Casero et al v. Chicago Title Insurance Company et al

Plaintiff: Robert A. Casero, Jr. and Catherine Mary Hattenburg
Defendant: Chicago Title Insurance Company and Fidelity National Title Group, Inc.
Case Number: 1:2017cv02165
Filed: August 1, 2017
Court: Maryland District Court
Office: Baltimore Office
County: Harford
Presiding Judge: J. Frederick Motz
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
February 13, 2018 Opinion or Order 20 ORDER granting 17 Motion for Reconsideration. Vacating 15 Order. Defendants are not required to participate in a mediation in the underlying suit. Signed by Judge George Levi Russell, III on 2/12/2018. (cags, Deputy Clerk)
February 12, 2018 Opinion or Order 19 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER denying 12 Motion for New Trial or to Alter or Amend the Judgment. Signed by Judge George Levi Russell, III on 2/12/2018. (dass, Deputy Clerk)
August 30, 2017 Opinion or Order 10 MEMORANDUM Signed by Judge J. Frederick Motz on 8/30/2017. (cags, Deputy Clerk)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Maryland District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Casero et al v. Chicago Title Insurance Company et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Robert A. Casero, Jr.
Represented By: Francis J Collins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Catherine Mary Hattenburg
Represented By: Francis J Collins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Chicago Title Insurance Company
Represented By: Yona Elizabeth Cohen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Fidelity National Title Group, Inc.
Represented By: Yona Elizabeth Cohen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?