Davis et al v. Martin et al
Plaintiff: David Davis and Maribeth Donohue
Defendant: Randall Martin, Theresa Martin, Lifeline, Inc., Lifeline, L.L.C., Lifeline of Maryland/Virginia, Inc. Lifeline of Pennsylvania, Inc., Maryland State Treasurer's Office, Office of the Governor of Maryland, Board of Public Works, Maryland Department of Disabilities, Department of Health and Mental Hygiene, Department of Human Resources, Baltimore Social Services Department and STATE OF MARYLAND
Case Number: 1:2015cv01746
Filed: June 15, 2015
Court: US District Court for the District of Maryland
Office: Baltimore Office
County: 88888
Presiding Judge: J. Frederick Motz
Nature of Suit: Other Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Both

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
March 9, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 69 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER granting Lifeline's 65 Motion to Compel and extending discovery deadline. Signed by Judge J. Frederick Motz on 3/9/2016. (dass, Deputy Clerk)
December 1, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 63 MEMORANDUM OPINION. Signed by Judge J. Frederick Motz on 12/1/2015. (hmls, Deputy Clerk)
October 22, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 52 MEMORANDUM. Signed by Judge J. Frederick Motz on 10/22/2015. (hmls, Deputy Clerk)
August 7, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 44 ORDER denying as moot Maryland State Defendants' 22 Motion to Strike portions of the complaint; granting Maryland State Defendants' 23 Motion to Dismiss; granting Lifeline, Inc., Lifeline, L.L.C., Randall Martin, Theresa Martin' s 26 Motion to Dismiss counts III and IV of the complaint but Plaintiffs are granted leave to file an amended complaint; granting Lifeline, Inc., Lifeline, L.L.C., Randall Martin, Theresa Marti's 30 Motion for Leave to File; granting Lifeline, Inc., Lifeline, L.L.C., Randall Martin, Theresa Martin's 30 Amended Motion to Strike impertinent and prejudicial allegations of the complaint. Signed by Judge J. Frederick Motz on 8/7/2015. (dass, Deputy Clerk)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Maryland District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Davis et al v. Martin et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: David Davis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Maribeth Donohue
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Randall Martin
Represented By: Irwin Raphael Kramer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Theresa Martin
Represented By: Irwin Raphael Kramer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lifeline, Inc.
Represented By: Irwin Raphael Kramer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lifeline, L.L.C.
Represented By: Irwin Raphael Kramer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lifeline of Maryland/Virginia, Inc. Lifeline of Pennsylvania, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Maryland State Treasurer's Office
Represented By: Francesca Bridgette Gibbs
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Office of the Governor of Maryland
Represented By: Francesca Bridgette Gibbs
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Board of Public Works
Represented By: Francesca Bridgette Gibbs
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Maryland Department of Disabilities
Represented By: Francesca Bridgette Gibbs
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Department of Health and Mental Hygiene
Represented By: Francesca Bridgette Gibbs
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Department of Human Resources
Represented By: Francesca Bridgette Gibbs
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Baltimore Social Services Department
Represented By: Francesca Bridgette Gibbs
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: STATE OF MARYLAND
Represented By: Francesca Bridgette Gibbs
Represented By: Ann Marie Sheridan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?