Kovacic v. Harris
Plaintiff: Ivica Kovacic
Defendant: Danijela Kovacic
Case Number: 1:2017cv00044
Filed: January 6, 2017
Court: US District Court for the District of Maryland
Office: Baltimore Office
County: Cecil
Presiding Judge: Marvin J. Garbis
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Cause of Action: 42:11601 International Child Abduction Remedies Act
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
July 12, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 68 MEMORANDUM OPINION Signed by Judge Richard D. Bennett on 7/12/2018. (cags, Deputy Clerk)
June 25, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 55 MEMORANDUM OPINION. Signed by Judge Richard D. Bennett on 6/25/2018. (c/m 6/25/18 jnls, Deputy Clerk)
June 23, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 24 MEMORANDUM ORDER denying 8 Motion to Dismiss filed by Danijela Harris. Signed by Judge Richard D. Bennett on 6/22/2017. (jnls, Deputy Clerk) Modified on 6/23/2017 (jnls, Deputy Clerk).
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Maryland District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Kovacic v. Harris
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ivica Kovacic
Represented By: Emma T Chen
Represented By: Ryan S Smethurst
Represented By: Ali Nathaniel Wright
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Danijela Kovacic
Represented By: C Thomas Brown
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?