The Board of Regents of The University of Texas System v. IDEXX Laboratories, Inc.
Plaintiff: The Board of Regents of The University of Texas System
Defendant: IDEXX Laboratories, Inc.
Petitioner: InvotexIP, Debora Stewart and Kristen Reilly
Case Number: 1:2018cv02513
Filed: August 16, 2018
Court: US District Court for the District of Maryland
Office: Baltimore Office
County: 88888
Presiding Judge: Theodore D Chuang
Nature of Suit: Assault Libel & Slander
Cause of Action: Motion to Quash
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 19, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 19, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER denying as moot #1 Motion to Quash; dismissing this case as moot; directing the Clerk to close this case. Signed by Judge Theodore D. Chuang on 9/19/2018. (jf3s, Deputy Clerk)
September 14, 2018 Filing 3 NOTICE by InvotexIP, Kristen Reilly, Debora Stewart of Withdrawal of #1 MOTION to Quash of Alternatively Motion to Transfer Consideration of Motion to Quash (Attachment: #1 Cover Letter) (tds, Deputy Clerk)
August 17, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 2 CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER. Signed by Judge Theodore D. Chuang on 8/17/2018. (jf3s, Deputy Clerk)
August 16, 2018 Filing 1 MOTION to Quash or Alternatively Motion to Transfer Consideration of Motion to Quash by InvotexIP, Kristen Reilly, Debora Stewart (Fee $47.00 Receipt No. 14637108363) (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit 1, #3 Exhibit 2, #4 Exhibit 3, #5 Exhibit 4, #6 Exhibit 5, #7 Exhibit 6, #8 Exhibit 7, #9 Exhibit 8, #10 Exhibit 9, #11 Exhibit 10) (jnls, Deputy Clerk)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Maryland District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: The Board of Regents of The University of Texas System v. IDEXX Laboratories, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: IDEXX Laboratories, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: InvotexIP
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Debora Stewart
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Kristen Reilly
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: The Board of Regents of The University of Texas System
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?