United States of America v. $64,018.84 U.S. Currency et al

Plaintiff: United States of America
Defendant: $64,018.84 U.S. Currency, One 2011 Suzuki GSX1300R Vin No. JS1GX72A3B2102693 and One 2013 Maserati Gran Turismo Vin No. ZAM45MMA0D0069477
Claimant: Dorothy Amor Smith and Daryl Thomas Smith
Case Number: 1:2018cv02482
Filed: August 13, 2018
Court: US District Court for the District of Maryland
Office: Baltimore Office
County: Baltimore City
Presiding Judge: Deborah K Chasanow
Nature of Suit: Drug Related Seizure of Property
Cause of Action: 21:881
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 21, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 21, 2018 Filing 8 MOTION to Dismiss and Motion for Partial Summary Judgment by Daryl Thomas Smith, Dorothy Amor Smith (Attachments: #1 Exhibit State v Daryl Smith Plea Transcript)(Biddle, Robert)
September 21, 2018 Filing 7 REDACTED DOCUMENT to #6 Claim for Property by Daryl Thomas Smith (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Redacted Exhibit for ECF #6)(Biddle, Robert)
September 13, 2018 Filing 6 CLAIM for Property by Daryl Thomas Smith. Answer due by 10/4/2018. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit vehicle records)(Biddle, Robert)
September 13, 2018 Filing 5 CLAIM for Property by Dorothy Amor Smith. Answer due by 10/4/2018. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Vehicle Records)(Biddle, Robert)
September 13, 2018 Filing 4 NOTICE of Appearance by Robert W Biddle on behalf of Daryl Thomas Smith (Biddle, Robert)
September 13, 2018 Filing 3 NOTICE of Appearance by Robert W Biddle on behalf of Dorothy Amor Smith (Biddle, Robert)
August 14, 2018 Filing 2 WARRANT issued to arrest property. (bmhs, Deputy Clerk)
August 13, 2018 Filing 1 VERIFIED COMPLAINT for FORFEITURE against $64,018.84 U.S. Currency, One 2011 Suzuki GSX1300R Vin No. JS1GX72A3B2102693, One 2013 Maserati Gran Turismo Vin No. ZAM45MMA0D0069477 filed by United States of America. (Attachments: #1 Declaration, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(bmhs, Deputy Clerk)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Maryland District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: United States of America v. $64,018.84 U.S. Currency et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: $64,018.84 U.S. Currency
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: One 2011 Suzuki GSX1300R Vin No. JS1GX72A3B2102693
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: One 2013 Maserati Gran Turismo Vin No. ZAM45MMA0D0069477
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: United States of America
Represented By: Tamera Lynn Fine
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Claimant: Dorothy Amor Smith
Represented By: Robert W Biddle
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Claimant: Daryl Thomas Smith
Represented By: Robert W Biddle
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?