One Twenty 2, LLC v. Videology Media Technologies, LLC

Plaintiff: ONE TWENTY 2, LLC a/k/a Media 122 and One Twenty 2, LLC
Defendant: VIDEOLOGY MEDIA TECHNOLOGIES, LLC
Case Number: 1:2018cv01050
Filed: April 11, 2018
Court: US District Court for the District of Maryland
Office: Baltimore Office
County: Baltimore City
Presiding Judge: Ellen L Hollander
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 11, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 11, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 17 MARGINAL ORDER Approving #16 Notice of Voluntary Dismissal without prejudice filed by One Twenty 2, LLC. Signed by Judge Ellen L. Hollander on 9/11/2018 (cags, Deputy Clerk)
September 11, 2018 Filing 16 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by One Twenty 2, LLC (Gollogly, Ezra)
September 4, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER Directing Plaintiff's counsel to file a Status Report by September 19, 2018. Signed by Judge Ellen L. Hollander on 9/4/2018. (bas, Deputy Clerk)
May 14, 2018 Case Stayed (bas, Deputy Clerk)
May 14, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER Granting Automatic Stay. Signed by Judge Ellen L. Hollander on 5/14/2018. (kw2s, Deputy Clerk)
May 14, 2018 Filing 13 Correspondence re: Proposed Order Granting Automatic Stay (Brennen, Robert)
May 10, 2018 Filing 12 SUGGESTION OF BANKRUPTCY Upon the Record as to Videology Media Technologies, Inc. by Videology Media Technologies, LLC (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Brennen, Robert)
May 9, 2018 Filing 11 Local Rule 103.3 Disclosure Statement by Videology Media Technologies, LLC identifying Other Affiliate Videology, Inc. for Videology Media Technologies, LLC.(Brennen, Robert)
May 9, 2018 Filing 10 QC NOTICE: #9 Local Rule 103.3 Disclosure Statement filed by Videology Media Technologies, LLC was filed incorrectly. **Please enter corporate parent/affiliate(s) when prompted. It has been noted as FILED IN ERROR, and the document link has been disabled. (bas, Deputy Clerk)
May 8, 2018 Filing 9 -[FILED IN ERROR]- Local Rule 103.3 Disclosure Statement by Videology Media Technologies, LLC (Brennen, Robert) Modified on 5/9/2018 (bas, Deputy Clerk).
May 8, 2018 Filing 8 MEMORANDUM to Counsel. Signed by Judge Ellen L. Hollander on 5/8/2018. (bas, Deputy Clerk)
May 8, 2018 Deficiency Notice as to Videology Media Technologies, LLC -- Your Local Rule 103.3 disclosure statement has not been filed. The Statement must be filed by 5/15/2018 (bas, Deputy Clerk)
May 7, 2018 Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance by Robert Scott Brennen on behalf of Videology Media Technologies, LLC (Brennen, Robert)
May 7, 2018 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by Megan Brianna Burnett on behalf of Videology Media Technologies, LLC (Burnett, Megan)
May 7, 2018 Filing 5 ANSWER to #1 Complaint, by Videology Media Technologies, LLC.(Burnett, Megan)
April 27, 2018 Filing 4 SUMMONS Returned Executed by One Twenty 2, LLC. Videology Media Technologies, LLC served on 4/13/2018, answer due 5/4/2018. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Gollogly, Ezra)
April 12, 2018 Filing 3 Summons Issued 21 days as to Videology Media Technologies, LLC.(bas, Deputy Clerk)
April 11, 2018 Filing 2 Local Rule 103.3 Disclosure Statement by ONE TWENTY 2, LLC a/k/a Media 122 (Gollogly, Ezra)
April 11, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against VIDEOLOGY MEDIA TECHNOLOGIES, LLC ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0416-7264218.), filed by ONE TWENTY 2, LLC a/k/a Media 122. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Civil Cover Sheet, #4 proposed Summons in a Civil Action)(Gollogly, Ezra)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Maryland District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: One Twenty 2, LLC v. Videology Media Technologies, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ONE TWENTY 2, LLC a/k/a Media 122
Represented By: Ezra Gollogly
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: One Twenty 2, LLC
Represented By: Ezra Gollogly
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: VIDEOLOGY MEDIA TECHNOLOGIES, LLC
Represented By: Robert Scott Brennen
Represented By: Megan Brianna Burnett
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?