Logue v. Patient First Corporation et al
Plaintiff: |
Matthew S. Logue |
Defendant: |
Patient First Corporation, Patient First Urgent Care, Bel Air, Boris Gronas, D.O., Drs. Gehris, Jordan, Day & Associates, LLC, Katherine V. Day, M.D., SurgCenter of Bel Air, LLC, Physicians Anesthesia Associates, P.A. and Paul D. Gilmore, M.D. |
Case Number: |
1:2016cv03937 |
Filed: |
December 8, 2016 |
Court: |
US District Court for the District of Maryland |
Office: |
Baltimore Office |
County: |
88888 |
Presiding Judge: |
James K. Bredar |
Nature of Suit: |
Personal Injury- Medical Malpractice |
Cause of Action: |
28 U.S.C. ยง 1332 |
Jury Demanded By: |
Plaintiff |
Available Case Documents
The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:
Date Filed |
Document Text |
November 18, 2019 |
Filing
150
MEMORANDUM AND ORDER denying 129 132 133 Defendants' Motions for Summary Judgment; and scheduling a conference call. Signed by Chief Judge James K. Bredar on 11/15/2019. (bmhs, Deputy Clerk)
|
October 2, 2018 |
Filing
117
MEMORANDUM AND ORDER granting 105 Partial Motion to Dismiss the Defendants Patient First Urgent Care, Bel Air and Patient First Corporation, Individually and d/b/a Patient First Urgent Case, Bel Air. Signed by Chief Judge James K. Bredar on 10/1/18. (krs, Deputy Clerk)
|
January 23, 2018 |
Filing
101
MEMORANDUM AND ORDER denying 99 Motion for Qualified Protective Order. Signed by Chief Judge James K. Bredar on 1/22/2018. (krs, Deputy Clerk)
|
March 28, 2017 |
Filing
55
MEMORANDUM. Signed by Judge James K. Bredar on 3/28/2017. (krs, Deputy Clerk)
|
Access additional case information on PACER
Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system.
A subscription to PACER is required.
Access this case on the Maryland District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System
Search for this case: Logue v. Patient First Corporation et al |
Search News |
[
Google News
| Marketwatch
| Wall Street Journal
| Financial Times
| New York Times
]
|
Search Web |
[
Unicourt
| Legal Web
| Google
| Bing
| Yahoo
| Ask
]
|
Plaintiff: Matthew S. Logue |
Represented By: |
Michael Harris Bereston |
Represented By: |
Paul D Brandes |
Represented By: |
Theresa Lynn Giannone |
Represented By: |
Nicole T Matteo |
Represented By: |
Peter M Villari |
Search News |
[
Google News
| Marketwatch
| Wall Street Journal
| Financial Times
| New York Times
]
|
Search Finance |
[
Google Finance
| Yahoo Finance
| Hoovers
| SEC Edgar Filings
]
|
Search Web |
[
Unicourt
| Justia Dockets
| Legal Web
| Google
| Bing
| Yahoo
| Ask
]
|
Defendant: Patient First Corporation |
Represented By: |
Matthew Carl Nelson |
Search News |
[
Google News
| Marketwatch
| Wall Street Journal
| Financial Times
| New York Times
]
|
Search Finance |
[
Google Finance
| Yahoo Finance
| Hoovers
| SEC Edgar Filings
]
|
Search Web |
[
Unicourt
| Justia Dockets
| Legal Web
| Google
| Bing
| Yahoo
| Ask
]
|
Defendant: Patient First Urgent Care, Bel Air |
Represented By: |
Matthew Carl Nelson |
Search News |
[
Google News
| Marketwatch
| Wall Street Journal
| Financial Times
| New York Times
]
|
Search Finance |
[
Google Finance
| Yahoo Finance
| Hoovers
| SEC Edgar Filings
]
|
Search Web |
[
Unicourt
| Justia Dockets
| Legal Web
| Google
| Bing
| Yahoo
| Ask
]
|
Defendant: Boris Gronas, D.O. |
Represented By: |
Matthew Carl Nelson |
Search News |
[
Google News
| Marketwatch
| Wall Street Journal
| Financial Times
| New York Times
]
|
Search Finance |
[
Google Finance
| Yahoo Finance
| Hoovers
| SEC Edgar Filings
]
|
Search Web |
[
Unicourt
| Justia Dockets
| Legal Web
| Google
| Bing
| Yahoo
| Ask
]
|
Defendant: Drs. Gehris, Jordan, Day & Associates, LLC |
Search News |
[
Google News
| Marketwatch
| Wall Street Journal
| Financial Times
| New York Times
]
|
Search Finance |
[
Google Finance
| Yahoo Finance
| Hoovers
| SEC Edgar Filings
]
|
Search Web |
[
Unicourt
| Justia Dockets
| Legal Web
| Google
| Bing
| Yahoo
| Ask
]
|
Defendant: Katherine V. Day, M.D. |
Search News |
[
Google News
| Marketwatch
| Wall Street Journal
| Financial Times
| New York Times
]
|
Search Finance |
[
Google Finance
| Yahoo Finance
| Hoovers
| SEC Edgar Filings
]
|
Search Web |
[
Unicourt
| Justia Dockets
| Legal Web
| Google
| Bing
| Yahoo
| Ask
]
|
Defendant: SurgCenter of Bel Air, LLC |
Represented By: |
Michelle Jacquelyn Marzullo |
Search News |
[
Google News
| Marketwatch
| Wall Street Journal
| Financial Times
| New York Times
]
|
Search Finance |
[
Google Finance
| Yahoo Finance
| Hoovers
| SEC Edgar Filings
]
|
Search Web |
[
Unicourt
| Justia Dockets
| Legal Web
| Google
| Bing
| Yahoo
| Ask
]
|
Defendant: Physicians Anesthesia Associates, P.A. |
Search News |
[
Google News
| Marketwatch
| Wall Street Journal
| Financial Times
| New York Times
]
|
Search Finance |
[
Google Finance
| Yahoo Finance
| Hoovers
| SEC Edgar Filings
]
|
Search Web |
[
Unicourt
| Justia Dockets
| Legal Web
| Google
| Bing
| Yahoo
| Ask
]
|
Defendant: Paul D. Gilmore, M.D. |
Represented By: |
James P Gleason, Jr |
Search News |
[
Google News
| Marketwatch
| Wall Street Journal
| Financial Times
| New York Times
]
|
Search Finance |
[
Google Finance
| Yahoo Finance
| Hoovers
| SEC Edgar Filings
]
|
Search Web |
[
Unicourt
| Justia Dockets
| Legal Web
| Google
| Bing
| Yahoo
| Ask
]
|
Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.
Why Is My Information Online?