Copez v. Umukoro et al

Plaintiff: Marquis Copez
Defendant: Lawerence Umukoro and A. Fagbemi
Case Number: 1:2018cv02791
Filed: September 11, 2018
Court: Maryland District Court
Presiding Judge: James K Bredar
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983pr
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 1, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed#Document Text
November 1, 2018 5 Featured Case ORDER DIRECTING Clerk to electronically send copy of Complaint and withhold service; DIRECTING counsel for defendants to notify court if service is accepted and to answer the Complaint ( re #1 Complaint filed by Marquis Copez ). Attachments will be emailed to attorneys who have not entered their appearance and were sent this NEF. Attorneys should contact the court if they do not receive the attachments; Granting #2 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. Signed by Chief Judge James K. Bredar on 10/31/2018. (c/m 11/01/2018 bas, Deputy Clerk)
October 22, 2018 4 Correspondence from Plaintiff re: Inmate Account Summary. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(bmhs, Deputy Clerk)
October 4, 2018 3 Featured Case ORDER directing Finance Officer to file within 21 days an inmate account summary information sheet. Signed by Chief Judge James K. Bredar on 10/4/2018. (c/m 10/4/2018)(ko, Deputy Clerk)
September 7, 2018 2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Marquis Copez(ds3, Deputy Clerk)
September 7, 2018 1 COMPLAINT against A. Fagbemi, Lawerence Umukoro, filed by Marquis Copez. (Attachments: #1 Attachment)(ds3, Deputy Clerk) (Additional attachment(s) added on 9/11/2018: #2 Envelope) (ds3, Deputy Clerk).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Maryland District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Copez v. Umukoro et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lawerence Umukoro
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: A. Fagbemi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Marquis Copez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?