J&J Sports Productions, Inc. v. Dimitris Spiliadis et al

Plaintiff: J&J Sports Productions, Inc.
Defendant: Sotirios Spiliadis, Dimitris Spiliadis, Olive Grove Catering, Inc., Dimitris Spiliadis a/k/a Dimitris Spiladis, Trustee for the Surviving Assets of Blue Zone Hospitality, LLC and Pauline Spiliadis
Case Number: 1:2018cv02600
Filed: August 22, 2018
Court: Maryland District Court
Presiding Judge: Ellen L Hollander
Nature of Suit: Cable/Satellite TV
Cause of Action: 47:605
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 12, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed#Document Text
October 12, 2018 12 SUMMONS Returned Executed by J&J Sports Productions, Inc.. Dimitris Spiliadis a/k/a Dimitris Spiladis, Trustee for the Surviving Assets of Blue Zone Hospitality, LLC served on 10/11/2018, answer due 11/1/2018.(Kind, Richard)
October 12, 2018 11 SUMMONS Returned Executed by J&J Sports Productions, Inc.. Olive Grove Catering, Inc. served on 10/11/2018, answer due 11/1/2018.(Kind, Richard)
October 12, 2018 10 SUMMONS Returned Executed by J&J Sports Productions, Inc.. Dimitris Spiliadis served on 10/11/2018, answer due 11/1/2018.(Kind, Richard)
September 17, 2018 Set/Reset Deadlines: Dimitris Spiliadis a/k/a Dimitris Spiladis, Trustee for the Surviving Assets of Blue Zone Hospitality, LLC answer due 10/23/2018; Olive Grove Catering, Inc. answer due 10/23/2018; Dimitris Spiliadis answer due 10/23/2018; Pauline Spiliadis answer due 10/23/2018; Sotirios Spiliadis answer due 10/23/2018. (dass, Deputy Clerk)
September 17, 2018 9 Featured Case ORDER granting consent motion for extension of time for all defendants to file their resonseive pleading to plaintiff's complaint re #8 Notice (Other) of proposed order filed by Dimitris Spiliadis a/k/a Dimitris Spiladis, Trustee for the Surviving Assets of Blue Zone Hospitality, LLC, Sotirios Spiliadis, Pauline Spiliadis, Dimitris Spiliadis. Signed by Judge Ellen L. Hollander on 9/17/2018. (dass, Deputy Clerk)
September 17, 2018 8 NOTICE by Dimitris Spiliadis a/k/a Dimitris Spiladis, Trustee for the Surviving Assets of Blue Zone Hospitality, LLC, Dimitris Spiliadis, Pauline Spiliadis, Sotirios Spiliadis Proposed Order (Grossbart, Robert)
September 17, 2018 7 QC NOTICE re: #6 Motion for Extension of Time, filed by Dimitris Spiliadis a/k/a Dimitris Spiladis, Trustee for the Surviving Assets of Blue Zone Hospitality, LLC, Olive Grove Catering, Inc., Sotirios Spiliadis, Pauline Spiliadis, Dimitris Spiliadis. **Motion is incomplete, and requests differing extension deadlines ie "(1) month week"...."two-week extension". A proposed order was not attached as indicated. Please re-file. It has been noted as FILED IN ERROR, and the document link has been disabled. (dass, Deputy Clerk)
September 14, 2018 6 (FILED IN ERROR) Consent MOTION for Extension of Time by Dimitris Spiliadis a/k/a Dimitris Spiladis, Trustee for the Surviving Assets of Blue Zone Hospitality, LLC, Olive Grove Catering, Inc., Dimitris Spiliadis, Pauline Spiliadis, Sotirios Spiliadis(Grossbart, Robert) Modified on 9/17/2018 (dass, Deputy Clerk).
August 27, 2018 5 SUMMONS Returned Executed by J&J Sports Productions, Inc.. Pauline Spiliadis served on 8/24/2018, answer due 9/14/2018.(Kind, Richard)
August 27, 2018 4 SUMMONS Returned Executed by J&J Sports Productions, Inc.. Sotirios Spiliadis served on 8/24/2018, answer due 9/14/2018.(Kind, Richard)
August 23, 2018 3 Summons Issued 21 days as to Dimitris Spiliadis a/k/a Dimitris Spiladis, Trustee for the Surviving Assets of Blue Zone Hospitality, LLC, Olive Grove Catering, Inc., Dimitris Spiliadis, Pauline Spiliadis, Sotirios Spiliadis. (Attachments: #1 Summons 2, #2 Summons 3, #3 Summons 4, #4 Summons 5)(hmls, Deputy Clerk)
August 22, 2018 2 Local Rule 103.3 Disclosure Statement by J&J Sports Productions, Inc. (hmls, Deputy Clerk)
August 22, 2018 1 COMPLAINT against Dimitris Spiliadis a/k/a Dimitris Spiladis, Trustee for the Surviving Assets of Blue Zone Hospitality, LLC, Olive Grove Catering, Inc., Dimitris Spiliadis, Pauline Spiliadis, Sotirios Spiliadis filed by J&J Sports Productions, Inc. Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 14637108474. (Attachments: #1 Attachment 1, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(hmls, Deputy Clerk)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Maryland District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: J&J Sports Productions, Inc. v. Dimitris Spiliadis et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sotirios Spiliadis
Represented By: Robert Neil Grossbart
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dimitris Spiliadis
Represented By: Robert Neil Grossbart
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Olive Grove Catering, Inc.
Represented By: Robert Neil Grossbart
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dimitris Spiliadis a/k/a Dimitris Spiladis, Trustee for the Surviving Assets of Blue Zone Hospitality, LLC
Represented By: Robert Neil Grossbart
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Pauline Spiliadis
Represented By: Robert Neil Grossbart
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: J&J Sports Productions, Inc.
Represented By: Ryan Carey Kind
Represented By: Richard M Kind
Represented By: Erica Millicent Cook
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?