U.S. Equal Employment Opportunity Commission v. Park School of Baltimore Inc.
Plaintiff: EEOC and U.S. Equal Employment Opportunity Commission
Defendant: Park School of Baltimore Inc.
Case Number: 1:2018cv02319
Filed: July 30, 2018
Court: US District Court for the District of Maryland
Office: Baltimore Office
County: Allegany
Presiding Judge: Richard D Bennett
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Jobs
Cause of Action: 42:2000
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 26, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 26, 2018 Deficiency Notice as to Park School of Baltimore Inc. -- Your Local Rule 103.3 disclosure statement has not been filed. The Statement must be filed by 10/3/2018 (kw2s, Deputy Clerk)
September 26, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 6 SCHEDULING ORDER: Status Report due by 2/8/2019. Signed by Judge Richard D. Bennett on 9/26/2018. (Attachments: #1 Informal Discovery Letter)(kw2s, Deputy Clerk)
September 26, 2018 Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance by Jeffrey E Nusinov on behalf of Park School of Baltimore Inc. (Nusinov, Jeffrey)
September 26, 2018 Filing 4 ANSWER to #1 Complaint by Park School of Baltimore Inc..(Vander Woude, John)
August 17, 2018 Filing 3 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by U.S. Equal Employment Opportunity Commission. Park School of Baltimore Inc. waiver sent on 7/30/2018, answer due 9/28/2018.(Thompson, Eric)
July 30, 2018 Filing 2 REQUEST FOR WAIVER of Service sent to Park School of Baltimore Inc. on 7-30-18 by EEOC. Waiver of Service due by 8/29/2018. (Attachments: #1 Unsigned Waiver of Service)(Thompson, Eric)
July 30, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Park School of Baltimore Inc., filed by U.S. Equal Employment Opportunity Commission. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Thompson, Eric) Modified on 7/31/2018 (kw2s, Deputy Clerk).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Maryland District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: U.S. Equal Employment Opportunity Commission v. Park School of Baltimore Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Park School of Baltimore Inc.
Represented By: Jeffrey E Nusinov
Represented By: John S Vander Woude
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: EEOC
Represented By: Eric Stephen Thompson
Represented By: Debra Michele Lawrence
Represented By: Maria Salacuse
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: U.S. Equal Employment Opportunity Commission
Represented By: Eric Stephen Thompson
Represented By: Debra Michele Lawrence
Represented By: Maria Salacuse
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?