Perez v. Silva et al
Plaintiff: Thomas E. Perez
Defendant: Ricardo Silva, Maryland Association of Correctional & Security Employees, Inc., Charles S. Ezrine, State Employee Benefits, Inc., Ameriguard Security Services, Inc., Maryland Association of Correctional & Security Employees Health & Welfare Plan and Maryland Association of Correctional & Security Employees Retirement Plan
Case Number: 1:2015cv03484
Filed: November 16, 2015
Court: US District Court for the District of Maryland
Office: Baltimore Office
County: Baltimore County
Presiding Judge: James K. Bredar
Nature of Suit: Employee Retirement Income Security Act of 1974
Cause of Action: 29:1001
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
February 8, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 139 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER Granting 129 Motion of AmeriGuard for Attorneys' Fees. Signed by Chief Judge James K. Bredar on 2/7/2019. (jnls, Deputy Clerk)
August 30, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 127 MEMORANDUM. Signed by Chief Judge James K. Bredar on 8/29/2018. (c/m 8/30/18 bas, Deputy Clerk)
February 26, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 117 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER GRANTS 96 Motion of Secretary of Labor to the extent it seeks judgment against Silva and HOLDS IN ABEYANCE the Secretarys motion to the extent it seeks judgment against AmeriGuard. Further, on or before March 16, 2018, the Secretary SHALL FILE a new proposed judgment form, only against Silva. Signed by Chief Judge James K. Bredar on 2/23/2018. (c/m 2/26/18 jnls, Deputy Clerk)
February 23, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 81 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER granting 53 Motion of AmeriGuard Security Services, Inc. for Leave to Amend to Include a Cross-Claim; granting in part and denying in part 78 Motion of plaintiff to Deem Admitted Plaintiffs Requests for Admissions. Signed by Judge James K. Bredar on 2/21/2017. (jnls, Deputy Clerk)
February 17, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 80 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER granting 71 Motion of plaintiff for Protective Order. Signed by Judge James K. Bredar on 2/16/2017. (jnls, Deputy Clerk)
May 9, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 42 MEMORANDUM. Signed by Judge James K. Bredar on 5/6/2016. (c/m 5/9/16 jnls, Deputy Clerk) Modified on 5/9/2016 (jnls, Deputy Clerk).
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Maryland District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Perez v. Silva et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Thomas E. Perez
Represented By: Jessica R Brown
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ricardo Silva
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Maryland Association of Correctional & Security Employees, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Charles S. Ezrine
Represented By: Shauna Marie Barnaskas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: State Employee Benefits, Inc.
Represented By: Shauna Marie Barnaskas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ameriguard Security Services, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Maryland Association of Correctional & Security Employees Health & Welfare Plan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Maryland Association of Correctional & Security Employees Retirement Plan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?