United States of America v. Kaur et al
Plaintiff: United States of America/Internal Revenue Service and United States of America
Defendant: Gagandeep Singh and Mandeep Kaur
Case Number: 1:2018cv02663
Filed: August 28, 2018
Court: US District Court for the District of Maryland
Presiding Judge: Paula Xinis
Nature of Suit: Taxes
Cause of Action: 26 U.S.C. ยง 6672
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 26, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 26, 2018 Filing 8 STATUS REPORT by Mandeep Kaur, Gagandeep Singh(Hoff, Alan)
October 15, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 7 LETTER ORDER REGARDING THE FILING OF DISCOVERY MOTIONS. Signed by Judge Paula Xinis on 10/15/2018. (kns, Deputy Clerk)
October 15, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 6 SCHEDULING ORDER: Status Report due by 3/4/2019. Signed by Judge Paula Xinis on 10/15/2018. (kns, Deputy Clerk)
October 10, 2018 Filing 5 ANSWER to #1 Complaint by Mandeep Kaur, Gagandeep Singh. (Attachments: #1 Demand for Jury Trial)(Hoff, Alan)
September 27, 2018 Filing 4 SUMMONS Returned Executed by United States of America. Gagandeep Singh served on 9/20/2018, answer due 10/11/2018.(Hoffman Logsdon, Megan)
September 27, 2018 Filing 3 SUMMONS Returned Executed by United States of America. Mandeep Kaur served on 9/20/2018, answer due 10/11/2018.(Hoffman Logsdon, Megan)
August 29, 2018 Filing 2 Summons Issued 21 days as to Mandeep Kaur and Gagandeep Singh.(km4, Deputy Clerk)
August 28, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by United States of America/Internal Revenue Service. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Civil Cover Sheet, #5 Summons, #6 Summons)(Hoffman Logsdon, Megan)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Maryland District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: United States of America v. Kaur et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gagandeep Singh
Represented By: Alan J Hoff
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mandeep Kaur
Represented By: Alan J Hoff
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: United States of America/Internal Revenue Service
Represented By: Megan Eileen Hoffman Logsdon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: United States of America
Represented By: Megan Eileen Hoffman Logsdon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?