OurPet's Company v. Caitec Corporation et al
Plaintiff: OurPet's Company
Defendant: Caitec Corporation and Hero Dog Toys
Case Number: 1:2018cv02001
Filed: June 29, 2018
Court: US District Court for the District of Maryland
Office: Baltimore Office
County: 88888
Presiding Judge: Richard D Bennett
Nature of Suit: Patent
Cause of Action: 35:271
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 29, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 29, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 14 Minutes of Teleconference and Order of Transfer. On June 28, 2018, the Court held a teleconference with Attorneys Gugliotta and Welling for Plaintiff, and Attorney Auito for Defendant. For the reasons stated in the Order, the Court hereby grants the Defendant's Motion to Dismiss to the extent that the Court hereby directs the Clerk of Court to transfer the case to the United States District Court for the District of Maryland where it is properly venued. (Related document #11 ) Signed by Judge Dan Aaron Polster on 6/29/2018. (K,K)
June 26, 2018 Notice [non-document] Telephone Conference set for 6/28/2018 at 04:30 PM before Judge Dan Aaron Polster. (K,K)
June 25, 2018 Filing 13 Opposition to #11 Motion to dismiss case for Improper Venue filed by OurPet's Company. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of David A. Welling, Esq.)(Welling, David)
June 11, 2018 Filing 12 Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by Caitec Corporation. (Auito, Derek) Modified filer on 6/14/2018 (S,SR).
June 11, 2018 Filing 11 Motion to dismiss case for Improper Venue filed by Caitec Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support, #2 Declaration of Terry Gao)(Auito, Derek) Modified filer on 6/14/2018 (S,SR).
May 11, 2018 Opinion or Order Order [non-document] granting Parties' #10 Third Stipulation extending time until 6/11/2018 to answer. Caitec Corporation answer due 6/11/2018; Hero Dog Toys answer due 6/11/2018. Approved by Judge Dan Aaron Polster on 5/11/2018.(K,K)
May 10, 2018 Filing 10 Third Stipulation extending time until 6/11/2018 to answer filed by Plaintiff OurPet's Company. (Welling, David) Modified text on 5/10/2018 (S,SR).
April 9, 2018 Opinion or Order Order [non-document] granting Parties' #9 Second Stipulated Motion for extension of time until 5/11/2018 to answer. Caitec Corporation answer due 5/11/2018; Hero Dog Toys answer due 5/11/2018. Approved by Judge Dan Aaron Polster on 4/9/2018.(K,K)
April 9, 2018 Filing 9 Second Stipulated Motion for extension of time until 5/11/2018 to answer filed by Plaintiff OurPet's Company. (Welling, David) Modified text on 4/9/2018 (S,SR).
March 8, 2018 Opinion or Order Order [non-document] granting #8 Parties' Stipulated Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. Defendants' answer due 4/12/18. Judge Dan Aaron Polster on 3/8/18.(P,R)
March 8, 2018 Filing 8 Stipulated Motion for extension of time until 4/12/2018 to answer (for Defendants to plead or respond to the Plaintiff's Complaint) filed by Plaintiff OurPet's Company. (Welling, David)
February 27, 2018 Filing 7 Return of Service by certified mail executed upon Caitec Corporation on 2/20/2018, filed on behalf of OurPet's Company (Welling, David)
February 27, 2018 Filing 6 Return of Service by certified mail executed upon Hero Dog Toys on 2/20/2018, filed on behalf of OurPet's Company (Welling, David)
February 15, 2018 Filing 5 FILING ERROR, INCOMPLETE DOCUMENT. Notice of Service of Summons & Complaint sent Certified Mail, Return Receipt Requested filed by OurPet's Company. Related document(s) #4 .(Welling, David) Modified text on 2/16/2018 (S,SR).
February 14, 2018 This action has been identified as a Patent Case that is subject to the Local Patent Rules. Link to #Local Patent Rules. (S,SR)
February 14, 2018 Filing 4 Original Summons and Magistrate Consent Form issued to counsel for service upon Caitec Corporation, Hero Dog Toys. (Attachments: #1 Magistrate Consent Form) (S,SR)
February 14, 2018 Random Assignment of Magistrate Judge pursuant to Local Rule 3.1. In the event of a referral, case will be assigned to Magistrate Judge David A. Ruiz. (S,SR)
February 14, 2018 Judge Dan Aaron Polster assigned to case. (S,SR)
February 14, 2018 Filing 3 Report on the Filing of an Action Regarding a Patent or Trademark (AO120) filed by OurPet's Company. (Welling, David)
February 14, 2018 Filing 2 Corporate Disclosure Statement identifying Other Affiliate Virtue Company for OurPet's Company filed by OurPet's Company. (Welling, David)
February 14, 2018 Filing 1 Complaint with jury demand against All Defendants. Filing fee paid $ 400, Receipt number 0647-8554476. Filed by OurPet's Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 ('418 patent), #2 Exhibit 2 (Hero Dog Toys product), #3 Exhibit 3 (Caitec Hero product), #4 Civil Cover Sheet, #5 Summons to Caitec, #6 Summons to Hero) (Welling, David)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Maryland District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: OurPet's Company v. Caitec Corporation et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: OurPet's Company
Represented By: Victor N Balancia
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Caitec Corporation
Represented By: Thomas Rath
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hero Dog Toys
Represented By: Thomas Rath
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?