Silver v. Wells Fargo Bank, N.A. et al
Plaintiff: Jeffrey J. Silver
Defendant: Wells Fargo Bank, N.A. and PNC Bank, N.A.
Case Number: 1:2016cv00382
Filed: February 10, 2016
Court: US District Court for the District of Maryland
Office: Baltimore Office
County: Baltimore County
Presiding Judge: Marvin J. Garbis
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1441 Petition For Removal--Other Contract
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
August 23, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 66 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER granting 56 Wells Fargo Bank, N.A.'s Motion for Reconsideration; denying 57 PNC Bank, National Association's Motion for Reconsideration; vacating the Court's Order 53 as to Count III; and directing Counsel to provide a post settlement conference status report without revealing any settlement positions. Signed by Judge Marvin J. Garbis on 8/22/2017. (bmhs, Deputy Clerk)
June 30, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 53 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER granting in part and denying in part 40 Wells Fargo Bank, N.A.'s Motion to Dismiss Claims Asserted Against It in the Amended Complaint; and granting in part and denying in part 43 PNC Bank, National Association's Motion to Dismiss Plaintiff Jeffrey J. Silver's Amended Complaint. Signed by Judge Marvin J. Garbis on 6/30/2017. (bmhs, Deputy Clerk)
November 29, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 34 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER granting 17 18 Defendants' Motions to Dismiss. Signed by Judge Marvin J. Garbis on 11/29/2016. (bmhs, Deputy Clerk)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Maryland District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Silver v. Wells Fargo Bank, N.A. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jeffrey J. Silver
Represented By: David Alan Greenbaum
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wells Fargo Bank, N.A.
Represented By: James T Heidelbach
Represented By: Keith Michael Lusby
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: PNC Bank, N.A.
Represented By: Nathan John Bresee
Represented By: David H Cox
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?