Airport Square Holdings, LLC v. GCCFC 2007-GG9 Colomary Facilities, LLC
Plaintiff: Airport Square Holdings, LLC
Defendant: GCCFC 2007-GG9 Colomary Facilities, LLC
Counter_claimant: GCCFC 2007-GG9 Colomary Facilities, LLC
Counter_defendant: Airport Square Holdings, LLC
Consol_plaintiff: Novare National Settlement Service, LLC
Case Number: 1:2016cv02883
Filed: August 16, 2016
Court: US District Court for the District of Maryland
Office: Baltimore Office
County: Anne Arundel
Presiding Judge: J. Frederick Motz
Nature of Suit: Other Contract
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
August 15, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 55 AMENDED ORDER granting 48 Motion of GCCFC 2007-GG9 Colomary Facilities, LLC for Release of Funds held in the court registry; denying 49 Motion of Airport Square Holdings, LLC for Reconsideration. Signed by Judge J. Frederick Motz on 8/15/2017. (jnls, Deputy Clerk)
August 3, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 54 ORDER granting 48 Motion of GCCFC 2007-GG9 Colomary Facilities, LLC for Release of Funds held in the court registry; denying 49 Motion of Airport Square Holdings, LLC for Reconsideration. Signed by Judge J. Frederick Motz on 8/3/2017. (jnls, Deputy Clerk)
February 16, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 46 MEMORANDUM. Signed by Judge J. Frederick Motz on 2/16/2017. (jnls, Deputy Clerk)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Maryland District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Airport Square Holdings, LLC v. GCCFC 2007-GG9 Colomary Facilities, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Airport Square Holdings, LLC
Represented By: Paul Harrison Farmer, Jr.
Represented By: Franklin Joseph Gormley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: GCCFC 2007-GG9 Colomary Facilities, LLC
Represented By: Timothy Francis McCormack
Represented By: Michelle McGeogh
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter_claimant: GCCFC 2007-GG9 Colomary Facilities, LLC
Represented By: Timothy Francis McCormack
Represented By: Michelle McGeogh
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter_defendant: Airport Square Holdings, LLC
Represented By: Paul Harrison Farmer, Jr.
Represented By: Franklin Joseph Gormley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Consol_plaintiff: Novare National Settlement Service, LLC
Represented By: Yona Elizabeth Cohen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?