Maryland Shall Issue, Inc. et al v. Hogan et al
Plaintiff: Maryland Shall Issue, Susan Brancato Vizas, Ana Sliveira, Deborah Kay Miller, Maryland Shall Issue, Inc., Christine Bunch and Atlantic Guns, Inc.
Defendant: Hogan, William M. Pallozzi and Lawrence Hogan
Amicus Curiae: Everytown for Gun Safety and Millenial Policy Center
Case Number: 1:2016cv03311
Filed: September 30, 2016
Court: US District Court for the District of Maryland
Office: Baltimore Office
County: Anne Arundel
Presiding Judge: J Mark Coulson
Referring Judge: Marvin J Garbis
2 Judge: Ellen L Hollander
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 11, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 11, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 110 ORDER denying #106 Motion to Supplement the Record on Appeal. Signed by Judge Ellen L. Hollander on 10/11/2019. (bmhs, Deputy Clerk)
October 11, 2019 Filing 109 MEMORANDUM. Signed by Judge Ellen L. Hollander on 10/11/2019. (bmhs, Deputy Clerk)
September 18, 2019 Filing 108 REPLY to Response to Motion re #106 MOTION to Supplement the Record on Appeal filed by Atlantic Guns, Inc..(Sweeney, John)
September 17, 2019 Filing 107 RESPONSE in Opposition re #106 MOTION to Supplement the Record on Appeal filed by Lawrence Hogan, William M. Pallozzi.(Katz, Jennifer)
September 6, 2019 Filing 106 MOTION to Supplement the Record on Appeal by Atlantic Guns, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order, #2 Memorandum in Support, #3 Exhibit 1)(Sweeney, John)
May 1, 2019 Filing 105 USCA Case Number 19-1469 for #103 Notice of Appeal, filed by Susan Brancato Vizas, Deborah Kay Miller, Atlantic Guns, Inc., Maryland Shall Issue, Inc. - Case Manager - Joy Hargett Moore (slss, Deputy Clerk)
April 26, 2019 Filing 104 Transmission of Notice of Appeal and Docket Sheet to US Court of Appeals re #103 Notice of Appeal,. IMPORTANT NOTICE: To access forms which you are required to file with the United States Court of Appeals for the Fourth Circuit please go to http://www.ca4.uscourts.gov and click on Forms & Notices.(ko, Deputy Clerk)
April 25, 2019 Filing 103 NOTICE OF APPEAL as to #99 Order on Motion for Summary Judgment,,,, Order on Motion to Strike,,, by Atlantic Guns, Inc., Susan Brancato Vizas, Maryland Shall Issue, Inc., Deborah Kay Miller. Filing fee $ 505, receipt number 0416-7975311.(Sutherell, Erienne)
April 4, 2019 Filing 102 REDACTED MEMORANDUM OPINION. Signed by Judge Ellen L. Hollander on 3/31/2019. (kw2s, Deputy Clerk)
April 4, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 101 ORDER granting in part #100 MOTION to File a Redacted Version of the Memorandum Opinion. Signed by Judge Ellen L. Hollander on 4/4/2019. (kw2s, Deputy Clerk)
April 4, 2019 Filing 100 MOTION to File a Redacted Version of the Memorandum Opinion by Atlantic Guns, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(Sweeney, John)
March 31, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 99 ORDER granting #59 Defendants' Motion for Summary Judgment; denying #75 Plaintiffs' Motion for Summary Judgment; denying as moot #79 #91 the parties Motions to Exclude Expert Witnesses; and directing parties to advise the Court as to whether they object to the lifting of the seal as that the Court may publicly issue this Memorandum Opinion. Signed by Judge Ellen L. Hollander on 3/31/2019. (bmhs, Deputy Clerk)
March 31, 2019 Filing 98 -SEALED- MEMORANDUM OPINION. Signed by Judge Ellen L. Hollander on 3/31/2019. (c/em 4/1/19 bmhs, Deputy Clerk)
December 21, 2018 Filing 97 REPLY to Response to Motion re #91 MOTION to Strike filed by Lawrence Hogan, William M. Pallozzi. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 4)(Katz, Jennifer)
December 7, 2018 Filing 96 RESPONSE in Support re #75 Cross MOTION for Summary Judgment and Opposition to Defendants' Motion for Summary Judgment filed by Atlantic Guns, Inc., Susan Brancato Vizas, Christine Bunch, Maryland Shall Issue, Inc., Deborah Kay Miller, Ana Sliveira. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Ex. 1, #2 Exhibit Ex. 2)(Sweeney, John)
December 7, 2018 Filing 95 RESPONSE in Support re #79 MOTION to Strike Opinions of Defendants' Experts James Johnson, James Russell, and Daniel Webster filed by Atlantic Guns, Inc., Susan Brancato Vizas, Christine Bunch, Maryland Shall Issue, Inc., Deborah Kay Miller, Ana Sliveira.(Sweeney, John)
December 7, 2018 Filing 94 RESPONSE in Opposition re #91 MOTION to Strike Opinions of Lay Witness Mark Pennak and Experts Carlisle Moody and Gary Kleck filed by Atlantic Guns, Inc., Susan Brancato Vizas, Christine Bunch, Maryland Shall Issue, Inc., Deborah Kay Miller, Ana Sliveira. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Ex. 1, #2 Exhibit Ex. 2, #3 Exhibit Ex. 3, #4 Exhibit Ex. 4)(Sweeney, John)
November 21, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 93 ORDER granting #92 Plaintiffs' Consent Motion for Extension of Time. Signed by Judge Ellen L. Hollander on 11/21/2018. (bmhs, Deputy Clerk)
November 21, 2018 Filing 92 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time by Atlantic Guns, Inc., Susan Brancato Vizas, Maryland Shall Issue, Inc., Deborah Kay Miller (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Sweeney, John)
November 16, 2018 Filing 91 MOTION to Strike by Lawrence Hogan, William M. Pallozzi (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support, #2 Exhibit 1, #3 Exhibit 2, #4 Exhibit 3, #5 Text of Proposed Order)(Katz, Jennifer)
November 16, 2018 Filing 90 RESPONSE in Opposition re #79 MOTION to Strike Opinions of Defendants' Experts James Johnson, James Russell, and Daniel Webster filed by Lawrence Hogan, William M. Pallozzi. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)(Katz, Jennifer)
November 16, 2018 Filing 89 REPLY to Response to Motion re #59 MOTION for Summary Judgment , RESPONSE in Opposition re #75 Cross-Motion for Summary Judgment filed by Lawrence Hogan, William M. Pallozzi. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 24, #2 Exhibit 25, #3 Exhibit 26, #4 Exhibit 27, #5 Exhibit 28, #6 Exhibit 29, #7 Exhibit 30, #8 Exhibit 31, #9 Exhibit 32, #10 Exhibit 33, #11 Exhibit 34, #12 Exhibit 35, #13 Exhibit 36, #14 Exhibit 37, #15 Exhibit 38, #16 Exhibit 39)(Katz, Jennifer)
November 9, 2018 Set/Reset Deadlines as to #79 MOTION to Strike Opinions of Defendants' Experts James Johnson, James Russell, and Daniel Webster. Responses due by 11/16/2018 (dass, Deputy Clerk)
November 9, 2018 Set/Reset Deadlines as to #75 Cross MOTION for Summary Judgment and Opposition to Defendants' Motion for Summary Judgment. Responses due by 11/16/2018 Replies due by 12/7/2018. (dass, Deputy Clerk)
November 9, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 88 ORDER granting #87 Consent Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply re: Defendants' opposition/reply in the summary judgment briefing, and Plaintiffs' reply in the summary judgment briefing. Signed by Judge Ellen L. Hollander on 11/9/2018. (dass, Deputy Clerk)
November 9, 2018 Filing 87 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply by Lawrence Hogan (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Katz, Jennifer)
October 25, 2018 Filing 86 REDACTED DOCUMENT to #75 Cross MOTION for Summary Judgment and Opposition to Defendants' Motion for Summary Judgment, #77 Memorandum,,, by Atlantic Guns, Inc., Susan Brancato Vizas, Maryland Shall Issue, Inc., Deborah Kay Miller(Sweeney, John)
October 17, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 85 ORDER granting #80 Consent Motion to Seal Declaration of Stephen Schneider and its Exhibits A and B, subject to the terms stated here. Signed by Judge Ellen L. Hollander on 10/17/2018. (bmhs, Deputy Clerk)
October 17, 2018 Filing 84 -SEALED- Declaration of Stephen Schneider. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(bmhs, Deputy Clerk)
October 16, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 83 ORDER granting #82 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time. Signed by Judge Ellen L. Hollander on 10/16/2018. (kw2s, Deputy Clerk)
October 16, 2018 Filing 82 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time by Lawrence Hogan, William M. Pallozzi (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Katz, Jennifer)
October 9, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 81 ORDER granting #76 Consent Motion for Leave to File an Amicus Curiae Brief. Signed by Judge Ellen L. Hollander on 10/9/2018. (bmhs, Deputy Clerk)
October 5, 2018 Filing 80 Consent MOTION to Seal Declaration of Stephen Schneider and its Exhibits A and B by Atlantic Guns, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Sweeney, John)
October 5, 2018 Filing 79 MOTION to Strike Opinions of Defendants' Experts James Johnson, James Russell, and Daniel Webster by Atlantic Guns, Inc., Susan Brancato Vizas, Maryland Shall Issue, Inc., Deborah Kay Miller (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order, #2 Exhibit 1, #3 Exhibit 2, #4 Exhibit 3, #5 Exhibit 4)(Sweeney, John)
October 5, 2018 Filing 78 Memorandum re #59 MOTION for Summary Judgment , #75 Cross MOTION for Summary Judgment and Opposition to Defendants' Motion for Summary Judgment Amicus Curiae Brief in opposition to Defendants' Motion for Summary Judgment and in Support of Plaintiffs' Cross-Motion for Summary Judgment filed by Millenial Policy Center.(Kline, Gregory)
October 5, 2018 Filing 77 Memorandum re #75 Cross MOTION for Summary Judgment and Opposition to Defendants' Motion for Summary Judgment filed by Atlantic Guns, Inc., Susan Brancato Vizas, Maryland Shall Issue, Inc., Deborah Kay Miller. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6, #7 Exhibit 7, #8 Exhibit 8, #9 Exhibit 9, #10 Exhibit 10, #11 Exhibit 11, #12 Exhibit 12, #13 Exhibit 13, #14 Exhibit 14, #15 Exhibit 15, #16 Exhibit 16, #17 Exhibit 17, #18 Exhibit 18, #19 Exhibit 19, #20 Exhibit 20, #21 Exhibit 21, #22 Exhibit 22, #23 Exhibit 23, #24 Exhibit 24, #25 Exhibit 25, #26 Exhibit 26, #27 Exhibit 27)(Sweeney, John)
October 5, 2018 Filing 76 Consent MOTION for Leave to File Amicus Curiae Brief in opposition to Defendants' Motion for Summary Judgment and in Support of Plaintiffs' Cross-Motion for Summary Judgment by Millenial Policy Center (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Kline, Gregory)
October 5, 2018 Filing 75 Cross MOTION for Summary Judgment and Opposition to Defendants' Motion for Summary Judgment by Atlantic Guns, Inc., Susan Brancato Vizas, Maryland Shall Issue, Inc., Deborah Kay Miller (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Sweeney, John)
October 2, 2018 Filing 74 PAPERLESS ORDER granting #73 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Joseph Greenlee. Directing attorney Joseph Greenlee to register online for CM/ECF at http://www.mdd.uscourts.gov/electronic-case-filing-registration. Signed by Clerk on 10/2/2018. (srd, Deputy Clerk)
October 1, 2018 Filing 73 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Joseph Greenlee on behalf of Millenial Policy Center by Gregory M. Kline, Esq. (Filing fee $100, receipt number 0416-7591345.) by Millenial Policy Center(Kline, Gregory)
September 18, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 72 ORDER granting #71 Consent Motion for Extension of Time. Signed by Judge Ellen L. Hollander on 9/18/2018. (bmhs, Deputy Clerk)
September 18, 2018 Filing 71 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Summary Judgment Motions by Atlantic Guns, Inc., Susan Brancato Vizas, Maryland Shall Issue, Inc., Deborah Kay Miller (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Sweeney, John)
August 27, 2018 Filing 70 Brief of Amicus Curiae by Everytown for Gun Safety in Support of #59 Defendants' MOTION for Summary Judgment. (Attachments: #1 Appendix)(bmhs, Deputy Clerk)
August 27, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 69 ORDER granting #68 Everytown for Gun Safety's Consent Motion for Leave to File Amicus Curiae Brief. Signed by Judge Ellen L. Hollander on 8/27/2018. (bmhs, Deputy Clerk)
August 24, 2018 Filing 68 MOTION for Leave to File Amicus Curiae Brief by Everytown for Gun Safety (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Brief of Amicus Curiae Everytown for Gun Safety in Support of Defendants' Motion for Summary Judgment, #2 Exhibit 2 - Appendix of Historical Authority, #3 Text of Proposed Order Granting Motion for Leave to File Amicus Curiae Brief)(Davis, Thad)
August 24, 2018 Filing 67 PAPERLESS ORDER granting #63 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Andrea Hadjiyianni. Directing attorney Andrea Hadjiyianni to register online for CM/ECF at http://www.mdd.uscourts.gov/electronic-case-filing-registration. Signed by Clerk on 8/24/2018. (srds, Deputy Clerk)
August 24, 2018 Filing 66 PAPERLESS ORDER granting #62 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Laura Corbin. Directing attorney Laura Corbin to register online for CM/ECF at http://www.mdd.uscourts.gov/electronic-case-filing-registration. Signed by Clerk on 8/24/2018. (srds, Deputy Clerk)
August 24, 2018 Filing 65 PAPERLESS ORDER granting #61 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Kimberly Friedman. Directing attorney Kimberly Friedman to register online for CM/ECF at http://www.mdd.uscourts.gov/electronic-case-filing-registration. Signed by Clerk on 8/24/2018. (srds, Deputy Clerk)
August 24, 2018 Filing 64 PAPERLESS ORDER granting #60 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Brian A Rosenthal. Attorney Brian A Rosenthal will receive a separate email with the previously issued CM/ECF login and password. Signed by Clerk on 8/24/2018. (srds, Deputy Clerk)
August 21, 2018 Filing 63 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Andrea H. Hadjiyianni (Filing fee $100, receipt number 0416-7516664.) by Everytown for Gun Safety(Davis, Thad)
August 21, 2018 Filing 62 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Laura F. Corbin (Filing fee $100, receipt number 0416-7516663.) by Everytown for Gun Safety(Davis, Thad)
August 21, 2018 Filing 61 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Kimberly L. Friedman (Filing fee $100, receipt number 0416-7516661.) by Everytown for Gun Safety(Davis, Thad)
August 21, 2018 Filing 60 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Brian A. Rosenthal (Filing fee $100, receipt number 0416-7516653.) by Everytown for Gun Safety(Davis, Thad)
August 17, 2018 Filing 59 MOTION for Summary Judgment by Lawrence Hogan, William M. Pallozzi (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6, #7 Exhibit 7, #8 Exhibit 8, #9 Exhibit 9, #10 Exhibit 10, #11 Exhibit 11, #12 Exhibit 12, #13 Exhibit 13, #14 Exhibit 14, #15 Exhibit 15, #16 Exhibit 16, #17 Exhibit 17, #18 Exhibit 18, #19 Exhibit 19, #20 Exhibit 20, #21 Exhibit 21, #22 Exhibit 22, #23 Exhibit 23, #24 Text of Proposed Order)(Katz, Jennifer)
July 26, 2018 Case reassigned to Judge Ellen L. Hollander. Judge Marvin J. Garbis no longer assigned to the case. (cags, Deputy Clerk)
June 27, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 58 ORDER granting #57 Motion for Extension of Time. Signed by Chief Judge James K. Bredar on 6/27/2018. (bmhs, Deputy Clerk)
June 26, 2018 Filing 57 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Summary Judgment Motions by Lawrence Hogan, William M. Pallozzi (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Scott, Robert)
May 2, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 56 ORDER granting #55 Consent Motion for Extension of Time for Defendants to Make Expert Disclosures. Signed by Judge Marvin J. Garbis on 5/1/2018. (bmhs, Deputy Clerk)
April 30, 2018 Filing 55 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time for Defendants to Make Expert Disclosures by Lawrence Hogan, William M. Pallozzi (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Scott, Robert)
April 20, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 54 ORDER granting #53 Plaintiff's Motion to Compel/Local Rule 104.7 and 104.8. Signed by Magistrate Judge J. Mark Coulson on 4/20/2018. (bmhs, Deputy Clerk)
April 13, 2018 Filing 53 Local Rule 104.7 and 104.8 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - 2018.01.30 Motion to Compel Defendant Pallozzi, #2 Exhibit B - 2018.03.20 Pallozzi's Opposition to A.Guns Motion to Compel, #3 Exhibit C - Atlantic Guns Reply in Support of Motion to Compel, #4 Exhibit D - Atlantic Guns Supplemental Reply in Support of Motion to Compel)(Sweeney, John)
March 22, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 52 ORDER granting #51 Consent Motion for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery. Signed by Judge Marvin J. Garbis on 3/22/2018. (bmhs, Deputy Clerk)
March 22, 2018 Filing 51 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery by Lawrence Hogan, William M. Pallozzi (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Scott, Robert)
March 7, 2018 Filing 50 QC NOTICE: #47 Affidavit, #48 Affidavit, #49 Affidavit filed by Lawrence Hogan, William M. Pallozzi was filed incorrectly. **Discovery material is not filed with the Court pursuant to Local Rule 104. It has been noted as FILED IN ERROR, and the document link has been disabled. (bmhs, Deputy Clerk)
March 7, 2018 Filing 49 (FILED IN ERROR) AFFIDAVIT of Service - Scott Miller by Lawrence Hogan, William M. Pallozzi(Scott, Robert) Modified on 3/7/2018 (bmhs, Deputy Clerk).
March 7, 2018 Filing 48 (FILED IN ERROR) AFFIDAVIT of Service - John Matthew Clark by Lawrence Hogan, William M. Pallozzi(Scott, Robert) Modified on 3/7/2018 (bmhs, Deputy Clerk).
March 7, 2018 Filing 47 (FILED IN ERROR) AFFIDAVIT of Service - Dana Hoffman by Lawrence Hogan, William M. Pallozzi(Scott, Robert) Modified on 3/7/2018 (bmhs, Deputy Clerk).
February 28, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 46 PAPERLESS ORDER: Pursuant to the dismissal of claims with prejudice by Plaintiffs Ana Sliveira and Christine Bunch, (ECF No. 44), Defendants' Motion for Sanctions for Failure to Respond to Discovery, (ECF No. 42), is denied as moot. Signed by Magistrate Judge J. Mark Coulson on 2/28/2018. (daws, Chambers)
February 20, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 45 ORDER denying as moot Defendant's Motion to Dismiss, or, in the Alternative, for Summary Judgment. Signed by Judge Marvin J. Garbis on 2/20/2018. (bmhs, Deputy Clerk)
February 20, 2018 Filing 44 NOTICE by Atlantic Guns, Inc., Susan Brancato Vizas, Christine Bunch, Maryland Shall Issue, Inc., Deborah Kay Miller, Ana Sliveira Joint Line (Hansel, Cary)
February 12, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 43 ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge J. Mark Coulson for all Discovery and Related Scheduling. Signed by Judge Marvin J. Garbis on 2/12/2018. (cags, Deputy Clerk)
February 9, 2018 Filing 42 MOTION for Sanctions by Lawrence Hogan, William M. Pallozzi (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6, #7 Text of Proposed Order, #8 Text of Proposed Order)(Katz, Jennifer)
January 4, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 41 STIPULATED CONFIDENTIALITY ORDER. Signed by Judge Marvin J. Garbis on 1/3/2018. (bmhs, Deputy Clerk)
December 22, 2017 Filing 40 Consent MOTION for Protective Order by Lawrence Hogan, William M. Pallozzi (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Stipulated Confidentiality Order)(Scott, Robert)
October 11, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 39 ORDER granting #38 motion for leave to withdraw appearance of Matthew J. Fader as counsel for Defendants. Signed by Judge Marvin J. Garbis on 10/11/2017. (dass, Deputy Clerk)
October 10, 2017 Filing 38 NOTICE to Substitute Attorney Robert A. Scott for Matthew J. Fader (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Scott, Robert)
September 27, 2017 Filing 37 Status Report Submitted by Atlantic Guns, Inc. (Sweeney, John)
September 25, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 36 SCHEDULING ORDER. Signed by Judge Marvin J. Garbis on 9/25/2017. (bmhs, Deputy Clerk)
September 25, 2017 Telephone Conference held on 9/25/2017 before Judge Marvin J. Garbis. (bmhs, Deputy Clerk)
September 20, 2017 Filing 35 ANSWER to #14 Amended Complaint by Lawrence Hogan, William M. Pallozzi.(Katz, Jennifer)
September 6, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 34 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER granting in part and denying in part #18 Defendants' Motion to Dismiss the Amended Complaint. Signed by Judge Marvin J. Garbis on 9/5/2017. (bmhs, Deputy Clerk)
August 7, 2017 Filing 33 Motion Hearing held on 8/7/2017 re #18 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim filed by Lawrence Hogan, William M. Pallozzi before Judge Marvin J. Garbis.(Court Reporter: M. Giordano) (pat, Deputy Clerk)
March 20, 2017 Filing 32 REPLY to Response to Motion re #18 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim filed by Lawrence Hogan, William M. Pallozzi.(Katz, Jennifer)
March 6, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 31 ORDER granting #30 Motion for Extension of Time. Signed by Judge Marvin J. Garbis on 3/6/2017. (bmhs, Deputy Clerk)
March 6, 2017 Filing 30 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply by Lawrence Hogan, William M. Pallozzi (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Katz, Jennifer)
February 28, 2017 Filing 29 RESPONSE in Opposition re #18 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim Memorandum in Opposition to Motion to Dismiss filed by Maryland Shall Issue, Inc..(Hansel, Cary)
February 28, 2017 Filing 28 CORRECTED QC NOTICE: #25 Memorandum filed by Maryland Shall Issue, Inc. was filed incorrectly. **Incorrect event selected. Please refile using the event under Responses and Replies -> Response in Opposition to Motion. It has been noted as FILED IN ERROR, and the document link has been disabled. (bmhs, Deputy Clerk)
February 28, 2017 Filing 27 (FILED IN ERROR) QC NOTICE: #25 Memorandum filed by Maryland Shall Issue, Inc. was filed incorrectly. **Incorrect event selected. Please refile using the event under Responses and Replies -> Reply to Response to Motion. It has been noted as FILED IN ERROR, and the document link has been disabled. (bmhs, Deputy Clerk) Modified on 2/28/2017 (bmhs, Deputy Clerk).
February 27, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 26 ORDER denying as moot #8 Defendants' Motion to Dismiss. Signed by Judge Marvin J. Garbis on 2/27/2017. (bmhs, Deputy Clerk)
February 27, 2017 Filing 25 (FILED IN ERROR) Memorandum re #18 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim filed by Maryland Shall Issue, Inc..(Hansel, Cary) Modified on 2/28/2017 (bmhs, Deputy Clerk).
February 23, 2017 Filing 24 NOTICE of Appearance by James Wallace Porter, III on behalf of Atlantic Guns, Inc. (Porter, James)
February 22, 2017 Filing 23 NOTICE of Appearance by John Parker Sweeney on behalf of Atlantic Guns, Inc. (Sweeney, John)
February 22, 2017 Filing 22 NOTICE of Appearance by Tara Sky Woodward on behalf of Atlantic Guns, Inc. (Woodward, Tara)
February 22, 2017 Filing 21 NOTICE of Appearance by Marc A Nardone on behalf of Atlantic Guns, Inc. (Nardone, Marc)
February 6, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ORDER granting #19 Plaintiffs' Motion for Extension of Time. Signed by Judge Marvin J. Garbis on 2/3/2017. (bmhs, Deputy Clerk)
February 3, 2017 Filing 19 MOTION for Extension of Time by Maryland Shall Issue, Inc.(Hansel, Cary)
January 20, 2017 Filing 18 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim by Lawrence Hogan, William M. Pallozzi (Attachments: #1 Supplement memorandum of law, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6, #7 Exhibit 7, #8 Exhibit 8, #9 Text of Proposed Order)(Katz, Jennifer)
January 5, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER granting #16 Defendants Motion for Extension of Time. Signed by Judge Marvin J. Garbis on 1/4/2017. (bmhs, Deputy Clerk)
January 4, 2017 Filing 16 MOTION for Extension of Time by Lawrence Hogan, William M. Pallozzi (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Katz, Jennifer)
January 3, 2017 Filing 15 RESPONSE in Opposition re #8 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim filed by Maryland Shall Issue, Inc..(Hansel, Cary)
December 28, 2016 Filing 14 AMENDED COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by Maryland Shall Issue, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Redline)(Hansel, Cary)
December 28, 2016 Filing 13 AMENDED COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by Maryland Shall Issue, Inc..(Hansel, Cary)
December 15, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER granting #10 Motion for Extension of Time to File a Response to the Defendants' Motion to Dimiss. Signed by Judge Marvin J. Garbis on 12/15/2016 (cags, Deputy Clerk)
December 15, 2016 Filing 11 Corrected Correspondence Correcting Earlier Submission: #10 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply Corrected Order- Consent Motion for Extension of Time (Hansel, Cary)
December 14, 2016 Filing 10 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #8 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim by Maryland Shall Issue, Inc..(Hansel, Cary)
December 6, 2016 Filing 9 NOTICE of Appearance by Matthew John Fader on behalf of All Defendants (Fader, Matthew)
December 2, 2016 Filing 8 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim by Lawrence Hogan, William M. Pallozzi (Attachments: #1 Supplement memorandum of law, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6, #7 Exhibit 7, #8 Exhibit 8, #9 Text of Proposed Order)(Katz, Jennifer)
November 16, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER granting #6 Defendants' Motion for Extension of Time. Signed by Judge Marvin J. Garbis on 11/15/2016. (bmhs, Deputy Clerk)
November 14, 2016 Filing 6 MOTION for Extension of Time by Lawrence Hogan, William M. Pallozzi (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Katz, Jennifer)
November 14, 2016 Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance by Jennifer L. Katz on behalf of All Defendants (Katz, Jennifer)
October 3, 2016 Filing 4 Summons Issued 21 days as to Lawrence Hogan, William M. Pallozzi. (bmhs, Deputy Clerk)
October 3, 2016 Filing 3 NOTICE by Atlantic Guns, Inc., Susan Brancato Vizas, Christine Bunch, Maryland Shall Issue, Inc., Deborah Kay Miller, Ana Sliveira re #1 Complaint Civil Cover Sheet and Summons (Hansel, Cary)
October 3, 2016 Filing 2 QC NOTICE: #1 Complaint filed by Susan Brancato Vizas, Deborah Kay Miller, Christine Bunch, Ana Sliveira, Atlantic Guns, Inc., Maryland Shall Issue, Inc. was filed incorrectly. **The following attachments or exhibits are missing - Civil Cover Sheet and Summons. To correct this problem, file Civil Cover Sheet and Summons using the event Notice (Other) and link Civil Cover Sheet and Summons to #1 Complaint. (bmhs, Deputy Clerk)
September 30, 2016 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0416-6268243.), filed by Inc. Maryland Shall Issue, Inc Atlantic Guns, Deborah K Miller, Christine Bunch, Susan Brancato Vizas, Ana Sliveira.(Hansel, Cary)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Maryland District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Maryland Shall Issue, Inc. et al v. Hogan et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Maryland Shall Issue
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Susan Brancato Vizas
Represented By: Cary Johnson Hansel, III
Represented By: John Parker Sweeney
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ana Sliveira
Represented By: Cary Johnson Hansel, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Deborah Kay Miller
Represented By: Cary Johnson Hansel, III
Represented By: John Parker Sweeney
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Maryland Shall Issue, Inc.
Represented By: Cary Johnson Hansel, III
Represented By: John Parker Sweeney
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Christine Bunch
Represented By: Cary Johnson Hansel, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Atlantic Guns, Inc.
Represented By: Cary Johnson Hansel, III
Represented By: John Parker Sweeney
Represented By: James Wallace Porter, III
Represented By: Marc A Nardone
Represented By: Tara Sky Woodward
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hogan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: William M. Pallozzi
Represented By: Jennifer L. Katz
Represented By: Matthew John Fader
Represented By: Robert A Scott
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lawrence Hogan
Represented By: Jennifer L. Katz
Represented By: Matthew John Fader
Represented By: Robert A Scott
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: Everytown for Gun Safety
Represented By: Brian A Rosenthal
Represented By: Laura Corbin
Represented By: Andrea Hadjiyianni
Represented By: Thad Alan Davis
Represented By: Kimberly Friedman
Represented By: Kimberly Lindsay Friedman
Represented By: Andrea H Hadjiyianni
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: Millenial Policy Center
Represented By: Gregory M Kline
Represented By: Joseph Greenlee
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?