Prusin v. Canton's Pearls, LLC et al
Plaintiff: Kristofer L Prusin
Defendant: Canton's Pearls, LLC and Eric K Hamilton
Case Number: 1:2016cv00605
Filed: March 2, 2016
Court: US District Court for the District of Maryland
Office: Baltimore Office
County: Baltimore City
Presiding Judge: James K. Bredar
Nature of Suit: Fair Labor Standards Act
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
August 31, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 159 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER granting Plainitff's 155 Motion for Reconsideration ; denying without prejudice Plaintiff's 109 Motion for Attorney Fees; denying as moot Plaintiff's 127 Motion to Strike ; denying as moot Defendants' 133 Motion for Leave to File Surreply to Plaintiff's Motion for Attorneys' Fees; denying as moot Plaintiff's 135 request for a hearing. Signed by Chief Judge James K. Bredar on 8/30/2018. (dass, Deputy Clerk)
May 9, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 139 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER denying as moot Plaintiff's 112 Motion for Judgment Debtor Exam; granting in part and denying in part Plaintiff's 115 Second Motion for Judgment Debtor Exam; directing Counsel to confer and propose additional dates to chambers by email; directing Plaintiffs counsel to submit a revised proposed order. Signed by Magistrate Judge Stephanie A Gallagher on 5/9/2018. (dass, Deputy Clerk)
January 30, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 103 MEMORANDUM. Signed by Chief Judge James K. Bredar on 1/29/2018. (dass, Deputy Clerk)
November 6, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 98 MEMORANDUM. Signed by Chief Judge James K. Bredar on 11/6/2017. (bas, Deputy Clerk)
September 29, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 89 MEMORANDUM. Signed by Judge James K. Bredar on 9/29/2017. (dass, Deputy Clerk)
August 15, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 82 MEMORANDUM OPINION. Signed by Magistrate Judge Stephanie A Gallagher on 8/15/2017. (dass, Deputy Clerk)
April 7, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 53 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER granting Plaintiff's 46 Motion to Obtain Payroll Records and Personal Identifying Information of a Former Employee. Signed by Magistrate Judge Stephanie A Gallagher on 4/7/2017. (dass, Deputy Clerk)
March 28, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 51 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER granting in part and denying in part Plaintiff's 45 Motion to Modify Discovery Order. Signed by Magistrate Judge Stephanie A Gallagher on 3/28/2017. (dass, Deputy Clerk)
January 11, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 35 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER denying Plaintiff's 22 Motion to Deem Admitted Unanswered Second Set of Request for Admissions. Signed by Magistrate Judge Stephanie A Gallagher on 1/11/2017. (dass, Deputy Clerk)
December 22, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 28 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER granting in part and denying in part 17 Motion for Protective Order and Motion to Modify Subpoeana. Signed by Magistrate Judge Stephanie A Gallagher on 12/22/2016. (dass, Deputy Clerk)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Maryland District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Prusin v. Canton's Pearls, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kristofer L Prusin
Represented By: Howard Benjamin Hoffman
Represented By: Bradford W Warbasse
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Canton's Pearls, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Eric K Hamilton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?