore City
Presiding Judge: William D Quarles
Nature of Suit: Americans with Disabilities - Employment
Cause of Action: 29:2601
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
February 29, 2016 68 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM. Signed by Judge J. Frederick Motz on 2/29/2016. (ca2s, Deputy Clerk)
February 5, 2016 63 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 49 Motion for Leave to File Amended Complaint. Signed by Judge J. Frederick Motz on 2/5/2016. (ca2s, Deputy Clerk)
March 4, 2015 24 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM OPINION. Signed by Judge William D Quarles, Jr on 3/4/2015. (c/m 3/4/2015 ca2s, Deputy Clerk)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Maryland District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Harrison v. O'Malley et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mary M. Harris
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hon. Governor Martin O'Malley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lee Robinson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cheryl A. Lotz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Daniel Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?