Constructure Management, Inc. v. Majmudar et al
Plaintiff: Constructure Management, Inc.
Defendant: Mukesh Majmudar, Hopkins Hospitality Investors, LLC, Hopkins Investors, LLC and Star Development Group, LLC
Case Number: 1:2016cv02309
Filed: June 22, 2016
Court: US District Court for the District of Maryland
Office: Baltimore Office
County: Howard
Presiding Judge: J. Frederick Motz
Nature of Suit: Other Fraud
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
March 28, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 73 MEMORANDUM OPINION. Signed by Judge Richard D. Bennett on 3/28/2018. (kw2s, Deputy Clerk)
January 17, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 41 ORDER denying 32 Motion to Compel. Signed by Judge J. Frederick Motz on 1/17/2017. (kw2s, Deputy Clerk)
December 19, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 36 ORDER denying 25 Motion to Compel. Signed by Judge J. Frederick Motz on 12/19/2016. (kw2s, Deputy Clerk)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Maryland District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Constructure Management, Inc. v. Majmudar et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Constructure Management, Inc.
Represented By: Jonathan R Wright
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mukesh Majmudar
Represented By: Howard G Goldberg
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hopkins Hospitality Investors, LLC
Represented By: Howard G Goldberg
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hopkins Investors, LLC
Represented By: Howard G Goldberg
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Star Development Group, LLC
Represented By: Howard G Goldberg
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?