Rockman et al v. Union Carbide Corporation et al
Plaintiff: Jeffrey Rockman and Sonja Rockman
Defendant: Union Carbide Corporation, Kaiser Gypsum Company, Inc. and Georgia-Pacific, LLC
Cross_claimant: Georgia-Pacific, LLC and Union Carbide Corporation
Cross_defendant: Kaiser Gypsum Company, Inc., Union Carbide Corporation and Georgia-Pacific, LLC
Case Number: 1:2016cv01169
Filed: April 20, 2016
Court: US District Court for the District of Maryland
Office: Baltimore Office
County: Baltimore County
Presiding Judge: Richard D Bennett
Nature of Suit: Asbestos Personal Injury Product Liability
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Both

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
July 17, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 189 MEMORANDUM OPINION. Signed by Judge Richard D. Bennett on 7/17/2017. (kw2s, Deputy Clerk)
June 22, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 183 MEMORANDUM OPINION. Signed by Judge Richard D. Bennett on 6/22/2017. (hmls, Deputy Clerk)
April 25, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 114 MEMORANDUM ORDER granting 88 Stipulation of Dismissal filed by General Electric Company, 100 Stipulation of Dismissal filed by Pfizer Inc., 85 Stipulation of Dismissal filed by Crown, Cork and Seal Co., Inc., 102 Stipulation of Dism issal filed by Schneider Electric USA, Inc., 90 Stipulation of Dismissal filed by Greene, Tweed & Co., 83 Stipulation of Dismissal filed by CertainTeed Corporation, 105 Stipulation of Dismissal filed by International Paper Company, [ 99] Stipulation of Dismissal filed by Paramount Packing & Rubber, Inc., 98 Stipulation of Dismissal filed by Metropolitan Life Insurance Company, 92 Stipulation of Dismissal filed by International Paper Company, 86 Stipulation of Dism issal filed by E.L. Stebbing & Co., Inc., 96 Stipulation of Dismissal filed by Lloyd E. Mitchell, Inc., 93 Stipulation of Dismissal filed by J.H. France Refractories Co., 84 Stipulation of Dismissal filed by Cooper Industries, Inc., 103 Stipulation of Dismissal filed by The Wallace & Gale Asbestos Settlement Trust, 91 Stipulation of Dismissal filed by Hampshire Industries, Inc., 97 Stipulation of Dismissal filed by MCIC, Inc., 87 Stipulation of Dismissal filed by Foster Wheeler LLC, 82 Stipulation of Dismissal filed by CBS Corporation, 94 Stipulation of Dismissal filed by John Crane-Houdaille, Inc., 95 Stipulation of Dismissal filed by Koppers Company, Inc., 89 Stipulation of Dismissal filed by The Goodyear Tire & Rubber Company, 81 Stipulation of Dismissal filed by Bayer Cropscience, Inc. Signed by Judge Richard D. Bennett on 4/25/2016. (ca2s, Deputy Clerk)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Maryland District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Rockman et al v. Union Carbide Corporation et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jeffrey Rockman
Represented By: Patrick Alexander Ciociola
Represented By: Bruce Craig Hill
Represented By: David L Palmer
Represented By: Armand J Volta, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sonja Rockman
Represented By: Patrick Alexander Ciociola
Represented By: Bruce Craig Hill
Represented By: David L Palmer
Represented By: Armand J Volta, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Union Carbide Corporation
Represented By: Danielle Grilli Marcus
Represented By: Peter Woodward Sheehan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kaiser Gypsum Company, Inc.
Represented By: Joel D Newport
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Georgia-Pacific, LLC
Represented By: Douglas B Pfeiffer
Represented By: Lynn C Schlie
Represented By: Robin Silver
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Cross_claimant: Georgia-Pacific, LLC
Represented By: Douglas B Pfeiffer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Cross_claimant: Union Carbide Corporation
Represented By: Danielle Grilli Marcus
Represented By: Peter Woodward Sheehan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Cross_defendant: Kaiser Gypsum Company, Inc.
Represented By: Joel D Newport
Represented By: Joel D Newport
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Cross_defendant: Union Carbide Corporation
Represented By: Danielle Grilli Marcus
Represented By: Peter Woodward Sheehan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Cross_defendant: Georgia-Pacific, LLC
Represented By: Douglas B Pfeiffer
Represented By: Lynn C Schlie
Represented By: Robin Silver
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?