EXIT Realty Corp. International v. EXIT Mortgage, LLC

Plaintiff: EXIT Realty Corp. International
Defendant: EXIT Mortgage, LLC
Case Number: 1:2018cv02498
Filed: August 15, 2018
Court: Maryland District Court
Office: Baltimore Office
County: Howard
Presiding Judge: George Jarrod Hazel
Nature of Suit: Trademark
Cause of Action: 15:1125
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 26, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed#Document Text
September 26, 2018 14 Featured Case SETTLEMENT ORDER DISMISSING case with each party to bear its own costs unless otherwise agreed without prejudice to the right of a party to move for good cause to reopen this action if settlement is not consummated. Signed by Judge George Jarrod Hazel on 9/26/2018. (jf3s, Deputy Clerk)
September 11, 2018 13 PAPERLESS correspondence scheduling a Fed. R. Civ. P. 16 telephone conference call for Friday, September 14, 2018 at 4:00 p.m. The parties are instructed to dial-in for the call. Phone number 877-810-9415; Access code: 5860700. (am2s, Chambers)
September 11, 2018 12 Local Rule 103.3 Disclosure Statement by EXIT Mortgage, LLC (Burkhouse, David)
September 11, 2018 11 ANSWER to #1 Complaint by EXIT Mortgage, LLC.(Burkhouse, David)
September 11, 2018 10 NOTICE of Appearance by David Andrew Burkhouse on behalf of EXIT Mortgage, LLC (Burkhouse, David)
August 27, 2018 9 SUMMONS Returned Executed by EXIT Realty Corp. International. EXIT Mortgage, LLC served on 8/23/2018, answer due 9/13/2018.(Carrier, William)
August 23, 2018 8 Report on Filing Patent/Trademark (Carrier, William)
August 22, 2018 7 NOTICE of Appearance by Jacob Byrne on behalf of EXIT Realty Corp. International (Byrne, Jacob)
August 17, 2018 6 Deficiency Notice -- Report on Filing Patent/Trademark form (AO 120) has not been filed. The form is located at http://www.mdd.uscourts.gov/publications/DisplayForms.asp?ActiveTab=Civil . Please fully complete and file the form by selecting Civil > Other Filings > Other Documents > Report on Filing Patent/Trademark. The form must be filed by 8/24/2018 (heps, Deputy Clerk)
August 17, 2018 5 Summons Issued 21 days as to EXIT Mortgage, LLC.(heps, Deputy Clerk)
August 16, 2018 4 NOTICE by EXIT Realty Corp. International re #1 Complaint Proposed Summons (Carrier, William)
August 16, 2018 3 QC NOTICE: #1 Complaint filed by EXIT Realty Corp. International was filed incorrectly. **The following attachments or exhibits are missing - Proposed Summons. To correct this problem, file Proposed Summons using the event Notice (Other) and link Proposed Summons to #1 Complaint. (heps, Deputy Clerk)
August 15, 2018 2 Local Rule 103.3 Disclosure Statement by EXIT Realty Corp. International (Carrier, William)
August 15, 2018 1 COMPLAINT against EXIT Mortgage, LLC ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0416-7503147.), filed by EXIT Realty Corp. International. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Carrier, William)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Maryland District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: EXIT Realty Corp. International v. EXIT Mortgage, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: EXIT Mortgage, LLC
Represented By: David Andrew Burkhouse
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: EXIT Realty Corp. International
Represented By: William W Carrier, III
Represented By: Jacob Byrne
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?