The Washington Post et al v. McManus et al
Plaintiff: The Baltimore Sun Company, LLC, Maryland-Delaware-D.C. Press Association, Inc., Schurz Communications, Inc., Capital-Gazette Communications, LLC, The Washington Post, Carroll County Times, LLC, Community Newspaper Holdings, Inc., APG Media of Chesapeake, LLC and Ogden Newspapers of Maryland, LLC
Defendant: Malcolm L. Funn, Board Member Kelley A. Howells, State Administrator Linda H. Lamone, Board Member Michael R. Cogan, Brian E. Frosh, Vice-Chairman Patrick J. Hogan and David J. McManus, Jr.
Amicus Curiae: Campaign Legal Center and Common Cause Maryland
Case Number: 1:2018cv02527
Filed: August 17, 2018
Court: US District Court for the District of Maryland
Office: Baltimore Office
County: 88888
Presiding Judge: Paul W Grimm
Nature of Suit: Constitutional - State Statute
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 3, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 15, 2018 Filing 31 REPLY to Response to Motion re #9 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction filed by APG Media of Chesapeake, LLC, Capital-Gazette Communications, LLC, Carroll County Times, LLC, Community Newspaper Holdings, Inc., Maryland-Delaware-D.C. Press Association, Inc., Ogden Newspapers of Maryland, LLC, Schurz Communications, Inc., The Baltimore Sun Company, LLC, The Washington Post. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit of Jonathan Albright, #2 Affidavit of Richard J. Douglas)(Berlin, Seth)
September 26, 2018 Filing 30 PAPERLESS ORDER granting #27 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Erin Chlopak. Directing attorney Erin Chlopak to register online for CM/ECF at http://www.mdd.uscourts.gov/electronic-case-filing-registration. Signed by Clerk on 9/26/2018. (srd, Deputy Clerk)
September 25, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 29 PAPERLESS ORDER granting #28 Motion for Leave to File Brief of Amici Curiae. Signed by Judge Paul W. Grimm on 9/25/2018. (sb2, Chambers)
September 24, 2018 Filing 28 MOTION for Leave to File Brief of Amici Curiae by Campaign Legal Center and Common Cause Maryland (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support of Defs' Opposition to Preliminary Injunction Motion)(Smith, Paul)
September 24, 2018 Filing 27 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Erin Chlopak (Filing fee $100, receipt number 0416-7578541.) by Campaign Legal Center and Common Cause Maryland(Smith, Paul)
September 24, 2018 Filing 26 NOTICE of Appearance by Paul March Smith on behalf of Campaign Legal Center and Common Cause Maryland (Smith, Paul)
September 21, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 25 PAPERLESS ORDER granting Plaintiffs' request for an extension of time to file a reply to Defendants' response in opposition to the motion for a preliminary injunction. The reply will now be due 10/15/18. The hearing on the motion for preliminary injunction is rescheduled to 11/16/18 at 9 a.m. Signed by Judge Paul W. Grimm on 9/21/2018. (sb2, Chambers)
September 12, 2018 Filing 24 RESPONSE in Opposition re #9 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction filed by Michael R. Cogan, Brian E. Frosh, Malcolm L. Funn, Patrick J. Hogan, Kelley A. Howells, Linda H. Lamone, David J. McManus, Jr. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F)(Trento, Andrea)
August 31, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 23 MARGINAL ORDER re #21 REQUEST for Extension of Time to File Defendants' Opposition to Motion for Preliminary Injunction (Unopposed) filed by Malcolm L. Funn, Linda H. Lamone, David J. McManus, Jr., Patrick J. Hogan, Kelley A. Howells, Brian E. Frosh, Michael R. Cogan. Signed by Judge Paul W. Grimm on 8/31/2018. (kns, Deputy Clerk)
August 31, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 22 PAPERLESS ORDER CANCELLING STATUS CONFERENCE scheduled on September 6, 2018 at 1:00PM AND ADVISING COUNSEL the Preliminary Injunction hearing remains scheduled for October 10, 2018 at 1:00PM. Signed by Judge Paul W. Grimm on 8/31/2018. (ats, Chambers)
August 29, 2018 Filing 21 REQUEST for Extension of Time to File Defendants' Opposition to Motion for Preliminary Injunction (Unopposed) (Trento, Andrea)
August 29, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 20 PAPERLESS ORDER MEMORIALIZING the August 20, 2018 conference call as follows: Defendants will file an opposition to Plaintiffs' motion for a preliminary injunction by Tuesday, September 4, 2018. Defendants' memorandum should be similar in length to Plaintiffs' 31-page memorandum. Plaintiffs will file their reply by September 17, 2018. A hearing is set for Wednesday, October 10, 2018 at 1:00 p.m. Signed by Judge Paul W. Grimm on 8/29/18. (Grimm, Paul) (lyb)
August 29, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 19 PAPERLESS ORDER THANKING COUNSEL for filing ECF No.18. Counsel is DIRECTED to submit a letter of 3 pages or less identifying the issues to be discussed. A call is scheduled for Thursday, September 6, 2018 at 1:00PM. Plaintiff's counsel is DIRECTED to initiate the call to chambers or circulate a conference call number to the parties. Signed by Judge Paul W. Grimm on 8/29/2018. (ats, Chambers)
August 28, 2018 Filing 18 Correspondence re: Memorandum of Understanding between the parties (Trento, Andrea)
August 24, 2018 Filing 17 PAPERLESS ORDER granting #14 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Dana Green. Directing attorney Dana Green to register online for CM/ECF at http://www.mdd.uscourts.gov/electronic-case-filing-registration. Signed by Clerk on 8/24/2018. (srds, Deputy Clerk)
August 24, 2018 Filing 16 PAPERLESS ORDER granting #13 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Paul Safier. Directing attorney Paul Safier to register online for CM/ECF at http://www.mdd.uscourts.gov/electronic-case-filing-registration. Signed by Clerk on 8/24/2018. (srds, Deputy Clerk)
August 20, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER Regarding the Filing of Motions. Signed by Judge Paul W. Grimm on 8/20/2018 (cags, Deputy Clerk)
August 20, 2018 Filing 14 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Dana R. Green (Filing fee $100, receipt number 0416-7511980.) by APG Media of Chesapeake, LLC, Capital-Gazette Communications, LLC, Carroll County Times, LLC, Community Newspaper Holdings, Inc., Maryland-Delaware-D.C. Press Association, Inc., Ogden Newspapers of Maryland, LLC, Schurz Communications, Inc., The Baltimore Sun Company, LLC, The Washington Post(Berlin, Seth)
August 20, 2018 Filing 13 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Paul J. Safier (Filing fee $100, receipt number 0416-7511561.) by APG Media of Chesapeake, LLC, Capital-Gazette Communications, LLC, Carroll County Times, LLC, Community Newspaper Holdings, Inc., Maryland-Delaware-D.C. Press Association, Inc., Ogden Newspapers of Maryland, LLC, Schurz Communications, Inc., The Baltimore Sun Company, LLC, The Washington Post(Berlin, Seth)
August 20, 2018 Filing 12 Summons Issued 60 days as to Michael R. Cogan, Brian E. Frosh, Malcolm L. Funn, Patrick J. Hogan, Kelley A. Howells, Linda H. Lamone, David J. McManus, Jr, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (Attachments: #1 Summons, #2 Summons, #3 Summons, #4 Summons, #5 Summons, #6 Summons)(jf3s, Deputy Clerk)
August 17, 2018 Filing 11 NOTICE of Appearance by Andrea William Trento on behalf of All Defendants (Trento, Andrea)
August 17, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 10 LETTER ORDER scheduling a telephone conference call on 8/20/2018 at 10:00 a.m. Signed by Judge Paul W. Grimm on 8/17/2018. (kns, Deputy Clerk)
August 17, 2018 Filing 9 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction by APG MEDIA OF CHESAPEAKE, LLC, CAPITAL-GAZETTE COMMUNICATIONS, LLC, CARROLL COUNTY TIMES, LLC, COMMUNITY NEWSPAPER HOLDINGS, INC., MARYLAND-DELAWARE-D.C. PRESS ASSOCIATION, INC., OGDEN NEWSPAPERS OF MARYLAND, LLC, SCHURZ COMMUNICATIONS, INC., THE BALTIMORE SUN COMPANY, LLC, The Washington Post (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support of Plaintiffs' Motion for Preliminary Injunction, #2 Affidavit of Kate Davey, #3 Affidavit of Timothy J. Thomas, #4 Affidavit of David Fike, #5 Affidavit of Robin Quillon, #6 Affidavit of Geordie Wilson, #7 Affidavit of Andrew Bruns, #8 Affidavit of Rebecca Snyder, #9 Exhibit A to the Decl. of Rebecca Snyder, #10 Affidavit of Seth D. Berlin, #11 Exhibit A to the Decl. of Seth D. Berlin, #12 Exhibit B to the Decl. of Seth D. Berlin, #13 Text of Proposed Order)(Berlin, Seth)
August 17, 2018 Filing 8 Local Rule 103.3 Disclosure Statement by MARYLAND-DELAWARE-D.C. PRESS ASSOCIATION, INC. identifying Other Affiliate MDDC Press Foundation for MARYLAND-DELAWARE-D.C. PRESS ASSOCIATION, INC..(Berlin, Seth)
August 17, 2018 Filing 7 Local Rule 103.3 Disclosure Statement by SCHURZ COMMUNICATIONS, INC. (Berlin, Seth)
August 17, 2018 Filing 6 Local Rule 103.3 Disclosure Statement by OGDEN NEWSPAPERS OF MARYLAND, LLC identifying Corporate Parent The Nutting Company, Inc. for OGDEN NEWSPAPERS OF MARYLAND, LLC.(Berlin, Seth)
August 17, 2018 Filing 5 Local Rule 103.3 Disclosure Statement by COMMUNITY NEWSPAPER HOLDINGS, INC. identifying Corporate Parent Raycom Media for COMMUNITY NEWSPAPER HOLDINGS, INC..(Berlin, Seth)
August 17, 2018 Filing 4 Local Rule 103.3 Disclosure Statement by APG MEDIA OF CHESAPEAKE, LLC identifying Corporate Parent Adams Publishing Group for APG MEDIA OF CHESAPEAKE, LLC.(Berlin, Seth)
August 17, 2018 Filing 3 Local Rule 103.3 Disclosure Statement by CAPITAL-GAZETTE COMMUNICATIONS, LLC, CARROLL COUNTY TIMES, LLC, THE BALTIMORE SUN COMPANY, LLC identifying Corporate Parent Tronc, Inc. for THE BALTIMORE SUN COMPANY, LLC; Corporate Parent THE BALTIMORE SUN COMPANY, LLC for CAPITAL-GAZETTE COMMUNICATIONS, LLC, CARROLL COUNTY TIMES, LLC.(Berlin, Seth)
August 17, 2018 Filing 2 Local Rule 103.3 Disclosure Statement by The Washington Post identifying Corporate Parent Nash Holdings, LLC for The Washington Post.(Berlin, Seth)
August 17, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT for Declaratory and Injunctive Relief against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0416-7508798.), filed by OGDEN NEWSPAPERS OF MARYLAND, LLC, CAPITAL-GAZETTE COMMUNICATIONS, LLC, The Washington Post, COMMUNITY NEWSPAPER HOLDINGS, INC., APG MEDIA OF CHESAPEAKE, LLC, MARYLAND-DELAWARE-D.C. PRESS ASSOCIATION, INC., THE BALTIMORE SUN COMPANY, LLC, SCHURZ COMMUNICATIONS, INC., CARROLL COUNTY TIMES, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons to D. McManus, #3 Summons to P. Hogan, #4 Summons to M. Cogan, #5 Summons to K. Howells, #6 Summons to M. Funn, #7 Summons to L. Lamone, #8 Summons to B. Frosh)(Berlin, Seth)
August 17, 2018 Case Reassigned to Judge Paul W. Grimm. Judge Deborah K. Chasanow no longer assigned to the case. (kns, Deputy Clerk)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Maryland District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: The Washington Post et al v. McManus et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: The Baltimore Sun Company, LLC
Represented By: Seth D Berlin
Represented By: Dana Green
Represented By: Paul Safier
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Maryland-Delaware-D.C. Press Association, Inc.
Represented By: Seth D Berlin
Represented By: Dana Green
Represented By: Paul Safier
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Schurz Communications, Inc.
Represented By: Seth D Berlin
Represented By: Dana Green
Represented By: Paul Safier
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Capital-Gazette Communications, LLC
Represented By: Seth D Berlin
Represented By: Dana Green
Represented By: Paul Safier
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: The Washington Post
Represented By: Seth D Berlin
Represented By: Dana Green
Represented By: Paul Safier
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Carroll County Times, LLC
Represented By: Seth D Berlin
Represented By: Dana Green
Represented By: Paul Safier
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Community Newspaper Holdings, Inc.
Represented By: Seth D Berlin
Represented By: Dana Green
Represented By: Paul Safier
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: APG Media of Chesapeake, LLC
Represented By: Seth D Berlin
Represented By: Dana Green
Represented By: Paul Safier
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ogden Newspapers of Maryland, LLC
Represented By: Seth D Berlin
Represented By: Dana Green
Represented By: Paul Safier
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Malcolm L. Funn
Represented By: Andrea William Trento
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Board Member Kelley A. Howells
Represented By: Andrea William Trento
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: State Administrator Linda H. Lamone
Represented By: Andrea William Trento
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Board Member Michael R. Cogan
Represented By: Andrea William Trento
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Brian E. Frosh
Represented By: Andrea William Trento
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Vice-Chairman Patrick J. Hogan
Represented By: Andrea William Trento
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: David J. McManus, Jr.
Represented By: Andrea William Trento
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: Campaign Legal Center and Common Cause Maryland
Represented By: Erin R Chlopak
Represented By: Paul March Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?