Breece v. Under Armour, Inc.
Plaintiff: Brian Breece
Defendant: Under Armour, Inc., Kevin A. Plank and Lawrence P. Molloy
Case Number: 1:2017cv00388
Filed: February 10, 2017
Court: US District Court for the District of Maryland
Office: Baltimore Office
County: Baltimore City
Presiding Judge: Richard D. Bennett
Nature of Suit: Securities/Commodities/Exchanges
Cause of Action: 15:78
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
February 18, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 166 MEMORANDUM ORDER denying 156 Plaintiffs' Motion for Partial Relief from the PSLRA Discovery Stay. Signed by Judge Richard D. Bennett on 2/18/2021. (krs, Deputy Clerk)
January 22, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 139 MEMORANDUM OPINION Signed by Judge Richard D. Bennett on 1/22/2020. (cags, Deputy Clerk)
August 19, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 98 MEMORANDUM OPINION. Signed by Judge Richard D. Bennett on 8/19/2019. (kw2s, Deputy Clerk)
September 19, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 74 MEMORANDUM OPINION. Signed by Judge Richard D. Bennett on 9/19/18. (krs, Deputy Clerk)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Maryland District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Breece v. Under Armour, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Brian Breece
Represented By: Charles J Piven
Represented By: Yelena Trepetin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Under Armour, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kevin A. Plank
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lawrence P. Molloy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?