Consumer Financial Protection Bureau v. Access Funding, LLC et al
Plaintiff: Consumer Financial Protection Bureau
Defendant: Access Funding, LLC, Reliance Funding, LLC, Lee Jundanian, Raffi Boghosian, Michael Borkowski, Charles Smith and Access Holding, LLC
Case Number: 1:2016cv03759
Filed: November 21, 2016
Court: US District Court for the District of Maryland
Office: Baltimore Office
County: Montgomery
Presiding Judge: J. Frederick Motz
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Cause of Action: Civil Miscellaneous Case
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
November 25, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 118 MEMORANDUM OPINION. Signed by Judge Ellen L. Hollander on 11/25/2019. (kw2s, Deputy Clerk)
January 18, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 87 MEMORANDUM OPINION. Signed by Judge Ellen L. Hollander on 1/18/2019. (kw2s, Deputy Clerk)
June 5, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 66 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER denying 46 Motion to Dismiss; denying 48 Motion to Dismiss. Signed by Judge Ellen L. Hollander on 6/4/2018. (kw2s, Deputy Clerk)
December 13, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 42 MEMORANDUM OPINION. Signed by Judge Ellen L. Hollander on 12/13/2017. (kw2s, Deputy Clerk)
September 13, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 27 MEMORANDUM OPINION. Signed by Judge J. Frederick Motz on 9/13/2017. (kw2s, Deputy Clerk)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Maryland District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Consumer Financial Protection Bureau v. Access Funding, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Access Funding, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Reliance Funding, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lee Jundanian
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Raffi Boghosian
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michael Borkowski
Represented By: Michael Thomas Hamilton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Charles Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Access Holding, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Consumer Financial Protection Bureau
Represented By: Meghan Sherman Cater
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?