White Oak Power Constructors v. Alstom Power, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: White Oak Power Constructors
Defendant: Old Dominion Electric Cooperative and Alstom Power, Inc.
Case Number: 1:2017cv01437
Filed: May 24, 2017
Court: US District Court for the District of Maryland
Office: Baltimore Office
County: Cecil
Presiding Judge: Catherine C Blake
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 7, 2017. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 7, 2017 Case electronically transferred to Eastern District of Virginia. (krs, Deputy Clerk)
November 7, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 37 ORDER granting #22 Alstom Power Inc.'s Motion to Transfer Venue; granting as to transfer and denying as to dismissal #24 Old Dominion Electric Cooperatives Motion to Transfer Venue, or in the Alternative toDismiss; denying as moot #34 White Oak Power Constructors motion for leave to file surreply; transfering case to the Eastern District of Virginia, Richmond Division. Signed by Judge Catherine C. Blake on 11/7/2017. (krs, Deputy Clerk)
November 7, 2017 Filing 36 MEMORANDUM. Signed by Judge Catherine C. Blake on 11/7/2017. (krs, Deputy Clerk)
November 6, 2017 Filing 35 RESPONSE in Opposition re #34 MOTION for Leave to File Surreply filed by Alstom Power, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Bernasconi, Andrew)
October 23, 2017 Filing 34 MOTION for Leave to File Surreply by White Oak Power Constructors (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support, #2 Exhibit A to Memo. in Support, #3 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order)(Windus, Robert)
October 11, 2017 Filing 33 REPLY to Response to Motion re #22 MOTION to Transfer Case filed by Alstom Power, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(Bernasconi, Andrew)
October 6, 2017 Filing 32 REPLY to Response to Motion re #24 MOTION to Change Venue or, in the Alternative, to Dismiss filed by Old Dominion Electric Cooperative.(Pirko, John)
September 20, 2017 Filing 31 RESPONSE in Opposition re #22 MOTION to Transfer Case , #24 MOTION to Change Venue or, in the Alternative, to Dismiss filed by White Oak Power Constructors.(Windus, Robert)
September 20, 2017 Filing 30 RESPONSE in Opposition re #24 MOTION to Change Venue or, in the Alternative, to Dismiss filed by White Oak Power Constructors.(Windus, Robert)
August 24, 2017 Filing 29 Local Rule 103.3 Disclosure Statement by Old Dominion Electric Cooperative identifying Other Affiliate Choptank Electric Cooperative, Inc., Other Affiliate Community Electric Cooperative, Other Affiliate Delaware Electric Cooperative, Other Affiliate Mecklenburg Electric Cooperative, Other Affiliate Northern Neck Electric Cooperative, Other Affiliate Prince George Electric Cooperative, Other Affiliate Rappahannock Electric Cooperative, Other Affiliate Shenandoah Valley Electric Cooperative, Other Affiliate Southside Electric Cooperative, Other Affiliate A&N Electric Cooperative, Other Affiliate BARC Electric Cooperative for Old Dominion Electric Cooperative.(Pirko, John)
August 23, 2017 Filing 28 PAPERLESS ORDER granting #23 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of James P Guy, II. Directing attorney James P Guy, II to register online for CM/ECF at http://www.mdd.uscourts.gov/electronic-case-filing-registration. Signed by Clerk on 8/23/2017. (srd, Deputy Clerk)
August 23, 2017 Filing 27 PAPERLESS ORDER granting #20 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Kenneth Stout. Directing attorney Kenneth Stout to register online for CM/ECF at http://www.mdd.uscourts.gov/electronic-case-filing-registration. Signed by Clerk on 8/23/2017. (srd, Deputy Clerk)
August 23, 2017 Filing 26 PAPERLESS ORDER granting #19 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Thomas Marshall Wolf. Attorney Thomas Marshall Wolf will receive a separate email with the previously issued CM/ECF login and password. Signed by Clerk on 8/23/2017. (srd, Deputy Clerk)
August 22, 2017 Filing 25 QC NOTICE: #21 Local Rule 103.3 Disclosure Statement filed by Old Dominion Electric Cooperative was filed incorrectly. **Please refile and enter all affiliates/parents when the system prompts you to do so. It has been noted as FILED IN ERROR, and the document link has been disabled. (krs, Deputy Clerk)
August 21, 2017 Filing 24 MOTION to Change Venue or, in the Alternative, to Dismiss by Old Dominion Electric Cooperative (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support of Old Dominion's Motion to Transfer Venue or, in the Alternative, to Dismiss, #2 Exhibit 1 to Memorandum in Support of Old Dominion's Motion to Transfer)(Pirko, John)
August 21, 2017 Filing 23 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice for James Patrick Guy, II (Filing fee $100, receipt number 0416-6843725.) by Old Dominion Electric Cooperative(Pirko, John)
August 21, 2017 Filing 22 MOTION to Transfer Case by Alstom Power, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(Bernasconi, Andrew)
August 21, 2017 Filing 21 [FILED IN ERROR] Local Rule 103.3 Disclosure Statement by Old Dominion Electric Cooperative (Pirko, John) Modified on 8/22/2017 (krs, Deputy Clerk).
August 21, 2017 Filing 20 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Kenneth T. Stout (Filing fee $100, receipt number 0416-6842938.) by Old Dominion Electric Cooperative(Pirko, John)
August 21, 2017 Filing 19 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Thomas M. Wolf (Filing fee $100, receipt number 0416-6842871.) by Old Dominion Electric Cooperative(Pirko, John)
August 15, 2017 Filing 18 PAPERLESS ORDER granting #16 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Jason Downing Boffey. Directing attorney Jason Downing Boffey to register online for CM/ECF at http://www.mdd.uscourts.gov/electronic-case-filing-registration. Signed by Clerk on 8/15/2017. (srd, Deputy Clerk)
August 15, 2017 Filing 17 PAPERLESS ORDER granting #15 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Mark Masterson. Directing attorney Mark Masterson to register online for CM/ECF at http://www.mdd.uscourts.gov/electronic-case-filing-registration. Signed by Clerk on 8/15/2017. (srd, Deputy Clerk)
August 8, 2017 Filing 16 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Jason Downing Boffey (Filing fee $100, receipt number 0416-6818647.) by White Oak Power Constructors(Windus, Robert)
August 8, 2017 Filing 15 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Mark Oliver Masterson (Filing fee $100, receipt number 0416-6818640.) by White Oak Power Constructors(Windus, Robert)
August 4, 2017 Filing 14 PAPERLESS ORDER granting #12 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Tarek F. Abdalla. Directing attorney Tarek F. Abdalla to register online for CM/ECF at http://www.mdd.uscourts.gov/electronic-case-filing-registration. Signed by Clerk on 8/4/2017. (srds, Deputy Clerk)
August 1, 2017 Filing 13 PAPERLESS ORDER granting #11 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Wayne Stansfield. Directing attorney Wayne Stansfield to register online for CM/ECF at http://www.mdd.uscourts.gov/electronic-case-filing-registration. Signed by Clerk on 8/1/2017. (srd, Deputy Clerk)
July 28, 2017 Filing 12 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Tarek Abdalla (Filing fee $100, receipt number 0416-6803327.) by Alstom Power, Inc.(Bernasconi, Andrew)
July 26, 2017 Filing 11 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Wayne Stansfield (Filing fee $100, receipt number 0416-6799507.) by Alstom Power, Inc.(Bernasconi, Andrew)
July 21, 2017 Filing 10 AMENDED COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by White Oak Power Constructors. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Red-lined Amended Complaint)(Windus, Robert)
July 14, 2017 Filing 9 Local Rule 103.3 Disclosure Statement by Alstom Power, Inc. identifying Corporate Parent General Electric Company, Corporate Parent ALSTOM, INC., Corporate Parent GE ALBANY US HOLDINGS LLC for Alstom Power, Inc..(Bernasconi, Andrew)
July 13, 2017 Filing 8 NOTICE of Appearance by Andrew C Bernasconi on behalf of Alstom Power, Inc. (Bernasconi, Andrew)
July 12, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 7 PAPERLESS ORDER APPROVING #6 Stipulation filed by White Oak Power Constructors, as proposed. Signed by Chief Judge Catherine C. Blake on 7/12/2017. (Blake, Catherine)
July 12, 2017 Filing 6 STIPULATION for Filing of Amended Complaint, Establishing Briefing Schedule for Certain Preliminary Motions and Extension of Time to Respond to Complaint by White Oak Power Constructors(Windus, Robert)
July 10, 2017 Filing 5 SUMMONS Returned Executed by White Oak Power Constructors. Old Dominion Electric Cooperative served on 6/22/2017, answer due 7/13/2017.(Windus, Robert)
July 10, 2017 Filing 4 SUMMONS Returned Executed by White Oak Power Constructors. Alstom Power, Inc. served on 6/22/2017, answer due 7/13/2017.(Windus, Robert)
May 26, 2017 Filing 3 Summons Issued 21 days as to Alstom Power, Inc., Old Dominion Electric Cooperative.(krs, Deputy Clerk)
May 24, 2017 Filing 2 Local Rule 103.3 Disclosure Statement by White Oak Power Constructors identifying Other Affiliate Sargent & Lundy, LLC, Other Affiliate PCL Industrial Construction Co. for White Oak Power Constructors.(Windus, Robert)
May 24, 2017 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0416-6682346.), filed by White Oak Power Constructors. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit Exhibit C, #4 Civil Cover Sheet, #5 Alstom Summons, #6 ODEC Summons)(Windus, Robert)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Maryland District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: White Oak Power Constructors v. Alstom Power, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Old Dominion Electric Cooperative
Represented By: Kenneth Stout
Represented By: James P Guy, II
Represented By: Thomas Marshall Wolf
Represented By: John Arthur Pirko
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Alstom Power, Inc.
Represented By: Wayne Stansfield
Represented By: Andrew C Bernasconi
Represented By: Tarek Abdalla
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: White Oak Power Constructors
Represented By: Robert Dixon Windus
Represented By: Mark Masterson
Represented By: Jason Downing Boffey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?