Durr Systems, Inc. v. EFC Systems, Inc.

Plaintiff: Durr Systems, Inc.
Defendant: EFC Systems, Inc.
Case Number: 1:2018cv02597
Filed: August 22, 2018
Court: US District Court for the District of Maryland
Presiding Judge: George Jarrod Hazel
Referring Judge: Ellen L Hollander
Nature of Suit: Patent
Cause of Action: 35:271
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 5, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 17, 2018 Filing 18 PAPERLESS ORDER granting #17 Corrected Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Travis Bliss. Directing attorney Travis Bliss to register online for CM/ECF at http://www.mdd.uscourts.gov/electronic-case-filing-registration. Signed by Clerk on 10/17/2018. (srd, Deputy Clerk)
October 16, 2018 Filing 17 CORRECTED MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Travis W. Bliss by EFC Systems, Inc.. The fee has already been paid.(Grivner, Geoffrey)
October 16, 2018 Filing 16 As discussed on today's call, Defendant will submit an amended counterclaim followed by an answer from Plaintiff. At that point the parties will submit a joint proposed scheduling order for the Court's consideration. (Hazel, George)
October 15, 2018 Filing 15 QC NOTICE: #14 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice filed by EFC Systems, Inc. needs to be modified. See attachment for details and corrective actions needed regarding the signature(s) on the motion. (srd, Deputy Clerk)
October 11, 2018 Filing 14 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Travis W. Bliss (Filing fee $100, receipt number 0416-7610207.) by EFC Systems, Inc.(Grivner, Geoffrey)
October 2, 2018 Filing 13 Local Rule 103.3 Disclosure Statement by EFC Systems, Inc. (Grivner, Geoffrey)
October 2, 2018 Filing 12 ANSWER to #1 Complaint, Affirmative Defenses, Certificate of Service, COUNTERCLAIM against All Plaintiffs by EFC Systems, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2)(Grivner, Geoffrey)
September 21, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER granting #9 Motion for Extension of Time to File Answer to Complaint; and stating that EFC Systems, Inc. has through and including 10/2/2018 to serve its Answer and Counterclaims. Signed by Judge George Jarrod Hazel on 9/20/2018. (tds, Deputy Clerk)
September 14, 2018 Filing 10 RESPONSE in Opposition re #9 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint, filed by Durr Systems, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit C, #5 Exhibit D, #6 Exhibit E, #7 Exhibit F, #8 Exhibit G)(Carrier, William)
September 12, 2018 Filing 9 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint, by EFC Systems, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order, #2 Exhibit Certificate of Service)(Grivner, Geoffrey)
September 4, 2018 Filing 8 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Durr Systems, Inc.. EFC Systems, Inc. served on 8/31/2018, answer due 9/21/2018.(Carrier, William)
August 28, 2018 Filing 7 Local Rule 103.3 Disclosure Statement by Durr Systems, Inc. (Carrier, William)
August 27, 2018 Filing 6 PAPERLESS ORDER granting #5 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Thomas Bejin. Directing attorney Thomas Bejin to register online for CM/ECF at http://www.mdd.uscourts.gov/electronic-case-filing-registration. Signed by Clerk on 8/27/2018. (srds, Deputy Clerk)
August 23, 2018 Filing 5 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Thomas E. Bejin (Filing fee $100, receipt number 0416-7521918.) by Durr Systems, Inc.(Carrier, William)
August 23, 2018 Filing 4 NOTICE of Appearance by Jacob Byrne on behalf of Durr Systems, Inc. (Byrne, Jacob)
August 23, 2018 Filing 3 Summons Issued 21 days as to EFC Systems, Inc..(krs, Deputy Clerk)
August 23, 2018 Filing 2 Report on Filing Patent/Trademark (krs, Deputy Clerk)
August 23, 2018 Case reassigned to Judge George Jarrod Hazel. Judge Ellen L. Hollander no longer assigned to the case. (cags, Deputy Clerk)
August 22, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT for Patent Infringement, Injunctive Relief, and Monetary Damages against EFC Systems, Inc. ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0416-7517428.), filed by Durr Systems, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Attachment Index of Exhibits, #3 Exhibit A, #4 Exhibit B, #5 Exhibit C, #6 Exhibit D, #7 Exhibit E, #8 Exhibit F, #9 Exhibit G, #10 Attachment Report AO 120, #11 Summons)(Carrier, William)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Maryland District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Durr Systems, Inc. v. EFC Systems, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Durr Systems, Inc.
Represented By: William W Carrier, III
Represented By: Thomas E Bejin
Represented By: Jacob Byrne
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: EFC Systems, Inc.
Represented By: Geoffrey G Grivner
Represented By: Travis Bliss
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?